LUMONDI INC. D/B/A LUMINOX WATCH COMPANY v. Lennon Image Technologies LLC
Administrative Proceeding USPTO Patent Trial and Appeal Board, Case No. IPR2013-00432

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo LUMONDI INC. D/B/A LUMINOX WATCH COMPANY, Petitioner
v.
No Logo Lennon Image Technologies LLC, Patent Owner
Technology Center 2600
Institution Decision Date 1/14/2014
Related Patent Application Number 09733197
Related Patent Number 6624843
Status Terminated
  Entries (26) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document 19 Filed: 3/21/2014, Entered: None Final Decision
Judgment Termination of Proceedings
    LREF
    Legal Document 18 Filed: 3/12/2014, Entered: None Notice
    Order - Conduct of Proceeding
      LREF
      Legal Document 17 Filed: 3/11/2014, Entered: None Motion
      Joint Request for Confidentiality
        LREF
        Legal Document 16 Filed: 3/11/2014, Entered: None Motion
        Joint Motion to Terminate
          LREF
          Legal Document 15 Filed: 2/12/2014, Entered: None Notice
          Amended Mandatory Notices
            LREF
            Legal Document 14 Filed: 2/7/2014, Entered: None Notice
            Order - On Motion to Withdraw - 37 CFR 42.10(e)
              LREF
              Legal Document 13 Filed: 2/6/2014, Entered: None Motion
              Motion for Counsel (P. Schechter) to Withdraw
                LREF
                Legal Document 11 Filed: 2/5/2014, Entered: None Notice
                Order - Conduct of the Proceeding
                  LREF
                  Legal Document 10 Filed: 1/14/2014, Entered: None Notice
                  Scheduling Order
                    LREF
                    Legal Document 9 Filed: 1/14/2014, Entered: None Institution Decision
                    Decision Institution of Inter Partes Review
                      LREF
                      Legal Document 8 Filed: 10/16/2013, Entered: None Preliminary Response
                      Patent Owner's Preliminary Response
                        LREF
                        Legal Document 7 Filed: 8/6/2013, Entered: None Notice
                        Order Staying Concurrent Ex Parte Reexamination
                          LREF
                          Legal Document 6 Filed: 7/31/2013, Entered: None Notice
                          Power of Attorney
                            LREF
                            Legal Document 5 Filed: 7/31/2013, Entered: None Notice
                            Patent Owner Mandatory Notices
                              LREF
                              Legal Document 4 Filed: 7/31/2013, Entered: None Power of Attorney
                              Power of Attorney
                                LREF
                                Legal Document 3 Filed: 7/16/2013, Entered: None Notice of Filing Date Accorded to Petition
                                Notice of Filing Date Accorded to Petition
                                  LREF
                                  Legal Document 1008 Filed: 7/10/2013, Entered: None Exhibit
                                  LUM-1008 Lennon Image v. Safilo - Lennon Image Response to Motion to Dismiss
                                    LREF
                                    Legal Document 1007 Filed: 7/10/2013, Entered: None Exhibit
                                    LUM-1007 - Lennon Image v. Forevermark - Plaintiffs Asserted Claims
                                      LREF
                                      Legal Document 1006 Filed: 7/10/2013, Entered: None Exhibit
                                      LUM-1006 - U.S. Patent No. 4,467,349
                                        LREF
                                        Legal Document 1005 Filed: 7/10/2013, Entered: None Exhibit
                                        LUM 1005- Serial No. 09/733,197 - Office Action dated 02/27/2003
                                          LREF
                                          Legal Document 1004 Filed: 7/10/2013, Entered: None Exhibit
                                          LUM-1004 - File History Excerpt Claims as Filed
                                            LREF
                                            Legal Document 1003 Filed: 7/10/2013, Entered: None Exhibit
                                            LUM-1003 - U.S. Patent No. 4,539,585
                                              LREF
                                              Legal Document 1002 Filed: 7/10/2013, Entered: None Exhibit
                                              LUM-1002 - U.S. Patent No. 4,731,743
                                                LREF
                                                Legal Document 1001 Filed: 7/10/2013, Entered: None Exhibit
                                                LUM-1001 - U.S. Patent No. 6,624,843
                                                  LREF
                                                  Legal Document 2 Filed: 7/10/2013, Entered: None Power of Attorney
                                                  Power of Attorney
                                                    LREF
                                                    Legal Document 1 Filed: 7/10/2013, Entered: None Petition
                                                    Petition for Inter Partes Review
                                                      LREF

                                                      Statistics

                                                      This case has been viewed 0 times.

                                                      No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                                      Space
                                                      Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                      Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                       
                                                      PlainSite
                                                      Sign Up
                                                      Need Password Help?