Oracle v. Clouding IP, LLC
Administrative Proceeding USPTO Patent Trial and Appeal Board, Case No. IPR2013-00094

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo Oracle, Petitioner
v.
No Logo Clouding IP, LLC, Patent Owner
Technology Center 2100
Institution Decision Date 5/23/2013
Related Patent Application Number 09950559
Related Patent Number 7596784
Status Terminated
  Entries (29) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document 18 Filed: 7/22/2013, Entered: None Final Decision
Judgment Termination of Proceeding § 42.73
    LREF
    Legal Document 16 Filed: 7/19/2013, Entered: None Motion
    Joint request for confidential treatment
      LREF
      Legal Document 15 Filed: 7/19/2013, Entered: None Motion
      Joint motion to terminate
        LREF
        Legal Document 14 Filed: 7/15/2013, Entered: None Notice
        Order - Conduct of the Proceeding - 37 CFR 42.5
          LREF
          Legal Document 13 Filed: 7/12/2013, Entered: None Notice
          Stipulation re Due Date 1
            LREF
            Legal Document 12 Filed: 6/17/2013, Entered: None Notice
            Petitioner Oracle's Updated Mandatory Notices
              LREF
              Legal Document 11 Filed: 6/13/2013, Entered: None Notice
              Order - Summary Initial Conference
                LREF
                Legal Document 10 Filed: 6/12/2013, Entered: None Notice
                Notice of Deposition of Dr. Grimshaw
                  LREF
                  Legal Document 9 Filed: 5/23/2013, Entered: None Notice
                  Scheduling Order
                    LREF
                    Legal Document 8 Filed: 5/23/2013, Entered: None Institution Decision
                    Decision - Institution of Inter Partes Review - 37 CFR 42.108
                      LREF
                      Legal Document 7 Filed: 3/26/2013, Entered: None Preliminary Response
                      Patent Owner's Preliminary Response
                        LREF
                        Legal Document 6 Filed: 1/4/2013, Entered: None Notice
                        Order - Denying Certain Grounds
                          LREF
                          Legal Document 5 Filed: 12/27/2012, Entered: None Notice
                          Mandatory Notices
                            LREF
                            Legal Document 4 Filed: 12/27/2012, Entered: None Notice of Filing Date Accorded to Petition
                            Notice of Filing Date Accorded to Petition
                              LREF
                              Legal Document 1012 Filed: 12/21/2012, Entered: None Exhibit
                              Petition Exhibit 1012
                                LREF
                                Legal Document 1011 Filed: 12/21/2012, Entered: None Exhibit
                                Petition Exhibit 1011
                                  LREF
                                  Legal Document 1010 Filed: 12/21/2012, Entered: None Exhibit
                                  Petition Exhibit 1010
                                    LREF
                                    Legal Document 1009 Filed: 12/21/2012, Entered: None Exhibit
                                    Petition Exhibit 1009
                                      LREF
                                      Legal Document 1008 Filed: 12/21/2012, Entered: None Exhibit
                                      Petition Exhibit 1008
                                        LREF
                                        Legal Document 1007 Filed: 12/21/2012, Entered: None Exhibit
                                        Petition Exhibit 1007
                                          LREF
                                          Legal Document 1006 Filed: 12/21/2012, Entered: None Exhibit
                                          Petition Exhibit 1006
                                            LREF
                                            Legal Document 1005 Filed: 12/21/2012, Entered: None Exhibit
                                            Petition Exhibit 1005
                                              LREF
                                              Legal Document 1004 Filed: 12/21/2012, Entered: None Exhibit
                                              Petition Exhibit 1004
                                                LREF
                                                Legal Document 1003 Filed: 12/21/2012, Entered: None Exhibit
                                                Petition Exhibit 1003
                                                  LREF
                                                  Legal Document 1002 Filed: 12/21/2012, Entered: None Exhibit
                                                  Petition Exhibit 1002
                                                    LREF
                                                    Legal Document 1001 Filed: 12/21/2012, Entered: None Exhibit
                                                    Petition Exhibit 1001
                                                      LREF
                                                      Legal Document 3 Filed: 12/21/2012, Entered: None Notice
                                                      Submission of Corrected Service
                                                        LREF
                                                        Legal Document 2 Filed: 12/21/2012, Entered: None Power of Attorney
                                                        Power of Attorney
                                                          LREF
                                                          Legal Document 1 Filed: 12/21/2012, Entered: None Petition
                                                          Petition
                                                            LREF

                                                            Statistics

                                                            This case has been viewed 1 time.

                                                            No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                                            Space
                                                            Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                            Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                             
                                                            PlainSite
                                                            Sign Up
                                                            Need Password Help?