Oracle Corporation v. Clouding IP, LLC
Administrative Proceeding USPTO Patent Trial and Appeal Board, Case No. IPR2013-00098

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

Oracle Corporation Oracle Corporation, Petitioner
v.
No Logo Clouding IP, LLC, Patent Owner
Technology Center 2100
Institution Decision Date 5/16/2013
Related Patent Application Number 10679863
Related Patent Number 6918014
Status Terminated
  Entries (26) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document 20 Filed: 7/22/2013, Entered: None Final Decision
Judgment Termination of Proceeding § 42.73
    LREF
    Legal Document 18 Filed: 7/19/2013, Entered: None Motion
    Joint request for confidential treatment
      LREF
      Legal Document 17 Filed: 7/19/2013, Entered: None Motion
      Joint motion to terminate
        LREF
        Legal Document 16 Filed: 7/15/2013, Entered: None Notice
        Order - Conduct of the Proceeding - 37 CFR 42.5
          LREF
          Legal Document 15 Filed: 7/15/2013, Entered: None Notice
          Order - Conduct of the Proceeding - 37 CFR 42.5
            LREF
            Legal Document 14 Filed: 7/12/2013, Entered: None Notice
            Stipulation re Due Date 1
              LREF
              Legal Document 13 Filed: 6/14/2013, Entered: None Power of Attorney
              Power of Attorney
                LREF
                Legal Document 12 Filed: 6/7/2013, Entered: None Notice
                Order - Summary Initial Conference
                  LREF
                  Legal Document 11 Filed: 5/31/2013, Entered: None Notice
                  Petitioner Oracle's Updated Mandatory Notices
                    LREF
                    Legal Document 10 Filed: 5/30/2013, Entered: None Notice
                    Notice of Deposition of Dr. Reynolds
                      LREF
                      Legal Document 9 Filed: 5/16/2013, Entered: None Notice
                      Order - Scheduling Order
                        LREF
                        Legal Document 8 Filed: 5/16/2013, Entered: None Institution Decision
                        Decision - Decision to Institute Trial
                          LREF
                          Legal Document 7 Filed: 3/27/2013, Entered: None Preliminary Response
                          Patent Owner's Preliminary Response
                            LREF
                            Legal Document 6 Filed: 1/4/2013, Entered: None Notice
                            Order - Denying Certain Grounds
                              LREF
                              Legal Document 5 Filed: 12/28/2012, Entered: None Notice of Filing Date Accorded to Petition
                              Notice of Filing Date Accorded to Petition
                                LREF
                                Legal Document 4 Filed: 12/27/2012, Entered: None Notice
                                Mandatory Notices
                                  LREF
                                  Legal Document 1008 Filed: 12/21/2012, Entered: None Exhibit
                                  Petition Exhibit 1008
                                    LREF
                                    Legal Document 1007 Filed: 12/21/2012, Entered: None Exhibit
                                    Petition Exhibit 1007
                                      LREF
                                      Legal Document 1006 Filed: 12/21/2012, Entered: None Exhibit
                                      Petition Exhibit 1006
                                        LREF
                                        Legal Document 1005 Filed: 12/21/2012, Entered: None Exhibit
                                        Petition Exhibit 1005
                                          LREF
                                          Legal Document 1004 Filed: 12/21/2012, Entered: None Exhibit
                                          Petition Exhibit 1004
                                            LREF
                                            Legal Document 1003 Filed: 12/21/2012, Entered: None Exhibit
                                            Petition Exhibit 1003
                                              LREF
                                              Legal Document 1002 Filed: 12/21/2012, Entered: None Exhibit
                                              Petition Exhibit 1002
                                                LREF
                                                Legal Document 1001 Filed: 12/21/2012, Entered: None Exhibit
                                                Petition Exhibit 1001
                                                  LREF
                                                  Legal Document 3 Filed: 12/21/2012, Entered: None Notice
                                                  Notice of Corrected Service
                                                    LREF
                                                    Legal Document 1 Filed: 12/21/2012, Entered: None Petition
                                                    Petition
                                                      LREF

                                                      Statistics

                                                      This case has been viewed 1 time.

                                                      No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                                      Space
                                                      Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                      Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                       
                                                      PlainSite
                                                      Sign Up
                                                      Need Password Help?