Oracle Corporation v. Clouding IP, LLC
Administrative Proceeding USPTO Patent Trial and Appeal Board, Case No. IPR2013-00260

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

Oracle Corporation Oracle Corporation, Petitioner
v.
No Logo Clouding IP, LLC, Patent Owner
Technology Center 3600
Institution Decision Date 7/22/2013
Related Patent Application Number 08959919
Related Patent Number 5825891
Status Trial Denied
  Entries (20) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document 10 Filed: 7/26/2013, Entered: None Notice
Expunged
    LREF
    Legal Document 9 Filed: 7/22/2013, Entered: None Final DecisionCourt Filing
    Judgement - Termination of Proceeding
      LREF
      Legal Document 7 Filed: 7/19/2013, Entered: None Motion
      Joint request for confidential treatment
        LREF
        Legal Document 6 Filed: 7/19/2013, Entered: None Motion
        Joint motion to terminate
          LREF
          Legal Document 5 Filed: 7/15/2013, Entered: None Notice
          Order - Conduct of the Proceeding - 37 CFR 42.5
            LREF
            Legal Document 4 Filed: 5/13/2013, Entered: None Notice
            Related Matters
              LREF
              Legal Document 1004 Filed: 5/3/2013, Entered: None Exhibit
              Exhibit
                LREF
                Legal Document 3 Filed: 5/3/2013, Entered: None Notice of Filing Date Accorded to Petition
                Notice of Filing Date Accorded to Petition
                  LREF
                  Legal Document 1007 Filed: 5/2/2013, Entered: None Exhibit
                  Exhibit Part 1
                    LREF
                    Legal Document 1007 Filed: 5/2/2013, Entered: None Exhibit
                    Exhibit Part 2
                      LREF
                      Legal Document 1006 Filed: 5/2/2013, Entered: None Exhibit
                      Exhibit Part 1
                        LREF
                        Legal Document 1006 Filed: 5/2/2013, Entered: None Exhibit
                        Exhibit Part 2
                          LREF
                          Legal Document 1005 Filed: 5/2/2013, Entered: None Exhibit
                          Exhibit Part 1
                            LREF
                            Legal Document 1005 Filed: 5/2/2013, Entered: None Exhibit
                            Exhibit Part 2
                              LREF
                              Legal Document 1004 Filed: 5/2/2013, Entered: None Exhibit
                              Expunged
                                LREF
                                Legal Document 1003 Filed: 5/2/2013, Entered: None Exhibit
                                Exhibit
                                  LREF
                                  Legal Document 1002 Filed: 5/2/2013, Entered: None Exhibit
                                  Exhibit
                                    LREF
                                    Legal Document 1001 Filed: 5/2/2013, Entered: None Exhibit
                                    Exhibit
                                      LREF
                                      Legal Document 2 Filed: 5/2/2013, Entered: None Power of Attorney
                                      Power of Attorney
                                        LREF
                                        Legal Document 1 Filed: 5/2/2013, Entered: None Petition
                                        Petition
                                          LREF

                                          Statistics

                                          This case has been viewed 0 times.

                                          No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                          Space
                                          Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                          Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                           
                                          PlainSite
                                          Sign Up
                                          Need Password Help?