Starwood Hotels and Resorts Worldwide, Inc. v. Lone Star WiFi LLC
Administrative Proceeding USPTO Patent Trial and Appeal Board, Case No. IPR2014-00101

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

Space Space

No Logo Starwood Hotels & Resorts Worldwide, Inc., Petitioner
v.
No Logo Lone Star Wifi LLC, Patent Owner
Technology Center 2400
Institution Decision Date 12/20/2013
Related Patent Application Number 12345565
Related Patent Number 8312286
Status Trial Denied
Technology Center 2400
Institution Decision Date 12/20/2013
Related Patent Application Number 12345565
Related Patent Number 8312286
Status Trial Denied
  Entries (30) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document 18 Filed: 12/20/2013, Entered: None Notice
Notice of Refund
    LREF
    Legal Document 17 Filed: 12/20/2013, Entered: None Notice
    Expunged
      LREF
      Legal Document 16 Filed: 12/20/2013, Entered: None Final Decision
      Judgment
        LREF
        Legal Document 14 Filed: 12/17/2013, Entered: None Motion
        Starwood Request for Refund
          LREF
          Legal Document 13 Filed: 12/17/2013, Entered: None Motion
          Joint Request to Treat as Confidential Information
            LREF
            Legal Document 12 Filed: 12/17/2013, Entered: None Motion
            Joint Motion to Terminate
              LREF
              Legal Document 11 Filed: 12/12/2013, Entered: None Notice
              ORDER Conduct of the Proceeding
                LREF
                Legal Document 10 Filed: 12/4/2013, Entered: None Institution Decision
                Judgment - Withdrawn
                  LREF
                  Legal Document 9 Filed: 11/19/2013, Entered: None Notice
                  Related Matters
                    LREF
                    Legal Document 8 Filed: 11/19/2013, Entered: None Power of Attorney
                    Power of Attorney
                      LREF
                      Legal Document 7 Filed: 11/19/2013, Entered: None Notice
                      Starwood - Notice of Non-Participation
                        LREF
                        Legal Document 6 Filed: 11/15/2013, Entered: None Notice
                        Order - Conduct of the Proceedings - 37 C.F.R. 42.5
                          LREF
                          Legal Document 5 Filed: 11/7/2013, Entered: None Notice of Filing Date Accorded to Petition
                          Notice of Filing Date Accorded to Petition
                            LREF
                            Legal Document 1014 Filed: 10/30/2013, Entered: None Exhibit
                            Starwood Exhibit 1014
                              LREF
                              Legal Document 1013 Filed: 10/30/2013, Entered: None Exhibit
                              Starwood Exhibit 1013 Part 1
                                LREF
                                Legal Document 1013 Filed: 10/30/2013, Entered: None Exhibit
                                Starwood Exhibit 1013 Part 2
                                  LREF
                                  Legal Document 1012 Filed: 10/30/2013, Entered: None Exhibit
                                  Starwood Exhibit 1012
                                    LREF
                                    Legal Document 1011 Filed: 10/30/2013, Entered: None Exhibit
                                    Starwood Exhibit 1011
                                      LREF
                                      Legal Document 1010 Filed: 10/30/2013, Entered: None Exhibit
                                      Starwood Exhibit 1010
                                        LREF
                                        Legal Document 1009 Filed: 10/30/2013, Entered: None Exhibit
                                        Starwood Exhibit 1009
                                          LREF
                                          Legal Document 1008 Filed: 10/30/2013, Entered: None Exhibit
                                          Starwood Exhibit 1008
                                            LREF
                                            Legal Document 1007 Filed: 10/30/2013, Entered: None Exhibit
                                            Starwood Exhibit 1007
                                              LREF
                                              Legal Document 1006 Filed: 10/30/2013, Entered: None Exhibit
                                              Starwood Exhibit 1006
                                                LREF
                                                Legal Document 1005 Filed: 10/30/2013, Entered: None Exhibit
                                                Starwood Exhibit 1005
                                                  LREF
                                                  Legal Document 1004 Filed: 10/30/2013, Entered: None Exhibit
                                                  Starwood Exhibit 1004
                                                    LREF
                                                    Legal Document 1003 Filed: 10/30/2013, Entered: None Exhibit
                                                    Starwood Exhibit 1003
                                                      LREF
                                                      Legal Document 1002 Filed: 10/30/2013, Entered: None Exhibit
                                                      Starwood Exhibit 1002
                                                        LREF
                                                        Legal Document 1001 Filed: 10/30/2013, Entered: None Exhibit
                                                        Starwood Exhibit 1001
                                                          LREF
                                                          Legal Document 4 Filed: 10/30/2013, Entered: None Power of Attorney
                                                          Power of Attorney
                                                            LREF
                                                            Legal Document 3 Filed: 10/30/2013, Entered: None Petition
                                                            Starwood '286 IPR Petition
                                                              LREF

                                                              Statistics

                                                              This case has been viewed 0 times.

                                                              No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                                              Space
                                                              Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                              Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                               
                                                              PlainSite
                                                              Sign Up
                                                              Need Password Help?