Chrysler Group LLC v. Norman IP Holdings, LLC
Administrative Proceeding USPTO Patent Trial and Appeal Board, Case No. IPR2014-00560

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo Chrysler Group LLC, Petitioner
v.
No Logo Norman IP Holdings, LLC, Patent Owner
Technology Center 2100
Institution Decision Date 6/26/2014
Related Patent Application Number 08226717
Related Patent Number 5592555
Status Trial Denied
Technology Center 2100
Institution Decision Date 6/26/2014
Related Patent Application Number 08226717
Related Patent Number 5592555
Status Trial Denied
  Entries (27) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document 15 Filed: 10/9/2014, Entered: None Notice
Notice of Refund
    LREF
    Legal Document 14 Filed: 10/7/2014, Entered: None Notice
    Request for Refund of Post-Institution Fee
      LREF
      Legal Document 13 Filed: 6/26/2014, Entered: None Final Decision
      Order - Motion to Terminate
        LREF
        Legal Document 11 Filed: 6/23/2014, Entered: None Motion
        Joint Request to File Confidential Information
          LREF
          Legal Document 10 Filed: 6/23/2014, Entered: None Motion
          Joint Stipulation to Dismiss
            LREF
            Legal Document 9 Filed: 4/28/2014, Entered: None Notice
            Related Matters
              LREF
              Legal Document 8 Filed: 4/28/2014, Entered: None Power of Attorney
              Power of Attorney
                LREF
                Legal Document 7 Filed: 4/28/2014, Entered: None Power of Attorney
                Power of Attorney
                  LREF
                  Legal Document 6 Filed: 4/23/2014, Entered: None Order
                  Notice of Accepting Corrected Petition
                    LREF
                    Legal Document 5 Filed: 4/23/2014, Entered: None Order
                    Expunged
                      LREF
                      Legal Document 4 Filed: 4/17/2014, Entered: None Notice
                      Corrected Petition For Inter Partes Review of U.S. Patent No. 5,592,555
                        LREF
                        Legal Document 3 Filed: 4/4/2014, Entered: None Notice of Filing Date Accorded to Petition
                        Notice of Filing Date Accorded to Petition
                          LREF
                          Legal Document 1013 Filed: 4/1/2014, Entered: None Exhibit
                          EX 1013 90.010757 mar 29 final OA
                            LREF
                            Legal Document 1012 Filed: 4/1/2014, Entered: None Exhibit
                            EX 1012 90.012783 jan 23 final OA
                              LREF
                              Legal Document 1011 Filed: 4/1/2014, Entered: None Exhibit
                              EX 1011 90.012783 nov 11 amendment
                                LREF
                                Legal Document 1010 Filed: 4/1/2014, Entered: None Exhibit
                                EX 1010 5.07.10 Saxon v Apple
                                  LREF
                                  Legal Document 1009 Filed: 4/1/2014, Entered: None Exhibit
                                  EX 1009 7.31.09 Saxon v Nokia
                                    LREF
                                    Legal Document 1008 Filed: 4/1/2014, Entered: None Exhibit
                                    EX 1008 Reex Request for US5592555
                                      LREF
                                      Legal Document 1007 Filed: 4/1/2014, Entered: None Exhibit
                                      EX 1007 US4525599 (Curran)
                                        LREF
                                        Legal Document 1006 Filed: 4/1/2014, Entered: None Exhibit
                                        EX 1006 US5185796 (Wilson)
                                          LREF
                                          Legal Document 1005 Filed: 4/1/2014, Entered: None Exhibit
                                          EX 1005 GB2188514A (Sheppard)
                                            LREF
                                            Legal Document 1004 Filed: 4/1/2014, Entered: None Exhibit
                                            EX 1004 US5172414 (Reeds)
                                              LREF
                                              Legal Document 1003 Filed: 4/1/2014, Entered: None Exhibit
                                              EX 1003 US5179591 (Hardy)
                                                LREF
                                                Legal Document 1002 Filed: 4/1/2014, Entered: None Exhibit
                                                EX 1002 US5222137 (Barrett)
                                                  LREF
                                                  Legal Document 1001 Filed: 4/1/2014, Entered: None Exhibit
                                                  EX 1001 US5592555
                                                    LREF
                                                    Legal Document 2 Filed: 4/1/2014, Entered: None Power of Attorney
                                                    Power of Attorney
                                                      LREF
                                                      Legal Document 1 Filed: 4/1/2014, Entered: None Petition
                                                      Petition For Inter Partes Review of U.S. Patent No. 5,592,555
                                                        LREF

                                                        Statistics

                                                        This case has been viewed 0 times.

                                                        No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                                        Space
                                                        Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                        Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                         
                                                        PlainSite
                                                        Sign Up
                                                        Need Password Help?