Luxottica Retail North America, Inc. v. Lennon Image Technologies LLC
Administrative Proceeding USPTO Patent Trial and Appeal Board, Case No. IPR2014-00593

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo Luxottica Retail North America Inc., Petitioner
v.
No Logo Lennon Image Technologies LLC, Patent Owner
Technology Center 2600
Institution Decision Date 10/10/2014
Related Patent Application Number 09733197
Related Patent Number 6624843
Status Terminated
Technology Center 2600
Institution Decision Date 10/10/2014
Related Patent Application Number 09733197
Related Patent Number 6624843
Status Terminated
  Entries (33) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document 21 Filed: 1/12/2015, Entered: None Termination - Settlement
Decision - Motion to Terminate
    LREF
    Legal Document 2001 Filed: 12/16/2014, Entered: None Exhibit
    Patent Owner's Explanation as to Why Termination is Appropriate
      LREF
      Legal Document 20 Filed: 12/16/2014, Entered: None Notice
      Notice to Withdraw Request for Rehearing
        LREF
        Legal Document 19 Filed: 12/16/2014, Entered: None Motion
        Joint Request to File Settlement Agreement as Business Confidential Information
          LREF
          Legal Document 18 Filed: 12/16/2014, Entered: None Motion
          Joint Motion to Terminate
            LREF
            Legal Document 17 Filed: 12/8/2014, Entered: None Order
            Order - Conduct of the Proceeding - 37 CFR 42.5
              LREF
              Legal Document 16 Filed: 11/26/2014, Entered: None Notice
              Joint Stipulation of Due Dates
                LREF
                Legal Document 15 Filed: 11/5/2014, Entered: None Notice
                Order - Conduct of the Proceeding
                  LREF
                  Legal Document 14 Filed: 10/24/2014, Entered: None Notice
                  Petitioner's Notice Regarding Initial Conference Call
                    LREF
                    Legal Document 13 Filed: 10/16/2014, Entered: None Rehearing Request - in re Institution Decision Granted
                    Patent Owner's Request for Rehearing
                      LREF
                      Legal Document 12 Filed: 10/10/2014, Entered: None Order
                      Scheduling Order
                        LREF
                        Legal Document 11 Filed: 10/10/2014, Entered: None Institution Decision
                        Decision - Institution of Inter Partes Review - 37 CFR 42.108
                          LREF
                          Legal Document 10 Filed: 7/14/2014, Entered: None Preliminary Response
                          PO PRELIMINARY RESPONSE
                            LREF
                            Legal Document 9 Filed: 6/18/2014, Entered: None Notice
                            Order - Conduct of the Proceeding 37 C.F.R. 42.5
                              LREF
                              Legal Document 8 Filed: 5/17/2014, Entered: None Order
                              Order - Granting Motion for Pro Hac Vice Admission of Richard S. Mandaro - 37 CFR 42.10
                                LREF
                                Legal Document 1011 Filed: 4/30/2014, Entered: None Exhibit
                                Affidavit of Richard S. Mandaro in Support of Motion For Pro Hac Vice Admission
                                  LREF
                                  Legal Document 7 Filed: 4/30/2014, Entered: None Motion
                                  Petitioner's Motion For Pro Hac Vice Admission of Richard S. Mandaro Under 37 C.F.R. 42.10(C)
                                    LREF
                                    Legal Document 6 Filed: 4/15/2014, Entered: None Notice
                                    Patent Owner Mandatory Notices
                                      LREF
                                      Legal Document 5 Filed: 4/14/2014, Entered: None Notice of Filing Date Accorded to Petition
                                      Notice of Filing Date Accorded to Petition
                                        LREF
                                        Legal Document 4 Filed: 4/11/2014, Entered: None Power of Attorney
                                        Power of Attorney
                                          LREF
                                          Legal Document 1010 Filed: 4/8/2014, Entered: None Exhibit
                                          Full Copy of Prosecution History for the '843 Patent
                                            LREF
                                            Legal Document 1009 Filed: 4/8/2014, Entered: None Exhibit
                                            Lumondi IPR Decision to Institute Inter Partes Review, Jan. 14, 2014, Case IPR2013-00432
                                              LREF
                                              Legal Document 1008 Filed: 4/8/2014, Entered: None Exhibit
                                              Plaintiff's Disclosure of Asserted Claims and Infringement Contentions in Lennon v. Macy's et al.
                                                LREF
                                                Legal Document 1007 Filed: 4/8/2014, Entered: None Exhibit
                                                Plaintiff's Disclosure of Asserted Claims and Infringement Contentions in Lennon v. Luxottica et al.
                                                  LREF
                                                  Legal Document 1006 Filed: 4/8/2014, Entered: None Exhibit
                                                  U.S. Patent No. 4,467,349 to Maloomiam
                                                    LREF
                                                    Legal Document 1005 Filed: 4/8/2014, Entered: None Exhibit
                                                    Office Action mailed Feb. 27, 2003
                                                      LREF
                                                      Legal Document 1004 Filed: 4/8/2014, Entered: None Exhibit
                                                      Claims as originally filed in U.S. Patent Application Serial No. 09/733,197
                                                        LREF
                                                        Legal Document 1003 Filed: 4/8/2014, Entered: None Exhibit
                                                        U.S. Patent No. 4,539,585 to Spackova et al.
                                                          LREF
                                                          Legal Document 1002 Filed: 4/8/2014, Entered: None Exhibit
                                                          U.S. Patent No. 4,731,743 to Blancato
                                                            LREF
                                                            Legal Document 1001 Filed: 4/8/2014, Entered: None Exhibit
                                                            U.S. Patent No. 6,624,843 to Lennon
                                                              LREF
                                                              Legal Document 3 Filed: 4/8/2014, Entered: None Power of Attorney
                                                              Power of Attorney
                                                                LREF
                                                                Legal Document 2 Filed: 4/8/2014, Entered: None Power of Attorney
                                                                Power of Attorney
                                                                  LREF
                                                                  Legal Document 1 Filed: 4/8/2014, Entered: None Petition
                                                                  Petition for Inter Partes Review of U.S. Patent No. 6,624,843
                                                                    LREF

                                                                    Statistics

                                                                    This case has been viewed 1 time.

                                                                    No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                                                    Space
                                                                    Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                    Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                     
                                                                    PlainSite
                                                                    Sign Up
                                                                    Need Password Help?