Microsoft Corporation v. BRADIUM TECHNOLOGIES LLC
Administrative Proceeding USPTO Patent Trial and Appeal Board, Case No. IPR2016-00448

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts
Microsoft Corporation Microsoft Corporation, Petitioner
Officer/Director, Greenfield Online Inc.
Officer/Director, Crisp Acquisition Corp
Officer/Director, Devry Inc.
Facebook, Inc. Officer/Director, Facebook, Inc.
Officer/Director, Visiocorp
Officer/Director, Immersion Corp
Officer/Director, Avanade Inc.
v.
No Logo Bradium Technologies LLC, Patent Owner
Technology Center 2400
Institution Decision Date 7/25/2016
Related Patent Application Number 12619643
Related Patent Number 7908343
Status Trial Instituted
  Entries (24) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document 10 Filed: 7/25/2016, Entered: None Order
Scheduling Order
    LREF
    Legal Document 9 Filed: 7/25/2016, Entered: None Institution Decision
    Decision - Institution of Inter Partes Review
      LREF
      Legal Document 2002 Filed: 4/27/2016, Entered: None Exhibit
      Exhibit 2002 - Prasad, Accelerating SIFT Feature extraction with a vector DSP (Master Thesis)
        LREF
        Legal Document 2001 Filed: 4/27/2016, Entered: None Exhibit
        Exhibit 2001 - Scheduling Transcript, Bradium Techs. v. Microsoft Corp. Case No., 15-cv-031 (D. Del.)
          LREF
          Legal Document 8 Filed: 4/27/2016, Entered: None Preliminary Response
          Patent Owner's Preliminary Response
            LREF
            Legal Document 7 Filed: 4/12/2016, Entered: None Notice
            Patent Owner's Updated Mandatory Notices
              LREF
              Legal Document 6 Filed: 2/1/2016, Entered: None Motion
              Motion for Pro Hac Vice Admission of Michael N. Zachary
                LREF
                Legal Document 5 Filed: 2/1/2016, Entered: None Notice
                Related Matters
                  LREF
                  Legal Document 4 Filed: 2/1/2016, Entered: None Power of Attorney
                  Power of Attorney
                    LREF
                    Legal Document 3 Filed: 1/27/2016, Entered: None Notice of Filing Date Accorded to Petition
                    Notice of Filing Date Accorded to Petition
                      LREF
                      Legal Document 1011 Filed: 1/11/2016, Entered: None Exhibit
                      Ex1011 Proof of Service of Complaint
                        LREF
                        Legal Document 1010 Filed: 1/11/2016, Entered: None Exhibit
                        Ex1010 Cover page of Reddy (Ex1004) from Linda Hall Library
                          LREF
                          Legal Document 1009 Filed: 1/11/2016, Entered: None Exhibit
                          Ex1009 Cover page and auth declaration of Reddy (Ex1004) from British Library
                            LREF
                            Legal Document 1008 Filed: 1/11/2016, Entered: None Exhibit
                            Ex1008 Printout of Google Scholar citations to Reddy (Ex1004)
                              LREF
                              Legal Document 1007 Filed: 1/11/2016, Entered: None Exhibit
                              Ex1007 Printout of IEEE Explore citations to Reddy (Ex1004)
                                LREF
                                Legal Document 1006 Filed: 1/11/2016, Entered: None Exhibit
                                Ex1006 Hornbacker - EP1070290B1
                                  LREF
                                  Legal Document 1005 Filed: 1/11/2016, Entered: None Exhibit
                                  Ex1005 Part 1 - Michalson Declaration with Appendices A-I
                                    LREF
                                    Legal Document 1005 Filed: 1/11/2016, Entered: None Exhibit
                                    Ex1005 Part 2 - Appendices J-KK to Michalson Declaration
                                      LREF
                                      Legal Document 1004 Filed: 1/11/2016, Entered: None Exhibit
                                      Ex1004 Reddy TerraVision IEEE 1999
                                        LREF
                                        Legal Document 1003 Filed: 1/11/2016, Entered: None Exhibit
                                        Ex1003 Hornbacker - WO9941675A1
                                          LREF
                                          Legal Document 1002 Filed: 1/11/2016, Entered: None Exhibit
                                          Ex1002 Levanon - US8924506B2
                                            LREF
                                            Legal Document 1001 Filed: 1/11/2016, Entered: None Exhibit
                                            Ex1001 Levanon - US7908343B2
                                              LREF
                                              Legal Document 2 Filed: 1/11/2016, Entered: None Power of Attorney
                                              Power of Attorney
                                                LREF
                                                Legal Document 1 Filed: 1/11/2016, Entered: None Petition
                                                IPR Petition of US7908343
                                                  LREF

                                                  Statistics

                                                  This case has been viewed 12 times.

                                                  No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                                  Space
                                                  Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                  Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                   
                                                  PlainSite
                                                  Sign Up
                                                  Need Password Help?