Microsoft Corporation v. Bradium Technologies LLC
Administrative Proceeding USPTO Patent Trial and Appeal Board, Case No. IPR2015-01435

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Last Updated October 6, 2019 at 12:12 AM EDT (2.3 years ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts
Microsoft Corporation Microsoft Corporation, Petitioner
Officer/Director, Greenfield Online Inc.
Officer/Director, Crisp Acquisition Corp
Officer/Director, Devry Inc.
Facebook, Inc. Officer/Director, Facebook, Inc.
Officer/Director, Visiocorp
Officer/Director, Immersion Corp
Officer/Director, Avanade Inc.
v.
No Logo Bradium Technologies LLC, Patent Owner
Technology Center 2400
Institution Decision Date 12/23/2015
Related Patent Application Number 13027929
Related Patent Number 8924506
Status Terminated
  Entries (34) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document 18 Filed: 1/29/2016, Entered: None Notice
Notice of Refund
    LREF
    Legal Document 17 Filed: 1/25/2016, Entered: None Refund Request
    Petitioner Request for Refund
      LREF
      Legal Document 16 Filed: 12/29/2015, Entered: None Notice
      Patent Owner's Updated Mandatory Notices
        LREF
        Legal Document 15 Filed: 12/23/2015, Entered: None Decision Denying Institution
        Decision Denying Institution of Inter Parties Review
          LREF
          Legal Document 14 Filed: 12/23/2015, Entered: None Decision Denying Institution
          Expunged
            LREF
            Legal Document 13 Filed: 10/19/2015, Entered: None Notice
            Patent Owner's Updated Mandatory Notices
              LREF
              Legal Document 12 Filed: 9/28/2015, Entered: None Preliminary Response
              Patent Owner Bradium Technologies Preliminary Response
                LREF
                Legal Document 11 Filed: 8/20/2015, Entered: None Order
                Order Granting Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Michael N. Zachery - 37 CFR 42.10
                  LREF
                  Legal Document 10 Filed: 8/20/2015, Entered: None Order
                  Order Granting Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Robin M. Plachy - 37 CFR 42.10
                    LREF
                    Legal Document 9 Filed: 8/20/2015, Entered: None Order
                    Order Granting Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Mark A. Hannemann - 37 CFR 42.10
                      LREF
                      Legal Document 8 Filed: 8/4/2015, Entered: None Motion
                      Motion for Pro Hac Vice Admission of Michael N Zachary
                        LREF
                        Legal Document 7 Filed: 8/4/2015, Entered: None Motion
                        Motion for Pro Hac Vice Admission of Robin N Plachy
                          LREF
                          Legal Document 6 Filed: 8/4/2015, Entered: None Motion
                          Motion for Pro Hac Vice Admission of Mark E Hannemann
                            LREF
                            Legal Document 5 Filed: 7/7/2015, Entered: None Notice
                            Related Matters
                              LREF
                              Legal Document 4 Filed: 7/7/2015, Entered: None Power of Attorney
                              Power of Attorney
                                LREF
                                Legal Document 3 Filed: 6/26/2015, Entered: None Notice of Filing Date Accorded to Petition
                                Notice of Filing Date Accorded to Petition
                                  LREF
                                  Legal Document 1014 Filed: 6/16/2015, Entered: None Exhibit
                                  Ex1014 Carpenter Declaration
                                    LREF
                                    Legal Document 1013 Filed: 6/16/2015, Entered: None Exhibit
                                    Ex1013 Lindstrom Declaration
                                      LREF
                                      Legal Document 1012 Filed: 6/16/2015, Entered: None Exhibit
                                      Ex1012 Claim Language of the 506 Patent
                                        LREF
                                        Legal Document 1011 Filed: 6/16/2015, Entered: None Exhibit
                                        Ex1011 Hornbacker - EP1070290B1
                                          LREF
                                          Legal Document 1010 Filed: 6/16/2015, Entered: None Exhibit
                                          Ex1010 Provisional Applications - Part 2
                                            LREF
                                            Legal Document 1010 Filed: 6/16/2015, Entered: None Exhibit
                                            Ex1010 Provisional Applications - Part 2
                                              LREF
                                              Legal Document 1009 Filed: 6/16/2015, Entered: None Exhibit
                                              Ex1009 Michalson Declaration Appendices P-EE
                                                LREF
                                                Legal Document 1009 Filed: 6/16/2015, Entered: None Exhibit
                                                Ex1009 Michalson Declaration Appendices P-EE
                                                  LREF
                                                  Legal Document 1008 Filed: 6/16/2015, Entered: None Exhibit
                                                  Ex1008 Hassan - US5940117
                                                    LREF
                                                    Legal Document 1007 Filed: 6/16/2015, Entered: None Exhibit
                                                    Ex1007 Cooper - US6118456
                                                      LREF
                                                      Legal Document 1006 Filed: 6/16/2015, Entered: None Exhibit
                                                      Ex1006 Rutledge - US6650998B1
                                                        LREF
                                                        Legal Document 1005 Filed: 6/16/2015, Entered: None Exhibit
                                                        Ex1005 Ligtenberg - US5682441
                                                          LREF
                                                          Legal Document 1004 Filed: 6/16/2015, Entered: None Exhibit
                                                          Ex1004 Lindstrom - Integrated-Global-Gis
                                                            LREF
                                                            Legal Document 1003 Filed: 6/16/2015, Entered: None Exhibit
                                                            Ex1003 Hornbacker - WO9941675A1
                                                              LREF
                                                              Legal Document 1002 Filed: 6/16/2015, Entered: None Exhibit
                                                              Ex1002 Potmesil Maps Alive with dArnaud Declaration
                                                                LREF
                                                                Legal Document 1001 Filed: 6/16/2015, Entered: None Exhibit
                                                                Ex1001 Levanon - US8924506B2
                                                                  LREF
                                                                  Legal Document 2 Filed: 6/16/2015, Entered: None petition
                                                                  Petition for Inter Partes Review
                                                                    LREF
                                                                    Legal Document 1 Filed: 6/16/2015, Entered: None Power of Attorney
                                                                    Power of Attorney
                                                                      LREF

                                                                      Statistics

                                                                      This case has been viewed 0 times.

                                                                      No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                                                      Space
                                                                      Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                      Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                       
                                                                      PlainSite
                                                                      Sign Up
                                                                      Need Password Help?