Microsoft Corporation v. BRADIUM TECHNOLOGIES LLC
Administrative Proceeding USPTO Patent Trial and Appeal Board, Case No. IPR2016-00449

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Last Updated October 6, 2019 at 12:15 AM EDT (2.2 years ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

Space Space

Microsoft Corporation Microsoft Corporation, Petitioner
Officer/Director, Greenfield Online Inc.
Officer/Director, Crisp Acquisition Corp
Officer/Director, Devry Inc.
Facebook, Inc. Officer/Director, Facebook, Inc.
Officer/Director, Visiocorp
Officer/Director, Immersion Corp
Officer/Director, Avanade Inc.
v.
No Logo Bradium Technologies LLC, Patent Owner
Technology Center 2400
Institution Decision Date 7/27/2016
Related Patent Application Number 13027929
Related Patent Number 8924506
Status Trial Instituted
  Entries (199) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document 69 Filed: 9/20/2017, Entered: None Notice of appeal
2017 09 20 IPR2016-00449 Patent Owners Notice of Appeal
    LREF
    Legal Document 68 Filed: 9/8/2017, Entered: None Motion
    Joint Motion to Maintain Confidential Documents or Expunge
      LREF
      Legal Document 67 Filed: 7/26/2017, Entered: None Final Decision
      FINAL WRITTEN DECISION
        LREF
        Legal Document 66 Filed: 7/26/2017, Entered: None Order
        DECISION ON PATENT OWNER'S MOTION TO EXCLUDE
          LREF
          Legal Document 65 Filed: 7/26/2017, Entered: None Order
          DECISION ON PETITIONER'S MOTION TO EXCLUDE
            LREF
            Legal Document 64 Filed: 7/26/2017, Entered: None Order
            DECISION ON MOTIONS TO SEAL
              LREF
              Legal Document 61 Filed: 7/24/2017, Entered: None Hearing Transcript
              Record of Oral Hearing
                LREF
                Legal Document 60 Filed: 4/25/2017, Entered: None Notice
                Petitioner's Updated Mandatory Notices
                  LREF
                  Legal Document 2086 Filed: 4/17/2017, Entered: None Exhibit
                  Ex. 2086 Patent Owner¿¿¿s Demonstratives for Oral Argument
                    LREF
                    Legal Document 1047 Filed: 4/17/2017, Entered: None Exhibit
                    Ex1047 - Petitioner's Demonstratives for Oral Argument
                      LREF
                      Legal Document 59 Filed: 4/17/2017, Entered: None Exhibit
                      Patent Owner's Exhibit List 5
                        LREF
                        Legal Document 58 Filed: 4/17/2017, Entered: None Exhibit
                        Petitioner's Updated Exhibit List
                          LREF
                          Legal Document 57 Filed: 4/12/2017, Entered: None Order
                          ORDER Trial Hearing 37 C.F.R. sec 42.70
                            LREF
                            Legal Document 2085 Filed: 4/7/2017, Entered: None Exhibit
                            Ex. 2085 - Declaration of Ian Moore
                              LREF
                              Legal Document 2084 Filed: 4/7/2017, Entered: None Exhibit
                              Ex. 2084 - Letter from C. Coulson to E. Day re Exhibit 1017, Declaration of Yonatan Lavi¿¿¿ dated February 13, 2017
                                LREF
                                Legal Document 2083 Filed: 4/7/2017, Entered: None Exhibit
                                Ex. 2083 - LinkedIn Profile of Yoni Lavi
                                  LREF
                                  Legal Document 56 Filed: 4/7/2017, Entered: None reply
                                  Patent Owner's Reply in Support of Patent Owner's Motion to Exclude Evidence (Public Version)
                                    LREF
                                    Legal Document 54 Filed: 4/7/2017, Entered: None Motion
                                    Patent Owner's Unopposed Motion to Seal
                                      LREF
                                      Legal Document 53 Filed: 4/7/2017, Entered: None Exhibit
                                      Patent Owner's Exhibit List 4
                                        LREF
                                        Legal Document 52 Filed: 4/7/2017, Entered: None reply
                                        Petitioner's Reply to Patent Owner's Opposition to Motion to Exclude
                                          LREF
                                          Legal Document 1015 Filed: 4/4/2017, Entered: None Exhibit
                                          Ex 1015 - Isaac Levanon -LinkedIn (corrected)
                                            LREF
                                            Legal Document 1014 Filed: 4/4/2017, Entered: None Exhibit
                                            Ex 1014 - Wikipedia Article IEEE 802 (corrected)
                                              LREF
                                              Legal Document 51 Filed: 4/4/2017, Entered: None other
                                              Petitioner's Certificate of Service
                                                LREF
                                                Legal Document 1046 Filed: 3/31/2017, Entered: None Exhibit
                                                Ex1046 - M. Bright Declaration
                                                  LREF
                                                  Legal Document 1045 Filed: 3/31/2017, Entered: None Exhibit
                                                  Ex1045 - 2017-03-13 Email E. Day to C. Coulson
                                                    LREF
                                                    Legal Document 1044 Filed: 3/31/2017, Entered: None Exhibit
                                                    Ex1044 - 2017-02-14 Ltr Resp to Coulson fr Day re Ex 1017
                                                      LREF
                                                      Legal Document 1043 Filed: 3/31/2017, Entered: None Exhibit
                                                      Ex1043 - C. Butler Affidavit re Internet Archive
                                                        LREF
                                                        Legal Document 1042 Filed: 3/31/2017, Entered: None Exhibit
                                                        Ex1042 - 2017-03-12 Email C. Coulson to E. Day
                                                          LREF
                                                          Legal Document 1041 Filed: 3/31/2017, Entered: None Exhibit
                                                          Ex1041 - 2017-02-27 Email E. Day to C. Coulson
                                                            LREF
                                                            Legal Document 1040 Filed: 3/31/2017, Entered: None Exhibit
                                                            Ex1040 - 2017-02-09 Email E. Day to C. Coulson
                                                              LREF
                                                              Legal Document 1039 Filed: 3/31/2017, Entered: None Exhibit
                                                              Ex1039 - 2017-02-09 Letter from C. Coulson to C. Ng
                                                                LREF
                                                                Legal Document 1035 Filed: 3/31/2017, Entered: None Exhibit
                                                                Ex1035 - Hearing transcript 2-03-16, Bradium v. Microsoft
                                                                  LREF
                                                                  Legal Document 1034 Filed: 3/31/2017, Entered: None Exhibit
                                                                  Ex1034 - 2016-02-25 Bradium Initial Disclosures
                                                                    LREF
                                                                    Legal Document 1033 Filed: 3/31/2017, Entered: None Exhibit
                                                                    Ex1033 - 3DVU Delaware corporate records
                                                                      LREF
                                                                      Legal Document 1032 Filed: 3/31/2017, Entered: None Exhibit
                                                                      Ex1032 - 2017-03-27 Michalson Errata
                                                                        LREF
                                                                        Legal Document 50 Filed: 3/31/2017, Entered: None response
                                                                        Patent Owner's Opposition to Petitioner's Motion to Exclude Evidence (Public)
                                                                          LREF
                                                                          Legal Document 48 Filed: 3/31/2017, Entered: None Motion
                                                                          Patent Owner's Unopposed Motion to Seal
                                                                            LREF
                                                                            Legal Document 47 Filed: 3/31/2017, Entered: None Exhibit
                                                                            Petitioner's Updated Exhibit List
                                                                              LREF
                                                                              Legal Document 46 Filed: 3/31/2017, Entered: None Opposition
                                                                              Petitioner's Opposition to Motion to Exclude
                                                                                LREF
                                                                                Legal Document 45 Filed: 3/31/2017, Entered: None response
                                                                                Petitioner's Response to Patent Owner's Motion for Observation
                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                  Legal Document 2081 Filed: 3/24/2017, Entered: None Exhibit
                                                                                  Ex 2081
                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                    Legal Document 2080 Filed: 3/24/2017, Entered: None Exhibit
                                                                                    Ex 2080
                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                      Legal Document 2079 Filed: 3/24/2017, Entered: None Exhibit
                                                                                      Ex 2079
                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                        Legal Document 44 Filed: 3/24/2017, Entered: None Motion
                                                                                        Patent Owner Motion to Exclude Evidence
                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                          Legal Document 43 Filed: 3/24/2017, Entered: None Exhibit
                                                                                          Exhibit List 3
                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                            Legal Document 42 Filed: 3/24/2017, Entered: None Motion
                                                                                            Petitioner's Motion to Exclude Evidence
                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                              Legal Document 2078 Filed: 3/22/2017, Entered: None Exhibit
                                                                                              Ex. 2078 - IPR2016-00448 and IPR2016-00449, Transcript of February 21, 2017 Deposition of Dr. William Michalson
                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                Legal Document 2077 Filed: 3/22/2017, Entered: None Exhibit
                                                                                                Ex. 2077 - Visteon Global Techs Inc., et al. v. Garmin Int¿¿¿l., Inc., No. 10-cv-10578-PDB-DRG, Transcript of November 9, 2012 Deposition of Dr. William Michalson
                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                  Legal Document 2076 Filed: 3/22/2017, Entered: None Exhibit
                                                                                                  Ex. 2076 - Under Armour Inc v. Adidas AG, IPR2015-00698, Declaration of Dr. William R. Michalson for IPR2015-00698, dated November 19, 2015
                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                    Legal Document 2075 Filed: 3/22/2017, Entered: None Exhibit
                                                                                                    Ex. 2075 - Under Armour Inc v. Adidas AG, IPR2015-00698, Transcript of February 5, 2016 Deposition of Dr. William R. Michalson
                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                      Legal Document 2074 Filed: 3/22/2017, Entered: None Exhibit
                                                                                                      Ex. 2074 - First Amended Complaint for Patent Infringement, dated March 11, 2016, Bradium Technologies LLC v. Microsoft Corp. case no. 1:15-cv-00031-RGA
                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                        Legal Document 2073 Filed: 3/22/2017, Entered: None Exhibit
                                                                                                        Ex. 2073 - The Free Dictionary, ¿¿¿Windows NT¿¿¿
                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                          Legal Document 41 Filed: 3/22/2017, Entered: None Motion
                                                                                                          Patent Owner's Motion for Observations on Cross-Examination
                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                            Legal Document 40 Filed: 3/22/2017, Entered: None Oral Hearing Request
                                                                                                            Patent Owner's Request for Oral Argument
                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                              Legal Document 39 Filed: 3/22/2017, Entered: None Oral Hearing Request
                                                                                                              Petitioner's Request for Oral Argument
                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                Legal Document 38 Filed: 3/22/2017, Entered: None Exhibit
                                                                                                                Patent Owner's Exhibit List 2
                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                  Legal Document 37 Filed: 3/22/2017, Entered: None Notice
                                                                                                                  Stipulation to Modify Due Date 4
                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                    Legal Document 36 Filed: 3/15/2017, Entered: None Notice
                                                                                                                    Stipulation to Modify Due Date
                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                      Legal Document 35 Filed: 2/17/2017, Entered: None Objection
                                                                                                                      Patent Owner Objection to Evidence
                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                        Legal Document 34 Filed: 2/15/2017, Entered: None Notice of Deposition
                                                                                                                        Revised Notice of Deposition - Michalson
                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                          Legal Document 33 Filed: 2/14/2017, Entered: None Notice of Deposition
                                                                                                                          Notice of Deposition - Michalson
                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                            Legal Document 32 Filed: 2/14/2017, Entered: None Notice of Deposition
                                                                                                                            Notice of Deposition - Lavi
                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                              Legal Document 1031 Filed: 2/10/2017, Entered: None Exhibit
                                                                                                                              Ex1031 - Intel Microprocessor Quick Reference Guide
                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                Legal Document 1030 Filed: 2/10/2017, Entered: None Exhibit
                                                                                                                                Ex1030 - Barclay, Microsoft TerraServer
                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                  Legal Document 1029 Filed: 2/10/2017, Entered: None Exhibit
                                                                                                                                  Ex1029 - Compaq Internet Archive capture
                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                    Legal Document 1028 Filed: 2/10/2017, Entered: None Exhibit
                                                                                                                                    Ex1028 - Windows 8 System Requirements
                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                      Legal Document 1027 Filed: 2/10/2017, Entered: None Exhibit
                                                                                                                                      Ex1027 - Bing Maps Preview app for Windows in the Windows Store
                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                        Legal Document 1026 Filed: 2/10/2017, Entered: None Exhibit
                                                                                                                                        Ex1026 - Excerpt of Initial Claim Chart 506 Patent
                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                          Legal Document 1025 Filed: 2/10/2017, Entered: None Exhibit
                                                                                                                                          Ex1025 - US7561156
                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                            Legal Document 1024 Filed: 2/10/2017, Entered: None Exhibit
                                                                                                                                            Ex1024 - US20080294332A1
                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                              Legal Document 1023 Filed: 2/10/2017, Entered: None Exhibit
                                                                                                                                              Ex1023 - Wolford, FXT1_ 3dfx Texture Compression
                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                Legal Document 1022 Filed: 2/10/2017, Entered: None Exhibit
                                                                                                                                                Ex1022 - The Universal Grid System
                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document 1020 Filed: 2/10/2017, Entered: None Exhibit
                                                                                                                                                  Ex1020 - Fujitsu Technical Reference Guide
                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document 1019 Filed: 2/10/2017, Entered: None Exhibit
                                                                                                                                                    Ex1019 - Isaac Levanon Deposition Transcript - with errata sheet
                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document 1018 Filed: 2/10/2017, Entered: None Exhibit
                                                                                                                                                      Ex1018 - Peggy Agouris Deposition Transcript - with errata sheet
                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document 1017 Filed: 2/10/2017, Entered: None Exhibit
                                                                                                                                                        Ex1017 - Yonatan Lavi Declaration - with Exhibits A-F
                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document 1016 Filed: 2/10/2017, Entered: None Exhibit
                                                                                                                                                          Ex1016 - Michalson Declaration
                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document 1015 Filed: 2/10/2017, Entered: None Exhibit
                                                                                                                                                            Ex1015 - Wikipedia Article IEEE 802
                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document 1014 Filed: 2/10/2017, Entered: None Exhibit
                                                                                                                                                              Ex1014 - Isaac Levanon -LinkedIn
                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document 31 Filed: 2/10/2017, Entered: None reply
                                                                                                                                                                Petitioner's Reply to Patent Owner Response
                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document 30 Filed: 2/3/2017, Entered: None Power of Attorney
                                                                                                                                                                  Petitioner's Updated Power of Attorney
                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document 29 Filed: 2/3/2017, Entered: None Notice
                                                                                                                                                                    Petitioner's Updated Notice of Counsel
                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document 28 Filed: 1/10/2017, Entered: None Power of Attorney
                                                                                                                                                                      Petitioner's Updated Power of Attorney
                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document 27 Filed: 1/10/2017, Entered: None Notice
                                                                                                                                                                        Petitioner's Updated Notice of Counsel
                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document 26 Filed: 1/9/2017, Entered: None Order
                                                                                                                                                                          ORDER GRANTING MOTION FOR ADMISSION PRO HAC VICE OF EVANS S. DAY
                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document 25 Filed: 1/9/2017, Entered: None Order
                                                                                                                                                                            Pro Hac Vice Admission of Bernstein
                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document 24 Filed: 1/9/2017, Entered: None Order
                                                                                                                                                                              Pro Hac Vice Admission of Zachary
                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document 23 Filed: 12/27/2016, Entered: None Notice of Deposition
                                                                                                                                                                                Petitioner's Notice of Deposition of Peggy Agouris
                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document 22 Filed: 12/27/2016, Entered: None Notice of Deposition
                                                                                                                                                                                  Petitioner's Notice of Deposition of Isaac Levanon
                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document 1013 Filed: 12/20/2016, Entered: None Exhibit
                                                                                                                                                                                    Ex1013 Day Affidavit ISO Motion for Pro Hac Vice Admission
                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document 1012 Filed: 12/20/2016, Entered: None Exhibit
                                                                                                                                                                                      Ex1012 Bernstein Affidavit ISO Motion for Pro Hac Vice Admission
                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document 21 Filed: 12/20/2016, Entered: None Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                        Petitioner's Motion for Pro Hac Vice Admission of Evan S. Day
                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document 20 Filed: 12/20/2016, Entered: None Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                          Petitioner's Motion for Pro Hac Vice Admission of Matthew C. Bernstein
                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document 19 Filed: 11/18/2016, Entered: None Objection
                                                                                                                                                                                            Petitioner's Objections to Patent Owner's Evidence
                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document 18 Filed: 11/15/2016, Entered: None Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                              Petitioner's Motion to Seal Confidential Information
                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document 2072 Filed: 11/11/2016, Entered: None Exhibit
                                                                                                                                                                                                Declaration of Isaac Levanon (Public Version)
                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document 2071 Filed: 11/11/2016, Entered: None Exhibit
                                                                                                                                                                                                  Exhibit 2071
                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document 2070 Filed: 11/11/2016, Entered: None Exhibit
                                                                                                                                                                                                    Exhibit 2070 - part 2
                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document 2070 Filed: 11/11/2016, Entered: None Exhibit
                                                                                                                                                                                                      Exhibit 2070 - part 3
                                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document 2070 Filed: 11/11/2016, Entered: None Exhibit
                                                                                                                                                                                                        Exhibit 2070 - part 5
                                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                          Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document 2070 Filed: 11/11/2016, Entered: None Exhibit
                                                                                                                                                                                                          Exhibit 2070 - part 1
                                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document 2070 Filed: 11/11/2016, Entered: None Exhibit
                                                                                                                                                                                                            Exhibit 2070 - part 4
                                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document 2069 Filed: 11/11/2016, Entered: None Exhibit
                                                                                                                                                                                                              Exhibit 2069 - part 2
                                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document 2069 Filed: 11/11/2016, Entered: None Exhibit
                                                                                                                                                                                                                Exhibit 2069 - part 3
                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document 2069 Filed: 11/11/2016, Entered: None Exhibit
                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Exhibit 2069 - part 5
                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document 2069 Filed: 11/11/2016, Entered: None Exhibit
                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Exhibit 2069 - part 6
                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document 2069 Filed: 11/11/2016, Entered: None Exhibit
                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Exhibit 2069 - part 8
                                                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document 2069 Filed: 11/11/2016, Entered: None Exhibit
                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Exhibit 2069 - part 9
                                                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document 2069 Filed: 11/11/2016, Entered: None Exhibit
                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Exhibit 2069 - part 10
                                                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document 2069 Filed: 11/11/2016, Entered: None Exhibit
                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Exhibit 2069 - part 12
                                                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document 2069 Filed: 11/11/2016, Entered: None Exhibit
                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Exhibit 2069 - part 13
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document 2069 Filed: 11/11/2016, Entered: None Exhibit
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Exhibit 2069 - part 14
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document 2069 Filed: 11/11/2016, Entered: None Exhibit
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Exhibit 2069 - part 1
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document 2069 Filed: 11/11/2016, Entered: None Exhibit
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Exhibit 2069 - part 4
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document 2069 Filed: 11/11/2016, Entered: None Exhibit
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Exhibit 2069 - part 7
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document 2069 Filed: 11/11/2016, Entered: None Exhibit
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Exhibit 2069 - part 11
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document 2067 Filed: 11/11/2016, Entered: None Exhibit
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          NGI Initiative
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document 2066 Filed: 11/11/2016, Entered: None Exhibit
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Visualization System for SRI's Digital Earth Proposal
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document 2065 Filed: 11/11/2016, Entered: None Exhibit
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Declaration of Inventors pursuant to 37 CFR 1.131 with exhibits (December 2005)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document 2064 Filed: 11/11/2016, Entered: None Exhibit
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Declaration of Inventors pursuant to 37 CFR 1.131 with exhibits (September 2005)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document 2063 Filed: 11/11/2016, Entered: None Exhibit
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  3DVU and Infoterra Signed a Memorandum of Understanding
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document 2060 Filed: 11/11/2016, Entered: None Exhibit
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Declaration of Olena Ierega
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document 2059 Filed: 11/11/2016, Entered: None Exhibit
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Bing Map Tile System
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document 2058 Filed: 11/11/2016, Entered: None Exhibit
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Sourceforge Webpage, TerraVision Open Sourced
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document 2057 Filed: 11/11/2016, Entered: None Exhibit
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Sourceforge Webpage, TerraVision
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document 2056 Filed: 11/11/2016, Entered: None Exhibit
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            "FlyOver" Trademark Application Prosecution History
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document 2055 Filed: 11/11/2016, Entered: None Exhibit
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              GPS Business News Webpage
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document 2054 Filed: 11/11/2016, Entered: None Exhibit
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Berry Review Webpage
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document 2053 Filed: 11/11/2016, Entered: None Exhibit
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Brochure for Kenwood Car Navigation System, HDV-910, HDV-810 (2004)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document 2052 Filed: 11/11/2016, Entered: None Exhibit
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Brochure for Kenwood Car Navigation System (2004)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document 2051 Filed: 11/11/2016, Entered: None Exhibit
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Brochure for Kenwood Car Navigation System
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document 2049 Filed: 11/11/2016, Entered: None Exhibit
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        VC Cafe Webpage
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document 2048 Filed: 11/11/2016, Entered: None Exhibit
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          3DVU's Mobile Navigation Best Seller on Sprint's Shop
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document 2047 Filed: 11/11/2016, Entered: None Exhibit
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            3DVU Enhancing Over 80 Million Nokia Phones with Navi2Go
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document 2046 Filed: 11/11/2016, Entered: None Exhibit
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              3DVU Releases the Ultimate Game-Changer in Mobile Navigation
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document 2045 Filed: 11/11/2016, Entered: None Exhibit
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                CNET Webpage
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document 2044 Filed: 11/11/2016, Entered: None Exhibit
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Tech Node Webpage
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document 2043 Filed: 11/11/2016, Entered: None Exhibit
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Transcript of August 2016 Deposition of Dr. Michalson
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document 2042 Filed: 11/11/2016, Entered: None Exhibit
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Printout of YouTube Webpage - Navi2Go in Action
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document 2041 Filed: 11/11/2016, Entered: None Exhibit
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Navi2Go Brochure
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document 2039 Filed: 11/11/2016, Entered: None Exhibit
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          The Auto Channel Webpage
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document 2038 Filed: 11/11/2016, Entered: None Exhibit
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            GIS Development: Asia Pacific
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document 2037 Filed: 11/11/2016, Entered: None Exhibit
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Daewoo Precision Industries Co., Ltd. License and Service Agreement (August 2005)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document 2036 Filed: 11/11/2016, Entered: None Exhibit
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Valuation Summary Regarding 3DVU (September 2005)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document 2035 Filed: 11/11/2016, Entered: None Exhibit
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Keyhole Deal Value Analysis (October 2005)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document 2033 Filed: 11/11/2016, Entered: None Exhibit
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    MapQuest Non-Disclosure Agreement (July 2005)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document 2032 Filed: 11/11/2016, Entered: None Exhibit
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      PRweb Webpage
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document 2031 Filed: 11/11/2016, Entered: None Exhibit
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Printout of YouTube Webpage
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document 2030 Filed: 11/11/2016, Entered: None Exhibit
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Silicom Ventures Webpage
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document 2028 Filed: 11/11/2016, Entered: None Exhibit
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            KORIL-RDF Cooperation and Project Funding Agreement
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document 2027 Filed: 11/11/2016, Entered: None Exhibit
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              KORIL-RDF Proposal (January 2005)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document 2026 Filed: 11/11/2016, Entered: None Exhibit
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                SIIRD Commercialization Report (March 2006)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document 2025 Filed: 11/11/2016, Entered: None Exhibit
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  SIIRD Memorandum of Understanding (2002)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document 2024 Filed: 11/11/2016, Entered: None Exhibit
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    SIIRD Mutual Nondisclosure Agreement (2002)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document 2023 Filed: 11/11/2016, Entered: None Exhibit
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      SIIRD Proposal (July 2001)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document 2021 Filed: 11/11/2016, Entered: None Exhibit
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Directions Magazine Webpage
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document 2020 Filed: 11/11/2016, Entered: None Exhibit
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Declaration of Inventors pursuant to 37 CFR 1.131 (June 2006)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document 2019 Filed: 11/11/2016, Entered: None Exhibit
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Declaration of Inventors pursuant to 37 CFR 1.131 (December 2005)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document 2018 Filed: 11/11/2016, Entered: None Exhibit
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Frost & Sullivan Webpage
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document 2017 Filed: 11/11/2016, Entered: None Exhibit
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Statista Webpage
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document 2016 Filed: 11/11/2016, Entered: None Exhibit
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  PWC Webpage
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document 2011 Filed: 11/11/2016, Entered: None Exhibit
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    US 4222076 (Knowlton)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document 2010 Filed: 11/11/2016, Entered: None Exhibit
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      White & Percival, Compression and Progressive Transmission of Astronomical Images
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document 2009 Filed: 11/11/2016, Entered: None Exhibit
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        US 6182114 (Yap et al.)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document 2008 Filed: 11/11/2016, Entered: None Exhibit
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          US 4698689 (Tzou)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document 2007 Filed: 11/11/2016, Entered: None Exhibit
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Maguire et al. (Vol. 2)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document 2006 Filed: 11/11/2016, Entered: None Exhibit
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Maguire et al. (Vol. 1)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document 2005 Filed: 11/11/2016, Entered: None Exhibit
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Ex 2005 - VRML Terrain Modeling for MBNMS
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document 2003 Filed: 11/11/2016, Entered: None Exhibit
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Declaration of Dr. Agouris
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document 17 Filed: 11/11/2016, Entered: None response
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Patent Owner Response (PUBLIC VERSION)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document 15 Filed: 11/11/2016, Entered: None Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      PATENT OWNER¿¿¿S UNOPPOSED MOTION TO SEAL PURSUANT TO 37 C.F.R. ¿¿ 42.14
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document 14 Filed: 11/11/2016, Entered: None Exhibit
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Patent Owner's Exhibit List
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document 13 Filed: 10/19/2016, Entered: None Notice
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Stipulation to Modify Due Dates
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document 12 Filed: 10/19/2016, Entered: None Notice
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Patent Owner Updated Mandatory Notices
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document 11 Filed: 8/8/2016, Entered: None Notice
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Petitioner's Objections to Evidence
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document 10 Filed: 7/27/2016, Entered: None Order
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                SCHEDULING ORDER
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document 9 Filed: 7/27/2016, Entered: None Institution Decision
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Trial Instituted Document
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document 2002 Filed: 4/28/2016, Entered: None Exhibit
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Exhibit 2002 - Prasad, Accelerating SIFT Feature extraction with a vector DSP (Master Thesis)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document 2001 Filed: 4/28/2016, Entered: None Exhibit
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Exhibit 2001 - Scheduling Transcript, Bradium Techs. v. Microsoft Corp. Case No., 15-cv-031 (D. Del.)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document 8 Filed: 4/28/2016, Entered: None Preliminary Response
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Patent Owner's Preliminary Response
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document 7 Filed: 4/12/2016, Entered: None Notice
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Patent Owner's Updated Mandatory Notices
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document 6 Filed: 2/1/2016, Entered: None Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Motion for Pro Hac Vice Admission of Michael N. Zachary
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document 5 Filed: 2/1/2016, Entered: None Notice
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Related Matters
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document 4 Filed: 2/1/2016, Entered: None Power of Attorney
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Power of Attorney
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document 3 Filed: 1/28/2016, Entered: None Notice of Filing Date Accorded to Petition
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Notice of Filing Date Accorded to Petition
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document 1011 Filed: 1/11/2016, Entered: None Exhibit
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Ex1011 Proof of Service of Complaint
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document 1010 Filed: 1/11/2016, Entered: None Exhibit
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Ex1010 Cover page of Reddy (Ex1004) from Linda Hall Library
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document 1009 Filed: 1/11/2016, Entered: None Exhibit
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Ex1009 Cover page and auth declaration of Reddy (Ex1004) from British Library
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document 1008 Filed: 1/11/2016, Entered: None Exhibit
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Ex1008 Printout of Google Scholar citations to Reddy (Ex1004)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document 1007 Filed: 1/11/2016, Entered: None Exhibit
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Ex1007 Printout of IEEE Explore citations to Reddy (Ex1004)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document 1006 Filed: 1/11/2016, Entered: None Exhibit
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Ex1006 Hornbacker - EP1070290B1
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document 1005 Filed: 1/11/2016, Entered: None Exhibit
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Ex1005 Part 2 - Appendices J-KK to Michalson Declaration
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document 1005 Filed: 1/11/2016, Entered: None Exhibit
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Ex1005 Part 2 - Appendices J-KK to Michalson Declaration
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document 1004 Filed: 1/11/2016, Entered: None Exhibit
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Ex1004 Reddy TerraVision IEEE 1999
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document 1003 Filed: 1/11/2016, Entered: None Exhibit
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Ex1003 Hornbacker - WO9941675A1
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document 1002 Filed: 1/11/2016, Entered: None Exhibit
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Ex1002 Levanon - US8924506B2
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document 1001 Filed: 1/11/2016, Entered: None Exhibit
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Ex1001 Levanon - US7908343B2
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document 2 Filed: 1/11/2016, Entered: None Power of Attorney
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Power of Attorney
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document 1 Filed: 1/11/2016, Entered: None petition
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              IPR Petition of US8924506
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF

                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Statistics

                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                This case has been viewed 52 times.

                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Space
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                 
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                PlainSite
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Sign Up
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Need Password Help?