McKesson v. City of Baton Rouge
Federal Civil Lawsuit Louisiana Middle District Court, Case No. 3:16-cv-00520
District Judge John W. deGravelles, presiding

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Last Updated July 24, 2019 at 4:37 PM DT (1.8 years ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

McKesson, DeRay McKesson, DeRay, Plaintiff
Officially listed as "DeRay McKesson"

Toggle Switch Represented by Rodney & Etter, LLC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED John Karl Etter +1 504 483 3224 +1 504 483 2259 jke@rodneylaw.com
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Roy J. Rodney, Jr. +1 504 483 3224 +1 337 988 6918 RJR@rodneylaw.com
No Logo Gloria La Riva, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Rodney & Etter, LLC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED John Karl Etter +1 504 483 3224 +1 504 483 2259 jke@rodneylaw.com
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Roy J. Rodney, Jr. +1 504 483 3224 +1 337 988 6918 RJR@rodneylaw.com
No Logo Kira Marrero, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Rodney & Etter, LLC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED John Karl Etter +1 504 483 3224 +1 504 483 2259 jke@rodneylaw.com
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Roy J. Rodney, Jr. +1 504 483 3224 +1 337 988 6918 RJR@rodneylaw.com
v.
No Logo Carl Dabadie, Jr., Defendant
No Logo EBRP Attorney's Office, Defendant
Officially listed as "City of Baton Rouge"
No Logo East Baton Rouge Parish, Defendant
No Logo Melvin Kip Holden, Defendant
No Logo Michael D. Edmonson, Defendant
No Logo Sid J. Gautreaux, III, Defendant
No Logo Sid J. Geatreaux, Defendant
Citation Section 42 U.S.C. § 1983
Nature of Suit 440 - Civil Rights: Other
  Entries (124) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 120 Filed: 7/24/2019, Entered: None Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief
    Request RequestSpace LREF
    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 118 Filed: 7/23/2019, Entered: None Miscellaneous Relief (First)
      Request RequestSpace LREF
      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 115 Filed: 4/17/2019, Entered: None Enroll Additional Attorney
        Request RequestSpace LREF
        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 113 Filed: 4/16/2019, Entered: None Telephone Conference
          Request RequestSpace LREF
          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 110 Filed: 4/1/2019, Entered: None Disbursement of funds
            Request RequestSpace LREF
            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 109 Filed: 12/19/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
            TRANSCRIPT REQUEST by William Most for proceedings held on 10/27/2017 before Judge deGravelles.. (Most, William) (Entered: 12/19/2017)
              Request RequestSpace LREF
              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 108 Filed: 11/16/2017, Entered: 11/16/2017 Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
              FINDING OF FACTS AND CONCLUSIONS OF LAW granting 107 Joint Consent Motion for Attorney's Fees and Expenses. Signed by Judge John W. deGravelles on 11/16/2017. (LLH)
                Request RequestSpace LREF
                Sealed Legal Document 107 Filed: 11/2/2017, Entered: 11/2/2017 Unknown Document Type
                SEALED Joint Consent Motion for Attorney's Fees and Expenses by Defendants. (Attachments: # 1 Memorandum in Support, # 2 Exhibit A, # 3 Exhibit B, # 4 Exhibit C, # 5 Exhibit D, # 6 Order)(LLH)
                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 106 Filed: 11/2/2017, Entered: 11/2/2017 Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                  ORDER granting 102 Sealed Joint Consent Motion to File Documents Under Seal. Signed by Judge John W. deGravelles on 11/2/2017. (LLH)
                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 105 Filed: 10/27/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                    ELECTRONIC EXHIBITS for hearing dated 10/27/2017.(ELW) (Entered: 11/02/2017)
                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 104 Filed: 11/2/2017, Entered: None Motion Hearing
                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 104 Filed: 10/27/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                        Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge John W. deGravelles.Motion Hearing held on 10/27/2017 re 85 Motion for Final Approval of Class Action Settlement filed by Kira Marrero, DeRay McKesson, Gloria La Riva. The Court finds that all of the requirements for a class actionhave been met. Accordingly, the Court approves and confirms the settlement classpreviously approved by the Magistrate Judge. In accordance with the agreement of the parties on the issue of attorneys' fees, the Court will determine and award reasonable attorneys' fees and costs. (Court Reporter G. Delatte-Richard.) Pursuant to Local Rules, offering parties shall retain custody of exhibits.(ELW) (Entered: 11/02/2017)
                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 103 Filed: 11/2/2017, Entered: None Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief
                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 103 Filed: 10/27/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                            JUDGMENT : All Defendants consent to class certification and final approval of the proposed settlement. Considering the Plaintiffs Motion for Final Approval and the exhibits attached thereto, the applicable law and jurisprudence, the pleadings, the representations of the parties and counsel, the proceedings herein, and for reasons orally assigned, the Class Settlement shall be and is hereby APPROVED as fair, reasonable, and adequate. The Court hereby approves the Settlement and finds that the Settlement is fair, reasonable and adequate in all respects. The Judgment is set as ordered. Signed by Judge John W. deGravelles on 10/27/2017. (ELW) (Entered: 11/02/2017)
                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 102 Filed: 11/1/2017, Entered: 11/1/2017 Unknown Document Type
                              Joint SEALED MOTION for Leave to File PLEADINGS AND EXHIBITS Under Seal - Joint Consent Motion by All Plaintiffs and All Defendants - by Gloria La Riva, Kira Marrero, DeRay McKesson. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Pleading; - Proposed Order -, # 2 Proposed Pleading;, # 3 Proposed Pleading;, # 4 Proposed Pleading;, # 5 Proposed Pleading;, # 6 Proposed Pleading;, # 7 Proposed Pleading;, # 8 Proposed Pleading;)(Etter, John)
                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 101 Filed: 10/27/2017, Entered: 10/27/2017 Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                ORDER granting 100 Consent SEALED MOTION for Leave to File Documents Under Seal. Signed by Judge John W. deGravelles on 10/27/2017. (LLH)
                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 100 Filed: 10/27/2017, Entered: 10/27/2017 Unknown Document Type
                                  Consent SEALED MOTION for Leave to File Documents Under Seal Under Seal by Gloria La Riva, Kira Marrero, DeRay McKesson. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Pleading; - Proposed Order -)(Etter, John)
                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 99 Filed: 10/26/2017, Entered: None Telephone Conference
                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 99 Filed: 10/25/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                      Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge John W. deGravelles. Telephone Conference held on 10/25/2017. The issue of whether Plaintiffs' attorneys' fees will be heard at the Friday, October 27,2017 hearing for final approval of the settlement was discussed. The late opt-out of Travis Day was discussed. The parties do not oppose the opt-outof Travis Day. The parties advised the Court that there were no other known opt-outs. Counsel for Plaintiffs represented that they would submit affidavits of the class representatives. Counsel for Plaintiffs also said that they would submit a draft consent judgment. (ELW) (Entered: 10/26/2017)
                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 98 Filed: 10/20/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                        ORDER granting 96 Motion for a status conference (by telephone). Telephone conference is set for 10/23/2017 @ 11:00 AM. Counsel for Plaintiffs is responsible for coordinating the call to the Court. Counsel shall call the Court from a land-line, if possible, to eliminate any extraneous noise. Signed by Judge John W. deGravelles on 10/20/2017. (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no hyperlink or PDF document associated with this entry.) (KDC) (Entered: 10/20/2017)
                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 97 Filed: 10/20/2017, Entered: 10/20/2017 Unknown Document Type
                                          RESPONSE to 96 MOTION to Set Status Conference filed by Gloria La Riva, Kira Marrero, DeRay McKesson. (Etter, John)
                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 96 Filed: 10/20/2017, Entered: 10/20/2017 Unknown Document Type
                                            MOTION to Set Status Conference by All Defendants. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Pleading; Proposed Order)(St. Pierre, Catherine)
                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 95 Filed: 10/17/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                              NOTICE of of Issuance of Subpoenas for Production of Documents to Sheriff Gautreaux and to Quick Release Bail Bonds - by Gloria La Riva, Kira Marrero, DeRay McKesson (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit - Subpoena to Quick Release Bail Bonds -, # 2 Exhibit - Subpoena to Sheriff Gautreaux -)(Etter, John) (Entered: 10/17/2017)
                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 94 Filed: 10/9/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                NOTICE of Issuance of Subpoenas for the Production of Documents by Gloria La Riva, Kira Marrero, DeRay McKesson (Attachments: # 1 Attachment - Subpoena to ABC Star Bail Bonding, # 2 Attachment - Subpoena to Agnes Bail Bonds, # 3 Attachment - Subpoena to All the Way Out Bail Bonds, # 4 Attachment - Subpoena to Anjelik Bail Bonds, # 5 Attachment - Subpoena to Around the Clock Bail Bonds, # 6 Attachment - Subpoena to Bail Bonds One, # 7 Attachment - Subpoena to Bail One, # 8 Attachment - Subpoena to Bethley Bail Bonds, # 9 Attachment - Subpoena to City Bail Bonding, # 10 Attachment - Subpoena to Laurie's Bail Bonds, # 11 Attachment - Subpoena to Lee's Bail Bonding, # 12 Attachment - Subpoena to On-Time Bail Bonding, # 13 Attachment - Subpoena to United States Surety)(Etter, John) (Entered: 10/09/2017)
                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 93 Filed: 10/4/2017, Entered: None Telephone Conference
                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 93 Filed: 9/26/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                    Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge John W. deGravelles: Telephone Conference held on 9/26/2017. Parties discussed a conflict with the current date of the Confirmation Hearing. The final approval hearing is reassigned for 10/27/2017 10:30 AM in Courtroom 1 before Judge John W. deGravelles. (LLH) (Entered: 10/04/2017)
                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 92 Filed: 9/27/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                      Supplemental STATUS REPORT by Gloria La Riva, Kira Marrero, DeRay McKesson. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A - Opt-Out Form Submitted by Travis Day -, # 2 Exhibit B - Minute Entry for September 14, 2017 status conference in Day v. Baton Rouge City Police, No. 17-328 -)(Etter, John) (Entered: 09/27/2017)
                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 91 Filed: 9/25/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                        NOTICE of TELEPHONE CONFERENCE:Telephone Conference set for 9/26/2017 at 10:30 AM before Judge John W. deGravelles. Counsel for Plaintiffs is responsible for coordinating the call to the Court. Counsel shall call the Court from a land-line, if possible, in order to eliminate any extraneous noise. (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no hyperlink or PDF document associated with this entry.)(KDC) (Entered: 09/25/2017)
                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 90 Filed: 8/25/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                          RESPONSE in Opposition to 85 Motion for Final Approval of Class Action Settlement filed by Michael D. Edmonson. (Brustowicz, Celeste) (Entered: 08/25/2017)
                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 89 Filed: 8/23/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                            ORDER granting 87 Motion for Leave to File Memo in Excess Pages (Memorandum in Support of Motion for Final Approval of Class Action Settlement, which contains 23 pages). IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that the attached Memorandum in Support of Motion for Final Approval of Class Action Settlement is hereby SUBSTITUTED in place of plaintiffs' Memorandum in Support of Motion for Final Approval of Class Action Settlement (Document No. 85-1, filed August 18, 2017). Signed by Judge John W. deGravelles on 08/23/2017. (KDC) (Entered: 08/23/2017)
                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 88 Filed: 8/23/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                              ORDER: Confirmation Hearing (Hearing on Final Approval) is reset for 10/30/2017 9:00 AM in Courtroom 1 before Judge John W. deGravelles.. Signed by Judge John W. deGravelles on 08/23/2017. (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no hyperlink or PDF document associated with this entry.)(KDC) (Entered: 08/23/2017)
                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 87 Filed: 8/22/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                MOTION for Leave to File Excess Pages and Motion to Substitute Pleading by Gloria La Riva, Kira Marrero, DeRay McKesson. (Attachments: # 1 Memorandum in Support, # 2 Proposed Pleading; - Memorandum in Support of Motion for Final Approval of Class Action Settlemement -, # 3 Proposed Pleading; - Proposed Order -)(Etter, John). Modified to edit the text on 8/23/2017 (KAH). (Entered: 08/22/2017)
                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 86 Filed: 8/21/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                  NOTICE OF NON-COMPLIANCE with LR 7(g) as to 85 Motion Final Approval of Class Action Settlement. REQUIRED CORRECTION: A combined Motion for Leave to Exceed the Page Limits and Motion to Strike the Incorrect Pleading must filed within 24 hours of this notice. Otherwise, the original filing may be stricken by the Court without further notice. (KAH) (Entered: 08/21/2017)
                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 85 Filed: 8/18/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                    Motion for Final Approval of Class Action Settlement by Gloria La Riva, Kira Marrero, DeRay McKesson. (Attachments: # 1 Memorandum in Support, # 2 Exhibit - 1 - First Amended Memorandum of Understanding -, # 3 Exhibit - 2 - Promise of Justice Initiative Report -, # 4 Exhibit - 3 - Press Release Issued by East Baton Rouge District Attorney -, # 5 Exhibit - 4 - Letter from James Craig with Opt Out Forms -, # 6 Exhibit - Proposed Judgment -)(Etter, John) Modified to edit the text on 8/21/2017 (KAH). Modified on 8/23/2017 to substitute doc as per Order #89(LLH). (Entered: 08/18/2017)
                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 84 Filed: 7/31/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                      STATUS REPORT by All Plaintiffs. (Etter, John) (Entered: 07/31/2017)
                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 83 Filed: 7/10/2017, Entered: 7/10/2017 Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                        ORDER OF DISMISSAL WITHOUT PREJUDICE granting 74 Ex Parte /Consent Motion for Voluntary Dismissal Without Prejudice of Individual Claims of Brandon Wayne Erp. The individual claims of Brandon Wayne Erp in this lawsuit are hereby DISMISSED WITHOUT PREJUDICE and Brandon Wayne Erp is hereby no longer designated as a putative class representative in this lawsuit. Signed by Judge John W. deGravelles on 7/10/2017. (EDC)
                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 82 Filed: 5/30/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                          ORDER granting 76 Motion to Strike 75 Notice of Related Proceedings. Signed by Magistrate Judge Erin Wilder-Doomes on 5/30/2017. (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no hyperlink or PDF document associated with this entry.) (BLR) (Entered: 05/30/2017)
                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 81 Filed: 5/30/2017, Entered: 5/30/2017 Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                            ORDER: The Court having considered the 52 Joint MOTION for Settlement Approval and Class Certification for Settlement Purposes Only, 67 Proposed Class Forms and Request for Fairness Hearing Settlement Approval and Class Certification, 72 MEMORANDUM in Support, memorializing the proposed settlement agreement between the parties, and the arguments of counsel, rules as listed. Confirmation Hearing set for 9/21/2017 09:00 AM in Courtroom 1 before Judge John W. deGravelles. Signed by Magistrate Judge Erin Wilder-Doomes on 5/30/2017. (LLH)
                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 80 Filed: 5/30/2017, Entered: 5/30/2017 Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                              ORDER AND REASONS granting in part and denying in part 52 Joint MOTION for Preliminary Approval of Settlement Agreement, Form, Content and Manner of Notice Distribution and Publication, and Certification for Settlement Purposes Only. The 67 Proposed Class Forms and Request for Fairness Hearing Settlement Approval and Class Certification is DENIED as moot. A detailed procedural order will be issued in conjunction with this opinion. Signed by Magistrate Judge Erin Wilder-Doomes on 5/30/2017. (LLH)
                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 79 Filed: 5/26/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                ORDER granting 78 Motion to Substitute Revised Notice, Opt Out Form, Objection Form and Claim Form. The clerk's office is directed to replace R. Docs. 73-1 through 73-4 with R. Docs. 78-1 through 78-4 and add 78-5 as an additional document. Signed by Magistrate Judge Erin Wilder-Doomes on 5/26/2017. (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no hyperlink or PDF document associated with this entry.) (BLR) (Entered: 05/26/2017)
                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 78 Filed: 5/25/2017, Entered: 5/25/2017 Unknown Document Type
                                                                                  Motion to Substitute Revised Notice, Opt Out Form, Objection Form and Claim Form by Gloria La Riva, Kira Marrero, DeRay McKesson. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Pleading; - Notice of Proposed Clas Action Settlement, # 2 Proposed Pleading; - Claim Form -, # 3 Proposed Pleading; - Opt Out Form -, # 4 Proposed Pleading; - Objection Form -, # 5 Proposed Pleading; - Proposed Schedule for Distribution of Notice and Class Members' Responses -, # 6 Proposed Pleading; - Proposed Order on Motion to Substitute -)(Etter, John) Modified on 5/26/2017 to edit the text (KAH).
                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 77 Filed: 5/22/2017, Entered: 5/22/2017 Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                    ORDER: Defendants shall file a Motion to Substitute the Notice of Proposed Class Action Settlement and the Claim Form with a final version of each form that accurately reflects the tiered method of payment set forth in the First Amended Memorandum of Understanding and specifies a deadline for the class members to submit the Claim Form to Plaintiffs' counsel. The Motion to Substitute shall be filed no later than Friday, May 26, 2017. Signed by Magistrate Judge Erin Wilder-Doomes on 5/22/2017. (KAH)
                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 76 Filed: 5/22/2017, Entered: 5/22/2017 Unknown Document Type
                                                                                      Ex Parte MOTION to Strike 75 Notice of Related Proceedings by Gloria La Riva, Kira Marrero, DeRay McKesson. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Pleading; - Proposed Order on Ex Parte Motion to Strike Pleading)(Etter, John)
                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 75 Filed: 5/22/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                        STRICKEN FROM THE RECORD NOTICE of Related Proceedings by Gloria La Riva, Kira Marrero, DeRay McKesson (Etter, John) Modified on 6/1/2017 to remove the document as it has been stricken in accordance with record document 82. (EDC). (Entered: 05/22/2017)
                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 74 Filed: 5/19/2017, Entered: 5/19/2017 Unknown Document Type
                                                                                          Ex Parte Consent Motion for Voluntary Dismissal Without Prejudice of Individual Claims of Brandon Wayne Erp by Brandon Wayne Erp. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Pleading; - Proposed Judgment)(Etter, John) Modified on 5/25/2017 to edit text. (EDC).
                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                            Blank 73 Filed: 5/5/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                            Memorandum on Preliminary Approval of Settlement Agreement Following 5/1/17 Court Conference by All Defendants. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit First Class Notice, # 2 Exhibit Claim Form, # 3 Exhibit Opt Out Form, # 4 Exhibit Objection)(Brustowicz, Celeste) Modified on 5/5/2017 to edit the text (KAH). (Attachment 1,2,3 &4 replaced on 5/30/2017) (ELW). ( (Additional attachment(s) added on 5/30/2017: # 5 Attachment) (ELW). Modified on 5/30/2017 as ordered by the court (ELW). (Entered: 05/05/2017)
                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 72 Filed: 5/5/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                              MEMORANDUM in Support of 52 Joint MOTION for Settlement Approval and Class Certification for Settlement Purposes Only - Plaintiffs' Memorandum on Preliminary Approval of Settlement Agreement Following 5/1/17 Court Conference filed by Gloria La Riva, Kira Marrero, DeRay McKesson. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A - First Amended Memorandum of Understanding)(Etter, John) (Entered: 05/05/2017)
                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 71 Filed: 5/2/2017, Entered: None Telephone Conference
                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 71 Filed: 5/1/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                  Minute Entry/Telephone Conference Report and Order for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Erin Wilder-Doomes: Telephone Conference held on 5/1/2017. Counsel discussed the Proposed Class Forms and Request for Fairness Hearing, Settlement Approval and Class Certification. The Court allowed the parties additional time in which to submit supplemental briefing regarding whether the proposed settlement class satisfies the requirements of FRCP 23. Counsel for the parties agreed to submit any supplemental briefing by 5/5/2017. The final Notice of Proposed Class Action Settlement, shall be filed no later 5/5/2017. (KAH) (Entered: 05/02/2017)
                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 70 Filed: 4/27/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                    NOTICE of TELEPHONE CONFERENCE: The in chambers Status Conference is set for 5/1/2017 has been converted to a Telephone Conference at 5/1/2017 at 03:00 PM before Magistrate Judge Erin Wilder-Doomes. Counsel participating in the Conference shall call 877-336-1839 using access code 9565780 five minutes prior to conference. (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no hyperlink or PDF document associated with this entry.)(BLR) (Entered: 04/27/2017)
                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 69 Filed: 4/27/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                      Notice to Counsel: At the request of counsel, a Status Conference is set for 5/1/2017 at 03:00 PM in chambers before Magistrate Judge Erin Wilder-Doomes. (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no hyperlink or PDF document associated with this entry.) (BLR) (Entered: 04/27/2017)
                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 68 Filed: 4/5/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                        ORDER denying without prejudice 41 Motion to Dismiss., 25 Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim, 26 Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim, and 28 Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim. Defendants may refile these, if necessary, after resolution of the Joint Motion for Preliminary Approval of Settlement Agreement, Form, Content and Manner of Notice Distribution and Publication, and Certification for Settlement Purposes Only. (Doc. 52.) Signed by Judge John W. deGravelles on 04/05/2017. (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no hyperlink or PDF document associated with this entry.) (KDC) (Entered: 04/05/2017)
                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                          Blank 67 Filed: 4/4/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                          Proposed Class Forms and Request for Fairness Hearing Settlement Approval and Class Certification by Michael D. Edmonson (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Pleading; Notice of Proposed Class Action Settlement, # 2 Exhibit Claim Form, # 3 Exhibit Opt Out Form, # 4 Exhibit Objection to Settlement)(Brustowicz, Celeste) Modified on 4/4/2017 to edit event and text (LLH). (Entered: 04/04/2017)
                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 66 Filed: 3/23/2017, Entered: None Telephone Conference
                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 66 Filed: 3/21/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                              Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Erin Wilder-Doomes. Telephone Conference held on 3/21/2017. The parties discussed the Proposed Class Forms and Request for Conference to Discuss Same, filed by defendant Colonel Michael Edmonson,Superintendent of the Louisiana State Police (ELW) Modified on 3/29/2017 to correct entry dates (ELW). (Entered: 03/23/2017)
                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 65 Filed: 3/16/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                NOTICE AND ORDER: The 64 Request for Conference to Discuss Proposed Class Forms is GRANTED. Telephone Conference set for 3/21/2017 at 09:30 AM before Magistrate Judge Erin Wilder-Doomes. Counsel participating in the Telephone Conference shall call 877-336-1839 using access code 9565780 five minutes prior to conference. Signed by Magistrate Judge Erin Wilder-Doomes on 3/16/2017. (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no hyperlink or PDF document associated with this entry.) (BLR) (Entered: 03/16/2017)
                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 64 Filed: 3/10/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                  NOTICE of Proposed Class Forms and Request for Conference to Discuss Same by Michael D. Edmonson (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Notice of Proposed Class Action Settlement, # 2 Exhibit Claim Form, # 3 Exhibit Damages Class Opt-Out Form)(Brustowicz, Celeste) Modified on 3/15/2017 to edit the event type regarding request for status conference. (EDC). (Entered: 03/10/2017)
                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 63 Filed: 3/3/2017, Entered: None Motion Hearing
                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 63 Filed: 3/1/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                      Minute Entry/Hearing Report and Order for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Erin Wilder-Doomes: Motion Hearing held on 3/1/2017 re 52 Joint MOTION for Settlement Approval and Class Certification for Settlement Purposes Only filed by Carl Dabadie, Jr., City of Baton Rouge, Sid J. Gautreaux, III, Melvin Kip Holden, East Baton Rouge Parish, Hillar C. Moore, III, Michael D. Edmonson. The Court continued the 3/1/2017 hearing in order to allow the parties to submit additional information and briefing regarding the matters discussed at the hearing. The parties shall have twenty-one (21) days from the date of this Hearing Report and Order in which to submit the additional information. After reviewing the additional information submitted, if any, the Court will reschedule the hearing, if necessary. (EDC) (Entered: 03/03/2017)
                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 62 Filed: 2/23/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                        Notice to Counsel: The telephone conference set for 2/24/2017 is RESET to a Motion Hearing set for 3/1/2017 at 10:00 AM in Courtroom 5 before Magistrate Judge Erin Wilder-Doomes. THIS IS A TIME AND LOCATION CHANGE.(This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no hyperlink or PDF document associated with this entry.)(SGO) (Entered: 02/23/2017)
                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 61 Filed: 2/16/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                          Notice to Counsel: The Motion Hearing set for 2/24/2017 at 10:00 AM is CONVERTED to a Telephone Conference before Magistrate Judge Erin Wilder-Doomes. Counsel for the City of Baton Rouge shall initiate the call to all parties then contact the court at 225-389-3584.(This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no hyperlink or PDF document associated with this entry.)(SGO) (Entered: 02/16/2017)
                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 60 Filed: 2/15/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                            ORDER granting 56 Ex Parte MOTION for Leave to Revised Proposed Claim Form. Record document 56-1 shall be substituted in place of record document 52-5. Signed by Magistrate Judge Erin Wilder-Doomes on 2/15/2017. (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no hyperlink or PDF document associated with this entry.) (SGO) (Entered: 02/15/2017)
                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 59 Filed: 2/15/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                              Notice to Counsel: A Motion Hearing is set for 2/24/2017 at 10:00 AM in Courtroom 5 before Magistrate Judge Erin Wilder-Doomes to discuss the pending 52 Joint Motion for Preliminary Approval of Settlement Agreement. (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no hyperlink or PDF document associated with this entry.)(SGO) (Entered: 02/15/2017)
                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 58 Filed: 2/9/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                ORDER granting Consent Motion to refer to Magistrate Judge Wilder-Doomes the pending Joint Motion for Preliminary Approval of Settlement Agreement, Form, Content and Manner of Notice Distribution and Publication, and Certification for Settlement Purposes Only (Docket No. 52), and 56 Ex Parte MOTION for Leave to Revised Proposed Claim Form MOTION for Leave to File Revised Proposed Claim Form filed by Kira Marrero, DeRay McKesson, Brandon Wayne Erp, Gloria La Riva. Signed by Judge John W. deGravelles on 02/09/2017. (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no hyperlink or PDF document associated with this entry.)(KDC) (Entered: 02/09/2017)
                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 57 Filed: 1/25/2017, Entered: 1/25/2017 Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                  Joint Consent Motion for Referral to Magistrate Judge - by all plaintiffs and by all defendants by All Plaintiffs. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Pleading; Proposed Order)(Etter, John)
                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 56 Filed: 1/25/2017, Entered: 1/25/2017 Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                    MOTION to Substitute Revised Proposed Claim Form by All Plaintiffs. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Pleading; Revised Proposed Claim Form, # 2 Proposed Pleading; Proposed Order)(Etter, John) Modified on 1/26/2017 to edit text (ELW).
                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 55 Filed: 1/3/2017, Entered: 1/3/2017 Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                      RULING AND ORDER granting 3 Motion to Appoint Counsel. ORDERED that Roy J. Rodney, Jr. and John K. Etter of the Rodney& Etter, LLC law firm are hereby APPOINTED Interim Class Counsel. Signed by Judge John W. deGravelles on 01/03/2017. (ELW)
                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 54 Filed: 12/8/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                        ORDER granting 53 Motion to Supplement Joint Motion for Preliminary Approval of Settlement Agreement, Form, Content and Manner of Notice Distribution and Publication and Certification for Settlement Purposes. Signed by Judge John W. deGravelles on 12/08/2016. (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no hyperlink or PDF document associated with this entry.) (KDC) (Entered: 12/08/2016)
                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 53 Filed: 12/5/2016, Entered: 12/5/2016 Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                          Ex Parte MOTION Motion to Supplement Joint Motion for Preliminary Approval of Settlement Agreement, Form, Content and Manner of Notice Distribution and Publication and Certification for Settlement Purposes - by All Plaintiffs. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Pleading; Proposed Notice of Class Action Settlement and Fairness Hearing, # 2 Proposed Pleading; Proposed Claim Form)(Etter, John)
                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 52 Filed: 11/30/2016, Entered: 11/30/2016 Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                            Joint MOTION for Preliminary Approval of Settlement Agreement, Form, Content and Manner of Notice Distribution and Publication, and Certification for Settlement Purposes Only by All Defendants. (Attachments: # 1 Memorandum in Support, # 2 Proposed Pleading; Order, # 3 Exhibit A)(St. Pierre, Catherine) Modified on 12/2/2016 to edit text.(EDC). ( # 4 Proposed Notice, # 5 Proposed Form) (LLH). Modified on 12/8/2016 to supplement motion as per Order #54(LLH). Modified to substitute attachment 5 per rec. doc. 60 on 2/15/2017 (SGO).
                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 51 Filed: 11/30/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                              ORAL ORDER: The parties shall file their joint motion for approval of the settlement agreement in this matter no later than December 2, 2016. Signed by Magistrate Judge Erin Wilder-Doomes on 11/28/2016. (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no hyperlink or PDF document associated with this entry.)(BLR) (Entered: 11/30/2016)
                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 50 Filed: 11/28/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                ORAL ORDER: The parties shall file their joint motion for approval of the settlement agreement in this matter no later than November 29, 2016. Signed by Magistrate Judge Erin Wilder-Doomes on 11/28/2016. (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no hyperlink or PDF document associated with this entry.)(BLR) (Entered: 11/28/2016)
                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 49 Filed: 11/17/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                  Notice to Counsel: In light of correspondence to the court, the parties shall have an an additional 10 days to file their joint motion for approval of the settlement agreement in this matter no later than November 28, 2016.(This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no hyperlink or PDF document associated with this entry.) (BLR) (Entered: 11/17/2016)
                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 48 Filed: 11/10/2016, Entered: 11/10/2016 Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                    Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Erin Wilder-Doomes. Telephone Conference held on 11/10/2016. ORDERED that the parties shall file their joint motion for approval of the settlement agreement in this matter no later than November 18, 2016. (ELW)
                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 47 Filed: 11/4/2016, Entered: None Telephone Conference
                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 47 Filed: 11/3/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                        Minute Entry/ Telephone Conference Report and Order for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Erin Wilder-Doomes: Telephone Conference held on 11/3/2016. Counsel and the court discussed the status of this matter. IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that the parties shall have a telephone status conference with Magistrate Judge Erin Wilder-Doomes on November 10, 2016 at 1:30 p.m. Counsel for plaintiffs to initiate the call and contact the court at (225) 389-3584 when all counsel are on the phone. (BLR) (Entered: 11/04/2016)
                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 46 Filed: 11/2/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                          Notice to Counsel Resetting Hearing: Due to a scheduling conflict involving a criminal matter before the court, the telephone status conference set for November 3, 2016 at 3:30 p.m. has been MOVED to 4:00 PM. NOTE: This is a time change only. Plaintiffs counsel shall initiate the call and contact the court at (225) 389-3584 (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no hyperlink or PDF document associated with this entry.)(BLR) (Entered: 11/02/2016)
                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 45 Filed: 10/24/2016, Entered: None Telephone Conference
                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                              Blank 45 Filed: 10/21/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                              Minute Entry/Telephone Status Conference Report and Order for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Erin Wilder-Doomes: Telephone Status Conference held on 10/21/2016. Counsel and the court discussed the status of this matter. A Telephone Conference set for 11/3/2016 at 03:30 PM before Magistrate Judge Erin Wilder-Doomes. (LLH) Modified on 10/26/2016 to edit text (LLH). (Entered: 10/24/2016)
                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 44 Filed: 10/7/2016, Entered: None Scheduling Conference
                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                  Blank 44 Filed: 10/6/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                  Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Erin Wilder-Doomes: Scheduling Conference held on 10/6/2016. The status of this matter. Counsel reached an agreement in principle to amicably resolve the matter. In light of the possibility that this matter will be resolved, the court finds good cause to defer entry of a Scheduling Order. Deadlines for Plaintiffs to file opposition memoranda to the pending Motions to Dismiss ( 25 , 26 , 28 and 41 ) are SUSPENDED until further order of the Court to permit the parties time to finalize a settlement agreement. A telephone status conference is set for October 21, 2016 at 10:30 a.m. Plaintiffs counsel shall initiate the call and contact the court at (225) 89-3584 once all counsel on are the phone. During the conference, counsel will be prepared to provide an update on the status of the settlement agreement and to discuss a schedule for presentation of the settlement agreement to the court for approval. (BLR) (Entered: 10/07/2016)
                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 43 Filed: 10/4/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                    NOTICE of Briefing Schedule on 41 MOTION to Dismiss : Opposition to the motion shall be filed within 21 days from the filing of the motion and shall not exceed 10 pages excluding attachments. The mover may file a reply brief within 14 days of the filing of the opposition and shall be limited to a total of 5 pages. No motion for leave will be required. Sur-Reply briefs will be permitted only with leave of Court for extraordinary reasons supported by sufficient facts. (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no hyperlink or PDF document associated with this entry.)(KDC) (Entered: 10/04/2016)
                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 42 Filed: 10/4/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                      SUMMONS Returned Executed by Gloria La Riva, Brandon Wayne Erp, Kira Marrero, DeRay McKesson. Hillar C. Moore, III served on 8/26/2016, answer due 10/7/2016. (Etter, John) (Entered: 10/04/2016)
                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 41 Filed: 10/3/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                        MOTION to Dismiss with Prejudice Plaintiffs' 1 Complaint for Damages for Deprivation of Civil Rights by Hillar C. Moore, III. (Attachments: # 1 Memorandum in Support)(BLR) (Entered: 10/03/2016)
                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 40 Filed: 10/3/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                          ORDER granting 38 MOTION for Extension of Time to Plead Under Local Civil Rule 7(a). Hillar C. Moore, III answer due 10/7/2016. Signed by Magistrate Judge Erin Wilder-Doomes on 10/3/2016. (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no hyperlink or PDF document associated with this entry.) (BLR) (Entered: 10/03/2016)
                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 39 Filed: 9/27/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                            ORDER granting the 37 Unopposed Ex Parte Motion to Cancel Status Conference. The scheduling conference will proceed as scheduled 10/6/2016 at 11:30 a.m. in chambers (Room 313) before Magistrate Erin Wilder-Doomes. Signed by Magistrate Judge Erin Wilder-Doomes on 9/27/2016. (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no hyperlink or PDF document associated with this entry.) (BLR) (Entered: 09/27/2016)
                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 38 Filed: 9/26/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                              MOTION for Extension of Time to Plead Under Local Civil Rule 7(a) by Hillar C. Moore, III. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Pleading;, # 2 Memorandum in Support of Motion to Dismiss)(Lee, Dale) Modified on 9/26/2016 to edit the text(TNB). (Entered: 09/26/2016)
                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 37 Filed: 9/26/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                Unopposed MOTION to Cancel Status Conference by Michael D. Edmonson. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Pleading;)(Brustowicz, Celeste) Modified on 9/26/2016 to edit text. (EDC). (Entered: 09/26/2016)
                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 36 Filed: 9/23/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                  ORDER granting 35 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response plaintiffs memoranda in opposition to the to the Motion to Dismiss Under Rule 12(b)(6) until Friday, September 30, 2016 or 21 days after the filing of a Rule 12(b) motion by East Baton Rouge Parish District Attorney Hillar C. Moore, III. Signed by Judge John W. deGravelles on 09/23/2016.(This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no hyperlink or PDF document associated with this entry.) (JHF) Modified on 9/26/2016 (KDC). (Entered: 09/23/2016)
                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 35 Filed: 9/23/2016, Entered: 9/23/2016 Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                    Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response to 25 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim, 26 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim by All Plaintiffs. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(Etter, John)
                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank 34 Filed: 9/22/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                      Joint STATUS REPORT - by Plaintiffs and Defendants - filed by All Plaintiffs. (Etter, John) (Entered: 09/22/2016)
                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 33 Filed: 9/22/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                        ORDER granting 31 Motion to Enroll Additional Attorney. Added attorney Alan Gregory Rome and Courtney King Humphrey for City of Baton Rouge, Carl Dabadie, Jr., East Baton Rouge Parish and Melvin Kip Holden. Signed by Magistrate Judge Erin Wilder-Doomes on 9/22/2016. (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no hyperlink or PDF document associated with this entry.) (BLR) (Entered: 09/22/2016)
                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 32 Filed: 9/22/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                          ORDER: The 30 Motion for Status Conference is GRANTED. A Status Conference is set for 9/29/2016 at 10:00 AM in chambers (suite 313) before Magistrate Judge Erin Wilder-Doomes. Signed by Magistrate Judge Erin Wilder-Doomes on 9/22/2016. (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no hyperlink or PDF document associated with this entry.)(BLR) (Entered: 09/22/2016)
                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 31 Filed: 9/22/2016, Entered: 9/22/2016 Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                            MOTION to Enroll A. Gregory Rome and Courtney K. Humphrey as Additional Attorney by City of Baton Rouge, Carl Dabadie, Jr, East Baton Rouge Parish, Melvin Kip Holden. (Attachments: # 1 Attachment Order)(Morris, Deelee)
                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 30 Filed: 9/16/2016, Entered: 9/16/2016 Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                              MOTION for Status Conference by Michael D. Edmonson. (Attachments: # 1 Memorandum in Support, # 2 Exhibit 1)(Brustowicz, Celeste)
                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 29 Filed: 9/12/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                NOTICE of Briefing Schedule on 28 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim : Opposition to the motion shall be filed within 21 days from the filing of the motion and shall not exceed 10 pages excluding attachments. The mover may file a reply brief within 14 days of the filing of the opposition and shall be limited to a total of 5 pages. No motion for leave will be required. Sur-Reply briefs will be permitted only with leave of Court for extraordinary reasons supported by sufficient facts. (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no hyperlink or PDF document associated with this entry.) (KDC) (Entered: 09/12/2016)
                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 28 Filed: 9/9/2016, Entered: 9/9/2016 Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                  MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim by Michael D. Edmonson. (Attachments: # 1 Memorandum in Support)(Brustowicz, Celeste)
                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 27 Filed: 9/6/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                    NOTICE of Briefing Schedule on 25 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim , 26 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim : Opposition to the motion shall be filed within 21 days from the filing of the motion and shall not exceed 10 pages excluding attachments. The mover may file a reply brief within 14 days of the filing of the opposition and shall be limited to a total of 5 pages. No motion for leave will be required. Sur-Reply briefs will be permitted only with leave of Court for extraordinary reasons supported by sufficient facts. (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no hyperlink or PDF document associated with this entry.) (KDC) (Entered: 09/06/2016)
                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 26 Filed: 9/2/2016, Entered: 9/2/2016 Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                      MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim by Sid J. Gautreaux, III. (Attachments: # 1 Memorandum in Support, # 2 Proposed Pleading; Proposed Order)(St. Pierre, Catherine)
                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 25 Filed: 9/2/2016, Entered: 9/2/2016 Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                        MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim by Melvin Kip Holden. (Attachments: # 1 Memorandum in Support, # 2 Attachment Order)(Morris, Deelee)
                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                          Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 24 Filed: 9/1/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                          ANSWER to 1 Complaint and 21 First Supplemental Amended Complaint with Jury Demand by City of Baton Rouge, Carl Dabadie, Jr, East Baton Rouge Parish.(Morris, Deelee) Modified on 9/2/2016 to edit text.(EDC). (Entered: 09/01/2016)
                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 23 Filed: 8/24/2016, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                            Summons Issued as to Hillar C. Moore, III. (NOTICE: Counsel shall print and serve both the summons and all attachments in accordance with Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 4.) (NLT) (Entered: 08/24/2016)
                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 22 Filed: 8/23/2016, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                              Summons Submitted (Etter, John) (Entered: 08/23/2016)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 21 Filed: 8/23/2016, Entered: 8/23/2016 Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                AMENDED COMPLAINT - First Amended and Supplemental Class Action Complaint for Damages for Deprivation of Civil Rights against All Defendants, filed by Gloria La Riva, Kira Marrero, DeRay McKesson.(Etter, John)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 20 Filed: 8/17/2016, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                  SUMMONS Returned Executed by Gloria La Riva, Kira Marrero, DeRay McKesson. Sid J. Gautreaux, III served on 8/11/2016, answer due 9/1/2016. (Etter, John) (Entered: 08/17/2016)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 19 Filed: 8/17/2016, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                    SUMMONS Returned Executed by Gloria La Riva, Kira Marrero, DeRay McKesson. (Etter, John) (Entered: 08/17/2016)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 18 Filed: 8/17/2016, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                      SUMMONS Returned Executed by Gloria La Riva, Kira Marrero, DeRay McKesson. Michael D. Edmonson served on 8/11/2016, answer due 9/1/2016. (Etter, John) (Entered: 08/17/2016)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 17 Filed: 8/17/2016, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                        SUMMONS Returned Executed by Gloria La Riva, Kira Marrero, DeRay McKesson. Melvin Kip Holden served on 8/11/2016, answer due 9/1/2016. (Etter, John) (Entered: 08/17/2016)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 16 Filed: 8/17/2016, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                          SUMMONS Returned Executed by Gloria La Riva, Kira Marrero, DeRay McKesson. East Baton Rouge Parish served on 8/11/2016, answer due 9/1/2016. (Etter, John) (Entered: 08/17/2016)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 15 Filed: 8/17/2016, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                            SUMMONS Returned Executed by Gloria La Riva, Kira Marrero, DeRay McKesson. City of Baton Rouge served on 8/11/2016, answer due 9/1/2016. (Etter, John) (Entered: 08/17/2016)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 14 Filed: 8/17/2016, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                              SUMMONS Returned Executed by Gloria La Riva, Kira Marrero, DeRay McKesson. Carl Dabadie, Jr served on 8/11/2016, answer due 9/1/2016. (Etter, John) (Entered: 08/17/2016)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 13 Filed: 8/10/2016, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Summons Issued as to All Defendants. (NOTICE: Counsel shall print and serve both the summons and all attachments in accordance with Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 4.) (Attachments: # 1 summons, # 2 summons, # 3 summons, # 4 summons, # 5 summons, # 6 summons)(EDC) (Entered: 08/10/2016)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 12 Filed: 8/10/2016, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Summons Submitted (Etter, John) (Entered: 08/10/2016)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 11 Filed: 8/10/2016, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Summons Submitted (Etter, John) (Entered: 08/10/2016)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 10 Filed: 8/10/2016, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Summons Submitted (Etter, John) (Entered: 08/10/2016)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 9 Filed: 8/10/2016, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Summons Submitted (Etter, John) (Entered: 08/10/2016)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 8 Filed: 8/10/2016, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Summons Submitted (Etter, John) (Entered: 08/10/2016)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7 Filed: 8/10/2016, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Summons Submitted (Etter, John) (Entered: 08/10/2016)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 6 Filed: 8/10/2016, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Summons Submitted (Etter, John) (Entered: 08/10/2016)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5 Filed: 8/9/2016, Entered: 8/9/2016 Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                SCHEDULING CONFERENCE ORDER: Scheduling Conference set for 10/6/2016 at 11:30 AM in chambers before Magistrate Judge Erin Wilder-Doomes. Status Report due by 9/22/2016. Signed by Magistrate Judge Erin Wilder-Doomes on 8/9/2016. (BLR)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4 Filed: 8/4/2016, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Exhibit(s) to 1 Complaint by All Plaintiffs. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit - 2 -, # 2 Exhibit - 3 -, # 3 Exhibit - 4 -, # 4 Exhibit - 5 -, # 5 Exhibit - 6 -, # 6 Exhibit - 7 -)(Etter, John) (Entered: 08/04/2016)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 3 Filed: 8/4/2016, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Ex Parte MOTION to Appoint Counsel - Motion to Appoint Interim Class Counsel - by All Plaintiffs. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Pleading; - Proposed Order Appointing Interim Class Counsel -)(Etter, John) (Entered: 08/04/2016)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2 Filed: 8/4/2016, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    NOTICE of Related Proceedings by Gloria La Riva, Kira Marrero, DeRay McKesson re 1 Complaint (Etter, John) (Entered: 08/04/2016)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1 Filed: 8/4/2016, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      COMPLAINT against All Defendants ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 053N-1448687.), filed by Gloria La Riva, Kira Marrero, DeRay McKesson. (Attachments: # 1 Attachment Civil Cover Sheet)(Etter, John) (Entered: 08/04/2016)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF

                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Statistics

                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      This case has been viewed 57 times.

                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Space
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                       
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      PlainSite
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Sign Up
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Need Password Help?