Bourgeois v. Department of Homeland Security
Federal Civil Lawsuit Tennessee Middle District Court, Case No. 3:16-cv-00699

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Last Updated December 6, 2018 at 8:49 AM ST (2.5 years ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo Pierre Yves Bourgeois, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Charla Jo Steinmetz Haas +1 615 321 0010 +1 615 327 9199 chaas@realvisa.com
v.
No Logo All Unknown Government Agencies involved in Security Checks, Defendant
No Logo AUSA David Rivera, Defendant
United States Department of Homeland Security United States Department of Homeland Security, Defendant
Officially listed as "Department of Homeland Security"

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Mark H. Wildasin +1 615 736 2079 +1 615 736 5323 mark.wildasin@usdoj.gov

Toggle Switch Represented by Anthony Joseph Coppolino

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Anthony Joseph Coppolino

Toggle Switch Represented by Henderson & Grohman, PC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Karen Grohman +1 505 738 3507 kfg@hglegalgroup.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Noticing INS Attorney

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Noticing INS Attorney

Toggle Switch Represented by Office of the Connecticut Attorney General

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Maura Murphy-Osborne +1 860 808 5020 +1 860 808 5347 maura.murphyosborne@ct.gov

Toggle Switch Represented by United States Department of Justice

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space AUSA USAILN.ECFAUSA@usdoj.gov
Space Larry D Adams +1 410 209 4800 +1 410 962 9947 larry.adams@usdoj.gov
Space Gary L. Anderson +1 210 384 7365 +1 210 384 7312 stephanie.karam@usdoj.gov
Space OIL-DCS Trial Attorney +1 202 305 0598 oil-dcs.cacd@usdoj.gov
Space U. S. Attorney - Criminal +1 314 539 2200 +1 314 539 7695 usamoe.crimdock@usdoj.gov
Space Jeffrey Michael Bauer +1 202 532 4786 +1 202 616 8962 jeffrey.bauer@usdoj.gov
Space John C Bell John.Bell2@usdoj.gov
Space Timothy Michael Belsan +1 202 532 4596 +1 202 305 7000 timothy.m.belsan@usdoj.gov
Space Michelle Renee Bennett +1 202 305 8902 michelle.bennett@usdoj.gov
Space Benjamin Leon Berwick +1 202 305 8573 +1 202 616 8470 benjamin.l.berwick@usdoj.gov
Space Jesi J Carlson +1 202 305 7037 +1 202 305 7000 jesi.j.carlson@usdoj.gov
Space Sharla Cerra +1 213 894 6117 +1 213 894 7819 USACAC.Civil@usdoj.gov
Space Priscilla To-Yin Chan +1 206 553 7970 Priscilla.Chan@usdoj.gov
Space Caroline Jane Clark Prime +1 619 546 7183 +1 619 546 7751 caroline.prime@usdoj.gov
Space Rebecca S. Cohen +1 206 553 7970 +1 206 553 4067 rebecca.cohen@usdoj.gov
Space Joseph A. Darrow +1 202 598 2445 joseph.a.darrow@usdoj.gov
Space Kathryn Celia Davis +1 202 616 8298 +1 202 616 8470 Kathryn.C.Davis@usdoj.gov
Space Lynn Trinka Ernce +1 916 554 2720 +1 916 554 2900 lynn.trinka.ernce@usdoj.gov
Space Walter Manning Evans +1 202 616 2186 +1 202 305 4829 Manning.Evans@usdoj.gov
Space Lily Sara Farel +1 202 353 7633 +1 202 616 8460 lily.farel@usdoj.gov
Space Brian Marc Feldman +1 212 637 2777 +1 212 637 2717 brian.feldman@usdoj.gov
Space August Edward Flentje +1 202 514 1278 august.flentje@usdoj.gov
Space Paul Gerald Freeborne +1 202 353 0543 +1 202 616 8460 paul.freeborne@usdoj.gov
Space Kyle Renee Freeny +1 202 514 5108 +1 202 616 8460 kyle.freeny@usdoj.gov
Space Christopher Douglas Frey +21263 720 00x2270 +1 212 637 2527 christopher.frey@usdoj.gov
Space Arjun Garg +1 202 305 8613 +1 202 616 8470 arjun.garg@usdoj.gov
Space Helen L Gilbert +1 202 514 4862
Space Glenn M Girdharry +1 202 532 4807 +1 202 305 7000 glenn.girdharry@usdoj.gov
Space Samuel P. Go +1 202 353 9923 +2 026 +16 8962 samuel.go@usdoj.gov
Space Katherine E.M. Goettel +1 202 532 4115 +1 202 305 7000 kate.goettel@usdoj.gov
Space Aaron S Goldsmith +1 202 532 4107 +1 202 616 8962 aaron.goldsmith@usdoj.gov
Space Kathryne Gray +1 202 305 7386 +1 202 305 7777 kathryne.m.gray@usdoj.gov
Space Christopher Wayne Hollis +1 202 305 0899 +1 202 616 8962 christopher.hollis@usdoj.gov
Space Luke M. Jones +1 202 514 3770 luke.jones@usdoj.gov
Space Diane Kelleher +1 202 514 4775 +22616820 226 616 8202 Diane.Kelleher@usdoj.gov
Space Sam Delk Kennedy, Jr. +1 615 736 5151 delk.kennedy@usdoj.gov
Space Jennie Leah Kneedler +1 202 305 8662 +1 202 616 8150 Jennie.L.Kneedler@usdoj.gov
Space Craig W. Kuhn +1 202 616 3540 craig.kuhn@usdoj.gov
Space Sunni Jones LeBeouf +1 504 680 3061 Sunni.J.Lebeouf@usdoj.gov
Space Lisa Leontiev +1 915 534 3491 lisa.leontiev@usdoj.gov
Space Robert Ira Lester +1 213 894 2464 +1 213 894 7819 robert.lester@usdoj.gov
Space Brant S. Levine +1 202 616 4373 +1 202 616 4314 Brant.Levine@usdoj.gov
Space Edward Martin +22616102 226 616 1024 edward.martin2@usdoj.gov
Space Joseph Anthony Marutollo +1 718 254 6288 +1 718 254 7489 joseph.marutollo@usdoj.gov
Space Michelle Lynn McConaghy +1 203 821 3700 +1 203 773 5373 michelle.mcconaghy@usdoj.gov
Space Stacey Elise McCord +1 501 340 2630 stacey.mccord@usdoj.gov
Space Joel Lunsford McElvain +1 202 514 2988 +1 202 616 8202 joel.mcelvain@usdoj.gov
Space Heather Kirsten McShain +1 212 637 2200 +1 212 637 2686 Heather.McShain@usdoj.gov
Space Jason Daniel Medinger +1 410 209 4800 +1 410 962 0122 jason.medinger@usdoj.gov
Space Douglas P. Morabito +1 203 821 3700 +1 203 773 5373 Douglas.Morabito@usdoj.gov
Space Emily B Nestler +1 202 616 8489 emily.b.nestler@usdoj.gov
Space Craig Arthur Oswald +1 312 353 5300 craig.oswald@usdoj.gov
Space Abigail Lynn Peluso +1 312 353 5300 abigail.peluso@usdoj.gov
Space Lisa E. Perkins +1 860 947 1101 +1 860 760 7979 lisa.perkins@usdoj.gov
Space Anthony Pogorzelski +1 305 961 9296 +1 305 530 7139 anthony.pogorzelski@usdoj.gov
Space Amy Powell +1 202 514 9836 +1 202 616 8202 amy.powell@usdoj.gov
Space Joshua Samuel Press +1 202 305 0106 +1 202 305 7000 joshua.press@usdoj.gov
Space Kirti Vaidya Reddy +1 212 637 2751 +1 212 637 2786 kirti.reddy@usdoj.gov
Space Erez R Reuveni +1 202 307 4293 erez.r.reuveni@usdoj.gov
Space Eleanor A Robinson-Gaither +1 713 567 9303 +1 713 718 3415 eleanor.robinson-gaither@usdoj.gov
Space Brad P. Rosenberg +1 202 514 3374 +1 202 616 8460 brad.rosenberg@usdoj.gov
Space Rod J Rosenstein +1 410 209 4800 rod.rosenstein@usdoj.gov
Space Daniel Schwei +1 202 305 8693 +1 202 616 8470 daniel.s.schwei@usdoj.gov
Space Nitin Shah +1 202 514 4269 nitin.shah@usdoj.gov
Space Carlton Frederick Sheffield +1 202 532 4737 carlton.f.sheffield@usdoj.gov
Space Jeremy Paul Sherer +1 205 244 2019 jeremy.sherer@usdoj.gov
Space Victoria S Shin +1 212 735 3732 +1 203 773 5373 Victoria.Shin@usdoj.gov
Space Katherine J. Shinners +1 202 598 8259 +1 202 305 7000 Katherine.J.Shinners@usdoj.gov
Space Brett A. Shumate +1 202 514 2331 brett.a.shumate@usdoj.gov
Space Kathryn Louise Smith +1 202 616 4039 +1 202 616 4002 kathryn.smith@usdoj.gov
Space Laura Katherine Smith +1 202 616 0419 +1 202 616 4314 laura.smith2@usdoj.gov
Space Sharon Denise Smith +1 504 680 3000 sharon.d.smith@usdoj.gov
Space Sekret T Sneed +1 213 894 3551 +1 213 894 7819 sekret.sneed@usdoj.gov
Space John C. Spaccarotella +1 305 961 9212 john.spaccarotella@usdoj.gov
Space Erik Kenneth Stegeby +1 202 616 4119 +1 813 274 6200 kenneth.stegeby@usdoj.gov
Space NATHAN MICHAEL SWINTON +1 202 305 7667 +1 202 616 8470 nathan.m.swinton@usdoj.gov
Space Andrew H. Tannenbaum +1 202 616 8202 +1 202 616 8202 andrew.tannenbaum@usdoj.gov
Space John K. Theis +1 202 305 7632 +1 202 616 8460 john.k.theis@usdoj.gov
Space John Russell Tyler +1 202 514 2356 +1 202 616 8470 john.tyler@usdoj.gov
Space Assistant 2241-194 US Attorney LA-CV +1 213 894 2434 USACAC.Habeas@usdoj.gov
Space Lana L. Vahab +1 202 532 4067 +1 202 305 7000 lana.vahab@usdoj.gov
Space Jeannette Anne Vargas +1 212 637 2000 +1 212 637 2730 Jeannette.Vargas@usdoj.gov
Space Gisela Ann Westwater +1 202 532 4174 gisela.westwater@usdoj.gov
Space Sarah Stevens Wilson +1 205 244 2140 +1 205 244 2181 Sarah.Wilson2@usdoj.gov
Space Kathryn L. Wyer +1 202 616 8475 kathryn.wyer@usdoj.gov
Space Donald W Yoo +1 213 894 3994 +1 213 894 7819 donald.yoo@usdoj.gov
Space Briana Yuh +1 202 532 4165 +1 202 305 7000 Briana.Yuh@usdoj.gov
Space ADRIENNE ZACK +1 202 598 2446 adrienne.zack@usdoj.gov

Toggle Switch Represented by US Attorney Habeas

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space US Attorney Habeas
No Logo Jen Johnson, Defendant
No Logo Loretta E. Lynch, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by United States Department of Justice

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
in her official capacity as United States Attorney General
TERMINATED: 06/20/2017 Daryl A. Atchison +1 251 415 7159 +1 251 441 5131 daryl.atchison@usdoj.gov
in her official capacity as United States Attorney General
TERMINATED: 06/20/2017 OIL-DCS Trial Attorney +1 202 305 0598 oil-dcs.cacd@usdoj.gov
in her official capacity as United States Attorney General
TERMINATED: 06/20/2017 U. S. Attorney - Criminal +1 314 539 2200 +1 314 539 7695 usamoe.crimdock@usdoj.gov
in her official capacity as United States Attorney General
TERMINATED: 06/20/2017 Benjamin Leon Berwick +1 202 305 8573 +1 202 616 8470 benjamin.l.berwick@usdoj.gov
in her official capacity as United States Attorney General
TERMINATED: 06/20/2017 Samuel William Bettwy +1 619 557 7119 +1 619 557 7122 Samuel.Bettwy@usdoj.gov
in her official capacity as United States Attorney General
TERMINATED: 06/20/2017 James O. Bickford +1 202 305 7632 +1 202 616 8470 james.bickford@usdoj.gov
in her official capacity as United States Attorney General
TERMINATED: 06/20/2017 Chad A Blumenfield +1 612 664 5600 chad.blumenfield@usdoj.gov
in her official capacity as United States Attorney General
TERMINATED: 06/20/2017 Steven Yale Bressler +1 202 305 0167 +1 202 616 8470 steven.bressler@usdoj.gov
in her official capacity as United States Attorney General
TERMINATED: 06/20/2017 Shane Patrick Cargo +1 212 210 9460 +1 212 922 3860 shane.cargo@usdoj.gov
in her official capacity as United States Attorney General
TERMINATED: 06/20/2017 Megan Anne Crowley +1 202 305 0754 megan.a.crowley@usdoj.gov
in her official capacity as United States Attorney General
TERMINATED: 06/20/2017 Yamileth G. Davila +1 202 305 0137 yamileth.g.davila@usdoj.gov
in her official capacity as United States Attorney General
TERMINATED: 06/20/2017 Kathryn Celia Davis +1 202 616 8298 +1 202 616 8470 Kathryn.C.Davis@usdoj.gov
in her official capacity as United States Attorney General
TERMINATED: 06/20/2017 Scott Dunn +1 718 254 6029 +1 718 254 6081 Scott.Dunn@usdoj.gov
in her official capacity as United States Attorney General
TERMINATED: 06/20/2017 Shahna M Esber +1 213 894 8308 +1 213 894 7819 shahna.esber@usdoj.gov
in her official capacity as United States Attorney General
TERMINATED: 06/20/2017 Leon Fresco +1 202 307 6482 +1 202 955 5564 leon.fresco@usdoj.gov
in her official capacity as United States Attorney General
TERMINATED: 06/20/2017 Audrey Benison Hemesath +1 916 554 2729 +1 916 554 2886 audrey.hemesath@usdoj.gov
in her official capacity as United States Attorney General
TERMINATED: 06/20/2017 Carolyn Aiko Ikari +1 860 760 7953 +1 860 760 7979 carolyn.ikari@usdoj.gov
in her official capacity as United States Attorney General
TERMINATED: 06/20/2017 Jeffrey B Isaacs +1 213 978 7940 +1 213 978 8112 USACAC.Criminal@usdoj.gov
in her official capacity as United States Attorney General
TERMINATED: 06/20/2017 Michael James +1 919 856 4530 Mike.James@usdoj.gov
in her official capacity as United States Attorney General
TERMINATED: 06/20/2017 Anna E. Juarez +1 202 532 4402 Anna.Juarez@usdoj.gov
in her official capacity as United States Attorney General
TERMINATED: 06/20/2017 Colin A. Kisor , +1 202 532 4331 colin.kisor@usdoj.gov
in her official capacity as United States Attorney General
TERMINATED: 06/20/2017 Nelsy De La Nuez +1 917 697 3688 nelsy.de.la.nuez2@usdoj.gov
in her official capacity as United States Attorney General
TERMINATED: 06/20/2017 Jason Lee +1 202 514 3367 +1 202 616 8470 Jason.Lee3@usdoj.gov
in her official capacity as United States Attorney General
TERMINATED: 06/20/2017 Karen Folster Lesperance +1 518 431 0247 +1 518 431 0249 karen.lesperance@usdoj.gov
in her official capacity as United States Attorney General
TERMINATED: 06/20/2017 Sheila Lieber +1 202 514 3259 +1 202 616 8470 sheila.lieber@usdoj.gov
in her official capacity as United States Attorney General
TERMINATED: 06/20/2017 Carlo D Marchioli +1 717 221 4482 carlo.d.marchioli@usdoj.gov
in her official capacity as United States Attorney General
TERMINATED: 06/20/2017 Gail Y. Mitchell +1 716 843 5833 +1 716 551 3196 gail.y.mitchell@usdoj.gov
in her official capacity as United States Attorney General
TERMINATED: 06/20/2017 Emily B Nestler +1 202 616 8489 emily.b.nestler@usdoj.gov
in her official capacity as United States Attorney General
TERMINATED: 06/20/2017 Elianis N. Perez +1 202 616 9124 elianis.perez@usdoj.gov
in her official capacity as United States Attorney General
TERMINATED: 06/20/2017 Sherease Pratt +1 202 307 0895 sherease.pratt@usdoj.gov
in her official capacity as United States Attorney General
TERMINATED: 06/20/2017 Rudy E. Renfer +1 919 856 4046 +1 919 856 4487 rudy.e.renfer@usdoj.gov
in her official capacity as United States Attorney General
TERMINATED: 06/20/2017 Erez R Reuveni +1 202 307 4293 erez.r.reuveni@usdoj.gov
in her official capacity as United States Attorney General
TERMINATED: 06/20/2017 Daniel Riess +1 202 353 3098 +1 202 616 8460 daniel.riess@usdoj.gov
in her official capacity as United States Attorney General
TERMINATED: 06/20/2017 William C. Silvis +1 202 307 4693 +1 202 305 7000 william.silvis@usdoj.gov
in her official capacity as United States Attorney General
TERMINATED: 06/20/2017 Eric J. Soskin +1 202 353 0533 eric.soskin@usdoj.gov
in her official capacity as United States Attorney General
TERMINATED: 06/20/2017 Elizabeth Joanne Stevens +1 202 616 9752 +1 202 233 0397 elizabeth.stevens@usdoj.gov
in her official capacity as United States Attorney General
TERMINATED: 06/20/2017 NATHAN MICHAEL SWINTON +1 202 305 7667 +1 202 616 8470 nathan.m.swinton@usdoj.gov
in her official capacity as United States Attorney General
TERMINATED: 06/20/2017 Margaret K. Taylor +1 202 305 0658 margaret.k.taylor@usdoj.gov
in her official capacity as United States Attorney General
TERMINATED: 06/20/2017 Ana H Voss +1 612 664 5600 +1 612 664 5788 ana.voss@usdoj.gov
in her official capacity as United States Attorney General
TERMINATED: 06/20/2017 Gisela Ann Westwater +1 202 532 4174 gisela.westwater@usdoj.gov
in her official capacity as United States Attorney General
TERMINATED: 06/20/2017 D Gerald Wilhelm +1 612 664 5600 gerald.wilhelm@usdoj.gov
in her official capacity as United States Attorney General
TERMINATED: 06/20/2017 Sarah Stevens Wilson +1 205 244 2140 +1 205 244 2181 Sarah.Wilson2@usdoj.gov
in her official capacity as United States Attorney General
TERMINATED: 06/20/2017 Spencer Elijah Wittman Amdur +1 202 616 7420 spencer.amdur@usdoj.gov
No Logo Lynuel Dennis, Defendant
Citation Section 08 U.S.C. § 1447
Nature of Suit 890 - Other Statutes: Other Statutory Actions
  Entries (13) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 13 Filed: 8/8/2016, Entered: 8/8/2016 Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
ORDER: The Report and Recommendation 11 is ADOPTED. This action is DISMISSED WITHOUT PREJUDICE for failure to timely serve Defendants. This is the final order in this case. Signed by District Judge Waverly D. Crenshaw, Jr on 8/8/16. (DOCKET TEXT SUMMARY ONLY-ATTORNEYS MUST OPEN THE PDF AND READ THE ORDER.)(dt) Modified on 8/8/2016 (dt).
    Request RequestSpace LREF
    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 12 Filed: 8/2/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
    GREEN CARD RETURNED Executed Acknowledgement filed by Pierre Yves Bourgeois. (Attachments: # 1 Attachment Return copy - Johnson, # 2 Attachment Return copy - Lynch, # 3 Attachment Return copy - Rivera)(Haas, Charla Jo) (Entered: 08/02/2016)
      Request RequestSpace LREF
      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 11 Filed: 7/19/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
      REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION: Magistrate Judge Brown recommends this case be dismissed without prejudice. Signed by Magistrate Judge Joe Brown on 7/19/16. (DOCKET TEXT SUMMARY ONLY-ATTORNEYS MUST OPEN THE PDF AND READ THE ORDER.)(dt) (Entered: 07/19/2016)
        Request RequestSpace LREF
        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 10 Filed: 7/12/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
        RESPONSE filed by David Rivera re 9 Order, . (Wildasin, Mark) (Entered: 07/12/2016)
          Request RequestSpace LREF
          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 9 Filed: 7/8/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
          ORDER regarding service of process: The Clerk is directed to send a copy of this order to the local U.S. Attorney's Office. The United States Attorney is DIRECTED to provide the Court with any information the United States Attorney has about this case and whether they believe they have been served. Signed by Magistrate Judge Joe Brown on 7/8/16. (DOCKET TEXT SUMMARY ONLY-ATTORNEYS MUST OPEN THE PDF AND READ THE ORDER.)(af) (Entered: 07/08/2016)
            Request RequestSpace LREF
            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 8 Filed: 7/7/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
            SUMMONS returned executed by Pierre Yves Bourgeois. All Defendants. (Attachments: # 1 Attachment Proof of Service, # 2 Attachment Proof of Service, # 3 Attachment Proof of Service, # 4 Attachment Proof of Service)(Haas, Charla Jo) (Entered: 07/07/2016)
              Request RequestSpace LREF
              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7 Filed: 7/6/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
              ORDER: The Plaintiff is directed to file with the Clerk proof of service or to show cause within 14 days why the Court should not dismiss the case for failure to obtain service of process within 90 days. The matter is presently set for a case management conference on August 24, 2016. If service of process has been obtained then the initial case management conference is reset for Tuesday, August 30, 2016, at 11:00 a.m. Signed by Magistrate Judge Joe Brown on 7/6/16. (DOCKET TEXT SUMMARY ONLY-ATTORNEYS MUST OPEN THE PDF AND READ THE ORDER.)(dt) (Entered: 07/06/2016)
                Request RequestSpace LREF
                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 6 Filed: 5/9/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                NOTICE of Initial Case Management Conference set for 8/24/2016 at 10:00 AM before Magistrate Judge Joe Brown. (dt) (Entered: 05/09/2016)
                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5 Filed: 5/3/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                  ORDER: This case is REFERRED to the Magistrate Judge for customized case management in accordance with Local rule 16.01. Signed by District Judge Waverly D. Crenshaw, Jr on 5/3/16. (DOCKET TEXT SUMMARY ONLY-ATTORNEYS MUST OPEN THE PDF AND READ THE ORDER.)(dt) (Entered: 05/03/2016)
                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4 Filed: 4/19/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                    ORDER: Pursuant to the division of the docket, this case is transferred to Judge Waverly Crenshaw. All previously imposed deadlines and Court dates remain, unchanged, pending any further order of the Court. Signed by Chief Judge Kevin H. Sharp on 4/19/16. (dt) (Entered: 04/20/2016)
                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 3 Filed: 4/1/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                      Summons issued as to Lynuel Dennis, Department of Homeland Security, Jen Johnson, Loretta E. Lynch, David Rivera. (Issued Summons returned to attorney by regular mail.)(dt) (Entered: 04/01/2016)
                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2 Filed: 4/1/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                        NOTICE/INFORMATION regarding Consent of the Parties to the Magistrate Judge. (dt) (Entered: 04/01/2016)
                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1 Filed: 4/1/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                          COMPLAINT against All Unknown Government Agencies involved in Security Checks, Lynuel Dennis, Department of Homeland Security, Jen Johnson, Loretta E. Lynch, David Rivera (Filing fee $400, Receipt number 0650-2176499), filed by Pierre Yves Bourgeois. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit List, # 2 Exhibit 1 - Copy of Mr. Bourgeois' Lawful Permanent Resident Card, # 3 Exhibit 2 - Copy of I-797C Receipt Notice issued by USCIS, # 4 Exhibit 3 - Copy of N-400 Interview Notice and Naturalization Interview results issed by USCIS, # 5 Exhibit 4 - Copies of email inquiries made by petitioner's attorney, # 6 Exhibit 5 - Copy of FBI Fingerprint Check, # 7 Attachment - Civil Cover Sheet)(dt) (Entered: 04/01/2016)
                            Request RequestSpace LREF

                            Statistics

                            This case has been viewed 23 times.

                            No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                            Space
                            Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                            Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                             
                            PlainSite
                            Sign Up
                            Need Password Help?