Directv, LLC v. Tanakas Grill & Sushi, Inc.
Federal Civil Lawsuit North Carolina Western District Court, Case No. 3:16-cv-00251

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Last Updated May 31, 2019 at 12:03 AM DT (2.1 years ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

Citation Section 47 U.S.C. § 0605
Nature of Suit Cable/Satellite TV
  Entries (17) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 22 Filed: 6/9/2017, Entered: None Notice of Voluntary Dismissal
    Request RequestSpace LREF
    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 21 Filed: 6/1/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
    CLERK'S JUDGMENT is hereby entered in accordance with the Court's Order dated 5/22/2017. Signed by Clerk, Frank G. Johns. (eef)
      Request RequestSpace LREF
      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 20 Filed: 5/22/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
      ORDER re 18 Memorandum in Support of Motion. Signed by Senior Judge Graham Mullen on 5/22/2017. (eef)
        Request RequestSpace LREF
        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 19 Filed: 5/4/2017, Entered: None Affidavit in Support of Motion
          Request RequestSpace LREF
          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 18 Filed: 5/4/2017, Entered: None Memorandum in Support of Motion
            Request RequestSpace LREF
            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 17 Filed: 4/17/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
            ORDER resetting Bench Trial set for 7/17/2017 10:00 AM in Courtroom 2-2, 401 W Trade St, Charlotte, NC 28202 before Senior Judge Graham Mullen.. Signed by Senior Judge Graham Mullen on 4/17/2017. (chh)
              Request RequestSpace LREF
              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 16 Filed: 3/21/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
              ORDER granting 11 Motion for Summary Judgment; FURTHER ORDERED that Plaintiff shall submit authorities in support of damages it is entitled to in this matter within (45) days from the date of this Order. Signed by Senior Judge Graham Mullen on 3/21/2017. (eef)
                Request RequestSpace LREF
                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 15 Filed: 2/21/2017, Entered: None Miscellaneous Filing
                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 14 Filed: 2/20/2017, Entered: None Miscellaneous Filing
                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 13 Filed: 2/8/2017, Entered: None Certificate of Service
                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 12 Filed: 2/8/2017, Entered: None Notice (Other)
                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 11 Filed: 2/8/2017, Entered: None SUMMARY JUDGMENT
                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 10 Filed: 2/8/2017, Entered: None Appendix
                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 9 Filed: 9/15/2016, Entered: None Summons Returned Executed
                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 8 Filed: 8/19/2016, Entered: None Scheduling Order
                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7 Filed: 8/8/2016, Entered: None Certification of Initial Attorneys Conference and Discovery Plan
                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5 Filed: 5/23/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                  ORDER granting 2 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice added Christopher Joseph Hufnagel for Directv, LLC. Signed by Senior Judge Graham Mullen on 5/23/16. (tob)
                                    Request RequestSpace LREF

                                    Statistics

                                    This case has been viewed 1 time.

                                    No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                    Space
                                    Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                    Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                     
                                    PlainSite
                                    Sign Up
                                    Need Password Help?