Newton v. Beneficial Financial I, Inc.
Federal Civil Lawsuit Virginia Western District Court, Case No. 3:16-cv-00058

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Last Updated April 6, 2020 at 12:25 PM DT (1.1 years ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo Donald Lewis Woodson, Jr., Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Suite 1050

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 10/13/2016, LEAD ATTORNEY Drew David Sarrett +1 877 575 0258 +1 877 575 0245 drew@mclaughlinvalaw.com

Toggle Switch Represented by The Law Office of Henry McLaughlin, P. C.

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Henry W. McLaughlin, III +1 804 205 9020 +1 804 575 0245 henry@mclaughlinvalaw.com
No Logo Michael Early Woodson, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Suite 1050

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 10/13/2016, LEAD ATTORNEY Drew David Sarrett +1 877 575 0258 +1 877 575 0245 drew@mclaughlinvalaw.com

Toggle Switch Represented by The Law Office of Henry McLaughlin, P. C.

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Henry W. McLaughlin, III +1 804 205 9020 +1 804 575 0245 henry@mclaughlinvalaw.com
No Logo Tonia Woodson Newton, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Suite 1050

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 10/13/2016, LEAD ATTORNEY Drew David Sarrett +1 877 575 0258 +1 877 575 0245 drew@mclaughlinvalaw.com

Toggle Switch Represented by The Law Office of Henry McLaughlin, P. C.

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Henry W. McLaughlin, III +1 804 205 9020 +1 804 575 0245 henry@mclaughlinvalaw.com
v.
No Logo BENEFICIAL FINANCIAL I, INC., Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Stradley Ronon Stevens & Young, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, PRO HAC VICE, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED CHRISTINE M. DEBEVEC +1 215 564 8156 cdebevec@stradley.com
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED John Alexander Nader +1 202 822 9611 jnader@stradley.com
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED David Adam Rosen +1 202 507 6401 +1 202 822 0140 drosen@stradley.com
No Logo Ditech Financial LLC, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Constangy Brooks & Smith, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Sarah Warren Smith +1 804 697 1208 +1 804 697 1339 sarahwarren.smith@troutmansanders.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Troutman Sanders, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Syed Mohsin Reza +1 703 734 4351 +1 703 448 6510 mohsin.reza@troutmansanders.com
Citation Section 28 U.S.C. § 1332
Nature of Suit Truth in Lending
  Entries (146) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 164 Filed: 4/6/2020, Entered: None USCA Mandate
    Request RequestSpace LREF
    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 163 Filed: 3/27/2020, Entered: None USCA Order
      Request RequestSpace LREF
      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 162 Filed: 2/27/2020, Entered: None USCA Order
        Request RequestSpace LREF
        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 161 Filed: 2/12/2020, Entered: None USCA Judgment
          Request RequestSpace LREF
          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 160 Filed: 2/12/2020, Entered: None USCA Memorandum
            Request RequestSpace LREF
            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 159 Filed: 5/6/2019, Entered: None Costs Taxed
              Request RequestSpace LREF
              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 158 Filed: 4/24/2019, Entered: None Transmittal of Notice of Appeal to 4CCA
                Request RequestSpace LREF
                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 157 Filed: 4/22/2019, Entered: None Notice of Appeal
                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 156 Filed: 4/17/2019, Entered: None Bill of Costs
                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 154 Filed: 4/16/2019, Entered: None USCA Order
                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 153 Filed: 3/26/2019, Entered: None Order on Motion for Summary Judgment
                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 152 Filed: 3/26/2019, Entered: None Memorandum Opinion
                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 151 Filed: 3/20/2019, Entered: None USCA Order
                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 150 Filed: 9/17/2018, Entered: None Brief / Memorandum in Support
                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 149 Filed: 9/17/2018, Entered: None Reply to Response to Motion
                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 148 Filed: 9/10/2018, Entered: None BRIEF/MEMORANDUM in Opposition
                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 147 Filed: 8/29/2018, Entered: None Order on Motion To Substitute Attorney
                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 146 Filed: 8/29/2018, Entered: None Substitute Attorney
                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 145 Filed: 8/27/2018, Entered: None BRIEF/MEMORANDUM in Support
                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 144 Filed: 8/27/2018, Entered: None SUMMARY JUDGMENT
                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 143 Filed: 8/27/2018, Entered: None BRIEF/MEMORANDUM in Support
                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 142 Filed: 8/27/2018, Entered: None SUMMARY JUDGMENT
                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 141 Filed: 8/3/2018, Entered: None USCA order
                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 140 Filed: 7/30/2018, Entered: None Order on motion for summary judgment
                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 139 Filed: 7/16/2018, Entered: None Order on Motion to Take Deposition
                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 138 Filed: 7/16/2018, Entered: None Motion Hearing
                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 137 Filed: 7/16/2018, Entered: None FTR Log Notes with Certificate
                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 136 Filed: 7/16/2018, Entered: None Reply to Response to motion
                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 135 Filed: 7/12/2018, Entered: None Order on Motion To Substitute Attorney
                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 133 Filed: 7/11/2018, Entered: None response in opposition to motion
                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 132 Filed: 7/11/2018, Entered: None Substitute Attorney
                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 131 Filed: 7/9/2018, Entered: None Extension of Time to File Response/Reply
                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 130 Filed: 6/26/2018, Entered: None Order on Motion to Withdraw
                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 129 Filed: 6/26/2018, Entered: None Withdraw
                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 127 Filed: 6/25/2018, Entered: None Discovery Letter
                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 126 Filed: 6/22/2018, Entered: None order on motion for miscellaneous relief
                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 124 Filed: 6/22/2018, Entered: None Miscellaneous Relief
                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 123 Filed: 6/19/2018, Entered: None BRIEF/MEMORANDUM in Support
                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 122 Filed: 6/19/2018, Entered: None Take Deposition
                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 121 Filed: 5/30/2018, Entered: None FTR Log Notes with Certificate
                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 120 Filed: 5/30/2018, Entered: None discovery hearing
                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 118 Filed: 5/30/2018, Entered: None Order on motion to compel
                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 117 Filed: 5/29/2018, Entered: None response
                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 114 Filed: 5/24/2018, Entered: None letter
                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 113 Filed: 5/23/2018, Entered: None Substitute Attorney
                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 111 Filed: 5/2/2018, Entered: None Order to Vacate
                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 110 Filed: 5/1/2018, Entered: None USCA Order
                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 109 Filed: 4/16/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                MEMORANDUM OPINION. Signed by Senior Judge Norman K. Moon on 4/16/18. (hnw)
                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 108 Filed: 4/10/2018, Entered: None Response
                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 107 Filed: 4/10/2018, Entered: None Response
                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 106 Filed: 4/2/2018, Entered: None Response in Opposition to Motion
                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 105 Filed: 4/2/2018, Entered: None Brief / Memorandum in Opposition
                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 104 Filed: 3/26/2018, Entered: None USCA Notice of Docketing ROA
                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 103 Filed: 3/23/2018, Entered: None Transmittal of Notice of Appeal to 4CCA
                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 102 Filed: 3/20/2018, Entered: None Notice of Appeal
                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 101 Filed: 3/20/2018, Entered: None Brief / Memorandum in Support
                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 100 Filed: 3/20/2018, Entered: None Reconsideration
                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 99 Filed: 3/19/2018, Entered: None Brief / Memorandum in Support
                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 98 Filed: 3/19/2018, Entered: None Reconsideration
                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 96 Filed: 2/16/2018, Entered: None Order on Motion for Summary Judgment
                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 95 Filed: 2/16/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                          MEMORANDUM OPINION. Signed by Senior Judge Norman K. Moon on 2/16/18. (hnw)
                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 93 Filed: 1/9/2018, Entered: None Order to Vacate
                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 90 Filed: 12/21/2017, Entered: None Response in Opposition to Motion
                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 89 Filed: 12/20/2017, Entered: None Order Referring Motion
                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 88 Filed: 12/19/2017, Entered: None Notice of Appearance
                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 87 Filed: 12/15/2017, Entered: None Order Transferring Case to Another Judge
                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 86 Filed: 12/7/2017, Entered: None Order on Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice
                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 85 Filed: 12/5/2017, Entered: None Appear Pro Hac Vice
                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 84 Filed: 11/22/2017, Entered: None Reply to Response to Motion
                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 82 Filed: 11/17/2017, Entered: None Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply
                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 81 Filed: 11/17/2017, Entered: None Reply to Response to Motion
                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 80 Filed: 11/16/2017, Entered: None Extension of Time to File Response/Reply
                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 79 Filed: 11/10/2017, Entered: None Brief / Memorandum in Support
                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 78 Filed: 11/10/2017, Entered: None Miscellaneous Relief
                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 77 Filed: 11/10/2017, Entered: None Brief / Memorandum in Opposition
                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 76 Filed: 11/7/2017, Entered: None Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply
                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 75 Filed: 11/6/2017, Entered: None Brief / Memorandum in Support
                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 74 Filed: 11/6/2017, Entered: None Extension of Time to File Response/Reply
                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 73 Filed: 11/3/2017, Entered: None Brief / Memorandum in Opposition
                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 72 Filed: 11/3/2017, Entered: None Brief / Memorandum in Opposition
                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 71 Filed: 10/23/2017, Entered: None Brief / Memorandum in Support
                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 70 Filed: 10/23/2017, Entered: None SUMMARY JUDGMENT
                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 69 Filed: 10/23/2017, Entered: None Brief / Memorandum in Support
                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 68 Filed: 10/23/2017, Entered: None SUMMARY JUDGMENT
                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 66 Filed: 10/21/2017, Entered: None Brief / Memorandum in Support
                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 65 Filed: 10/21/2017, Entered: None Amend/Correct
                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 61 Filed: 10/6/2017, Entered: None Notice to Take Deposition
                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 60 Filed: 10/6/2017, Entered: None Notice to Take Deposition
                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 52 Filed: 5/12/2017, Entered: None Scheduling Order
                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 51 Filed: 4/28/2017, Entered: None Scheduling Letter
                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 50 Filed: 4/24/2017, Entered: None Answer to Amended Complaint
                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 49 Filed: 4/20/2017, Entered: None Answer to Amended Complaint
                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 48 Filed: 4/14/2017, Entered: None Notice (Other)
                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 47 Filed: 4/7/2017, Entered: None Scheduling Letter
                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 46 Filed: 4/6/2017, Entered: None Order on Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim
                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 45 Filed: 4/6/2017, Entered: None Memorandum Opinion
                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 44 Filed: 4/4/2017, Entered: None Motion Hearing
                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 43 Filed: 3/29/2017, Entered: None Notice of Appearance
                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 42 Filed: 3/2/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                      NOTICE of Hearing on Motion 36 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiffs' Second Amended Complaint for Injunction, Damages and Declaratory Judgment, 38 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM : (CR) (No Interpreter requested) Motion Hearing set for 3/31/2017 02:15 PM in Charlottesville before District Judge Glen E. Conrad. (ssm)
                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 41 Filed: 2/10/2017, Entered: None Reply to Response to Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                          Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 40 Filed: 2/4/2017, Entered: None Brief / Memorandum in Opposition
                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 40 Filed: 2/3/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                            Brief / Memorandum in Opposition re 38 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM . filed by Tonia Woodson Newton, Donald Lewis Woodson, Jr, Michael Early Woodson. (McLaughlin, Henry)
                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 39 Filed: 1/23/2017, Entered: None Brief / Memorandum in Support
                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 39 Filed: 1/20/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                Memorandum of Law in Support of 38 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM filed by Beneficial Financial I, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Text of Proposed Order)(hnw) (Entered: 01/23/2017)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 38 Filed: 1/20/2017, Entered: None Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim
                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 37 Filed: 1/20/2017, Entered: None Brief / Memorandum in Support
                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 36 Filed: 1/20/2017, Entered: None Dismiss
                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 35 Filed: 1/6/2017, Entered: None Amended Complaint
                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 34 Filed: 1/6/2017, Entered: None Brief / Memorandum in Opposition
                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 33 Filed: 1/6/2017, Entered: None Order on Motion for Leave to File
                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 32 Filed: 1/4/2017, Entered: None Response
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 31 Filed: 1/4/2017, Entered: None Response to Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 30 Filed: 12/21/2016, Entered: None Notice of Appearance
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 29 Filed: 12/19/2016, Entered: None Brief / Memorandum in Support
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 28 Filed: 12/19/2016, Entered: None Leave to File Document
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 27 Filed: 12/2/2016, Entered: None Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 26 Filed: 11/18/2016, Entered: None Order on Motion for Leave to File
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 25 Filed: 11/8/2016, Entered: None Brief / Memorandum in Support
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 24 Filed: 11/8/2016, Entered: None Leave to File Document
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 23 Filed: 11/8/2016, Entered: None Amended Complaint
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 22 Filed: 11/8/2016, Entered: None Amended Complaint
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 22 Filed: 11/7/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    AMENDED COMPLAINT against Beneficial Financial I, Inc., filed by Tonia Woodson Newton, Donald Lewis Woodson, Jr, Michael Early Woodson. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C, # 4 Exhibit D, # 5 Exhibit E, # 6 Exhibit F, # 7 Exhibit G, # 8 Exhibit H, # 9 Exhibit I, # 10 Exhibit J, # 11 Exhibit K, # 12 Exhibit L, # 13 Exhibit M)(McLaughlin, Henry) (Entered: 11/08/2016)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 21 Filed: 11/4/2016, Entered: None Order on Motion to Amend/Correct
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 20 Filed: 10/21/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Consent MOTION to Amend/Correct by Tonia Woodson Newton, Donald Lewis Woodson, Jr, Michael Early Woodson. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A)(McLaughlin, Henry)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 19 Filed: 10/13/2016, Entered: None Order on Motion to Withdraw as Attorney
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 18 Filed: 10/12/2016, Entered: None Brief / Memorandum in Support
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 18 Filed: 10/11/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Brief / Memorandum in Support re 15 MOTION to Dismiss . filed by Tonia Woodson Newton, Donald Lewis Woodson, Jr, Michael Early Woodson. (McLaughlin, Henry)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 17 Filed: 10/11/2016, Entered: None Withdraw as Attorney
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 16 Filed: 9/26/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Magistrate Consent Notice to Parties. (hnw)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 15 Filed: 9/23/2016, Entered: None Dismiss
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 14 Filed: 9/23/2016, Entered: None Brief / Memorandum in Support
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 13 Filed: 9/23/2016, Entered: None Dismiss
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 12 Filed: 9/12/2016, Entered: None Order on Motion for Extension of Time to Answer
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 11 Filed: 9/8/2016, Entered: None Extension of Time to File Answer
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 10 Filed: 8/26/2016, Entered: None Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 9 Filed: 8/26/2016, Entered: None Order on Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 8 Filed: 8/23/2016, Entered: None Appear Pro Hac Vice
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7 Filed: 8/18/2016, Entered: None State Court Records
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 6 Filed: 8/11/2016, Entered: None Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5 Filed: 8/10/2016, Entered: None Extension of Time to File Response/Reply
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4 Filed: 8/10/2016, Entered: None Extension of Time to File Response/Reply
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 3 Filed: 8/9/2016, Entered: None Order Requesting State Court Record
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2 Filed: 8/8/2016, Entered: None Positive Corporate Disclosure Statement
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2 Filed: 8/5/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Positive Corporate Disclosure Statement by Beneficial Financial I, Inc. identifying Corporate Parent HSBC Finance Corporation, Corporate Parent HSBC Holdings PLC for Beneficial Financial I, Inc.. (hnw) (Entered: 08/08/2016)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1 Filed: 8/8/2016, Entered: None Notice of Removal
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1 Filed: 8/5/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Louisa County Circuit Court, case number CL-16000173-00. (Filing & Administrative fee $ 400 paid by e-receipt number 0423-2506784 ), filed by Beneficial Financial I, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1a Summons and Complaint with Exhibits, # 2 Exhibit 1b Additional Exhibits to Complaint, # 3 Exhibit 1c, further Exhibits to Complaint # 4 Exhibit 2, # 5 Exhibit 3 Notice of Filing Notice of Removal, # 6 Exhibit 4 Consent to Removal, # 7 Civil Cover Sheet)(hnw) Modified on 9/26/2016 (hnw). (Entered: 08/08/2016)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF

                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Statistics

                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      This case has been viewed 50 times.

                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Space
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                       
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      PlainSite
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Sign Up
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Need Password Help?