J&J Sports Productions, Inc. v. Barajas
Federal Civil Lawsuit Texas Southern District Court, Case No. 7:16-cv-00464

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Last Updated February 10, 2019 at 2:55 AM ST (2.3 years ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

Citation Section 28 U.S.C. § 1331
Nature of Suit Cable/Satellite TV
  Entries (30) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 37 Filed: 5/11/2018, Entered: None Bill of Costs
    Request RequestSpace LREF
    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 36 Filed: 5/1/2018, Entered: None Judgment - Final
      Request RequestSpace LREF
      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 35 Filed: 4/27/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
      OPINION re 31 MOTION for Summary Judgment (Signed by Judge Micaela Alvarez) Parties notified.(BelindaSaenz, 7)
        Request RequestSpace LREF
        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 34 Filed: 4/24/2018, Entered: None Proposed Pretrial Order
          Request RequestSpace LREF
          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 33 Filed: 3/19/2018, Entered: None Reply to Response to Motion
            Request RequestSpace LREF
            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 32 Filed: 3/9/2018, Entered: None Response in Opposition to Motion
              Request RequestSpace LREF
              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 31 Filed: 2/23/2018, Entered: None SUMMARY JUDGMENT
                Request RequestSpace LREF
                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 27 Filed: 7/24/2017, Entered: None Notice of Setting (FORM, noticing) - Civil
                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 26 Filed: 7/13/2017, Entered: None Notice of Appearance
                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 25 Filed: 6/21/2017, Entered: None Certificate of Interested Parties
                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 24 Filed: 6/21/2017, Entered: None Answer
                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 23 Filed: 6/5/2017, Entered: None Order
                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 22 Filed: 4/25/2017, Entered: None Relief from Judgment
                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 21 Filed: 4/20/2017, Entered: None Notice of Appearance
                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 20 Filed: 4/13/2017, Entered: None Order on Motion to Compel
                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 19 Filed: 3/14/2017, Entered: None Compel
                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 17 Filed: 1/31/2017, Entered: None Return of Service Executed
                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 16 Filed: 12/23/2016, Entered: None Abstract of Judgment Issued
                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 15 Filed: 11/21/2016, Entered: None Judgment - Default
                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 14 Filed: 11/21/2016, Entered: None Continuance
                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 13 Filed: 11/21/2016, Entered: None extension of time
                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 12 Filed: 11/16/2016, Entered: None Clerks Entry of Default
                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 11 Filed: 11/16/2016, Entered: None Order
                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 10 Filed: 11/11/2016, Entered: None Default Judgment
                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 9 Filed: 11/11/2016, Entered: None Request for Entry of Default
                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5 Filed: 9/23/2016, Entered: None Return of Service Executed
                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4 Filed: 8/22/2016, Entered: None Summons - Request for Issuance
                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 3 Filed: 8/9/2016, Entered: None Order for Initial Conference - FORM
                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2 Filed: 8/8/2016, Entered: None Certificate of Interested Parties
                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1 Filed: 8/8/2016, Entered: None Complaint
                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF

                                                              Statistics

                                                              This case has been viewed 4 times.

                                                              No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                                              Space
                                                              Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                              Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                               
                                                              PlainSite
                                                              Sign Up
                                                              Need Password Help?