Mori Rubin v. Hospital of Barstow Inc
Federal Civil Lawsuit California Central District Court, Case No. 5:16-cv-01600

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Last Updated November 23, 2020 at 3:39 PM ST (6.9 months ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

Citation Section 29 U.S.C. § 160(1)
Nature of Suit Labor: Labor/Mgt. Relations
  Entries (16) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 32 Filed: 11/23/2020, Entered: None Notice (Other)
    Request RequestSpace LREF
    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 31 Filed: 5/3/2018, Entered: None Minutes of In Chambers Order/Directive - no proceeding held
      Request RequestSpace LREF
      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 30 Filed: 12/8/2016, Entered: None Initial Order upon Filing of Complaint - form only
        Request RequestSpace LREF
        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 27 Filed: 8/31/2016, Entered: None Order
          Request RequestSpace LREF
          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 26 Filed: 8/31/2016, Entered: None Motion Hearing
            Request RequestSpace LREF
            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 26 Filed: 8/29/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
            MINUTES OF Motion Hearing Re Petition for Temporary Injunction Under Section 10(j) of the National Labor Relations Act held before Judge Christina A. Snyder: The Court GRANTS the Regional Director's petition for interim injunctive relief under Section 10(j) 1 . See document for details. Court Reporter: Laura Elias. (gk)
              Request RequestSpace LREF
              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 25 Filed: 8/25/2016, Entered: None Appear Pro Hac Vice
                Request RequestSpace LREF
                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 24 Filed: 8/25/2016, Entered: None Appear Pro Hac Vice
                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 23 Filed: 8/23/2016, Entered: None Appear Pro Hac Vice (G-64)
                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 22 Filed: 8/23/2016, Entered: None Appear Pro Hac Vice (G-64)
                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 20 Filed: 8/15/2016, Entered: None Reply
                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 19 Filed: 8/12/2016, Entered: None Leave to File Excess Pages
                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 18 Filed: 8/11/2016, Entered: None Leave to File Document
                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 17 Filed: 8/10/2016, Entered: None Objection/Opposition (Motion related)
                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 14 Filed: 8/8/2016, Entered: None Leave to File Document
                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 13 Filed: 8/8/2016, Entered: None Response in Opposition to Motion
                                  Request RequestSpace LREF

                                  Statistics

                                  This case has been viewed 5 times.

                                  No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                  Space
                                  Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                  Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                   
                                  PlainSite
                                  Sign Up
                                  Need Password Help?