National Labor Relations Board v. Judella, Inc.
Federal Civil Lawsuit Illinois Northern District Court, Case No. 1:16-cv-08026

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Last Updated February 7, 2019 at 5:55 AM ST (2.2 years ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo National Labor Relations Board, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by National Labor Relations Board

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, PRO HAC VICE, LEAD ATTORNEY Polly Misra +1 202 273 3740 +1 202 273 4244 polly.misra@nlrb.gov
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Vivian Robles +1 312 353 7603 vivian.robles@nlrb.gov
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY Igor Volynets +1 202 273 1947 igor.volynets@nlrb.gov
v.
No Logo Judella , Inc., Defendant
Citation Section 29 U.S.C. § 160(1)
Nature of Suit 790 - Labor: Other
  Entries (26) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 23 Filed: 2/14/2017, Entered: 2/14/2017 Unknown Document Type
ORDER. Signed by the Honorable Jorge L. Alonso on 2/14/2017. Notice mailed by judge's staff (ntf, )
    Request RequestSpace LREF
    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 22 Filed: 2/14/2017, Entered: 2/14/2017 Unknown Document Type
    MINUTE entry before the Honorable Jorge L. Alonso: NLRB's uncontested motion to withdraw applications 21 is granted. Enter Order. Status hearing previously set for 2/15/17 is stricken. Notice mailed by judge's staff (ntf, )
      Request RequestSpace LREF
      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 21 Filed: 2/13/2017, Entered: 2/13/2017 Unknown Document Type
      MOTION by Plaintiff National Labor Relations Board to withdraw (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Volynets, Igor)
        Request RequestSpace LREF
        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 20 Filed: 12/13/2016, Entered: 12/13/2016 Unknown Document Type
        MINUTE entry before the Honorable Jorge L. Alonso: Plaintiff's unopposed motion to postpone 12/15/16 status hearing 19 is granted. Status hearing previously set for 12/15/16 is stricken and reset to 2/15/17 at 9:30 a.m. Notice mailed by judge's staff (ntf, )
          Request RequestSpace LREF
          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 19 Filed: 12/12/2016, Entered: 12/12/2016 Unknown Document Type
          MOTION by Plaintiff National Labor Relations Board for extension of time (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Volynets, Igor)
            Request RequestSpace LREF
            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 18 Filed: 11/18/2016, Entered: 11/18/2016 Unknown Document Type
            MINUTE entry before the Honorable Jorge L. Alonso: Plaintiff's motion for leave to appear pro hac vice (government attorney) 16 is granted. Attorney Igor Volynets is given leave to appear as counsel for Plaintiff. Notice mailed by judge's staff (ntf, )
              Request RequestSpace LREF
              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 17 Filed: 11/16/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
              ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff National Labor Relations Board by Igor Volynets (Volynets, Igor) (Entered: 11/16/2016)
                Request RequestSpace LREF
                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 16 Filed: 11/16/2016, Entered: 11/16/2016 Unknown Document Type
                MOTION by Plaintiff National Labor Relations BoardPro Hac Vice Application (government attorney) (Volynets, Igor)
                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 15 Filed: 11/16/2016, Entered: 11/16/2016 Unknown Document Type
                  MINUTE entry before the Honorable Jorge L. Alonso: Plaintiff's unopposed motion to postpone 11/17/16 status hearing 14 is granted. Status hearing previously set for 11/17/16 is stricken and reset to 12/15/16 at 9:30 a.m. Notice mailed by judge's staff (ntf, )
                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 14 Filed: 11/15/2016, Entered: 11/15/2016 Unknown Document Type
                    MOTION by Plaintiff National Labor Relations Board for extension of time November 17 status hearing (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Misra, Polly)
                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 13 Filed: 10/27/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                      MINUTE entry before the Honorable Jorge L. Alonso: This case has been reassigned to the calendar of Judge Jorge L. Alonso. Initial status hearing set for 11/17/16 at 9:30 a.m. Notice mailed by judge's staff (ntf, ) (Entered: 10/27/2016)
                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 12 Filed: 10/27/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                        EXECUTIVE COMMITTEE ORDER: Case reassigned to the Honorable Jorge L. Alonso for all further proceedings. Signed by Executive Committee on 10/27/2016. (mmy, ) (Entered: 10/27/2016)
                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 11 Filed: 10/26/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                          ORDER REASSIGNING Case to the Honorable Mary M. Rowland, pursuant to Local Rule 73.1 for all further proceedings, parties having consented to the reassignment. Signed by Honorable Ruben Castillo on 10/26/2016. (mmy, ) (Entered: 10/26/2016)
                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 10 Filed: 10/26/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                            MINUTE entry before the Honorable Ruben Castillo:The status hearing set for 11/1/2016 is stricken.Mailed notice (rao, ) (Entered: 10/26/2016)
                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 9 Filed: 10/26/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                              JOINT CONSENT to Exercise of Jurisdiction by a United States Magistrate Judge (Misra, Polly) (Entered: 10/26/2016)
                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 8 Filed: 10/25/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                STATUS Report Joint Initial Status Report by National Labor Relations Board (Misra, Polly) (Entered: 10/25/2016)
                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7 Filed: 9/20/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                  MINUTE entry before the Honorable Ruben Castillo: The parties are directed to file a joint status report by 10/25/2016. The Court will hold a status hearing in open court on 11/1/2016 at 9:45 a.m.Mailed notice (rao, ) (Entered: 09/20/2016)
                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 6 Filed: 8/22/2016, Entered: None Order
                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 6 Filed: 8/19/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                      ORDER: Polly Misra's motion for leave to appear pro hac vice 5 on behalf of Plaintiff is granted. Signed by the Honorable Ruben Castillo on 8/19/2016. Mailed notice. (pk,) (Entered: 08/22/2016)
                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5 Filed: 8/11/2016, Entered: 8/11/2016 Unknown Document Type
                                        MOTION by Plaintiff National Labor Relations BoardPro Hac Vice for Government Attorney Polly Misra (Misra, Polly)
                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4 Filed: 8/11/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                          ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff National Labor Relations Board by Vivian Robles (Robles, Vivian) (Entered: 08/11/2016)
                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 3 Filed: 8/11/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                            ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff National Labor Relations Board by Polly Misra (Misra, Polly) (Entered: 08/11/2016)
                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2 Filed: 8/11/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                              CIVIL Cover Sheet (Misra, Polly) (Entered: 08/11/2016)
                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1 Filed: 8/11/2016, Entered: 8/11/2016 Unknown Document Type
                                                COMPLAINT Application for a Summary Order Requiring Obedience with Subpoena filed by National Labor Relations Board; (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit, # 2 Exhibit, # 3 Exhibit, # 4 Exhibit, # 5 Exhibit, # 6 Exhibit, # 7 Exhibit, # 8 Exhibit)(Misra, Polly)
                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 2/14/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                  ***Civil Case Terminated. (ntf, )
                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 8/11/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                  CASE ASSIGNED to the Honorable Ruben Castillo. Designated as Magistrate Judge the Honorable Mary M. Rowland. (ew, )
                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF

                                                    Statistics

                                                    This case has been viewed 12 times.

                                                    No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                                    Space
                                                    Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                    Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                     
                                                    PlainSite
                                                    Sign Up
                                                    Need Password Help?