PurAyr, LLC v. Phocatox Technologies, LLC
Federal Civil Lawsuit Virginia Western District Court, Case No. 5:16-cv-00047

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Last Updated January 14, 2019 at 12:14 PM ST (2.4 years ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

Citation Section 28 U.S.C. § 1332
Nature of Suit Assault Libel & Slander
  Entries (25) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 32 Filed: 1/13/2017, Entered: None Acknowledgment Letter
    Request RequestSpace LREF
    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 31 Filed: 1/10/2017, Entered: None State Court Records Returned
      Request RequestSpace LREF
      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 30 Filed: 12/8/2016, Entered: None Order on Motion for Leave to File
        Request RequestSpace LREF
        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 29 Filed: 12/8/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
        MEMORANDUM OPINION. Signed by District Judge Elizabeth K. Dillon on 12/8/2016. (jat)
          Request RequestSpace LREF
          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 26 Filed: 10/13/2016, Entered: None Motion Hearing
            Request RequestSpace LREF
            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 24 Filed: 9/23/2016, Entered: None Brief / Memorandum in Support
              Request RequestSpace LREF
              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 23 Filed: 9/15/2016, Entered: None Brief / Memorandum in Opposition
                Request RequestSpace LREF
                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 22 Filed: 9/15/2016, Entered: None Order on Motion to Stay
                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 21 Filed: 9/9/2016, Entered: None Brief / Memorandum in Support
                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 20 Filed: 9/9/2016, Entered: None Stay
                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 19 Filed: 9/2/2016, Entered: None Leave to File Document
                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 18 Filed: 9/2/2016, Entered: None Counterclaim
                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 17 Filed: 9/1/2016, Entered: None Order
                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 14 Filed: 8/29/2016, Entered: None Brief / Memorandum in Support
                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 13 Filed: 8/29/2016, Entered: None Remand to State Court
                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 11 Filed: 8/23/2016, Entered: None Negative Corporate Disclosure Statement
                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 9 Filed: 8/23/2016, Entered: None Order on Motion for Leave to File
                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 8 Filed: 8/19/2016, Entered: None Leave to File Document
                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7 Filed: 8/17/2016, Entered: None Scheduling Letter
                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 6 Filed: 8/17/2016, Entered: None Magistrate Consent Notice to Parties
                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5 Filed: 8/17/2016, Entered: None Negative Corporate Disclosure Statement
                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4 Filed: 8/16/2016, Entered: None State Court Records
                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 3 Filed: 8/12/2016, Entered: None Order Requesting State Court Record
                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2 Filed: 8/11/2016, Entered: None Negative Corporate Disclosure Statement
                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1 Filed: 8/11/2016, Entered: None Notice of Removal
                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF

                                                    Statistics

                                                    This case has been viewed 7 times.

                                                    No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                                    Space
                                                    Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                    Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                     
                                                    PlainSite
                                                    Sign Up
                                                    Need Password Help?