Cybernet Entertainment Llc v. Atlantic Innovations, Llc

Administrative Proceeding USPTO Trademark Trial and Appeal Board, Case No. 91229486-OPP
Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Last Updated August 23, 2017 at 8:07 AM EDT (7.7 years ago) Update UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert AlertsSpaceJump Jump
Summary

No one has written a summary of this case yet. Sign up or sign in to contribute one.

Parties
No Logo Cybernet Entertainment LLC, Plaintiff

Represented by Austin Law Group

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space TTAB Attorney Placeholder swanson@austinlawgroup.com
v.
No Logo Atlantic Innovations, LLC, Defendant

Represented by Lambert & Associates

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Brendan M Shortell shortell@lambertpatentlaw.com
Attributes
Type Opposition
Interlocutory Attorney ELIZABETH WINTER
Date in Location 8/11/2016
Status Code 2
Location Code 845
Timeline
  Entries (8) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (4) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 8 Filed: 7/17/2017, Entered: None N
P Notice Of Reliance
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7 Filed: 7/17/2017, Entered: None N
P Testimony
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 6 Filed: 7/12/2017, Entered: None N
P Testimony
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5 Filed: 7/12/2017, Entered: None N
P Testimony
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4 Filed: 9/20/2016, Entered: None N
Answer
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 3 Filed: 8/11/2016, Entered: None
Pending, Instituted
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2 Filed: 8/11/2016, Entered: None
Notice And Trial Dates Sent; Answer Due:
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1 Filed: 8/11/2016, Entered: None
Filed And Fee
Request RequestSpace LREF

Statistics

This case has been viewed 3 times.

Space
Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
 
PlainSite
Sign Up
Need Password Help?