BEYOND NUCLEAR et al v. U.S. DEPARTMENT OF ENERGY, FORRESTAL BUILDING, ROOM GM-174 GROUND FLOOR, SOUTH BUILDING, 1000 INDEPENDENCE AVENUE, S.W., WASHINGTON, D.C. 20585 et al
Federal Civil Lawsuit District Of Columbia District Court, Case No. 1:16-cv-01641

Tags
Last Updated February 2, 2017 at 3:30 PM ST (4.3 years ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo BEYOND NUCLEAR, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Harmon, Curran, Spielberg & Eisenberg, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Diane J. Curran +1 202 328 3500 dcurran@harmoncurran.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Sorkin Law Group APLC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Terry J. Lodge +1 419 255 7552 +1 419 255 8582 tjlodge50@yahoo.com
No Logo CITIZENS FOR ALTERNATIVES TO CHEMICAL CONTAMINATION, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Sorkin Law Group APLC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Terry J. Lodge +1 419 255 7552 +1 419 255 8582 tjlodge50@yahoo.com
No Logo ENVIRONMENTALISTS, INC., Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Sorkin Law Group APLC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Terry J. Lodge +1 419 255 7552 +1 419 255 8582 tjlodge50@yahoo.com
No Logo LONE TREE COUNCIL, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Sorkin Law Group APLC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Terry J. Lodge +1 419 255 7552 +1 419 255 8582 tjlodge50@yahoo.com
No Logo NUCLEAR INFORMATION AND RESOURCE SERVICE, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Sorkin Law Group APLC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Terry J. Lodge +1 419 255 7552 +1 419 255 8582 tjlodge50@yahoo.com
No Logo SAVANNAH RIVER SITE WATCH, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Sorkin Law Group APLC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Terry J. Lodge +1 419 255 7552 +1 419 255 8582 tjlodge50@yahoo.com
No Logo Sierra Club, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Harmon, Curran, Spielberg & Eisenberg, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Diane J. Curran +1 202 328 3500 dcurran@harmoncurran.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Sorkin Law Group APLC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
PRO HAC VICE, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Terry J. Lodge +1 419 255 7552 +1 419 255 8582 tjlodge50@yahoo.com
No Logo Sierra Club, Inc., Plaintiff
v.
No Logo DAVID HUIZENGA, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by United States Department of Justice

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Assistant Deputy Administrator, National Nuclear Security Administration Judith E. Coleman +1 202 637 5600 judith.coleman@usdoj.gov
Assistant Deputy Administrator, National Nuclear Security Administration Stephen Macfarlane +1 916 930 2204 +1 916 930 2210 Stephen.Macfarlane@usdoj.gov
No Logo ERNEST MONIZ, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by United States Department of Justice

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Secretary, U.S. Department of Energy Judith E. Coleman +1 202 637 5600 judith.coleman@usdoj.gov
Secretary, U.S. Department of Energy Stephen Macfarlane +1 916 930 2204 +1 916 930 2210 Stephen.Macfarlane@usdoj.gov
No Logo JACK R CRAIG, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by United States Department of Justice

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Manager, U.S. Department of Energy, Savannah River Site Operation Office Judith E. Coleman +1 202 637 5600 judith.coleman@usdoj.gov
Manager, U.S. Department of Energy, Savannah River Site Operation Office Stephen Macfarlane +1 916 930 2204 +1 916 930 2210 Stephen.Macfarlane@usdoj.gov
No Logo MONICA C REGALBUTO, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by United States Department of Justice

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Assistant Secretary for Environmental Management Judith E. Coleman +1 202 637 5600 judith.coleman@usdoj.gov
Assistant Secretary for Environmental Management Stephen Macfarlane +1 916 930 2204 +1 916 930 2210 Stephen.Macfarlane@usdoj.gov
No Logo U.S. DEPARTMENT OF ENERGY, FORRESTAL BUILDING, ROOM GM-174 GROUND FLOOR, SOUTH BUILDING, 1000 INDEPENDENCE AVENUE, S.W., WASHINGTON, D.C. 20585, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by United States Department of Justice

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Judith E. Coleman +1 202 637 5600 judith.coleman@usdoj.gov
Space Stephen Macfarlane +1 916 930 2204 +1 916 930 2210 Stephen.Macfarlane@usdoj.gov
  Entries (36) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 34 Filed: 2/2/2017, Entered: None Order on Motion for Summary Judgment
    Request RequestSpace LREF
    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 33 Filed: 2/2/2017, Entered: None Memorandum & Opinion
      Request RequestSpace LREF
      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 32 Filed: 1/17/2017, Entered: None Notice (Other)
        Request RequestSpace LREF
        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 31 Filed: 1/13/2017, Entered: None Reply to opposition to Motion
          Request RequestSpace LREF
          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 30 Filed: 1/10/2017, Entered: None Reply to opposition to Motion
            Request RequestSpace LREF
            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 29 Filed: 1/10/2017, Entered: None Memorandum in Opposition to Motion
              Request RequestSpace LREF
              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 28 Filed: 1/4/2017, Entered: None Joint Appendix
                Request RequestSpace LREF
                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 26 Filed: 12/21/2016, Entered: None Motion for Order
                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 25 Filed: 12/20/2016, Entered: None Reply to opposition to Motion
                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 24 Filed: 12/15/2016, Entered: None Scheduling Order
                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 23 Filed: 12/6/2016, Entered: None Reply to opposition to Motion
                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 22 Filed: 12/6/2016, Entered: None Memorandum in Opposition to Motion
                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 21 Filed: 12/6/2016, Entered: None Strike
                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 20 Filed: 12/6/2016, Entered: None Notice (Other)
                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 19 Filed: 11/29/2016, Entered: None Notice (Other)
                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 18 Filed: 11/23/2016, Entered: None Memorandum in Opposition to Motion
                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 18 Filed: 11/22/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                  Memorandum in opposition to re 15 MOTION for Summary Judgment and Memorandum in Support filed by BEYOND NUCLEAR, CITIZENS FOR ALTERNATIVES TO CHEMICAL CONTAMINATION, ENVIRONMENTALISTS, INC., LONE TREE COUNCIL, NUCLEAR INFORMATION AND RESOURCE SERVICE, SAVANNAH RIVER SITE WATCH, SIERRA CLUB. (Lodge, Terry) (Entered: 11/22/2016)
                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 17 Filed: 11/23/2016, Entered: None SUMMARY JUDGMENT
                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 17 Filed: 11/22/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                      Cross MOTION for Summary Judgment by BEYOND NUCLEAR, CITIZENS FOR ALTERNATIVES TO CHEMICAL CONTAMINATION, ENVIRONMENTALISTS, INC., LONE TREE COUNCIL, NUCLEAR INFORMATION AND RESOURCE SERVICE, SAVANNAH RIVER SITE WATCH, SIERRA CLUB (Lodge, Terry) (Entered: 11/22/2016)
                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 16 Filed: 11/23/2016, Entered: None Memorandum in Opposition to Motion
                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 16 Filed: 11/22/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                          MEMORANDUM in support of re 17 , 18 MOTION for Summary Judgment and Memorandum in Support of Cross-Motion for Summary Judgment filed by BEYOND NUCLEAR, CITIZENS FOR ALTERNATIVES TO CHEMICAL CONTAMINATION, ENVIRONMENTALISTS, INC., LONE TREE COUNCIL, NUCLEAR INFORMATION AND RESOURCE SERVICE, SAVANNAH RIVER SITE WATCH, SIERRA CLUB. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration Declaratiion of Gordon Edwards, # 2 Declaration Declaration of Marvin Resnikoff)(Lodge, Terry) Modified text and linkages on 11/23/2016 (td). (Entered: 11/22/2016)
                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 15 Filed: 11/4/2016, Entered: None SUMMARY JUDGMENT
                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 14 Filed: 10/18/2016, Entered: None Administrative Record
                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 13 Filed: 10/6/2016, Entered: None Amend/Correct
                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 12 Filed: 9/28/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                  NOTICE of Appearance by Diane J. Curran on behalf of BEYOND NUCLEAR, ENVIRONMENTALISTS, INC., LONE TREE COUNCIL, NUCLEAR INFORMATION AND RESOURCE SERVICE, SAVANNAH RIVER SITE WATCH, SIERRA CLUB (Curran, Diane) (Entered: 09/28/2016)
                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 11 Filed: 9/28/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                    NOTICE of Appearance by Diane J. Curran on behalf of BEYOND NUCLEAR (Curran, Diane) (Entered: 09/28/2016)
                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 10 Filed: 9/21/2016, Entered: None Notice of Withdrawal of Appearance
                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 9 Filed: 9/20/2016, Entered: None Scheduling Order
                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 8 Filed: 9/6/2016, Entered: None Notice of Appearance
                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7 Filed: 9/6/2016, Entered: None Notice of Appearance
                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 6 Filed: 8/31/2016, Entered: None Notice of Appearance
                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5 Filed: 8/22/2016, Entered: None Electronic Summons Issued as to AUSA,USAG
                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4 Filed: 8/17/2016, Entered: None Amended Complaint
                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 3 Filed: 8/12/2016, Entered: None Appear Pro Hac Vice
                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2 Filed: 8/12/2016, Entered: None Appear Pro Hac Vice
                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1 Filed: 8/12/2016, Entered: None Complaint
                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF

                                                                          Statistics

                                                                          This case has been viewed 68 times.

                                                                          No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                                                          Space
                                                                          Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                          Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                           
                                                                          PlainSite
                                                                          Sign Up
                                                                          Need Password Help?