Ginney Abeyta v. Bank of America, N.A., et al
Appeal Court of Appeals for the Ninth Circuit, Case No. 16-15707

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Last Updated January 26, 2017 at 9:55 AM ST (4.3 years ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

Nature of Suit 3480 - Consumer Credit
  Entries (4) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 18 Filed: 7/13/2016, Entered: None
Filed (ECF) notice of appearance of Joshua B. Swigart for Appellant Ginney Abeyta. Date of service: 07/13/2016. [10049635] [16-15707] (Swigart, Joshua) [Entered: 07/13/2016 06:32 PM]
    Request RequestSpace LREF
    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 16 Filed: 6/13/2016, Entered: None
    Filed (ECF) notice of appearance of Ramir M. Hernandez for Appellee Silver State Schools Credit Union. Date of service: 06/13/2016. [10011975] [16-15707] (Brooks, Michael) [Entered: 06/13/2016 11:16 AM]
      Request RequestSpace LREF
      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 15 Filed: 6/2/2016, Entered: None
      Filed Mediation order: This case is not selected for inclusion in the Mediation Program. Counsel are requested to contact the Circuit Mediator should circumstances develop that warrant further settlement discussions. [9999340] (VS) [Entered: 06/02/2016 08:18 AM]
        Request RequestSpace LREF
        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 13 Filed: 5/13/2016, Entered: None
        Filed (ECF) notice of appearance of Ashley B. Burkett for Appellee Bank of America, N.A.. Date of service: 05/13/2016. [9975471] [16-15707] (Burkett, Ashley) [Entered: 05/13/2016 09:11 AM]
          Request RequestSpace LREF

          Statistics

          This case has been viewed 77 times.

          No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
          Space
          Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
          Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
           
          PlainSite
          Sign Up
          Need Password Help?