Steven Demarais v. Gurstel Chargo, P.A.
Appeal Court of Appeals for the Eighth Circuit, Case No. 16-3173

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Last Updated January 11, 2019 at 10:09 AM ST (2.3 years ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

Nature of Suit 3480 - Consumer Credit
  Entries (68) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 00803289880 Filed: 8/29/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
JUDGMENT FILED - The judgment of the originating court is REVERSED and REMANDED in accordance with the opinion.. DUANE BENTON, C. ARLEN BEAM and DIANA E. MURPHY Hrg Mar 2017 [4573346] [16-3173] (JMM) [Entered: 08/29/2017 08:14 AM]
    Request RequestSpace LREF
    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 803289880 Filed: 8/29/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
    JUDGMENT FILED - The judgment of the originating court is REVERSED and REMANDED in accordance with the opinion.. DUANE BENTON, C. ARLEN BEAM and DIANA E. MURPHY Hrg Mar 2017 [4573346] [16-3173] (JMM) [Entered: 08/29/2017 08:14 AM]
      Request RequestSpace LREF
      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 00803289864 Filed: 8/29/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
      OPINION FILED - THE COURT: Duane Benton, C. Arlen Beam and Diana E. Murphy AUTHORING JUDGE:Duane Benton (PUBLISHED) [4573336] [16-3173] (JMM) [Entered: 08/29/2017 08:03 AM]
        Request RequestSpace LREF
        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 803289864 Filed: 8/29/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
        OPINION FILED - THE COURT: Duane Benton, C. Arlen Beam and Diana E. Murphy AUTHORING JUDGE:Duane Benton (PUBLISHED) [4573336] [16-3173] (JMM) [Entered: 08/29/2017 08:03 AM]
          Request RequestSpace LREF
          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 00803210950 Filed: 5/18/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
          28(j) citation filed by Appellees Gurstel Chargo, P.A. and RAzOR Capital, LLC w/service 05/18/2017 - FOR CAL [4537749] [16-3173] (MHN) [Entered: 05/18/2017 01:26 PM]
            Request RequestSpace LREF
            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 803210950 Filed: 5/18/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
            28(j) citation filed by Appellees Gurstel Chargo, P.A. and RAzOR Capital, LLC w/service 05/18/2017 - FOR CAL [4537749] [16-3173] (MHN) [Entered: 05/18/2017 01:26 PM]
              Request RequestSpace LREF
              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 00803138567 Filed: 2/14/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
              ARGUMENT RESPONSE/APPEARANCE FORM filed by Mr. Darren Brayer Schwiebert for Mr. Steven Demarais for argument in March, at the U.S. Courthouse in St. Paul, Minnesota. [4501207] [16-3173] (DBS) [Entered: 02/14/2017 09:09 AM]
                Request RequestSpace LREF
                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 803138567 Filed: 2/14/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                ARGUMENT RESPONSE/APPEARANCE FORM filed by Mr. Darren Brayer Schwiebert for Mr. Steven Demarais for argument in March, at the U.S. Courthouse in St. Paul, Minnesota. [4501207] [16-3173] (DBS) [Entered: 02/14/2017 09:09 AM]
                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 00803138474 Filed: 2/14/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                  ARGUMENT RESPONSE/APPEARANCE FORM filed by Mr. Manuel H. Newburger for Gurstel Chargo, P.A. and RAzOR Capital, LLC for argument in March, at the U.S. Courthouse in St. Paul, Minnesota. [4501158] [16-3173] (MHN) [Entered: 02/14/2017 07:49 AM]
                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 803138474 Filed: 2/14/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                    ARGUMENT RESPONSE/APPEARANCE FORM filed by Mr. Manuel H. Newburger for Gurstel Chargo, P.A. and RAzOR Capital, LLC for argument in March, at the U.S. Courthouse in St. Paul, Minnesota. [4501158] [16-3173] (MHN) [Entered: 02/14/2017 07:49 AM]
                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 00803075527 Filed: 11/16/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                      LETTER from Appellees Gurstel Chargo, P.A. and RAzOR Capital, LLC regarding availability for oral argument. w/service 11/16/2016 [4470228] [16-3173] (MHN) [Entered: 11/16/2016 05:26 PM]
                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 803075527 Filed: 11/16/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                        LETTER from Appellees Gurstel Chargo, P.A. and RAzOR Capital, LLC regarding availability for oral argument. w/service 11/16/2016 [4470228] [16-3173] (MHN) [Entered: 11/16/2016 05:26 PM]
                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 00803074850 Filed: 11/16/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                          BRIEF FILED - AMICUS BRIEF filed by DBA International, Inc. w/service 11/16/2016 , Length: 18 pages 10 COPIES OF PAPER BRIEFS FROM DBA International, Inc. due 11/21/2016 WITH certificate of service for paper briefs [4469882] [16-3173]--[Edited adding DBA to name 11/16/2016 by JMM] (JMM) [Entered: 11/16/2016 11:05 AM]
                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 803074850 Filed: 11/16/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                            BRIEF FILED - AMICUS BRIEF filed by DBA International, Inc. w/service 11/16/2016, Length: 18 pages 10 COPIES OF PAPER BRIEFS FROM DBA International, Inc. due 11/21/2016 WITH certificate of service for paper briefs [4469882] [16-3173]--[Edited adding DBA to name 11/16/2016 by JMM] (JMM) [Entered: 11/16/2016 11:05 AM]
                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 00803074844 Filed: 11/16/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                              CLERK ORDER: [4462766-2] Granting motion leave to file amicus brief DBA International, Inc. in 16-3173 has been changed to an amicus in this case. [4469876] [16-3173][4469876] [16-3173]--[Edited 11/16/2016 by JMM] (JMM) [Entered: 11/16/2016 11:01 AM]
                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 803074844 Filed: 11/16/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                CLERK ORDER: [4462766-2] Granting motion leave to file amicus brief DBA International, Inc. in 16-3173 has been changed to an amicus in this case. [4469876] [16-3173][4469876] [16-3173]--[Edited 11/16/2016 by JMM] (JMM) [Entered: 11/16/2016 11:01 AM]
                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 00803065981 Filed: 11/2/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                  BRIEF FILED - APPELLANT REPLY BRIEF filed by Mr. Steven Demarais. w/service 11/02/2016 , Length: 6,914 words 10 COPIES OF PAPER BRIEFS FROM Steven Demarais due 11/07/2016 WITH certificate of service for paper briefs [4465585] [16-3173] (JMM) [Entered: 11/02/2016 11:34 AM]
                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 803065981 Filed: 11/2/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                    BRIEF FILED - APPELLANT REPLY BRIEF filed by Mr. Steven Demarais. w/service 11/02/2016, Length: 6,914 words 10 COPIES OF PAPER BRIEFS FROM Steven Demarais due 11/07/2016 WITH certificate of service for paper briefs [4465585] [16-3173] (JMM) [Entered: 11/02/2016 11:34 AM]
                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 00803065635 Filed: 11/1/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                      REPLY brief of Mr. Steven Demarais submitted for review. The time for filing the subsequent brief (if any) does not begin to run until the brief has been approved and filed. [4465307] [16-3173] (DBS) [Entered: 11/01/2016 09:55 PM]
                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 803065635 Filed: 11/1/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                        REPLY brief of Mr. Steven Demarais submitted for review. The time for filing the subsequent brief (if any) does not begin to run until the brief has been approved and filed. [4465307] [16-3173] (DBS) [Entered: 11/01/2016 09:55 PM]
                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 00803060820 Filed: 10/26/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                          CLERK ORDER:Parties are notified that absent the filing of a formal objection within 8 days, the motion of International, Inc. for leave to participate as amicus curiae in support of Appellees will be deemed as granted. [4462865] [16-3173] (JMM) [Entered: 10/26/2016 09:25 AM]
                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 803060820 Filed: 10/26/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                            CLERK ORDER:Parties are notified that absent the filing of a formal objection within 8 days, the motion of International, Inc. for leave to participate as amicus curiae in support of Appellees will be deemed as granted. [4462865] [16-3173] (JMM) [Entered: 10/26/2016 09:25 AM]
                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 00803060605 Filed: 10/25/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                              MOTION interested party, DBA International, Inc. , for leave to file amicus curiae brief on behalf of Defendants-Appellees GURSTEL CHARGO, P.A. and RAZOR CAPITAL, LLC. w/service 10/25/2016. [4462766] [16-3173] (DSM) [Entered: 10/25/2016 07:41 PM]
                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 803060605 Filed: 10/25/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                MOTION interested party, DBA International, Inc., for leave to file amicus curiae brief on behalf of Defendants-Appellees GURSTEL CHARGO, P.A. and RAZOR CAPITAL, LLC. w/service 10/25/2016. [4462766] [16-3173] (DSM) [Entered: 10/25/2016 07:41 PM]
                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 00803055474 Filed: 10/18/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                  BRIEF FILED - APPELLEE BRIEF filed by Gurstel Chargo, P.A. and RAzOR Capital, LLC, w/service 10/18/2016 , Length: 9,533 words 10 COPIES OF PAPER BRIEFS FROM Gurstel Chargo, P.A. and RAzOR Capital, LLC due 10/24/2016 WITH certificate of service for paper briefs . Reply brief of Steven Demarais due on 11/01/2016. [4460222] [16-3173] (JMM) [Entered: 10/18/2016 02:13 PM]
                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 803055474 Filed: 10/18/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                    BRIEF FILED - APPELLEE BRIEF filed by Gurstel Chargo, P.A. and RAzOR Capital, LLC, w/service 10/18/2016, Length: 9,533 words 10 COPIES OF PAPER BRIEFS FROM Gurstel Chargo, P.A. and RAzOR Capital, LLC due 10/24/2016 WITH certificate of service for paper briefs . Reply brief of Steven Demarais due on 11/01/2016. [4460222] [16-3173] (JMM) [Entered: 10/18/2016 02:13 PM]
                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 00803055398 Filed: 10/18/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                      APPELLEE brief of Gurstel Chargo, P.A. and RAzOR Capital, LLC submitted for review. The time for filing the subsequent brief (if any) does not begin to run until the brief has been approved and filed. [4460189] [16-3173] (MHN) [Entered: 10/18/2016 01:43 PM]
                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 803055398 Filed: 10/18/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                        APPELLEE brief of Gurstel Chargo, P.A. and RAzOR Capital, LLC submitted for review. The time for filing the subsequent brief (if any) does not begin to run until the brief has been approved and filed. [4460189] [16-3173] (MHN) [Entered: 10/18/2016 01:43 PM]
                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 00803053979 Filed: 10/17/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                          Brief deficiency notice sent to counsel, Attorney Mr. Manuel H. Newburger for Appellees Gurstel Chargo, P.A. and RAzOR Capital, LLC. [4459481] [16-3173] (JMM) [Entered: 10/17/2016 10:47 AM]
                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 803053979 Filed: 10/17/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                            Brief deficiency notice sent to counsel, Attorney Mr. Manuel H. Newburger for Appellees Gurstel Chargo, P.A. and RAzOR Capital, LLC. [4459481] [16-3173] (JMM) [Entered: 10/17/2016 10:47 AM]
                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 00803052541 Filed: 10/13/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                              APPELLEE brief of Gurstel Chargo, P.A. and RAzOR Capital, LLC submitted for review. The time for filing the subsequent brief (if any) does not begin to run until the brief has been approved and filed. [4458803] [16-3173] (MHN) [Entered: 10/13/2016 11:44 PM]
                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 803052541 Filed: 10/13/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                APPELLEE brief of Gurstel Chargo, P.A. and RAzOR Capital, LLC submitted for review. The time for filing the subsequent brief (if any) does not begin to run until the brief has been approved and filed. [4458803] [16-3173] (MHN) [Entered: 10/13/2016 11:44 PM]
                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 00803031513 Filed: 9/14/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                  ADDENDUM of APPELLANT FILED by Appellant Mr. Steven Demarais , w/service 09/14/2016 [4448297] [16-3173] (JMM) [Entered: 09/14/2016 03:00 PM]
                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 803031513 Filed: 9/14/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                    ADDENDUM of APPELLANT FILED by Appellant Mr. Steven Demarais, w/service 09/14/2016 [4448297] [16-3173] (JMM) [Entered: 09/14/2016 03:00 PM]
                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 00803031507 Filed: 9/14/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                      BRIEF FILED - APPELLANT BRIEF filed by Mr. Steven Demarais. w/service 09/14/2016 , Length: 7,956 words 10 COPIES OF PAPER BRIEFS FROM Steven Demarais due 09/19/2016 WITH certificate of service for paper briefs Brief of Gurstel Chargo, P.A. and RAzOR Capital, LLC due on 10/14/2016 [4448296] [16-3173] (JMM) [Entered: 09/14/2016 03:00 PM]
                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 803031507 Filed: 9/14/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                        BRIEF FILED - APPELLANT BRIEF filed by Mr. Steven Demarais. w/service 09/14/2016, Length: 7,956 words 10 COPIES OF PAPER BRIEFS FROM Steven Demarais due 09/19/2016 WITH certificate of service for paper briefs Brief of Gurstel Chargo, P.A. and RAzOR Capital, LLC due on 10/14/2016 [4448296] [16-3173] (JMM) [Entered: 09/14/2016 03:00 PM]
                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 00803030119 Filed: 9/13/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                          Addendum of APPELLANT submitted for review by Mr. Steven Demarais [4447693] [16-3173] (DBS) [Entered: 09/13/2016 11:46 AM]
                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 803030119 Filed: 9/13/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                            Addendum of APPELLANT submitted for review by Mr. Steven Demarais [4447693] [16-3173] (DBS) [Entered: 09/13/2016 11:46 AM]
                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 00803030113 Filed: 9/13/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                              APPELLANT brief of Mr. Steven Demarais submitted for review. The time for filing the subsequent brief (if any) does not begin to run until the brief has been approved and filed. [4447690] [16-3173] (DBS) [Entered: 09/13/2016 11:45 AM]
                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 803030113 Filed: 9/13/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                APPELLANT brief of Mr. Steven Demarais submitted for review. The time for filing the subsequent brief (if any) does not begin to run until the brief has been approved and filed. [4447690] [16-3173] (DBS) [Entered: 09/13/2016 11:45 AM]
                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 00803029762 Filed: 9/13/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                  Addendum deficiency notice sent to counsel, Attorney Mr. Darren Brayer Schwiebert for Appellant Mr. Steven Demarais. New electronic copy of addendum due on 09/19/2016 [4447525] [16-3173] (JMM) [Entered: 09/13/2016 09:11 AM]
                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 803029762 Filed: 9/13/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                    Addendum deficiency notice sent to counsel, Attorney Mr. Darren Brayer Schwiebert for Appellant Mr. Steven Demarais. New electronic copy of addendum due on 09/19/2016 [4447525] [16-3173] (JMM) [Entered: 09/13/2016 09:11 AM]
                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 00803029755 Filed: 9/13/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                      Brief deficiency notice sent to counsel, Attorney Mr. Darren Brayer Schwiebert for Appellant Mr. Steven Demarais. [4447516] [16-3173] (JMM) [Entered: 09/13/2016 08:55 AM]
                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 803029755 Filed: 9/13/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                        Brief deficiency notice sent to counsel, Attorney Mr. Darren Brayer Schwiebert for Appellant Mr. Steven Demarais. [4447516] [16-3173] (JMM) [Entered: 09/13/2016 08:55 AM]
                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 00803029627 Filed: 9/12/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                          APPELLANT brief of Mr. Steven Demarais submitted for review. The time for filing the subsequent brief (if any) does not begin to run until the brief has been approved and filed. [4447456] [16-3173] (DBS) [Entered: 09/12/2016 07:36 PM]
                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 803029627 Filed: 9/12/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                            APPELLANT brief of Mr. Steven Demarais submitted for review. The time for filing the subsequent brief (if any) does not begin to run until the brief has been approved and filed. [4447456] [16-3173] (DBS) [Entered: 09/12/2016 07:36 PM]
                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 00803029624 Filed: 9/12/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                              Addendum of APPELLANT submitted for review by Mr. Steven Demarais [4447455] [16-3173] (DBS) [Entered: 09/12/2016 07:32 PM]
                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 803029624 Filed: 9/12/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                Addendum of APPELLANT submitted for review by Mr. Steven Demarais [4447455] [16-3173] (DBS) [Entered: 09/12/2016 07:32 PM]
                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 00803029618 Filed: 9/12/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                  APPELLANT brief of Mr. Steven Demarais submitted for review. The time for filing the subsequent brief (if any) does not begin to run until the brief has been approved and filed. [4447453] [16-3173] (DBS) [Entered: 09/12/2016 07:31 PM]
                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 803029618 Filed: 9/12/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                    APPELLANT brief of Mr. Steven Demarais submitted for review. The time for filing the subsequent brief (if any) does not begin to run until the brief has been approved and filed. [4447453] [16-3173] (DBS) [Entered: 09/12/2016 07:31 PM]
                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                      Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 00803008928 Filed: 8/15/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                      Certificate of transcript filed by Appellees Gurstel Chargo, P.A. and RAzOR Capital, LLC. Transcript ordered [4437433] [16-3173] (MHN) [Entered: 08/15/2016 11:06 AM]
                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 803008928 Filed: 8/15/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                        Certificate of transcript filed by Appellees Gurstel Chargo, P.A. and RAzOR Capital, LLC. Transcript ordered [4437433] [16-3173] (MHN) [Entered: 08/15/2016 11:06 AM]
                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 00803003599 Filed: 8/5/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                          APPEARANCE filed by Manuel H. Newburger for Appellee RAzOR Capital, LLC w/service 08/05/2016 [4434915] [16-3173] (MHN) [Entered: 08/05/2016 06:20 PM]
                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 803003599 Filed: 8/5/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                            APPEARANCE filed by Manuel H. Newburger for Appellee RAzOR Capital, LLC w/service 08/05/2016 [4434915] [16-3173] (MHN) [Entered: 08/05/2016 06:20 PM]
                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 00803003590 Filed: 8/5/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                              APPEARANCE filed by Manuel H. Newburger for Appellee Gurstel Chargo, P.A. w/service 08/05/2016 [4434912] [16-3173] (MHN) [Entered: 08/05/2016 05:30 PM]
                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 803003590 Filed: 8/5/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                APPEARANCE filed by Manuel H. Newburger for Appellee Gurstel Chargo, P.A. w/service 08/05/2016 [4434912] [16-3173] (MHN) [Entered: 08/05/2016 05:30 PM]
                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 00803002372 Filed: 8/5/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                  STATEMENT of issues filed by Appellant Mr. Steven Demarais - w/service 08/05/2016. [4434364] [16-3173] (DBS) [Entered: 08/05/2016 06:44 AM]
                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 803002372 Filed: 8/5/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                    STATEMENT of issues filed by Appellant Mr. Steven Demarais - w/service 08/05/2016. [4434364] [16-3173] (DBS) [Entered: 08/05/2016 06:44 AM]
                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 00803002369 Filed: 8/5/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                      Certificate of transcript filed by Appellant Mr. Steven Demarais. No Transcript [4434363] [16-3173] (DBS) [Entered: 08/05/2016 06:43 AM]
                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 803002369 Filed: 8/5/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                        Certificate of transcript filed by Appellant Mr. Steven Demarais. No Transcript [4434363] [16-3173] (DBS) [Entered: 08/05/2016 06:43 AM]
                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 00803002366 Filed: 8/5/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                          APPEARANCE filed by Darren Brayer Schwiebert for Appellant Mr. Steven Demarais w/service 08/05/2016 [4434362] [16-3173] (DBS) [Entered: 08/05/2016 06:41 AM]
                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 803002366 Filed: 8/5/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                            APPEARANCE filed by Darren Brayer Schwiebert for Appellant Mr. Steven Demarais w/service 08/05/2016 [4434362] [16-3173] (DBS) [Entered: 08/05/2016 06:41 AM]
                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 00802992346 Filed: 7/22/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                              BRIEFING SCHEDULE SET AS FOLLOWS: Transcript due on or before 08/31/2016. Appendix due 09/12/2016. BRIEF APPELLANT, Steven Demarais due 09/12/2016 Appellee brief is due 30 days from the date the court issues the Notice of Docket Activity filing the brief of appellant. Appellant reply brief is due 14 days from the date the court issues the Notice of Docket Activity filing the appellee brief. [4429477] [16-3173] (JMM) [Entered: 07/22/2016 02:25 PM]
                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 802992346 Filed: 7/22/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                BRIEFING SCHEDULE SET AS FOLLOWS: Transcript due on or before 08/31/2016. Appendix due 09/12/2016. BRIEF APPELLANT, Steven Demarais due 09/12/2016 Appellee brief is due 30 days from the date the court issues the Notice of Docket Activity filing the brief of appellant. Appellant reply brief is due 14 days from the date the court issues the Notice of Docket Activity filing the appellee brief. [4429477] [16-3173] (JMM) [Entered: 07/22/2016 02:25 PM]
                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 00802992342 Filed: 7/22/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                  Originating court document filed consisting of notice of appeal, order filed 07/06/16, judgment filed 07/07/16 and docket entries. [4429473] [16-3173] (JMM) [Entered: 07/22/2016 02:24 PM]
                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 802992342 Filed: 7/22/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                    Originating court document filed consisting of notice of appeal, order filed 07/06/16, judgment filed 07/07/16 and docket entries. [4429473] [16-3173] (JMM) [Entered: 07/22/2016 02:24 PM]
                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 00802992334 Filed: 7/22/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                      Civil case docketed. [4429462] [16-3173] (JMM) [Entered: 07/22/2016 02:19 PM]
                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 802992334 Filed: 7/22/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                        Civil case docketed. [4429462] [16-3173] (JMM) [Entered: 07/22/2016 02:19 PM]
                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF

                                                                                                                                          Statistics

                                                                                                                                          This case has been viewed 205 times.

                                                                                                                                          No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                                                                                                                          Space
                                                                                                                                          Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                                                          Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                                                           
                                                                                                                                          PlainSite
                                                                                                                                          Sign Up
                                                                                                                                          Need Password Help?