Haque v. Bloomberg
Federal Civil Lawsuit New York Southern District Court, Case No. 1:16-cv-05602
District Judge Vernon S. Broderick, presiding

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Last Updated October 10, 2018 at 5:59 PM DT (2.6 years ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo Khondaker M. Haque, Plaintiff
No Logo N.J., Plaintiff
No Logo R.M., Plaintiff
No Logo S.K., Plaintiff
No Logo Shamsad R. Kazi, Plaintiff
v.
City of New York City of New York, Defendant
No Logo Commissioner Raymond Kelly, Defendant
No Logo Congressman Peter King, Defendant
No Logo Director Julia Pierson, Defendant
No Logo Dr. Galina Orenshteyn, Defendant
Bloomberg, Michael Rubens Bloomberg, Michael Rubens, Defendant
Officially listed as "Michael Bloomberg"
No Logo Senator Chuck Schumer, Defendant
Citation Section 42 U.S.C. § 1983
Nature of Suit 470 - Civil (RICO) Racketeer/Corrupt Organization
  Entries (11) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 12 Filed: 9/1/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
NOTICE OF APPEAL from 4 Judgment - Sua Sponte (Complaint), 3 Order of Dismissal. Document filed by Khondaker M. Haque. Form D-P is due within 14 days to the Court of Appeals, Second Circuit. (tp) (Entered: 09/02/2016)
    Request RequestSpace LREF
    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 11 Filed: 8/8/2016, Entered: None
    SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED. Summons and Complaint, served. Galina Orenshteyn served on 7/26/2016, answer due 8/16/2016. Service was made by Mail. Document filed by Khondaker M. Haque. (sc) (Entered: 08/08/2016)
      Request RequestSpace LREF
      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 10 Filed: 8/8/2016, Entered: None
      SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED. Summons and Complaint, served. Chuck Schumer served on 7/26/2016, answer due 8/16/2016. Service was made by Mail. Document filed by Khondaker M. Haque. (sc) (Entered: 08/08/2016)
        Request RequestSpace LREF
        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 9 Filed: 8/8/2016, Entered: None
        SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED. Summons and Complaint, served. Peter King served on 7/26/2016, answer due 8/16/2016. Service was made by Mail. Document filed by Khondaker M. Haque. (sc) (Entered: 08/08/2016)
          Request RequestSpace LREF
          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 8 Filed: 8/8/2016, Entered: None
          SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED. Summons and Complaint, served. City of New York served on 7/26/2016, answer due 8/16/2016. Service was made by Mail. Document filed by Khondaker M. Haque. (sc) (Entered: 08/08/2016)
            Request RequestSpace LREF
            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7 Filed: 8/8/2016, Entered: None
            SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED. Summons and Complaint, served. Julia Pierson served on 7/26/2016, answer due 8/16/2016. Service was made by Mail. Document filed by Khondaker M. Haque. (sc) (Entered: 08/08/2016)
              Request RequestSpace LREF
              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 6 Filed: 8/8/2016, Entered: None
              SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED. Summons and Complaint, served. Raymond Kelly served on 7/26/2016, answer due 8/16/2016. Service was made by Mail. Document filed by Khondaker M. Haque. (sc) (Entered: 08/08/2016)
                Request RequestSpace LREF
                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5 Filed: 8/8/2016, Entered: None
                SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED. Summons and Complaint, served. Michael Bloomberg served on 7/26/2016, answer due 8/16/2016. Service was made by Mail. Document filed by Khondaker M. Haque. (sc) (Entered: 08/08/2016)
                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4 Filed: 8/4/2016, Entered: None Court Filing
                  CIVIL JUDGMENT: Pursuant to the order issued August 4, 2016, dismissing the action, IT IS ORDERED, ADJUDGED AND DECREED that the action is dismissed. The Court dismisses without prejudice the claims of N.J., R.M., and S.K., and any claims that Plaintiffs Haque and Kazi assert on behalf of them and others. The Court dismisses Plaintiffs Haque and Kazi's remaining federal claims as frivolous. The Court declines to assert supplemental jurisdiction over any state-law claims Plaintiffs attempt to assert, and dismisses those claims without prejudice. 28 U.S.C. § 1367(c)(3). The Court certifies under 28 U.S.C. § 1915(a)(3) that any appeal from the Court's judgment would not be taken in good faith. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that the Clerk of Court mail a copy of this judgment to Plaintiff and note service on the docket. (Signed by Judge Vernon S. Broderick on 8/4/2016) (lmb) (Entered: 08/05/2016)
                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 3 Filed: 8/4/2016, Entered: None Court Filing
                    ORDER OF DISMISSAL: The Clerk of Court is directed to mail a copy of this order to Plaintiffs and note service on the docket. The Court dismisses this action. The Court dismisses without prejudice the claims of N.J., R.M., and S.K., and any claims that Plaintiffs Haque and Kazi assert on behalf of them and others. The Court dismisses Plaintiffs Haque and Kazi's remaining federal claims as frivolous. The Court declines to assert supplemental jurisdiction over any state-law claims Plaintiffs attempt to assert, and dismisses these claims without prejudice. 28 U.S.C. § 1367(c)(3). The Court certifies under 28 U.S.C. § 1915(a)(3) that any appeal from this order would not be taken in good faith, and therefore in forma pauperis status is denied for the purpose of an appeal. See Coppedge v. United States, 369 U.S. 438, 444-45 (1962). The Clerk's Office is directed to mail a copy of this order to the pro se plaintiff. (As further set forth in this Order) (Signed by Judge Vernon S. Broderick on 8/4/2016) (lmb) (Entered: 08/05/2016)
                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1 Filed: 7/14/2016, Entered: None
                      COMPLAINT against Michael Bloomberg, City of New York, Raymond Kelly, Peter King, Galina Orenshteyn, Julia Pierson, Chuck Schumer. (Filing Fee $ 400.00, Receipt Number 1156616)Document filed by N.J., Shamsad R. Kazi, Khondaker M. Haque, R.M., S.K.. (Attachments: # 1 ccs)(laq) (Entered: 07/18/2016)
                        Request RequestSpace LREF

                        Statistics

                        This case has been viewed 192 times.

                        No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                        Space
                        Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                        Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                         
                        PlainSite
                        Sign Up
                        Need Password Help?