Smulley v. Webster Financial Corporation
Appeal Court of Appeals for the Second Circuit, Case No. 16-2618

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Last Updated December 2, 2018 at 10:23 AM ST (2.5 years ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

Nature of Suit 2290 - Real Property: Other
  Entries (19) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 32 Filed: 8/26/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
ACKNOWLEDGMENT AND NOTICE OF APPEARANCE, on behalf of Appellee Federal Housing Finance Agency, Federal National Mortgage Association, JPMorgan Chase Bank, N.A. and Mortgage Electronic Registration Systems, Inc., FILED. Service date 08/26/2016 by US mail, CM/ECF.[1850056] [16-2618] [Entered: 08/26/2016 10:25 AM]
    Request RequestSpace LREF
    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 28 Filed: 8/17/2016, Entered: None
    ACKNOWLEDGMENT AND NOTICE OF APPEARANCE, on behalf of Appellee Webster Financial Corporation, FILED. Service date 08/17/2016 by US mail.[1842980] [16-2618] [Entered: 08/17/2016 12:38 PM]
      Request RequestSpace LREF
      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 27 Filed: 8/16/2016, Entered: None
      LR 31.2 SCHEDULING NOTIFICATION, on behalf of Appellant Dorothy A. Smulley, informing Court of proposed due date 11/15/2016, RECEIVED. Service date 08/16/2016 by CM/ECF.[1842408] [16-2618] [Entered: 08/16/2016 07:48 PM]
        Request RequestSpace LREF
        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 25 Filed: 8/16/2016, Entered: None
        STATEMENT OF ISSUES, on behalf of Appellant Dorothy A. Smulley, FILED. Service date 08/16/2016 by CM/ECF.[1841806] [16-2618] [Entered: 08/16/2016 11:51 AM]
          Request RequestSpace LREF
          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 23 Filed: 8/15/2016, Entered: None
          DEFECTIVE DOCUMENT, MOTION, Appellant's Preliminary Statement [21], on behalf of Appellant Dorothy A. Smulley, FILED.[1841059] [16-2618] [Entered: 08/15/2016 03:03 PM]
            Request RequestSpace LREF
            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 19 Filed: 8/10/2016, Entered: None
            MOTION, for review, on behalf of Appellant Dorothy A. Smulley, FILED. Service date 08/08/2016 by email.[1841034] [16-2618]--[Edited 08/15/2016 by DCS] [Entered: 08/15/2016 02:43 PM]
              Request RequestSpace LREF
              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 18 Filed: 8/10/2016, Entered: None
              ACKNOWLEDGMENT AND NOTICE OF APPEARANCE FORM, on behalf of Party Dorothy A. Smulley, FILED. Service date 08/08/2016 by Email.[1840226] [16-2618]--[Edited 08/15/2016 by DCS] [Entered: 08/12/2016 03:51 PM]
                Request RequestSpace LREF
                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 17 Filed: 8/10/2016, Entered: None
                FORM D-P, on behalf of Appellant Dorothy A. Smulley, FILED. Service date 08/08/2016 by Email.[1840219] [16-2618]--[Edited 08/15/2016 by DCS] [Entered: 08/12/2016 03:44 PM]
                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 18 Filed: 8/12/2016, Entered: None
                  ACKNOWLEDGMENT AND NOTICE OF APPEARANCE FORM, on behalf of Party Dorothy A. Smulley, FILED. Service date 08/10/2016 by US mail.[1840226] [16-2618] [Entered: 08/12/2016 03:51 PM]
                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 17 Filed: 8/12/2016, Entered: None
                    FORM D-P, on behalf of Appellant Dorothy A. Smulley, FILED. Service date 08/10/2016 by US mail.[1840219] [16-2618] [Entered: 08/12/2016 03:44 PM]
                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 15 Filed: 8/12/2016, Entered: None
                      NOTICE, to Appellee Federal Housing Finance Agency, Federal National Mortgage Association, JPMorgan Chase Bank, N.A., Mortgage Electronic Registration Systems, Inc. and Webster Financial Corporation , for failure to file an appearance, SENT.[1839461] [16-2618] [Entered: 08/12/2016 09:09 AM]
                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 14 Filed: 8/10/2016, Entered: None
                        CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE, for Notice of Appearance as Additional Counsel, on behalf of Appellee Federal Housing Finance Agency, Federal National Mortgage Association, JPMorgan Chase Bank, N.A. and Mortgage Electronic Registration Systems, Inc., FILED. Service date 08/10/2016 by US mail, CM/ECF.[1837538] [16-2618] [Entered: 08/10/2016 11:38 AM]
                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 13 Filed: 8/8/2016, Entered: None
                          ORDER, dated 08/08/2016, dismissing appeal by 08/29/2016, unless Appellant Dorothy A. Smulley, submits form D-P, FILED.[1834747] [16-2618] [Entered: 08/08/2016 09:57 AM]
                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 10 Filed: 8/3/2016, Entered: None
                            NOTICE OF APPEARANCE AS ADDITIONAL COUNSEL, on behalf of Appellee Federal Housing Finance Agency, Federal National Mortgage Association, JPMorgan Chase Bank, N.A. and Mortgage Electronic Registration Systems, Inc., FILED. Service date 08/03/2016 by CM/ECF. [1831856] [16-2618] [Entered: 08/03/2016 11:48 AM]
                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 3 Unknown Document Type
                                Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 8 Filed: 7/28/2016, Entered: None
                                INSTRUCTIONAL FORMS, to Pro Se litigant, SENT.[1827588] [16-2618] [Entered: 07/28/2016 12:23 PM]
                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2 Unknown Document Type
                                    Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5 Filed: 7/26/2016, Entered: None
                                    ELECTRONIC INDEX, in lieu of record, FILED.[1827523] [16-2618] [Entered: 07/28/2016 12:03 PM]
                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1 Unknown Document Type
                                        Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF

                                        Statistics

                                        This case has been viewed 90 times.

                                        No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                        Space
                                        Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                        Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                         
                                        PlainSite
                                        Sign Up
                                        Need Password Help?