Jones v. Midland Funding LLC
Appeal Court of Appeals for the Second Circuit, Case No. 11-254

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Last Updated August 15, 2016 at 5:38 AM DT (4.8 years ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

Nature of Suit 3480 - Consumer Credit
  Entries (9) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 44 Filed: 4/11/2011, Entered: None
CERTIFIED COPY OF ORDER, dated 04/11/2011, disposing of the appeal to DISTRICT OF CONNECTICUT, ISSUED.[Mandate][258580] [11-254] [Entered: 04/11/2011 09:38 AM]
    Request RequestSpace LREF
    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 43 Filed: 4/11/2011, Entered: None
    FRAP 42 STIPULATION, with prejudice, FILED.[258539] [11-254] [Entered: 04/11/2011 09:18 AM]
      Request RequestSpace LREF
      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 37 Filed: 4/6/2011, Entered: None
      FRAP 42 STIPULATION, With Prejudice, RECEIVED. Service date 04/06/2011 by CM/ECF.[255538] [11-254] [Entered: 04/06/2011 04:38 PM]
        Request RequestSpace LREF
        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 35 Filed: 3/9/2011, Entered: None
        CAMP CONFERENCE ORDER: Type of Conference: Amended Telephonic, Scheduled Date of Conference: 03/16/2011, Start Time: 3:00 PM, endorsed by Vidya Kurella, FILED.[229464] [11-254] [Entered: 03/09/2011 08:32 AM]
          Request RequestSpace LREF
          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 31 Filed: 3/8/2011, Entered: None
          LETTER, dated 03/08/2011, on behalf of Appellant Midland Credit Mgmt, Incorporated and Midland Funding LLC, RECEIVED. Service date 03/08/2011 by CM/ECF.[229028] [11-254] [Entered: 03/08/2011 02:39 PM]
            Request RequestSpace LREF
            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 30 Filed: 2/14/2011, Entered: None
            ELECTRONIC INDEX, in lieu of record, FILED.[209007] [11-254] [Entered: 02/14/2011 12:23 PM]
              Request RequestSpace LREF
              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 29 Filed: 2/14/2011, Entered: None
              SO-ORDERED SCHEDULING NOTIFICATION, setting Appellant Midland Credit Mgmt, Incorporated and Midland Funding LLC Brief due date as 05/05/2011; Joint Appendix due date as 05/05/2011, FILED.[208610] [11-254] [Entered: 02/14/2011 09:11 AM]
                Request RequestSpace LREF
                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 25 Filed: 2/10/2011, Entered: None
                SCHEDULING NOTIFICATION, on behalf of Appellant Midland Credit Mgmt, Incorporated and Midland Funding LLC, informing Court of proposed due date 05/06/2011, RECEIVED. Service date 02/10/2011 by CM/ECF.[207291] [11-254] [Entered: 02/10/2011 05:18 PM]
                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 23 Filed: 2/9/2011, Entered: None
                  ACKNOWLEDGMENT AND NOTICE OF APPEARANCE, on behalf of Appellee Kenneth W. Jones, FILED. Service date 02/09/2011 by CM/ECF.[205819] [11-254] [Entered: 02/09/2011 02:48 PM]
                    Request RequestSpace LREF

                    Statistics

                    This case has been viewed 26 times.

                    No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                    Space
                    Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                    Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                     
                    PlainSite
                    Sign Up
                    Need Password Help?