Zubkis v. Donaldson, et al
Appeal Court of Appeals for the Ninth Circuit, Case No. 05-55313

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Last Updated August 16, 2016 at 5:13 AM EDT (5.3 years ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

Space Space

No Logo Anthony J. Bosco, Defendant - Appellee,
No Logo Carmen J. Lawrence, Defendant - Appellee,
No Logo Cynthia A. Glassman, Defendant - Appellee,
No Logo Edwin H. Nordlinger, Defendant - Appellee,
No Logo Elizabeth Jacobs, Defendant - Appellee,
No Logo Ernest E. Badway, Defendant - Appellee,
No Logo Harvey J. Goldschmid, Defendant - Appellee,
No Logo Henry Klehm, Iii, Defendant - Appellee,
No Logo Jacqueline A. Zucker, Defendant - Appellee,
No Logo John J. Graubard, Defendant - Appellee,
No Logo Kay L. Lackey, Defendant - Appellee,
No Logo Mark K. Schonfeld, Defendant - Appellee,
No Logo Paul S. Atkins, Defendant - Appellee,
No Logo Peter A. Pizzani, Defendant - Appellee,
No Logo Peter Sack, Defendant - Appellee,
No Logo Roel C. Campos, Defendant - Appellee,
No Logo Wayne M. Carlin, Defendant - Appellee,
No Logo William H. Donaldson, Chairman, U.s. Securities And Exchange Commission, Defendant - Appellee,
No Logo Zubkis, Vladislav Steven, Plaintiff - Appellant,
Officially listed as "Steven Vladislav Zubkis"
Nature of Suit 2360 - Personal Injury: Other Personal
Case Type civil
Lower Court Case https://ecf.casd.uscourts.gov/cgi-bin/DktRpt.pl?caseNumber=CV-03-02104-RTB
Lower Court Case https://ecf.casd.uscourts.gov/cgi-bin/DktRpt.pl?caseNumber=CV-03-02104-RTB
  Entries (17) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Blank  Filed: 8/14/2006, Entered: None
RECORD RETURNED. (See control card for details.) (JAS)
    LREF
    Blank  Filed: 8/14/2006, Entered: None
    RECORD RETURNED. (See control card for details.) (JAS)
      LREF
      Blank  Filed: 4/11/2006, Entered: None
      MANDATE ISSUED. Costs taxed against aplt $142.50 [05-55313] (GV)
        LREF
        Blank  Filed: 3/3/2006, Entered: None
        Filed Aples' bill of costs $142.50; served on 3/2/06 [05-55313] (GV)
          LREF
          Blank  Filed: 2/17/2006, Entered: None
          FILED MEMORANDUM: AFFIRMED. (Terminated on the Merits after Submission Without Oral Hearing; Affirmed; Written, Unsigned, Unpublished. Ferdinand F. FERNANDEZ, Pamela A. RYMER, Jay S. BYBEE). FILED AND ENTERED JUDGMENT. [05-55313] (GV)
            LREF
            Blank  Filed: 2/13/2006, Entered: None
            SUBMITTED TO SCREENING PANEL 413. ( Oral) [05-55313] [05-55313] (TH)
              LREF
              Blank  Filed: 8/29/2005, Entered: None
              FILED CERTIFIED RECORD ON APPEAL IN: 2 Clerks files, [05-55313] (JAS)
                LREF
                Blank  Filed: 8/16/2005, Entered: None
                Calendar check performed [05-55313] (TH)
                  LREF
                  Blank  Filed: 7/15/2005, Entered: None
                  Filed original & 11 copies Appellant Vladislav Steven Zubkis's reply brief (Informal: n) 8 pages; served on 7/14/05 with minor defcy: (add'l 4 copies are req). Notified aplt. [05-55313] (GV)
                    LREF
                    Blank  Filed: 6/29/2005, Entered: None
                    Filed original & 15 copies Aples' 25 pages ans br, 5 Supplemental Excs.; served on 6/28/05 [05-55313] (GV)
                      LREF
                      Blank  Filed: 6/20/2005, Entered: None
                      Copy of letter received from Beth Levine AUSA to Vladislav Zubkis re: rcvd 14-day oral ex.tm.f ans br. Brief now due on 7/1/05; optioanl rpy br due 14 days after service of the Governemnt's brief (Cassefile) [05-55313] (GV)
                        LREF
                        Blank  Filed: 6/16/2005, Entered: None
                        14 day oral extension by phone of time to file Appellee William H. Donaldson, Appellee Cynthia A. Glassman, Appellee Harvey J. Goldschmid, Appellee Paul S. Atkins, Appellee Roel C. Campos, Appellee Elizabeth Jacobs, Appellee Carmen J. Lawrence, Appellee Edwin H. Nordlinger, Appellee Henry Klehm, Appellee Jacqueline A. Zucker, Appellee Kay L. Lackey, Appellee Ernest E. Badway, Appellee Wayne M. Carlin, Appellee Mark K. Schonfeld, Appellee Peter A. Pizzani, Appellee John J. Graubard, Appellee Anthony J. Bosco, Appellee Peter Sack's brief. Appellees' brief due 7/1/05,, ; appellants' reply brief due 14 days from service of answering brief [05-55313] (PG)
                          LREF
                          Blank  Filed: 5/17/2005, Entered: None
                          Filed original & 15 copies Appellant Vladislav Steven Zubkis's opening brief (Informal: n) 29 pages; 5 Excs; served on 5/16/05; minor defcy: (need white covers for excs, copy of noa). Notified aplt. [05-55313] (GV)
                            LREF
                            Blank  Filed: 4/19/2005, Entered: None
                            Rec'd notice of change of address from Vladislav Steven Zubkis, dated 4/14/05. New address: 1590 Continental St. Suite 200, San Diego CA 92154 (Casefile) [05-55313] (GV)
                              LREF
                              Blank  Filed: 3/31/2005, Entered: None
                              Filed order PROMO: (Deputy Clerk: cag) Aplt's mtn for an ex.tm.f the opening br is granted. The opening br is due 5/18/05. The ans br is due 6/17/05, and the optional rpy br is due 14 days after service of the ans br. [05-55313] (GV)
                                LREF
                                Blank  Filed: 3/24/2005, Entered: None
                                Filed Appellant Vladislav Steven Zubkis's motion to extend time to file appellant's opening brief; served on 3/22/05 (Promo) [5375634] [05-55313] (GV)
                                  LREF
                                  Blank  Filed: 3/22/2005, Entered: None
                                  Received letter from pro se appellant Zubkis re: states court's caption for the case is incorrect. (to PRO SE) (RT)
                                    LREF

                                    Statistics

                                    This case has been viewed 163 times.

                                    No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                    Space
                                    Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                    Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                     
                                    PlainSite
                                    Sign Up
                                    Need Password Help?