Malone v. TD Ameritrade, Inc.

Federal Civil Lawsuit Texas Eastern District Court, Case No. 4:16-cv-00614
Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Last Updated November 17, 2018 at 12:54 AM EST (6.4 years ago) Update UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert AlertsSpaceJump Jump
Summary

No one has written a summary of this case yet. Sign up or sign in to contribute one.

Parties
No Logo Michael F Malone, Plaintiff

Represented by Bragar, Eagel & Squire P.C.

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space JEFFREY H. SQUIRE +1 212 308 5858 squire@bespc.com

Represented by Kendall Law Group, PLLC - Dallas

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Joe Kendall +1 214 744 3000 +1 214 744 3015 jkendall@kendalllawgroup.com
Space Jamie Jean McKey +1 214 744 3000 +1 214 744 3015 jmckey@kendalllawgroup.com
No Logo TD Ameritrade, Inc., Counter-Claimant

Represented by Allen Franklin Gardner

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
, , , Allen Franklin Gardner

Represented by Baritz and Colman LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
, , , Neil S. Baritz +1 561 750 0910 +7505 750 750 5045 nbaritz@baritzcolman.com
, Heather Cooper +1 561 864 5101 hcooper@baritzcolman.com

Represented by Bradley Bowling

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
, Bradley Bowling

Represented by Bryan Cave, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
, , , Keith Miles Aurzada +1 214 721 8041 +1 214 721 8100 keith.aurzada@bryancave.com
, John Michael Clear +1 314 259 2283 +1 314 552 8283 jmclear@bryancave.com
, , Heather Shaw Goldman +1 202 508 6311 heather.goldman@bryancave.com
Space Eric D. Martin +1 314 259 2324 +1 314 552 8234 eric.martin@bryancave.com
, , , , , Rodney F. Page +1 202 508 6000 +1 202 508 6200 rfpage@bryancave.com
, GREGORY J SACHNIK +1 214 721 8059 +1 214 220 6759 gregory.sachnik@bryancave.com
, Steven Russell Smith +1 312 602 5000 +1 312 602 5050 srsmith@bryancave.com
, , , , , William J. Wortel +1 312 602 5000 +1 312 602 5050 bill.wortel@bclplaw.com

Represented by Christa & Jackson

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Laura Kassner Christa +1 310 282 8040 +1 310 282 8421 Lchrista@christalaw.com

Represented by Eversheds Sutherland LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, PRO HAC VICE, LEAD ATTORNEY Adam C. Pollet +1 202 383 0812 +1 202 637 3593 adampollet@eversheds-sutherland.com

Represented by Flashpoint Law, Inc.

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Shirish Gupta +1 650 539 4019 sgupta@flashpointlaw.com

Represented by Goodwin Procter, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
, , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , Mark Holland +1 212 813 8800 +1 212 355 3333 mholland@goodwinlaw.com

Represented by Grant, Konvalinka & Harrison, PC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Matthew D Brownfield +1 423 756 8400 mbrownfield@gkhpc.com

Represented by Hart Wagner LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Lindsay H. Duncan +1 503 222 4499 lhd@hartwagner.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Matthew J. Kalmanson +1 503 222 4499 +1 503 222 2301 mjk@hartwagner.com

Represented by Ireland Carroll & Kelley

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
, , , Otis W Carroll, Jr. +1 903 561 1600 +1 903 581 1071 Fedserv@icklaw.com
, , , Deborah J Race +1 903 561 1600 drace@icklaw.com

Represented by Joshua J. Parker

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
, Joshua J. Parker

Represented by Kutak Rock, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
, Gregory R. Crochet +1 404 222 4600 greg.crochet@kutakrock.com
, , Thomas H Dahlk +1 402 964 5000 +9645 964 964 5050 tom.dahlk@kutakrock.com

Represented by Law Offices of Debra Lee Bogo-Ernst

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
, , Robert J. Kriss +1 312 701 7165 +1 312 706 8646 rkriss@mayerbrown.com
Space Lee H. Rubin +1 650 331 2037 +1 650 331 2060 lrubin@mayerbrown.com

Represented by Lori A. Gordon

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
, Lori A. Gordon

Represented by Mandell Menkes LLC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 07/02/2014, TERMINATED: 07/02/2014, TERMINATED: 07/02/2014, TERMINATED: 07/02/2014, TERMINATED: 07/02/2014 Elizabeth Anne Ferrari Morris +1 312 251 1014 +1 312 759 2183 emorris@mandellmenkes.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Natalie Anne Harris +1 312 251 1000 nharris@mandellmenkes.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Danielle Nicole Twait +1 312 251 1017 +1 312 251 1010 dtwait@mandellmenkes.com

Represented by Michael A. Hawes

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
, , , Michael A. Hawes

Represented by Michael Charles Smith

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
, Michael Charles Smith

Represented by Michael E Jones

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
, , , Michael E Jones

Represented by Morrison & Foerster, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
, , , Brooks M. Beard +1 415 268 7339 +1 415 268 7522 bbeard@mofo.com
, , , Michael Allen Jacobs +1 415 268 7000 +1 415 268 7522 mjacobs@mofo.com

Represented by Munger, Tolles & Olson LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
, , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , Robert L. Dell Angelo +1 213 683 9100 +1 213 687 3702
, , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , Marc S T Dworsky +1 213 683 9100 +1 213 687 3702 marc.dworsky@mto.com

Represented by Nirav N. Desai

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
, Nirav N. Desai

Represented by Olshan, Grundman, Frome, Rosenzweig & Wolosky, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, PRO HAC VICE, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY Kyle C. Bisceglie +1 212 451 2300 +1 212 451 2222 kbisceglie@olshanlaw.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, PRO HAC VICE, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Andrew B. Lustigman alustigman@olshanlaw.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, PRO HAC VICE, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, PRO HAC VICE, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, PRO HAC VICE, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, PRO HAC VICE, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, PRO HAC VICE Matteo Joshua Rosselli +1 212 451 2300 +1 212 451 2222 mrosselli@olshanlaw.com

Represented by Omaha

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
, , , , Megan S. Wright +1 402 397 1700 +1 402 397 1806 mwright@clinewilliams.com

Represented by Paul, Weiss, Rifkind, Wharton & Garrison, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
, , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , Charles Edward Davidow +1 202 223 7380 +1 202 223 7480 cdavidow@paulweiss.com
, , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , Brad Scott Karp +1 212 373 2384 +1 212 373 2384 bkarp@paulweiss.com
, , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , Richard A. Rosen +1 212 373 3305 +1 212 373 2359 rrosen@paulweiss.com

Represented by Robert Sokohl

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
, Robert Sokohl

Represented by ROBINSON, WETTRE LAW FIRM

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 12/09/2014, TERMINATED: 12/09/2014, TERMINATED: 12/09/2014 Donald A. Robinson +1 973 690 5400 +1 973 466 2760
TERMINATED: 12/09/2014, TERMINATED: 12/09/2014, TERMINATED: 12/09/2014 Leda D. Wettre +1 973 690 5400 +1 973 466 2760

Represented by Roshan Suresh Mansinghani

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
, Roshan Suresh Mansinghani

Represented by Sidley Austin LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
, , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , Sara Beth Brody +1 415 772 1200 +1 415 772 7400 sbrody@sidley.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, PRO HAC VICE, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, PRO HAC VICE Alex J Kaplan +1 212 839 5839 +1 212 839 5599 ajkaplan@sidley.com
TERMINATED: 07/13/2016, PRO HAC VICE, TERMINATED: 07/13/2016, PRO HAC VICE Jackie Adeline Lu +1 212 839 7346 +1 212 839 5599 jlu@sidley.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, PRO HAC VICE, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, PRO HAC VICE Alfred Robert Pietrzak +1 212 839 5300 +1 212 839 5599 rpietrzak@sidley.com
, , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , Alfred Robert Pietrzak +1 212 839 5300 +1 212 839 5599 rpietrzak@sidley.com
, , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , Owen H. Smith +1 212 839 5300 osmith@sidley.com

Represented by Sutherland Asbill & Brennan LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, PRO HAC VICE, LEAD ATTORNEY Bruce Bettigole +1 202 383 0165 +1 202 637 3593 bruce.bettigole@sutherland.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, PRO HAC VICE, LEAD ATTORNEY Nicholas T. Christakos +1 202 383 0184 +1 202 637 3593 nicholas.christakos@sablaw.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, PRO HAC VICE, LEAD ATTORNEY Gail Lynn Westover +1 202 383 0100 +1 202 637 3593 gail.westover@sablaw.com

Represented by The Nagi Law Firm Group LLC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
, Dmitry Shifrin +1 312 463 6325 +1 312 819 1910 dshifrin@polsinelli.com

Represented by United States Securities and Exchange Commission

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
, , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , Saima S. Ahmed +1 212 336 0994 +1 212 336 1322 ahmeds@sec.gov

Represented by Victoria H Buter

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
, , , Victoria H Buter

Represented by Wilson Sonsini Goodrich & Rosati, PC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space David J. Berger +1 650 493 9300 +1 650 493 6811 dberger@wsgr.com
TERMINATED: 05/31/2013, TERMINATED: 05/31/2013, TERMINATED: 05/31/2013, TERMINATED: 05/31/2013, TERMINATED: 05/31/2013, Abraham DeLaO +1 512 338 5400 +1 512 338 5499 adelao@wsgr.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, Michael Brett Levin +1 650 493 9300 +1 650 565 5100 mlevin@wsgr.com
, , , , Michael Brett Levin +1 650 493 9300 +1 650 565 5100 mlevin@wsgr.com
, , , , , , , , , , , , , , Jessica Leigh Margolis +1 212 999 5800 +1 212 999 5899 jmargolis@wsgr.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, Natalie J. Morgan +1 858 350 2303 +1 858 350 2399 nmorgan@wsgr.com
, , , , , , , , , , , , , , Brian D. Range +1 512 338 5400 +1 512 338 5499 brange@wsgr.com
, , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , Larry Shatzer +1 202 973 8803 +1 202 973 8899 lshatzer@wsgr.com
, , Lucy Yen +1 212 999 5800 +1 212 999 5899 lyen@wsgr.com
v.
No Logo TD Ameritrade Clearing, Inc., Defendant

Represented by Bryan Cave, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
, , , Keith Miles Aurzada +1 214 721 8041 +1 214 721 8100 keith.aurzada@bryancave.com
, John Michael Clear +1 314 259 2283 +1 314 552 8283 jmclear@bryancave.com
, GREGORY J SACHNIK +1 214 721 8059 +1 214 220 6759 gregory.sachnik@bryancave.com
, , TERMINATED: 01/25/2012, TERMINATED: 01/25/2012, TERMINATED: 01/25/2012, TERMINATED: 01/25/2012, TERMINATED: 01/31/2012 Steven Russell Smith +1 312 602 5000 +1 312 602 5050 srsmith@bryancave.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, (Inactive), ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Michael Jude Werich +1 312 602 5112 michael.werich@bryancave.com

Represented by Elizabeth Bruening Smith

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
, Elizabeth Bruening Smith

Represented by Kutak Rock, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Victoria H. Buter +1 402 346 6000 +1 402 346 1148 vicki.buter@kutakrock.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Thomas H Dahlk +1 402 964 5000 +9645 964 964 5050 tom.dahlk@kutakrock.com

Represented by Milbank, Tweed, Hadley & McCloy LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTO Alan J. Stone +1 212 530 5285 +1 212 530 5219 astone@milbank.com

Represented by Sidley Austin LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, PRO HAC VICE, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, PRO HAC VICE Alex J Kaplan +1 212 839 5839 +1 212 839 5599 ajkaplan@sidley.com
TERMINATED: 07/13/2016, PRO HAC VICE, TERMINATED: 07/13/2016, PRO HAC VICE Jackie Adeline Lu +1 212 839 7346 +1 212 839 5599 jlu@sidley.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, PRO HAC VICE, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, PRO HAC VICE Alfred Robert Pietrzak +1 212 839 5300 +1 212 839 5599 rpietrzak@sidley.com

Represented by Thompson, Coe, Cousins & Irons LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Zandra E Foley +1 713 403 8210 +1 713 403 8299 zfoley@thompsoncoe.com
Space William N Radford +1 214 871 8212 +1 214 871 8209 wradford@thompsoncoe.com

Represented by William F. Hargens

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
, , , William F. Hargens

Represented by Wilson Sonsini Goodrich & Rosati, PC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED David J. Berger +1 650 493 9300 +1 650 493 6811 dberger@wsgr.com
Attributes
Citation Section 28 U.S.C. § 1332
Nature of Suit 190 - Contract: Other Contract Actions
Timeline
  Entries (72) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 72 Filed: 8/8/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
FINAL JUDGMENT. Plaintiffs claims and the above numbered cause are hereby DISMISSED with prejudice. Signed by Judge Amos L. Mazzant, III on 8/8/17. (cm, ) (Entered: 08/08/2017)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 71 Filed: 8/8/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
MEMORANDUM ADOPTING REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION OF UNITED STATES MAGISTRATE JUDGE for 61 Motion for Partial Summary Judgment filed by Michael F Malone, 70 Report and Recommendations, 58 Motion for Summary Judgment, filed by TD Ameritrade, Inc., TD Ameritrade Clearing, Inc.. Defendants Motion for Summary Judgment (Dkt. #58) is GRANTED, Plaintiffs Cross Motion for Partial Summary Judgment (Dkt. #61) is DENIED, and Plaintiffs claims are DISMISSED with prejudice. All relief not previously granted is DENIED. Signed by Judge Amos L. Mazzant, III on 8/8/17. (cm, ) (Entered: 08/08/2017)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 70 Filed: 7/18/2017, Entered: 7/18/2017 Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS re 61 Cross MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment filed by Michael F Malone. Within fourteen (14) days after service of the magistrate judges report, any party may serve and file written objections to the findings and recommendations of the magistrate judge. 28 U.S.C. § 636(b)(1)(C). The parties are directed to Local Rule CV-72(c) for page limitations on objections. Signed by Magistrate Judge Kimberly C Priest Johnson on 7/18/17. (cm, )
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 69 Filed: 7/7/2017, Entered: 7/7/2017 Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Kimberly C Priest Johnson: Motion Hearing held on 7/7/2017 re 61 Cross MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment filed by Michael F Malone, 58 MOTION for Summary Judgment TD AMERITRADE AND TD AMERITRADE CLEARING'S MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT AND MEMORANDUM OF POINTS AND AUTHORITIES IN SUPPORT filed by TD Ameritrade, Inc., TD Ameritrade Clearing, Inc. (Court Reporter Digital Recording - Plano 108.) (ttm, )
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 68 Filed: 7/6/2017, Entered: 7/6/2017 Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
ORDER granting 67 Motion for Leave to Appear Telephonically. Mr. Michael Clear is directed to call (214) 872-4891 no later than 9:25 a.m. Signed by Magistrate Judge Kimberly C Priest Johnson on 7/6/17. (cm, )
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 67 Filed: 7/5/2017, Entered: 7/5/2017 Unknown Document Type
MOTION for Leave to Appear Telephonic Appearance for 7-7-17 Hearing DEFENDANTS' UNOPPOSED MOTION FOR TELEPHONIC ATTENDANCE AT JULY 7, 2017 HEARING by TD Ameritrade Clearing, Inc., TD Ameritrade, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Sachnik, Gregory)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 66 Filed: 6/21/2017, Entered: 6/21/2017 Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
ORDER Setting Motions for Oral Argument 61 Cross MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment, 58 MOTION for Summary Judgment TD AMERITRADE AND TD AMERITRADE CLEARING'S MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT AND MEMORANDUM OF POINTS AND AUTHORITIES IN SUPPORT :( Oral Argument set for 7/7/2017 09:30 AM in Ctrm 108 (Plano) before Magistrate Judge Kimberly C Priest Johnson.), ( Copies and Exhibits due by 6/28/2017.). Signed by Magistrate Judge Kimberly C Priest Johnson on 6/21/17. (cm, )
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 65 Filed: 6/13/2017, Entered: 6/13/2017 Unknown Document Type
RESPONSE in Support re 61 Cross MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment filed by Michael F Malone. (Attachments: # 1 Affidavit Second Declaration of Michael F. Malone in Opposition to Defendants' Summary Judgment Motion and in Support of His Cross-Motion for Partial Summary Judgment)(McKey, Jamie)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 64 Filed: 6/9/2017, Entered: 6/9/2017 Unknown Document Type
REPLY to Response to Motion re 61 Cross MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment, 58 MOTION for Summary Judgment TD AMERITRADE AND TD AMERITRADE CLEARING'S MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT AND MEMORANDUM OF POINTS AND AUTHORITIES IN SUPPORT Reply in Support of Motion for Summary Judgment and Response in Opposition to Plaintiff's Cross-Motion for Partial Summary Judgment filed by TD Ameritrade Clearing, Inc., TD Ameritrade, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Ex A - Third Payson Affidavit)(Aurzada, Keith)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 63 Filed: 6/5/2017, Entered: 6/5/2017 Unknown Document Type
RESPONSE in Opposition re 58 MOTION for Summary Judgment TD AMERITRADE AND TD AMERITRADE CLEARING'S MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT AND MEMORANDUM OF POINTS AND AUTHORITIES IN SUPPORT filed by Michael F Malone. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Affidavit Declaration of Michael F. Malone in Opposition to Defendants' Summary Judgment Motion and in Support of His Cross-Motion for Partial Summary Judgment, # 3 Affidavit Declaration of R. Alan Miller in Opposition to Defendants' Summary Judgment Motion, # 4 Text of Proposed Order)(McKey, Jamie)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 62 Filed: 6/2/2017, Entered: 6/2/2017 Unknown Document Type
***DEFICIENT. TO BE REFILED. PLEASE IGNORE.*** RESPONSE in Opposition re 58 MOTION for Summary Judgment TD AMERITRADE AND TD AMERITRADE CLEARING'S MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT AND MEMORANDUM OF POINTS AND AUTHORITIES IN SUPPORT filed by Michael F Malone. (Attachments: # 1 Affidavit Declaration of Michael F. Malone in Opposition to Defendants' Summary Judgment Motion and in Support of His Cross-Motion for Partial Summary Judgment, # 2 Affidavit Declaration of R. Alan Miller in Opposition to Defendants' Summary Judgment Motion)(McKey, Jamie) Modified on 6/5/2017 (cm, ).
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 61 Filed: 6/2/2017, Entered: 6/2/2017 Unknown Document Type
Cross MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment by Michael F Malone. Responses due by 6/16/2017 (McKey, Jamie) (Additional attachment(s) added on 8/8/2017: # 1 Text of Proposed Order) (cm, ).
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 60 Filed: 5/17/2017, Entered: 5/17/2017 Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
ORDER granting 59 Motion to Amend Briefing Schedule. ORDERED Plaintiff shall file his response on or before June 2, 2017. Defendants shall file their reply, if any, on or before June 9, 2017. Signed by Magistrate Judge Kimberly C Priest Johnson on 5/17/2017. (pad, )
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 59 Filed: 5/16/2017, Entered: 5/16/2017 Unknown Document Type
Unopposed MOTION to Amend/Correct 54 Order on Motion to Amend/Correct, Briefing Schedule by Michael F Malone. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(McKey, Jamie)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 58 Filed: 5/15/2017, Entered: 5/15/2017 Unknown Document Type
MOTION for Summary Judgment TD AMERITRADE AND TD AMERITRADE CLEARING'S MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT AND MEMORANDUM OF POINTS AND AUTHORITIES IN SUPPORT by TD Ameritrade Clearing, Inc., TD Ameritrade, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit Exhibit B, # 3 Text of Proposed Order [Proposed] Order)(Sachnik, Gregory)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 57 Filed: 5/3/2017, Entered: 5/3/2017 Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
ORDER granting 56 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply re 56 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to 52 Order on Motion for Partial Summary Judgment, Order on Motion to Dismiss. Responses due by 5/15/2017. Signed by Magistrate Judge Kimberly C Priest Johnson on 5/3/17. (cm, )
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 56 Filed: 5/2/2017, Entered: 5/2/2017 Unknown Document Type
MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to 52 Order on Motion for Partial Summary Judgment, Order on Motion to Dismiss MOTION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME TO FILE RESPONSE TO PLAINTIFF'S SECOND AMENDED CLASS ACTION COMPLAINT AND MEMORANDUM OF POINTS AND AUTHORITIES IN SUPPORT by TD Ameritrade Clearing, Inc., TD Ameritrade, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Aurzada, Keith)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 55 Filed: 4/28/2017, Entered: 4/28/2017 Unknown Document Type
AMENDED COMPLAINT Second Amended Class Action Complaint against All Defendants, filed by Michael F Malone. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C, # 4 Exhibit D, # 5 Exhibit E, # 6 Exhibit F)(Kendall, Elton)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 54 Filed: 4/24/2017, Entered: 4/24/2017 Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
ORDER granting 53 Motion to Amend Briefing Schedule. Plaintiffs Response to Defendants Motion to Dismiss, if any, shall be filed on or before May 19, 2017, and Defendants Reply to Plaintiffs Response, if any, shall be filed on or before May 24, 2017. Signed by Magistrate Judge Kimberly C Priest Johnson on 4/24/17. (cm, )
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 53 Filed: 4/21/2017, Entered: 4/21/2017 Unknown Document Type
Unopposed MOTION to Amend/Correct 52 Order on Motion for Partial Summary Judgment, Order on Motion to Dismiss Briefing Schedule by Michael F Malone. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(McKey, Jamie)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 52 Filed: 4/20/2017, Entered: 4/20/2017 Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
ORDER denying as moot, without prejudice to refiling 32 Motion for Partial Summary Judgment; denying as moot, without prejudice to refiling 26 Motion to Dismiss. Signed by Magistrate Judge Kimberly C Priest Johnson on 4/20/17. (cm, )
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 51 Filed: 4/20/2017, Entered: 4/20/2017 Unknown Document Type
NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Gregory John Sachnik on behalf of TD Ameritrade Clearing, Inc., TD Ameritrade, Inc. (Sachnik, Gregory)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 50 Filed: 4/20/2017, Entered: 4/20/2017 Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Kimberly C Priest Johnson: Telephonic Status Conference held on 4/20/2017. (Court Reporter Digital Recording - Plano 108.) (ttm, )
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 49 Filed: 4/12/2017, Entered: 4/12/2017 Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
ORDER granting 48 Unopposed Motion to Continue Status Conference. The Court shall reset the telephonic status conference to Thursday, April 20, 2017, at 1:00 p.m. Signed by Magistrate Judge Kimberly C Priest Johnson on 4/12/17. (cm, )
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 48 Filed: 4/12/2017, Entered: 4/12/2017 Unknown Document Type
Unopposed MOTION to Continue Telephonic Status Conference by Michael F Malone. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(McKey, Jamie)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 47 Filed: 4/11/2017, Entered: 4/11/2017 Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
ORDER, ( Telephonic Status Conference set for 4/13/2017 11:30 PM before Magistrate Judge Kimberly C Priest Johnson.). It is, therefore, ORDERED that all parties shall appear before the undersigned, telephonically, for a status conference on Thursday, April 13, 2017, at 11:30 a.m. Signed by Magistrate Judge Kimberly C Priest Johnson on 4/11/17. (cm, )
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 46 Filed: 4/11/2017, Entered: 4/11/2017 Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
ORDER REFERRING CASE to Magistrate Judge Magistrate Judge Kimberly C Priest Johnson for all pretrial proceedings. Signed by Judge Amos L. Mazzant, III on 4/11/17. (cm, )
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 45 Filed: 4/4/2017, Entered: 4/4/2017 Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
RESPONSE to 40 Report and Recommendations, 43 Response to Non-Motion, 41 Objection to Report and Recommendations Plaintiff's Corrected Reply in Support of His Objections to the Report and Recommendation of Magistrate Judge Johnson Dated March 6, 2017 by Michael F Malone. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Text of Proposed Order)(Kendall, Elton)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 44 Filed: 4/4/2017, Entered: 4/4/2017 Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
RESPONSE to 40 Report and Recommendations, 43 Response to Non-Motion, 41 Objection to Report and Recommendations Plaintiff's Reply in Support of His Objection to the Report and Recommendation of Magistrate Judge Johnson Dated March 6, 2017 by Michael F Malone. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Text of Proposed Order)(Kendall, Elton)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 43 Filed: 3/28/2017, Entered: 3/28/2017 Unknown Document Type
RESPONSE to 40 Report and Recommendations, 41 Objection to Report and Recommendations TD AMERITRADE AND TD AMERITRADE CLEARING'S RESPONSE TO PLAINTIFF'S OBJECTIONS TO THE REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION OF MAGISTRATE JUDGE JOHNSON DATED MARCH 6, 2017 by TD Ameritrade Clearing, Inc., TD Ameritrade, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Sachnik, Gregory)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 42 Filed: 3/21/2017, Entered: 3/21/2017 Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
ORDER re 41 Objection to Report and Recommendations filed by Michael F Malone. Response shall be filed within seven (7) days of this Order. Signed by Magistrate Judge Kimberly C Priest Johnson on 3/21/17. (cm, )
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 41 Filed: 3/15/2017, Entered: 3/15/2017 Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
OBJECTION to 40 Report and Recommendations of Magistrate Judge Johnson Dated March 6, 2017 by Michael F Malone. (Kendall, Elton)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 40 Filed: 3/6/2017, Entered: 3/6/2017 Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS OF UNITED STATES MAGISTRATE JUDGE re 26 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiff's First Amended Complaint and Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Support. Signed by Magistrate Judge Kimberly C Priest Johnson on 3/6/2017. (pad, )
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 39 Filed: 3/3/2017, Entered: 3/3/2017 Unknown Document Type
REPLY to Response to Motion re 32 MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment Plaintiff's Reply Memorandum of Law in Support of Plaintiff's Cross-Motion for Partial Summary Judgment filed by Michael F Malone. (Kendall, Elton)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 38 Filed: 2/22/2017, Entered: 2/22/2017 Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
ORDER granting 37 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply re 32 MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment Replies due by 3/3/2017. Signed by Judge Amos L. Mazzant, III on 2/22/17. (cm, )
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 37 Filed: 2/15/2017, Entered: 2/15/2017 Unknown Document Type
Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to 32 MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment by Michael F Malone. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(McKey, Jamie)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 36 Filed: 2/10/2017, Entered: 2/10/2017 Unknown Document Type
REPLY to Response to Motion re 32 MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment, 26 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiff's First Amended Complaint and Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Support REPLY IN SUPPORT OF THEIR MOTION TO DISMISS PLAINTIFFS FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT AND RESPONSE IN OPPOSITION TO PLAINTIFFS CROSS-MOTION FOR PARTIAL SUMMARY JUDGMENT filed by TD Ameritrade Clearing, Inc., TD Ameritrade, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B)(Aurzada, Keith)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 35 Filed: 1/31/2017, Entered: 1/31/2017 Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
ORDER REFERRING MOTION: 26 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiff's First Amended Complaint and Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Support filed by TD Ameritrade, Inc., TD Ameritrade Clearing, Inc.. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. § 636, the Court hereby REFERS the above-referenced motion to United States Magistrate Judge Kimberly C. Priest Johnson for consideration and a determination or recommended disposition. Signed by Judge Amos L. Mazzant, III on 1/31/17. (cm, )
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 34 Filed: 1/25/2017, Entered: 1/25/2017 Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
ORDER granting 33 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply re 32 MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment, 26 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiff's First Amended Complaint and Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Support. Replies due by 2/10/2017. Signed by Judge Amos L. Mazzant, III on 1/25/17. (cm, )
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 33 Filed: 1/24/2017, Entered: 1/24/2017 Unknown Document Type
Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to 32 MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment, 26 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiff's First Amended Complaint and Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Support by TD Ameritrade Clearing, Inc., TD Ameritrade, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Aurzada, Keith)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 32 Filed: 1/20/2017, Entered: 1/20/2017 Unknown Document Type
MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment by Michael F Malone. Responses due by 2/3/2017 (Kendall, Elton) (Additional attachment(s) added on 1/23/2017: # 1 Text of Proposed Order) (cm, ).
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 31 Filed: 1/20/2017, Entered: 1/20/2017 Unknown Document Type
RESPONSE in Opposition re 26 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiff's First Amended Complaint and Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Support and in Support of Plaintiff's Cross-Motion for Partial Summary Judgment filed by Michael F Malone. (Attachments: # 1 Affidavit Declaration of Michael F. Malone in Opposition to Motion to Dismiss)(Kendall, Elton) (Additional attachment(s) added on 1/23/2017: # 2 Text of Proposed Order) (cm, ).
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 30 Filed: 1/19/2017, Entered: 1/19/2017 Unknown Document Type
NOTICE of Attorney Appearance - Pro Hac Vice by Jeffrey H Squire on behalf of Michael F Malone. Filing fee $ 100, receipt number 0540-6117552. (Squire, Jeffrey)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 29 Filed: 1/5/2017, Entered: 1/5/2017 Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
ORDER granting 28 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply re 26 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiff's First Amended Complaint and Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Support. Responses due by 1/20/2016. Signed by Judge Amos L. Mazzant, III on 1/5/17. (cm, )
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 28 Filed: 1/3/2017, Entered: 1/3/2017 Unknown Document Type
Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to 26 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiff's First Amended Complaint and Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Support by Michael F Malone. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Kendall, Elton)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 27 Filed: 12/16/2016, Entered: 12/16/2016 Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
SCHEDULING ORDER: Final Pretrial Conference set for 9/22/2017 09:00 AM in Ctrm 208 (Sherman) before Judge Amos L. Mazzant III. Amended Pleadings due by 3/7/2017. Discovery due by 5/30/2017. Expert Witness List due by 2/21/2017. Joinder of Parties due by 1/24/2017. Jury instructions due by 9/8/2017 Mediation Completion due by 5/1/2017. Motions due by 3/21/2017. Motions in Limine due by 8/23/2017. Proposed Pretrial Order due by 8/23/2017. Signed by Judge Amos L. Mazzant, III on 12/16/16. (cm, )
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 26 Filed: 12/16/2016, Entered: 12/16/2016 Unknown Document Type
MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiff's First Amended Complaint and Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Support by TD Ameritrade Clearing, Inc., TD Ameritrade, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1, # 2 Text of Proposed Order)(Aurzada, Keith)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 25 Filed: 11/30/2016, Entered: 11/30/2016 Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
ORDER GRANTING MOTION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME TO FILE RESPONSE TO PLAINTIFFS FIRST AMENDED CLASS ACTION COMPLAINT granting 24 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply. Responses due by 12/16/2016. Signed by Judge Amos L. Mazzant, III on 11/30/16. (cm, ) Modified on 11/30/2016 (cm, ).
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 24 Filed: 11/29/2016, Entered: 11/29/2016 Unknown Document Type
Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply to Plaintiff's First Amended Class Action Complaint (DE 20) and Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Support by TD Ameritrade Clearing, Inc., TD Ameritrade, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Aurzada, Keith)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 23 Filed: 11/28/2016, Entered: 11/28/2016 Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
ORDER - Before the Court is Plaintiffs Unopposed Motion to Enter Scheduling Order (Dkt. 18 ). The Court, having considered the motion, finds Plaintiffs Unopposed Motion to Enter Scheduling Order should be and is hereby DENIED. Signed by Judge Amos L. Mazzant, III on 11/28/2016. (baf, )
Request RequestSpace LREF
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 22 Filed: 11/28/2016, Entered: 11/28/2016 Unknown Document Type
REPORT of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting. (Kendall, Elton)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 21 Filed: 11/22/2016, Entered: 11/22/2016 Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
ORDER finding as moot 8 Motion to Dismiss; granting 19 Unopposed Motion for Leave to File First Amended Complaint. Signed by Judge Amos L. Mazzant, III on 11/22/16. (cm, )
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 20 Filed: 11/18/2016, Entered: 11/18/2016 Unknown Document Type
AMENDED COMPLAINT First Amended Class Action Complaint against TD Ameritrade Clearing, Inc., TD Ameritrade, Inc., filed by Michael F Malone.(Kendall, Elton)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 19 Filed: 11/17/2016, Entered: 11/17/2016 Unknown Document Type
Unopposed MOTION for Leave to File First Amended Complaint by Michael F Malone. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit First Amended Complaint, # 2 Text of Proposed Order)(Kendall, Elton)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 18 Filed: 11/9/2016, Entered: 11/9/2016 Unknown Document Type
Unopposed MOTION to Enter Scheduling Order re 17 Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply, 15 Order, Set Deadlines/Hearings by Michael F Malone. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Kendall, Elton)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 17 Filed: 10/25/2016, Entered: 10/25/2016 Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
ORDER granting 16 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply re 8 MOTION to Dismiss Complaint and Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Support Responses due by 11/17/2016. Replies due by 12/1/2016. Signed by Judge Amos L. Mazzant, III on 10/25/16. (cm, )
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 16 Filed: 10/24/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
Joint MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to 8 MOTION to Dismiss Complaint and Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Support by Michael F Malone. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Kendall, Elton) (Entered: 10/24/2016)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 15 Filed: 10/24/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
ORDER GOVERNING PROCEEDINGS, ( Management Conference set for 12/13/2016 03:00 PM in Ctrm 208 (Sherman) before Judge Amos L. Mazzant III.) Signed by Judge Amos L. Mazzant, III on 10/24/16. (cm, ) (Entered: 10/24/2016)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 14 Filed: 10/11/2016, Entered: 10/11/2016 Unknown Document Type
CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by TD Ameritrade Clearing, Inc., TD Ameritrade, Inc. identifying Corporate Parent TD Ameritrade Holding Corporation for TD Ameritrade Clearing, Inc., TD Ameritrade, Inc.. (Aurzada, Keith)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 13 Filed: 10/11/2016, Entered: 10/11/2016 Unknown Document Type
Additional Attachments to Main Document: 8 MOTION to Dismiss Complaint and Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Support.. (Aurzada, Keith)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 12 Filed: 10/11/2016, Entered: 10/11/2016 Unknown Document Type
Additional Attachments to Main Document: 8 MOTION to Dismiss Complaint and Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Support.. (Aurzada, Keith)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 11 Filed: 10/11/2016, Entered: 10/11/2016 Unknown Document Type
Additional Attachments to Main Document: 8 MOTION to Dismiss Complaint and Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Support.. (Aurzada, Keith)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 10 Filed: 10/11/2016, Entered: 10/11/2016 Unknown Document Type
Additional Attachments to Main Document: 8 MOTION to Dismiss Complaint and Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Support.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1D)(Aurzada, Keith)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 9 Filed: 10/11/2016, Entered: 10/11/2016 Unknown Document Type
Additional Attachments to Main Document: 8 MOTION to Dismiss Complaint and Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Support.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1A, # 2 Exhibit 1B)(Aurzada, Keith)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 8 Filed: 10/11/2016, Entered: 10/11/2016 Unknown Document Type
MOTION to Dismiss Complaint and Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Support by TD Ameritrade Clearing, Inc., TD Ameritrade, Inc.. (Aurzada, Keith) (Additional attachment(s) added on 10/12/2016: # 1 Text of Proposed Order) (cm, ).
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7 Filed: 10/5/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
NOTICE of Attorney Appearance - Pro Hac Vice by John Michael Clear on behalf of All Defendants. Filing fee $ 100, receipt number 0540-5970304. (Clear, John) (Entered: 10/05/2016)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 6 Filed: 9/6/2016, Entered: 9/6/2016 Unknown Document Type
Defendant's Unopposed First Application for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint re TD Ameritrade Clearing, Inc., TD Ameritrade, Inc..( Aurzada, Keith)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5 Filed: 8/30/2016, Entered: 8/30/2016 Unknown Document Type
SUMMONS Returned Executed by Michael F Malone. TD Ameritrade Clearing, Inc. served on 8/18/2016, answer due 9/8/2016. (daj, )
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4 Filed: 8/30/2016, Entered: 8/30/2016 Unknown Document Type
SUMMONS Returned Executed by Michael F Malone. TD Ameritrade, Inc. served on 8/18/2016, answer due 9/8/2016. (daj, )
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 3 Filed: 8/17/2016, Entered: 8/17/2016 Unknown Document Type
SUMMONS Issued as to TD Ameritrade Clearing, Inc.. (cm, )
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2 Filed: 8/17/2016, Entered: 8/17/2016 Unknown Document Type
SUMMONS Issued as to TD Ameritrade, Inc.. (cm, )
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1 Filed: 8/16/2016, Entered: 8/16/2016 Unknown Document Type
COMPLAINT Class Action against All Defendants ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0540-5888625.), filed by Michael F Malone. (Attachments: # 1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Kendall, Elton)
Request RequestSpace LREF

Statistics

This case has been viewed 31 times.

Space
Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
 
PlainSite
Sign Up
Need Password Help?