Thorco Shipping A/S v. Schroder Marine Services, Inc.
Federal Civil Lawsuit Texas Southern District Court, Case No. 4:16-cv-02021

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Last Updated December 4, 2018 at 7:59 PM ST (2.8 years ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo Thorco Shipping A/S, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Eastham Watson et al

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED William A Durham +1 713 225 0905 +1 713 225 2907 durham@easthamlaw.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Holland & Knight, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Patrick Joseph Sweeney +1 212 513 3547 +1 212 341 7122 patrick.sweeney@hklaw.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Phelps Dunbar, LLP (Baton Rouge)

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Kevin Jacob LaVie +1 504 584 9211 +1 504 568 9130 laviek@phelps.com
Space Marcus Rene Tucker +1 713 626 1386 Marcus.Tucker@phelps.com
v.
No Logo Schroder Marine Services, Inc., Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Brown Sims, PC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Michael D. Williams +1 713 629 1580 +1 713 629 5027 mwilliams@brownsims.com
Citation Section 28 U.S.C. § 1333
Nature of Suit 120 - Contract: Marine
  Entries (6) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 6 Filed: 9/28/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
Final DISMISSAL. On the parties' motion, this case is dismissed without prejudice 5 . Case terminated on 9/28/2016. (Signed by Judge Lynn N Hughes) Parties notified. (ghassan, 4) (Entered: 09/29/2016)
    Request RequestSpace LREF
    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5 Filed: 9/27/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
    Joint MOTION to Dismiss Without Prejudice by Thorco Shipping A/S, filed. Motion Docket Date 10/18/2016. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(Durham, William) (Entered: 09/27/2016)
      Request RequestSpace LREF
      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4 Filed: 8/19/2016, Entered: 8/19/2016 Unknown Document Type
      ANSWER to 1 Complaint by Schroder Marine Services, Inc., filed. (Attachments: # 1 Certificate off Interested Parties)(Williams, Michael)
        Request RequestSpace LREF
        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 3 Filed: 7/27/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
        RETURN of Service of SUMMONS Executed as to Schroder Marine Services, Inc. served on 7/21/2016, answer due 8/11/2016, filed.(Durham, William) (Entered: 07/27/2016)
          Request RequestSpace LREF
          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2 Filed: 7/11/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
          ORDER FOR CONFERENCE. Initial Conference set for 10/3/2016 at 09:30 AM in Room 11122 before Judge Lynn N Hughes(Signed by Judge Lynn N Hughes) Parties notified.(ckrus, 4) (Entered: 07/11/2016)
            Request RequestSpace LREF
            Blank 1 Filed: 7/8/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
            COMPLAINT against Schroder Marine Services, Inc. (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0541-16920434) filed by Thorco Shipping A/S. (Attachments: # 1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Durham, William) (Entered: 07/08/2016)
              LREF

              Statistics

              This case has been viewed 6 times.

              No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
              Space
              Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
              Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
               
              PlainSite
              Sign Up
              Need Password Help?