Beasley v. INDY Mac Bank
Federal Civil Lawsuit New York Eastern District Court, Case No. 2:16-cv-04629

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Last Updated October 12, 2018 at 6:29 PM DT (2.6 years ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

Citation Section 15 U.S.C. § 1601
Nature of Suit Truth in Lending
  Entries (31) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 39 Filed: 3/31/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
MEMORANDUM & ORDER ADOPTING REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION; Judge Tomlinson's R&R (Docket Entry 37) is ADOPTED in its entirety and the Trust's motion to dismiss (Docket Entry 23) is GRANTED. Plaintiff's claims against the Trust are DISMIS SED WITH PREJUDICE, and the Clerk of the Court is directed to TERMINATE Deutsche Bank National Trust Company as a defendant in this action. Given Plaintiff's pro se status, the Court certifies pursuant to 28 U.S.C. § 1915(a)(3) that any app eal from this Memorandum and Order would not be taken in good faith and therefore in forma pauperis status is DENIED for purposes of an appeal. The Clerk of the Court is directed to mail a copy of this Memorandum & Order to the pro se Plaintiff. So Ordered by Judge Joanna Seybert on 3/31/2018. C/M; C/ECF (Valle, Christine)
    Request RequestSpace LREF
    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 33 Filed: 7/19/2017, Entered: None Reply in Support
      Request RequestSpace LREF
      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 31 Filed: 6/2/2017, Entered: None Certificate of Service
        Request RequestSpace LREF
        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 30 Filed: 5/31/2017, Entered: None Extension of Time to File Response/Reply
          Request RequestSpace LREF
          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 29 Filed: 5/12/2017, Entered: None Summons Returned Executed
            Request RequestSpace LREF
            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 28 Filed: 5/5/2017, Entered: None Certificate of Service
              Request RequestSpace LREF
              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 27 Filed: 5/4/2017, Entered: None Letter
                Request RequestSpace LREF
                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 26 Filed: 5/4/2017, Entered: None Certificate of Service
                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 25 Filed: 4/24/2017, Entered: None Letter
                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 23 Filed: 3/9/2017, Entered: None Dismiss
                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 22 Filed: 2/10/2017, Entered: None NOTICE of Change of Address/Firm/Email
                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 21 Filed: 2/8/2017, Entered: None Certificate of Service
                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 20 Filed: 1/30/2017, Entered: None Certificate of Service
                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 19 Filed: 1/26/2017, Entered: None Letter
                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 18 Filed: 1/24/2017, Entered: None Certificate of Service
                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 17 Filed: 1/20/2017, Entered: None Corporate Disclosure Statement
                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 16 Filed: 1/20/2017, Entered: None Pre Motion Conference
                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 15 Filed: 1/13/2017, Entered: None Letter
                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 14 Filed: 12/15/2016, Entered: None Declaration
                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 13 Filed: 12/9/2016, Entered: None Extension of Time to File Answer
                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 12 Filed: 12/9/2016, Entered: None Declaration
                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 11 Filed: 12/8/2016, Entered: None Notice of Appearance
                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 10 Filed: 10/26/2016, Entered: None Summons Issued
                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 8 Filed: 8/30/2016, Entered: None Proceed In Forma Pauperis
                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7 Filed: 8/19/2016, Entered: None Notice of Related Case Assignment/Designation
                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 6 Filed: 8/19/2016, Entered: None Clerks Notice of Rule 73
                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5 Filed: 8/19/2016, Entered: None Letter
                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4 Filed: 8/19/2016, Entered: None Letter
                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 3 Filed: 8/19/2016, Entered: None Prisoner Authorization
                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2 Filed: 8/19/2016, Entered: None Proceed In Forma Pauperis
                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1 Filed: 8/19/2016, Entered: None Complaint
                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF

                                                                Statistics

                                                                This case has been viewed 8 times.

                                                                No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                                                Space
                                                                Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                 
                                                                PlainSite
                                                                Sign Up
                                                                Need Password Help?