Martegani et al v. Cirrus Design Corporation et al
Federal Civil Lawsuit New York Southern District Court, Case No. 1:08-cv-08809
District Judge John G. Koeltl, presiding

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Last Updated January 16, 2017 at 2:03 AM ST (4.8 years ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo Micaela Martegani, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Gardner Cornell, P.C.

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED James Housley Furman +1 512 454 3751 +1 512 451 5857 jfurman@furmanlawgroup.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Schlemmer & Maniatis, Llp

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Paul Neal Schlemmer +1 212 248 5060 +1 212 389 9793 pschlemmer@nyctriallawyers.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Shandell, Blitz, Blitz & Bookson, Llp

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Justin Michael Blitz +1 212 871 1300 justin@schulmanblitz.com
v.
No Logo Ballistic Recovery Systems, Inc., Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Reed Smith LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY Oliver K. Beiersdorf +1 212 549 0415 +1 212 521 5450 obeiersdorf@reedsmith.com
LEAD ATTORNEY Patrick Eugene Bradley +1 609 524 2044 +1 609 951 0824 pbradley@reedsmith.com
No Logo Cirrus Design Corporation, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Reed Smith LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Oliver K. Beiersdorf +1 212 549 0415 +1 212 521 5450 obeiersdorf@reedsmith.com
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Patrick Eugene Bradley +1 609 524 2044 +1 609 951 0824 pbradley@reedsmith.com
No Logo East End Aviation, LLC, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Ryan & Brennan LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space John O. Brennan +1 516 328 1100 +1 516 354 0814 jbrennan@rbdllp.net
No Logo Cirrus Design Corporation, ThirdParty Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Reed Smith LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Oliver K. Beiersdorf +1 212 549 0415 +1 212 521 5450 obeiersdorf@reedsmith.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Patrick Eugene Bradley +1 609 524 2044 +1 609 951 0824 pbradley@reedsmith.com
No Logo Esther Monique Savarese, ThirdParty Defendant
Citation Section 28 U.S.C. § 1332nr
Nature of Suit 315 - Personal Injury: Airplane Product Liability
  Entries (54) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 54 Filed: 3/29/2010, Entered: None Court Filing
ORDER. This case was referred to Magistrate Judge Fox for all purposes pursuant to 28 U.S.C. § 636(c) by Order of this Court dated December 18, 2009. The parties have assured the Court that the stipulation of dismissal signed by this Court on March 24, 2010 is consistent with Magistrate Judge Fox's infantcompromise Memorandum and Order dated January 22, 2010. Therefore, the Court reaffirms the Judgment of dismissal entered on March 25, 2010 and, for good cause and by agreement of the parties, vacates the reference of the case to Magistrate Judge Fox pursuant to 28 U.S.C. section 636(c)(4) and Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 73(b)(3). See Paddington Partners v. Bouchard, 950 F. Supp. 87, 89-90 (S.D.N.Y. 1996). (Signed by Judge John G. Koeltl on 3/26/10) (djc) (Entered: 04/09/2010)
    Request RequestSpace LREF
    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 53 Filed: 3/25/2010, Entered: None Court Filing
    ENDORSED LETTER addressed to Judge John G. Koeltl from James H. Furman dated 3/24/10 re: counsel for plaintiff advises the Court that there is no impediment to the Court's "so ordering" the Stipulation of Dismissal submitted to the Court by Counsel for defendant Cirrus Design Corporation on 3/10/10. Counsel for plaintiff has made disbursement of the settlement funds to Ms. Martegani in her individual and Trustee capacities. ENDORSEMENT: This letter should be filed. So Ordered. (Signed by Judge John G. Koeltl on 3/24/10) (dle) (Entered: 03/25/2010)
      Request RequestSpace LREF
      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 52 Filed: 3/25/2010, Entered: None
      CLERK'S JUDGMENT in favor of Cirrus Design Corporation against Micaela Martegani dismissing all claims against defendants with prejudice and closing third-party action with prejudice. (Signed by J. Michael McMahon, Clerk on 3/25/10) (jf) (Additional attachment(s) added on 3/25/2010: # 1 notice of right to appeal) (jf). (Entered: 03/25/2010)
        Request RequestSpace LREF
        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 51 Filed: 3/24/2010, Entered: None Court Filing
        STIPULATION OF DISMISSAL: IT IS HEREBY STIPULATED AND AGREED, by and between the undersigned attorneys of record for all the parties to the above-entitled action, that whereas no party hereto is an infant or incompetent person for whom a committee has been appointed and no person not a party has an interest in the subject matter of the action, the above-entitled action and all claims asserted therein be and hereby are dismissed, with prejudice, as against Defendants CIRRUS DESIGN CORPORATION, BALLISTIC RECOVERY SYSTEMS, INC. and EAST END AVIATION, LLC; and that all claims and cross-claims asserted by EAST END AVIATION, LLC against CIRRUS DESIGN CORPORATION and BALLISTIC RECOVERY SYSTEMS, INC. are dismissed, with prejudice; and further that Defendant third-Party Plaintiff CIRRUS DESIGN CORPORATION's third-party action as against third-party defendant ESTHER MONIQUE SAVARESE, as Executrix and Personal Representative of the Estate of SERGIO SAVARESE, deceased, is dismissed, with prejudice. All of the claims asserted in this action are dismissed without costs to either party as against the other. This stipulation may be filed without further notice with the Clerk of the Court. The Clerk is directed to enter judgment and to close this case. So Ordered. (Signed by Judge John G. Koeltl on 3/24/2010) (jfe) (Entered: 03/24/2010)
          Request RequestSpace LREF
          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 50 Filed: 1/26/2010, Entered: None Court Filing
          REDACTED MEMORANDUM AND ORDER... Based on the record, as a whole, except as noted above, the Court finds that the terms and conditions under which the infant's claims will be compromised and settled, as proposed by the parties, is fair, reasonable and in the best interests of the minor child. In order to address deficiencies in the plaintiffs' submissions, respecting attorney's fees and costs, the Settlement Amount shall be reallocated as described in this Memorandum and Order, and as further set forth. This Memorandum and Order will be filed under seal with the Clerk of Court and a redacted version (this is the redacted version) will be filed electronically. (Signed by Magistrate Judge Kevin Nathaniel Fox on 1/22/10) Copies Mailed By Chambers.(rjm) (Entered: 01/26/2010)
            Request RequestSpace LREF
            Sealed Legal Document 49 Filed: 1/25/2010, Entered: None
            SEALED DOCUMENT placed in vault.(nm) (Entered: 01/25/2010)
              Request RequestSpace LREF
              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 48 Filed: 12/21/2009, Entered: None Court Filing
              ORDER REFERRING CASE TO MAGISTRATE JUDGE. Order that case be referred to the Clerk of Court for assignment to a Magistrate Judge for Consent under 28 U.S.C. §636(c) for all purposes (including trial). Referred to Magistrate Judge Kevin Nathaniel Fox. (Signed by Judge John G. Koeltl on 12/18/2009) (tve) (Entered: 12/21/2009)
                Request RequestSpace LREF
                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 47 Filed: 12/1/2009, Entered: None Court Filing
                ORDER: IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that a hearing on the application to compromise an infant's claim shall be held in the action bearing docket number 08 Civ. 8809 on December 9, 2009, at 2:30 p.m., in courtroom 6A, 500 Pearl Street, New York, New York. So Ordered (Signed by Magistrate Judge Kevin Nathaniel Fox on 12/1/09) (js) (Entered: 12/02/2009)
                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 46 Filed: 10/15/2009, Entered: None Court Filing
                  ORDER: The docket sheet maintained by the Clerk of Court, for the first-captioned action above, reflects that a "Consent Motion to Appoint Guardian ad Litem" (Docket Entry No. 39) remains unresolved. However, the Court addressed this motion with the parties during a telephonic conference on August 13, 2009. At that time, it was determined that a guardian ad litem was not needed. Consequently, for the reasons discussed during the August 13, 2009 telephonic conference with the parties, the motion reflected at Docket Entry No. 39, is denied. (Signed by Magistrate Judge Kevin Nathaniel Fox on 10/15/2009) (jfe) (Entered: 10/15/2009)
                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 45 Filed: 10/7/2009, Entered: None Court Filing
                    ORDER: Therefore, IT IS HEREBY ORDERED, that, on or before October 20, 2009, Savarese supplement her September 2009 submissions by providing the following information, or an explanation for why the information is not necessary for a complete analysis of this matter by the Court: (1) the address of the decedent's place of employment; (2) the names of each defendant's insurance carrier(s), the maximum amount of coverage available under each insurance policy and the name(s) of the claim ho1der(s); (3) a complete list of each defendant's assets; (4) an itemization of the amounts requested for attorney disbursements; (5) the plaintiffs life expectancy and that of the decedent, prior to his death; (6) "all distributee's names, ages as of decedent's date of death, anticipated years of dependency and percent of net amount of settlement"; (7) whether a structured settlement exists, and, if so, the cost of any annuity; (8) the cost of the decedent's funeral, and a copy of the bill for funereal services; (9) the facts and details of any creditor's claims; (10) whether a pecuniary loss is being sought by the plaintiff; (11) the plaintiffs attorney's name, address and telephone number; and (12) any other information and supporting documentation that will aid the Court's analysis of this matter. (Signed by Magistrate Judge Kevin Nathaniel Fox on 10/6/2009) (jfe) (Entered: 10/07/2009)
                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                      Blank 44 Filed: 9/24/2009, Entered: None
                      MOTION to Seal Document Submission to Approve Settlement. Document filed by Micaela Martegani(Individually, as Surviving Spouse, and as Executrix and Personal Representative of the Estate of Ivano Luini, deseased).(Furman, James) (Entered: 09/24/2009)
                        LREF
                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 43 Filed: 9/15/2009, Entered: None Court Filing
                        ORDER: On or before September 25, 2009, the plaintiff, Micaela Martegani, shall submit a verified and properly notarized copy of her "Submissions of WrongfulDeath Compromise Settlement Proceeding Information for Purposes of Obtaining Approval of Settlement." (Signed by Magistrate Judge Kevin Nathaniel Fox on 9/15/09) (db) (Entered: 09/15/2009)
                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 42 Filed: 9/15/2009, Entered: None Court Filing
                          ENDORSED LETTER addressed to Magistrate Judge Kevin N. Fox from Oliver Beiersdorf dated 8/27/2009 re: We represent Cirrus Design Corporation ("Cirrus") in the referenced, related actions and write with the consent of plaintiffs' counsel. Accordingly, with the consent of plaintiffs' counsel, Cirrus respectfully requests that the Court modify the Orders such that Cirrus' confidential financial and insurance information need not be disclosed. ENDORSEMENT: Application denied. Any material that for good cause, should not be disseminated publicly may always be dealt with via a court-issued protective order. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Magistrate Judge Kevin Nathaniel Fox on 9/15/2009) (jmi) (Entered: 09/15/2009)
                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 41 Filed: 8/14/2009, Entered: None Court Filing
                            ORDER: That, on or before September 4,2009, the parties submit to the Court, all information recommended in: (1) the New York State Unified Court System Surrogate's Court Form, entitled "Wrongful Death Compromise Settlement Proceeding Checklist," available at http://www.nycourts.gov/forms/surrogates/wrongfuldeath.shtml; and (2) 22 N.Y.C.R.R. Uniform Rule § 207.38, for assessment by the Court, in determining the propriety of the respective proposed infant compromises. (Signed by Magistrate Judge Kevin Nathaniel Fox on 8/14/09) (db) (Entered: 08/14/2009)
                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 40 Filed: 7/29/2009, Entered: None Court Filing
                              ORDER REFERRING CASE TO MAGISTRATE JUDGE. Order that case be referred to the Clerk of Court for assignment to a Magistrate Judge for Settlement - Infant Compromise Approval. Referred to Magistrate Judge Kevin Nathaniel Fox. (Signed by Judge John G. Koeltl on 7/28/2009) (jpo) (Entered: 07/29/2009)
                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 39 Filed: 7/28/2009, Entered: None
                                CONSENT MOTION to Appoint Guardian ad Litem ad Litem and Set Minor Settlement Hearing. Document filed by Micaela Martegani(Individually, as Surviving Spouse, and as Executrix and Personal Representative of the Estate of Ivano Luini, deseased). (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order for Appointment of Guardian Ad Litem)(Furman, James) (Entered: 07/28/2009)
                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 38 Filed: 7/24/2009, Entered: None
                                  NOTICE of Settlement. Document filed by Micaela Martegani(Individually, as Surviving Spouse, and as Executrix and Personal Representative of the Estate of Ivano Luini, deseased). (Furman, James) (Entered: 07/24/2009)
                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 37 Filed: 3/30/2009, Entered: None Court Filing
                                    CIVIL SCHEDULING ORDER: No additional parties may be joined or cause of action asserted after June 24, 2009. No additional defenses may be asserted after July 8, 2009. Except for good cause shown, all fact discovery shall be commenced in time to be completed by January 20, 2010. The plaintiffs shall submit their expert report by February 19, 2010. The defendants shall submit their expert report by April 5, 2010. Except for good cause shown, all expert discovery shall be commenced in time to be completed by June 4, 2010. Dispositive motions, if any, are to be completed by July 12, 2010. A joint pretrial order, together with any motions in limine or motions to bifurcate, shall be submitted by September 6, 2010. The parties shall be ready for trial on 48 hours notice on or after September 17, 2010. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge John G. Koeltl on 3/28/2009) (tve) (Entered: 03/30/2009)
                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 36 Filed: 2/19/2009, Entered: None
                                      WAIVER OF SERVICE RETURNED EXECUTED. Document filed by Esther Monique Savarese. (Beiersdorf, Oliver) (Entered: 02/19/2009)
                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 35 Filed: 2/19/2009, Entered: None
                                        WAIVER re: Summons. Document filed by Cirrus Design Corporation.(Beiersdorf, Oliver) (Entered: 02/19/2009)
                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 34 Filed: 2/18/2009, Entered: None
                                          WAIVER re: Summons. Document filed by Cirrus Design Corporation.(Beiersdorf, Oliver) (Entered: 02/18/2009)
                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 33 Filed: 1/30/2009, Entered: None Court Filing
                                            STIPULATION: Plaintiff hereby withdraws, with prejudice, her Motion to Remand this action to the Supreme Court of the State of New York, New York County. Plaintiff has entered into a tentative settlement with defendant East End Aviation, LLC and will forthwith file a dismissal without prejudice of East End Aviation, LLC in this action. The parties agree that Plaintiff will forthwith dismiss without prejudice Ballistic Recovery Systems, Inc. from this action. ENDORSEMENT: Defendants East End Aviation, LLC and Ballistic Recovery Systems, Inc. are dismissed without prejudice by agreement. The motion to remand Docket No. 12 is withdrawn with prejudice. The Clerk is directed to close Docket No. 12. (Signed by Judge John G. Koeltl on 1/30/09) (tro) (Entered: 01/30/2009)
                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 32 Filed: 1/15/2009, Entered: None
                                              CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE of Ballistic's Answer to East End's Cross-Claims served on Schlemmer & Maniatis and Ryan, Brennan & Donnelly, LLP on 1/15/09. Service was made by ECF. Document filed by Ballistic Recovery Systems, Inc.. (Beiersdorf, Oliver) (Entered: 01/15/2009)
                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 31 Filed: 1/15/2009, Entered: None
                                                ANSWER to Complaint. Document filed by Ballistic Recovery Systems, Inc..(Beiersdorf, Oliver) (Entered: 01/15/2009)
                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 30 Filed: 1/15/2009, Entered: None
                                                  CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE of Cirrus' Answer to East End Aviation's Cross-Claims served on Schlemmer & Maniatis, LLP and Ryan, Brennan & Donnelly, LLP on 1/15/09. Service was made by ECF. Document filed by Cirrus Design Corporation. (Beiersdorf, Oliver) (Entered: 01/15/2009)
                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 29 Filed: 1/15/2009, Entered: None
                                                    ANSWER to Complaint. Document filed by Cirrus Design Corporation.(Beiersdorf, Oliver) (Entered: 01/15/2009)
                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 28 Filed: 1/5/2009, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                      JOINT STIPULATION AND ORDER EXTENDING THE TIME BY WHICH PLAINTIFF MAY FILE HER REPLY TO THE OPPOSITION TO MOTION TO REMAND, by and between the parties hereto, through their respective counsel of record, that the time by which Plaintiff may file her reply to the opposition to motion to remand filed by Defendants, Cirrus Design Corporation and Ballistic Recovery Systems, Inc., is extended from Wednesday, December 31, 2008, to January 30, 2009. The parties have previously submitted a joint stipulation for an extension of time in this action; however, the parties are attempting to work out an agreement as to Issues of removal and remand. IT IS SO STIPULATED. ( Replies due by 1/30/2009.) (Signed by Judge John G. Koeltl on 12/31/2008) (jmi) Modified on 1/16/2009 (jmi). (Entered: 01/05/2009)
                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 27 Filed: 12/29/2008, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                        ORDER FOR ADMISSION PRO HAC VICE OF JAMES H. FURMAN ON WRITTEN MOTION for plaintiff. (Signed by Judge John G. Koeltl on 12/24/08) (cd) (Entered: 12/29/2008)
                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 26 Filed: 12/29/2008, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                          JOINT STIPULATION AND ORDER EXTENDING THE TIME BY WHICH PLAINTIFF MAY FILE HER REPLY TO THE OPPOSITION TO MOTION TO REMAND by and between the parties hereto through their respective counsel of record, that the time by which Plaintiff may file her reply to the opposition to motion to remand filed by Defendants, Cirrus Design Corporation and Ballistic Recovery Systems, Inc., is extended from Friday December 5, 2008 to Wednesday December 31, 2008. SO ORDERED( Replies due by 12/31/2008.) (Signed by Judge John G. Koeltl on 12/17/2008) (jmi) (Entered: 12/29/2008)
                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 25 Filed: 12/22/2008, Entered: None
                                                            FILING ERROR - ELECTRONIC FILING FOR NON-ECF DOCUMENT - DECLARATION of TX Cert of Good Standing in Support re: 23 FIRST MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice James H. Furman. Document filed by Micaela Martegani(Individually, as Surviving Spouse, and as Executrix and Personal Representative of the Estate of Ivano Luini, deseased). (Schlemmer, Paul) Modified on 12/23/2008 (db). (Entered: 12/22/2008)
                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 24 Filed: 12/22/2008, Entered: None
                                                              FLING ERROR - ELECTRONIC FILING FOR NON-ECF DOCUMENT - AFFIDAVIT of Paul N. Schlemmer in Support re: 23 FIRST MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice James H. Furman. Document filed by Micaela Martegani(Individually, as Surviving Spouse, and as Executrix and Personal Representative of the Estate of Ivano Luini, deseased). (Schlemmer, Paul) Modified on 12/23/2008 (db). (Entered: 12/22/2008)
                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 23 Filed: 12/22/2008, Entered: None
                                                                FILING ERROR - ELECTRONIC FILING FOR NON-ECF DOCUMENT - FIRST MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice James H. Furman. Document filed by Micaela Martegani(Individually, as Surviving Spouse, and as Executrix and Personal Representative of the Estate of Ivano Luini, deseased).(Schlemmer, Paul) Modified on 12/23/2008 (db). (Entered: 12/22/2008)
                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 22 Filed: 12/8/2008, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                  ENDORSED LETTER addressed to Judge John G. Koeltl from Paul N. Schlemmer dated 12/5/2008 re: Counsel writes to request that the Court adjourn the pretrial conference scheduled for 12/8/2008 pending oral argument on the motion to remand. ENDORSEMENT: The conference is canceled. So ordered. (Signed by Judge John G. Koeltl on 12/5/2008) (tve) (Entered: 12/16/2008)
                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 21 Filed: 12/12/2008, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                    JOINT STIPULATION AND ORDER EXTENDING THE TIME BY WHICH PLAINTIFF MAY FILE HER REPLY TO THE OPPOSITION TO MOTION TO REMAND the time by which plaintiff may file her reply to the opposition to remand filed by Defendants Cirrus and Ballistic is extended from Friday 12/5/08 to Wednesday 12/31/08. ( Reply to Response to Brief due by 12/31/2008.) (Signed by Judge John G. Koeltl on 12/11/08) (cd) (Entered: 12/12/2008)
                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 20 Filed: 11/28/2008, Entered: None
                                                                      FILING ERROR - ELECTRONIC FILING FOR NON-ECF DOCUMENT (Proposed Order) - MOTION to Remand to State Court Proposed Order on Motion to Remand. Document filed by Micaela Martegani(Individually, as Surviving Spouse, and as Executrix and Personal Representative of the Estate of Ivano Luini, deseased), Micaela Martegani(on behalf of all interested beneficiaries, including Mattia Luini).(Blitz, Justin) Modified on 12/2/2008 (jar). (Entered: 11/28/2008)
                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 19 Filed: 11/28/2008, Entered: None
                                                                        MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: 18 MOTION to Remand to State Court.. Document filed by Micaela Martegani(Individually, as Surviving Spouse, and as Executrix and Personal Representative of the Estate of Ivano Luini, deseased), Micaela Martegani(on behalf of all interested beneficiaries, including Mattia Luini). (Blitz, Justin) (Entered: 11/28/2008)
                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 18 Filed: 11/28/2008, Entered: None
                                                                          MOTION to Remand to State Court. Document filed by Micaela Martegani(Individually, as Surviving Spouse, and as Executrix and Personal Representative of the Estate of Ivano Luini, deseased), Micaela Martegani(on behalf of all interested beneficiaries, including Mattia Luini). (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Exhibit A - Affidavit)(Blitz, Justin) Modified on 2/9/2009 (tro). (Entered: 11/28/2008)
                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 17 Filed: 11/26/2008, Entered: None
                                                                            MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: 12 MOTION to Remand to State Court., 16 MOTION to Remand to State Court. Re-filed. Document filed by Micaela Martegani(Individually, as Surviving Spouse, and as Executrix and Personal Representative of the Estate of Ivano Luini, deseased). (Attachments: # 1 Affidavit Furman Affidavit with Ex 1 policy, # 2 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order of Remand)(Schlemmer, Paul) (Entered: 11/26/2008)
                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 16 Filed: 11/26/2008, Entered: None
                                                                              MOTION to Remand to State Court. Document filed by Micaela Martegani(Individually, as Surviving Spouse, and as Executrix and Personal Representative of the Estate of Ivano Luini, deseased).(Schlemmer, Paul) (Entered: 11/26/2008)
                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 15 Filed: 11/25/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Opposition re: 12 MOTION to Remand to State Court.. Document filed by Cirrus Design Corporation, Ballistic Recovery Systems, Inc.. (Beiersdorf, Oliver) (Entered: 11/25/2008)
                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 14 Filed: 11/25/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                  DECLARATION of Oliver Beiersdorf in Opposition re: 12 MOTION to Remand to State Court.. Document filed by Cirrus Design Corporation, Ballistic Recovery Systems, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1 to Declaration of Oliver Beiersdorf, # 2 Exhibit 2 to Declaration of Oliver Beiersdorf)(Beiersdorf, Oliver) (Entered: 11/25/2008)
                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 13 Filed: 11/24/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                    NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by John Owen Brennan on behalf of East End Aviation, LLC (Attachments: # 1 Letter, # 2 Notice of Appearance; and fully executed Stipulation extending East End's time to answer complaint to December 24, 2008)(Brennan, John) (Entered: 11/24/2008)
                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 12 Filed: 11/14/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                      MOTION to Remand to State Court. Document filed by Micaela Martegani(Individually, as Surviving Spouse, and as Executrix and Personal Representative of the Estate of Ivano Luini, deseased), Micaela Martegani(on behalf of all interested beneficiaries, including Mattia Luini). (Attachments: # 1 Memorandum of Law, # 2 Affidavit Supporting Affidavit, # 3 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order)(Blitz, Justin) Modified on 11/18/2008 (db). (Entered: 11/14/2008)
                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 11 Filed: 11/14/2008, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                        ENDORSED LETTER addressed to Mr. Fletcher, Courtroom Deputy to Judge John G. Koeltl from William Maniatis dated 11/14/08 re: Counsel for Plaintiff request an extension of time to file their Motion to Remand, Memorandum of Law in Support, and relevant exhibits until 11/21/08. ENDORSEMENT: The papers should be filed, not on ECF until this ECF filing is set up. The Court would extend the deadlines until November 21, 2008, but there is no assurance that the Court can extend the time limit under the Rules. (Signed by Judge John G. Koeltl on 11/14/08) (tro) (Entered: 11/14/2008)
                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 10 Filed: 11/10/2008, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                          NOTICE of Hearing: Pretrial Conference set for 12/8/2008 at 04:30 PM in Courtroom 12B, 500 Pearl Street, New York, NY 10007 before Judge John G. Koeltl. (jfe) (Entered: 11/10/2008)
                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 9 Filed: 11/7/2008, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                            STIPULATION EXTENDING TIME TO ANSWER that the time for the Defendant EAST END AVIATION, LLC to appear and to answer, amend or supplement the answer as of course or to make any motion with relation to the summons or to the complaint in this action, be and the same hereby is extended to and including the 24th day of December 2008. East End Aviation, LLC answer due 12/24/2008. (Signed by Judge John G. Koeltl on 11/6/2008) (jmi) (Entered: 11/07/2008)
                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 8 Filed: 10/30/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                              THIRD PARTY COMPLAINT against Esther Monique Savarese.Document filed by Cirrus Design Corporation.(dle) (Additional attachment(s) added on 12/3/2008: # 1 3rd party complaint part 2) (dle). (Entered: 10/31/2008)
                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7 Filed: 10/30/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                                ANSWER to Complaint. Document filed by Cirrus Design Corporation.(Beiersdorf, Oliver) (Entered: 10/30/2008)
                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 6 Filed: 10/20/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                                  ANSWER to Complaint. Document filed by Ballistic Recovery Systems, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Oliver Beiersdorf Certificate of Service)(Beiersdorf, Oliver) (Entered: 10/20/2008)
                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5 Filed: 10/20/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                                    ANSWER to Complaint. Document filed by Cirrus Design Corporation. (Attachments: # 1 Oliver Beiersdorf's Certificate of Service)(Beiersdorf, Oliver) (Entered: 10/20/2008)
                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                      Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4 Filed: 10/20/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                                      AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE of Notice of Removal served on Paul N. Schlemmer, Esq. and East End Aviation, LLC on October 15, 2008. Service was made by mail. Document filed by Cirrus Design Corporation. (Beiersdorf, Oliver) (Entered: 10/20/2008)
                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 3 Filed: 10/15/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                                        RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. No Corporate Parent. Document filed by Ballistic Recovery Systems, Inc..(mbe) (Entered: 10/17/2008)
                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2 Filed: 10/15/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                                          RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. No Corporate Parent. Document filed by Cirrus Design Corporation.(mbe) (Entered: 10/17/2008)
                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1 Filed: 10/15/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                                            NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Supreme Court, County of New York. Case Number: 11980-08. (Filing Fee $ 350.00, Receipt Number 665654).Document filed by Cirrus Design Corporation, Ballistic Recovery Systems, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit)(mbe) (Entered: 10/17/2008)
                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF

                                                                                                              Space Space

                                                                                                              Statistics

                                                                                                              This case has been viewed 159 times.

                                                                                                              No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                                                                                              Space
                                                                                                              Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                              Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                               
                                                                                                              PlainSite
                                                                                                              Sign Up
                                                                                                              Need Password Help?