Keith Russell Ingersoll
Bankruptcy Case Florida Middle Bankruptcy Court, Case No. 6:11-bk-02238
District Judge Karen S. Jennemann, presiding

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Last Updated December 21, 2016 at 3:48 AM ST (4.5 years ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo Carla P Musselman, Trustee

Toggle Switch Represented by John H Meininger III PA

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space John H Meininger, III +1 407 246 1585 +1 407 246 7101
No Logo Keith Russell Ingersoll, Debtor

Toggle Switch Represented by Herron Hill Law Group, PLLC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Kenneth D Herron, Jr +1 407 648 0058
Space Peter N Hill +1 407 648 0058 +1 407 648 0681
Office of the United States Trustee Office of the United States Trustee, U.S. Trustee
Officially listed as "United States Trustee - ORL7"
  Entries (73) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 73 Filed: 10/31/2013, Entered: None
Order Approving Chapter 7 Account, Discharging Trustee, Canceling Bond and Closing Estate . Service Instructions: Clerks Office to serve. (Vivianne) (Entered: 10/31/2013)
    Request RequestSpace LREF
    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 72 Filed: 4/15/2013, Entered: None
    Transcript Regarding Hearing Held July 27, 2011 on Motion by Trustee to Sell Various Corporate Interests of the Debtor's.. To purchase a copy of this transcript, please contact Realtime Reporters, Inc: 407-884-4662 (related document(s)64). Transcript access will be restricted through 07/15/2013. (Jim) (Entered: 04/15/2013)
      Request RequestSpace LREF
      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 71 Filed: 10/29/2012, Entered: None
      Interim Report 09/30/12 Filed by Carla P Musselman. (Musselman, Carla) (Entered: 10/29/2012)
        Request RequestSpace LREF
        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 70 Filed: 8/7/2011, Entered: None
        BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document. (related document(s) (Related Doc # 68)). Service Date 08/07/2011. (Admin.) (Entered: 08/08/2011)
          Request RequestSpace LREF
          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 69 Filed: 8/6/2011, Entered: None
          BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document. (related document(s) (Related Doc # 67)). Service Date 08/06/2011. (Admin.) (Entered: 08/07/2011)
            Request RequestSpace LREF
            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 68 Filed: 8/5/2011, Entered: None
            Order Granting Motion For Relief From Stay of Mercedes-Benz Financial Services USA, LLC (Related Doc # 61) Signed on 8/5/2011. (Vicki) (Entered: 08/05/2011)
              Request RequestSpace LREF
              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 67 Filed: 8/4/2011, Entered: None
              Order Denying Motion To Sell Property Free and Clear of Liens. The Objections are Sustained. 32, 33, 34). Signed on 8/4/2011. (Vivianne) (Entered: 08/04/2011)
                Request RequestSpace LREF
                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 66 Filed: 7/27/2011, Entered: None
                Exhibit List Filed by Peter N Hill on behalf of Debtor Keith Russell Ingersoll (related document(s)64). (Attachments: 1 Exhibits 1-5) (Vivianne) (Entered: 07/29/2011)
                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 65 Filed: 7/27/2011, Entered: None
                  Exhibit List Filed by Trustee Carla P Musselman (related document(s)64). (Attachments: 1 Exhibits 1-3) (Vivianne) (Entered: 07/29/2011)
                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 64 Filed: 7/27/2011, Entered: None
                    Hearing Proceeding Memo: Hearing Held - APPEARANCES: Kenneth Herron: D'or, IWIG, LLC Carla Musselman: Tee John Meininger: Tee EVIDENCE: Trustee's Exhibits Admitted: 1-3 Objecting Parties' Exhibits Admitted: 1-5 RULING: Tagged for Audio Access. 1) Motion to Sell Property Free and Clear of Liens re: 50% Membership Interest in BK Financial Group, LLC. Filed by Trustee (Doc #33) and Objection to Trustee's Motion to Sell Property of the Estate Free and Clear of Liens re: 50% Membership Interest in BK Financial Group, LLC. Filed by Debtor (Doc #37) - Sustained. Order by Herron. 2) Motion to Sell Property Free and Clear of Liens re: 50% Membership Interest in Le Chateau Financial Group, LLC. Filed by Trustee (Doc #32) and Objection to Trustee's Motion to Sell Property of the Estate Free and Clear of Liens re: 50% Membership Interest in Le Chateau Financial Group, LLC. Filed by Debtor (Doc #39) - Sustained. Order by Herron. 3) Motion to Sell Property Free and Clear of Liens re: 50% Membership Interest in L.I. Financial Group, LLC. Filed by Trustee (Doc #34) and Amended Objection to Trustees Motion to Sell Property of the Estate Free and Clear of Liens by IWIG, LLC re: 50% Membership Interest in L.I. Financial Group, LLC. Filed by Interested Party IWIG, LLC (Doc #40) - Sustained. Order by Herron. Mr. Herron is directed to submit one Order addressing all three matters. Proposed Orders, if applicable, should be submitted within three days after the date of the hearing - Local Rule 9072-1(c). This is not an official Order of the Court.. (Dkt) (Entered: 07/28/2011)
                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 63 Filed: 7/17/2011, Entered: None
                      BNC Certificate of Mailing - Order of Discharge. (related document(s) (Related Doc # 62)). Service Date 07/17/2011. (Admin.) (Entered: 07/18/2011)
                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 62 Filed: 7/15/2011, Entered: None
                        Discharge of Debtor . Signed on 7/15/2011 (Vivianne) (Entered: 07/15/2011)
                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 61 Filed: 7/6/2011, Entered: None
                          Motion for Relief from Stay with Negative Notice. (Filing Fee Paid) Re: 2007 Mercedes S550V. Filed by Bert Echols on behalf of Creditor Mercedes-Benz Financial Services USA, LLC (Attachments: 1 Exhibit contract2 Exhibit title3 Affidavit) (Echols, Bert) Modified on 7/6/2011 (Melanie). (Entered: 07/06/2011)
                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 60 Filed: 6/29/2011, Entered: None
                            BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document. (related document(s) (Related Doc # 58)). Service Date 06/29/2011. (Admin.) (Entered: 06/30/2011)
                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 59 Filed: 6/29/2011, Entered: None
                              BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document. (related document(s) (Related Doc # 56)). Service Date 06/29/2011. (Admin.) (Entered: 06/30/2011)
                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 58 Filed: 6/27/2011, Entered: None
                                Order Granting Motion To Continue/Reschedule Hearing. The Hearings Scheduled for 6/21/11 at 2:00 PM are Continued to 7/27/11 at 2:00 PM. (Related Doc # 52, 53). Signed on 6/27/2011. (Vivianne) (Entered: 06/27/2011)
                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 57 Filed: 6/27/2011, Entered: None
                                  Amendment to Schedule B, Filing Fee Not Paid or Not Required. Filed by Kenneth D Herron Jr on behalf of Debtor Keith Russell Ingersoll. (Herron, Kenneth) (Entered: 06/27/2011)
                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 56 Filed: 6/22/2011, Entered: None
                                    Order Vacating Discharge of Debtor (related document(s)50). Signed on 6/22/2011 (Vivianne) (Entered: 06/24/2011)
                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 55 Filed: 6/21/2011, Entered: None
                                      PDF with attached Audio File. Court Date & Time [ 6/21/2011 14:18:38 ]. (ADIclerk) (Entered: 06/22/2011)
                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 54 Filed: 6/21/2011, Entered: None
                                        Hearing Proceeding Memo: Hearing Held - Tagged for Audio Access. 1) Motion to Sell Property Free and Clear of Liens re: 50% Membership Interest in BK Financial Group, LLC. Filed by Trustee (Doc #33) Objection to Trustee's Motion to Sell Property of the Estate Free and Clear of Liens re: 50% Membership Interest in BK Financial Group, LLC. Filed by Debtor (Doc #37) *2) Motion to Sell Property Free and Clear of Liens re: 50% Membership Interest in Le Chateau Financial Group, LLC. Filed by Trustee (Doc #32) Objection to Trustee's Motion to Sell Property of the Estate Free and Clear of Liens re: 50% Membership Interest in Le Chateau Financial Group, LLC. Filed by Debtor (Doc #39) *3) Motion to Sell Property Free and Clear of Liens re: 50% Membership Interest in L.I. Financial Group, LLC. Filed by Trustee (Doc #34) Amended Objection to Trustees Motion to Sell Property of the Estate Free and Clear of Liens by IWIG, LLC re: 50% Membership Interest in L.I. Financial Group, LLC. Filed by Interested Party IWIG, LLC (Doc #40) 4) Motion to Continue/Reschedule Hearing On Trustees Motion to Sell Property of the Estate Free and Clear of Liens. Filed by Debtor (Doc #52) - Granted; F.E.H. on all pending matters is set for 07/27/11 at 2:00 p.m. (1 hour). Parties are directed to exhange exhibits on or before 07/22/11 Order by Herron. 5) Motion to Continue/Reschedule Hearing On Trustees Motion to Sell Property of the Estate Free and Clear of Liens. Filed by IWIG, LLC (Doc #53) - Granted; F.E.H. on all pending matters is set for 07/27/11 at 2:00 p.m. (1 hour). Parties are directed to exhange exhibits on or before 07/22/11 Order by Herron. Proposed Orders, if applicable, should be submitted within three days after the date of the hearing - Local Rule 9072-1(c). This is not an official Order of the Court.. (Dkt) (Entered: 06/21/2011)
                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 53 Filed: 6/20/2011, Entered: None
                                          Motion to Continue/Reschedule Hearing On Trustees Motion to Sell Property of the Estate Free and Clear of Liens (50% Membership Interest in L.I. Financial Group, LLC) and Amended Objection by IWIG, LLC to Trustees Motion to Sell Property of the Estate Free and Clear of Liens (50% Membership Interest in L.I. Financial Group, LLC) Scheduled for 6/21/2011 Filed by Kenneth D Herron Jr on behalf of Interested Party IWIG, LLC (related document(s)45, 40, 34). (Herron, Kenneth) (Entered: 06/20/2011)
                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 52 Filed: 6/20/2011, Entered: None
                                            Motion to Continue/Reschedule Hearing On Trustees Motion to Sell Property of the Estate Free and Clear of Liens (50% Membership Interest in Le Chateau Financial Group, LLC), Trustees Motion to Sell Property of the Estate Free and Clear of Liens (50% Membership Interest in BK Financial Group, LLC), Trustees Motion to Sell Property of the Estate Free and Clear of Liens (50% Membership Interest in L.I. Financial Group, LLC), Debtors Objection to Trustees Motion to Sell Property of the Estate Free and Clear of Liens (50% Membership Interest in BK Financial Group, LLC), Debtors Objection to Trustees Motion to Sell Property of the Estate Free and Clear of Liens (50% Membership Interest in L.I. Financial Group, LLC), Debtors Objection to Trustees Motion to Sell Property of the Estate Free and Clear of Liens (50% Membership Interest in Le Chateau Financial Group, LLC) and Amended Objection by IWIG, LLC to Trustees Motion to Sell Property of the Estate Free and Clear of Liens (50% Membership Interest in L.I. Financial Group, LLC) Scheduled for 6/21/2011 Filed by Kenneth D Herron Jr on behalf of Debtor Keith Russell Ingersoll (related document(s)32, 37, 38, 45, 39, 33, 44, 43, 40, 34). (Herron, Kenneth) (Entered: 06/20/2011)
                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 51 Filed: 6/3/2011, Entered: None
                                              BNC Certificate of Mailing - Order of Discharge. (related document(s) (Related Doc # 50)). Service Date 06/03/2011. (Admin.) (Entered: 06/04/2011)
                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 50 Filed: 6/1/2011, Entered: None
                                                Discharge of Debtor . Signed on 6/1/2011 (Vivianne) (Entered: 06/01/2011)
                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 49 Filed: 5/27/2011, Entered: None
                                                  Certification of Completion of Instructional Course Concerning Personal Financial Management with Certificate of Debtor Education Provided by Agency Attached. Date Course was Completed: 5/27/2011 . Filed by Kenneth D Herron Jr on behalf of Debtor Keith Russell Ingersoll. (Herron, Kenneth) (Entered: 05/27/2011)
                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 48 Filed: 5/18/2011, Entered: None
                                                    BNC Certificate of Mailing - Notice of Hearing (related document(s) (Related Doc # 45)). Service Date 05/18/2011. (Admin.) (Entered: 05/19/2011)
                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 47 Filed: 5/18/2011, Entered: None
                                                      BNC Certificate of Mailing - Notice of Hearing (related document(s) (Related Doc # 44)). Service Date 05/18/2011. (Admin.) (Entered: 05/19/2011)
                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 46 Filed: 5/18/2011, Entered: None
                                                        BNC Certificate of Mailing - Notice of Hearing (related document(s) (Related Doc # 43)). Service Date 05/18/2011. (Admin.) (Entered: 05/19/2011)
                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 45 Filed: 5/16/2011, Entered: None
                                                          Notice of Evidentiary Hearing on Motion to Sell Property Free and Clear of Liens 50% Membership Interest in L.I. Financial Group, LLC and Objection (related document(s)40, 34). Hearing scheduled for 6/21/2011 at 02:00 PM at Orlando, FL - Courtroom B, 5th Floor, 135 W. Central Boulevard. (Vivianne) (Entered: 05/16/2011)
                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 44 Filed: 5/16/2011, Entered: None
                                                            Notice of Evidentiary Hearing on Motion to Sell Property Free and Clear of Liens - 50% Membership Interest in Le Chateau Financial Group, LLC and Objection. (related document(s)32, 39). Hearing scheduled for 6/21/2011 at 02:00 PM at Orlando, FL - Courtroom B, 5th Floor, 135 W. Central Boulevard. (Vivianne) (Entered: 05/16/2011)
                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 43 Filed: 5/16/2011, Entered: None
                                                              Notice of Evidentiary Hearing on Motion to Sell Property Free and Clear of Liens 50% Membership Interest in BK Financial Group, LLC and Objection. (related document(s)37, 33). Hearing scheduled for 6/21/2011 at 02:00 PM at Orlando, FL - Courtroom B, 5th Floor, 135 W. Central Boulevard. (Vivianne) (Entered: 05/16/2011)
                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 42 Filed: 5/15/2011, Entered: None
                                                                BNC Certificate of Mailing. (related document(s) (Related Doc # 41)). Service Date 05/15/2011. (Admin.) (Entered: 05/16/2011)
                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 41 Filed: 5/12/2011, Entered: None
                                                                  Notice of Requirement to File a Statement of Completion of Course in Personal Financial Management. Failure to file a certification within 60 days after the first date set for the meeting of creditors will result in the case being closed without an entry of discharge. (ADIclerk) (Entered: 05/12/2011)
                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 40 Filed: 5/11/2011, Entered: None
                                                                    Amended Objection to Trustees Motion to Sell Property of the Estate Free and Clear of Liens by IWIG, LLC (50% Membership Interest in L.I. Financial Group, LLC)(Doc. 34) Amended as to Signature Block Filed by Peter N Hill on behalf of Interested Party IWIG, LLC (related document(s)34, 38). (Hill, Peter) Modified on 5/12/2011 (Vivianne). (Entered: 05/11/2011)
                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 39 Filed: 5/11/2011, Entered: None
                                                                      Objection to Trustee's Motion to Sell Property of the Estate Free and Clear of Liens (50% Membership Interest in Le Chateau Financial Group, LLC)(Doc. 32) Filed by Peter N Hill on behalf of Debtor Keith Russell Ingersoll (related document(s)32). (Hill, Peter) (Entered: 05/11/2011)
                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 38 Filed: 5/11/2011, Entered: None
                                                                        Objection to Trustee's Motion to Sell Property of the Estate Free and Clear of Liens (50% Membership Interest in L.I. Financial Group, LLC)(Doc. 34) Filed by Peter N Hill on behalf of Debtor Keith Russell Ingersoll (related document(s)34). (Hill, Peter) (Entered: 05/11/2011)
                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 37 Filed: 5/11/2011, Entered: None
                                                                          Objection to Trustee's Motion to Sell Property of the Estate Free and Clear of Liens (50% Membership Interest in BK Financial Group, LLC)(Doc. 33) Filed by Peter N Hill on behalf of Debtor Keith Russell Ingersoll (related document(s)33). (Hill, Peter) (Entered: 05/11/2011)
                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 36 Filed: 5/11/2011, Entered: None
                                                                            Objection to Trustee's Motion to Sell Property of the Estate Free and Clear of Liens (50% Membership Interest in L.I. Financial Group, LLC)(Doc. 34) by IWIG LLC Filed by Peter N Hill on behalf of Debtor Keith Russell Ingersoll (related document(s)34). (Hill, Peter) (Entered: 05/11/2011)
                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 35 Filed: 4/21/2011, Entered: None
                                                                              BNC Certificate of Mailing. (related document(s) (Related Doc # 31)). Service Date 04/21/2011. (Admin.) (Entered: 04/22/2011)
                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 34 Filed: 4/20/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                Motion to Sell Property Free and Clear of Liens 50% Membership Interest in L.I. Financial Group, LLC. with 21 Days Negative Notice. Filed by John H Meininger III on behalf of Trustee Carla P Musselman (Attachments: 1 Exhibit "A" - Assignment Of Membership Interest Agreement2 Current Mailing Matrix) (Meininger, John) Modified on 4/21/2011 (Vivianne). (Entered: 04/20/2011)
                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 33 Filed: 4/20/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                  Motion to Sell Property Free and Clear of Liens 50% Membership Interest in BK Financial Group, LLC. with 21 Days Negative Notice. Filed by John H Meininger III on behalf of Trustee Carla P Musselman (Attachments: 1 Exhibit "A" - Assignment Of Membership Interest Agreement2 Current Mailing Matrix) (Meininger, John) Modified on 4/21/2011 (Vivianne). (Entered: 04/20/2011)
                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 32 Filed: 4/20/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                    Motion to Sell Property Free and Clear of Liens - 50% Membership Interest in Le Chateau Financial Group, LLC. with 21 Days Negative Notice. Filed by John H Meininger III on behalf of Trustee Carla P Musselman (Attachments: 1 Exhibit "A" - Assignment Of Membership Interest Agreement2 Current Mailing Matrix) (Meininger, John) Modified on 4/21/2011 (Vivianne). (Entered: 04/20/2011)
                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 31 Filed: 4/18/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                      Notice of the Deadline to file Proofs of Claim, served upon all creditors and parties in interest. Proofs of Claims due by 07/21/2011. (ADIclerk) (Entered: 04/18/2011)
                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 30 Filed: 4/18/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                        Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice Filed by Bert Echols on behalf of Creditor Mercedes-Benz Financial Services USA, LLC. (Echols, Bert) (Entered: 04/18/2011)
                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 29 Filed: 4/16/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                          BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document. (related document(s) (Related Doc # 28)). Service Date 04/16/2011. (Admin.) (Entered: 04/17/2011)
                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 28 Filed: 4/14/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                            Order Approving Application to Employ/Retain John Henry Meininger III and the law firm of Meininger and Meininger PA as Attorney for Trustee (Related Doc # 26). Signed on 4/14/2011. (Vivianne) (Entered: 04/14/2011)
                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 27 Filed: 4/13/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                              Declaration re: Application To Appoint Attorney Filed by John H Meininger III on behalf of Attorney for Trustee John Henry Meininger III. (Meininger, John) (related document 26) Modified on 4/13/2011 (Vivianne). (Entered: 04/13/2011)
                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 26 Filed: 4/12/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                Application to Employ John Henry Meininger III and the law firm of Meininger and Meininger PA as Attorney Filed by Carla P Musselman. (Musselman, Carla) (Entered: 04/12/2011)
                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 25 Filed: 4/1/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                  Notice of Change of Address of Creditors, MGM Staging & Exotic Car Gallery Filed by Kenneth D Herron Jr on behalf of Debtor Keith Russell Ingersoll. (Herron, Kenneth) (Entered: 04/01/2011)
                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 24 Filed: 3/31/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                    Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice Filed by James P Paul on behalf of Creditor Tony Gram. (Maggie) (Entered: 03/31/2011)
                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                      Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 23 Filed: 3/20/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                      BNC Certificate of Mailing - Order (related document(s) (Related Doc # 20)). Service Date 03/20/2011. (Admin.) (Entered: 03/21/2011)
                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 22 Filed: 3/18/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                        BNC Certificate of Mailing - Order (related document(s) (Related Doc # 17)). Service Date 03/18/2011. (Admin.) (Entered: 03/19/2011)
                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 21 Filed: 3/18/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                          BNC Certificate of Mailing - Notice to Creditors and Parties in Interest (related document(s) (Related Doc # 18)). Service Date 03/18/2011. (Admin.) (Entered: 03/19/2011)
                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 20 Filed: 3/18/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                            Order Determining Debtor's Compliance with Filing Requirements of Section 521(a) . Signed on 3/18/2011 (Vivianne) (Entered: 03/18/2011)
                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 19 Filed: 3/16/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                              Certificate of Service Re: Notice of Chapter 7 Bankruptcy Case, Meeting of Creditors and Deadlines with Social Security Number furnished to Mercedes Benz Fin Srvc and RBC Bank Lending Svc Ctr Filed by Kenneth D Herron Jr on behalf of Debtor Keith Russell Ingersoll (related document(s)18). (Herron, Kenneth) (Entered: 03/16/2011)
                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 18 Filed: 3/16/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                Notice of Deficient Filing. (1) The amendment was not served as required by Fed. R. Bankr. P. 1009(a) and Local Rule 1009-1, with written proof of service provided to the Court. (2) A copy of the Notice of Bankruptcy Case, Meeting of Creditors and Deadlines (Section 341 Meeting Notice), containing the full social security number was not served on the additional creditors, with written proof of service provided to the Court. (related document(s)13). (Vivianne) (Entered: 03/16/2011)
                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 17 Filed: 3/16/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                  Order Determining Debtor's Compliance with Filing Requirements of Section 521(a) . Signed on 3/16/2011 (Vivianne) (Entered: 03/16/2011)
                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 16 Filed: 3/16/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                    Certificate of Service Re: Notice of Chapter 7 Bankruptcy Case, Meeting of Creditors, & Deadlines served on additional creditors Filed by Kenneth D Herron Jr on behalf of Debtor Keith Russell Ingersoll (related document(s)5). (Herron, Kenneth) (Entered: 03/16/2011)
                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 15 Filed: 3/16/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                      Notice of Change of Address for Ingersoll White Investment G Filed by Kenneth D Herron Jr on behalf of Debtor Keith Russell Ingersoll. (Herron, Kenneth) (Entered: 03/16/2011)
                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 14 Filed: 3/15/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                        Declaration Under Penalty of Perjury for Electronic Filing Regarding Summary and Schedules A-J, Statement of Financial Affairs, Individual Debtor's Statement of Intentions, Chapter 7 Statement of Currently Monthly Income and Means-Test Calculation, Notice to Consumer Debtors Under Sec. 342(b) of the Bankruptcy Code Filed by Kenneth D Herron Jr on behalf of Debtor Keith Russell Ingersoll. (Herron, Kenneth) (Entered: 03/15/2011)
                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 13 Filed: 3/15/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                          Schedules A - J and Summary of Schedules, Statement of Financial Affairs, Individual Debtor's Statement of Intentions, Chpater 7 Statement of Current Monthly Income and Means-Test Calculation, Notice to Consumer Debtors Unders Sec. 342(b) of the Bankruptcy Code (Fee Paid.) Filed by Kenneth D Herron Jr on behalf of Debtor Keith Russell Ingersoll (related document(s)6). (Herron, Kenneth) (Entered: 03/15/2011)
                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 12 Filed: 3/9/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                            BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document. (related document(s) (Related Doc # 11)). Service Date 03/09/2011. (Admin.) (Entered: 03/10/2011)
                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 11 Filed: 3/4/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                              Order Granting Motion to Extend Time Until 3/15/11 to File Lists, Schedules and Statements. (Related Doc # 10). Signed on 3/4/2011. (Vivianne) (Entered: 03/07/2011)
                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 10 Filed: 3/3/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                Motion to Extend Time Until 3/15/11 to File Lists, Schedules and Statements. Filed by Kenneth D Herron Jr on behalf of Debtor Keith Russell Ingersoll (related document(s)6). (Herron, Kenneth) Modified on 3/4/2011 (Vivianne). (Entered: 03/03/2011)
                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 9 Filed: 3/2/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                  Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice Filed by Philip D Storey on behalf of Creditor Michael A O'Quinn. (Storey, Philip) (Entered: 03/02/2011)
                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 8 Filed: 2/25/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                    BNC Certificate of Mailing - Notice of Meeting of Creditors. (related document(s) (Related Doc # 5)). Service Date 02/25/2011. (Admin.) (Entered: 02/26/2011)
                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7 Filed: 2/25/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                      BNC Certificate of Mailing - Notice to Creditors and Parties in Interest (related document(s) (Related Doc # 6)). Service Date 02/25/2011. (Admin.) (Entered: 02/26/2011)
                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 6 Filed: 2/23/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                        Notice of Deficient Filing. Summary of Schedules, Statistical Summary, Schedules A-J, Statement of Financial Affairs, Statement of Income, Statement of Intent, Disclosure of Compensationi . Statement of Intent due 3/23/2011. (Ahyen) (Entered: 02/23/2011)
                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5 Filed: 2/23/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                          Notice of Commencement of Case, Section 341 Meeting of Creditors, and Fixing Deadlines . Section 341(a) meeting to be held on 3/30/2011 at 10:00 AM at Orlando, FL (6-60) - 135 West Central Blvd., 6th Floor, Suite 600. Last day to oppose discharge or dischargeability is 5/31/2011. (Ahyen) (Entered: 02/23/2011)
                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4 Filed: 2/21/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                            Certificate of Credit Counseling. Date Course was Completed: 02/20/2011. Filed by Kenneth D Herron Jr on behalf of Debtor Keith Russell Ingersoll. (Herron, Kenneth) (Entered: 02/21/2011)
                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 3 Filed: 2/21/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                              Declaration Under Penalty of Perjury for Electronic Filing Regarding Petition Filed by Kenneth D Herron Jr on behalf of Debtor Keith Russell Ingersoll. (Herron, Kenneth) (Entered: 02/21/2011)
                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2 Filed: 2/21/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                Statement of Debtors Social Security Numbers Filed by Kenneth D Herron Jr on behalf of Debtor Keith Russell Ingersoll. (Herron, Kenneth) (Entered: 02/21/2011)
                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                  Blank 1 Filed: 2/21/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                  Voluntary Petition under Chapter 7. (Fee Paid.). Schedules and Statements Not Filed Statement of Financial Affairs Not Filed. Disclosure of Compensation Not Filed or Not Required. Statement of Income and Means Test Calcul ation Not Filed. Filed by Kenneth D Herron Jr on behalf of Keith Russell Ingersoll. (Herron, Kenneth) (Entered: 02/21/2011)
                                                                                                                                                    LREF

                                                                                                                                                    Statistics

                                                                                                                                                    This case has been viewed 1,620 times.

                                                                                                                                                    No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                                                                                                                                    Space
                                                                                                                                                    Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                                                                    Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                                                                     
                                                                                                                                                    PlainSite
                                                                                                                                                    Sign Up
                                                                                                                                                    Need Password Help?