Christopher Mark Paris
Bankruptcy Case Florida Middle Bankruptcy Court, Case No. 8:16-bk-03463
District Judge K. Rodney May, presiding

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Last Updated November 10, 2016 at 3:39 AM ST (4.9 years ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo Christopher Mark Paris, Debtor

Toggle Switch Represented by The Stohlman Law Firm, LLC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Charles T Stohlman +1 863 603 0856 +1 863 603 9677
No Logo Larry S. Hyman, Trustee
No Logo United States Trustee - TPA7/13, U.S. Trustee
  Entries (14) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Blank 14 Filed: 8/26/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
BNC Certificate of Mailing - Order of Discharge. (related document(s) (Related Doc # 12)). Notice Date 08/26/2016. (Admin.) (Entered: 08/27/2016)
    LREF
    Blank 13 Filed: 8/23/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
    Order Approving Chapter 7 Account, Discharging Trustee, Canceling Bond and Closing Estate . Service Instructions: Clerks Office to serve. (Pamella) (Entered: 08/23/2016)
      LREF
      Blank 12 Filed: 8/23/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
      Discharge of Debtor . Service Instructions: Clerks Office to serve. (Pamella) (Entered: 08/23/2016)
        LREF
        Blank 11 Filed: 8/22/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
        Certificate of Debtor Education Concerning Financial Management Received from Agency. Date Course was Completed: 8/22/16 . Filed by Charles T Stohlman on behalf of Debtor Christopher Mark Paris. (Stohlman, Charles) (Entered: 08/22/2016)
          LREF
          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 10 Filed: 8/7/2016, Entered: None
          BNC Certificate of Mailing - Order (related document(s) (Related Doc # 9)). Notice Date 08/07/2016. (Admin.) (Entered: 08/08/2016)
            Request RequestSpace LREF
            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 9 Filed: 8/5/2016, Entered: None
            Order Withholding Entry of Discharge. Deficiency to be cured: Personal Financial Management. Service Instructions: Clerks Office to serve. (JEANINE) (Entered: 08/05/2016)
              Request RequestSpace LREF
              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 8 Filed: 7/17/2016, Entered: None
              BNC Certificate of Mailing. (related document(s) (Related Doc # 7)). Notice Date 07/17/2016. (Admin.) (Entered: 07/18/2016)
                Request RequestSpace LREF
                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7 Filed: 7/14/2016, Entered: None
                Notice of Requirement to File a Statement of Completion of Course in Personal Financial Management. Failure to file a certification within 60 days after the first date set for the meeting of creditors will result in the case being closed without an entry of discharge. (ADIclerk) (Entered: 07/14/2016)
                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 6 Filed: 6/21/2016, Entered: None
                  Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice Filed by Evan S Singer on behalf of Creditor Ditech Financial LLC. (Singer, Evan) (Entered: 06/21/2016)
                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5 Filed: 4/27/2016, Entered: None
                    BNC Certificate of Mailing - Notice of Meeting of Creditors. (related document(s) (Related Doc # 4)). Notice Date 04/27/2016. (Admin.) (Entered: 04/28/2016)
                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4 Filed: 4/25/2016, Entered: None
                      Notice of Commencement of Case, Section 341 Meeting of Creditors, and Fixing Deadlines . Section 341(a) meeting to be held on 5/31/2016 at 01:30 PM at Tampa, FL (862) - Room 100-C, Timberlake Annex, 501 E. Polk Street. Last day to oppose discharge or dischargeability is 8/1/2016. (Jeffery H.) (Entered: 04/25/2016)
                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 3 Filed: 4/24/2016, Entered: None
                        Certificate of Credit Counseling. Date Course was Completed: December 23, 2015. Filed by Charles T Stohlman on behalf of Debtor Christopher Mark Paris. (Stohlman, Charles) (Entered: 04/24/2016)
                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2 Filed: 4/24/2016, Entered: None
                          Statement of Debtors Social Security Numbers Filed by Charles T Stohlman on behalf of Debtor Christopher Mark Paris. (Stohlman, Charles) (Entered: 04/24/2016)
                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                            Blank 1 Filed: 4/24/2016, Entered: None
                            Voluntary Petition under Chapter 7. (Fee Paid.). Schedules and Summary of Assets. Statement of Financial Affairs. Statement of Intentions. Disclosure of Compensation. Statement of Income and Means Test Calculation. Filed by Charles T Stohlman on behalf of Christopher Mark Paris. (Stohlman, Charles) (Entered: 04/24/2016)
                              LREF

                              Statistics

                              This case has been viewed 4,229 times.

                              No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                              Space
                              Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                              Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                               
                              PlainSite
                              Sign Up
                              Need Password Help?