District Appellate Supreme
Federal
Arizona District Court Court of Appeals for the Ninth Circuit United States Supreme Court

USA v. Arpaio et al
Criminal Case Arizona District Court, Case No. 2:16-cr-01012-SRB

Tags
Last Updated November 2, 2017 at 11:27 PM DT (3.5 years ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

United States of America United States of America, Plaintiff
Officially listed as "USA"
No Logo Arpaio, Joseph M., Defendant (1)
Officially listed as "Joseph M Arpaio"

Toggle Switch Represented by 233 Broadway

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Sheriff Andrew Melvin McDonald, Jr. +1 602 263 1700 +1 602 200 7847 melmcdonald2@gmail.com
Space Andrew Melvin McDonald, Jr. +1 602 263 1700 +1 602 200 7847 melmcdonald2@gmail.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Jones, Skelton & Hochuli, P.L.C.

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Sheriff Justin Michael Ackerman +1 602 263 1740 jackerman@jshfirm.com
Sheriff Joseph John Popolizio +1 602 263 1700 +1 602 200 7876 jpopolizio@jshfirm.com
No Logo Ramon Gomez, Movant

Note: Criminal cases with multiple defendants may have several records with the same case number: one record for the master file (all defendants), as well as one record per defendant. It can often be difficult to tell which record is which. Other likely matches for this case include:

Office Phoenix Division
Filed 8/19/2016
County Maricopa
Terminated
Reopened
Other Court Case None
Count 1
Citation Section 18 U.S.C. § 401.F
Offense Level 4
18401 - Criminal Contempt
Defendant Custody Status
  Entries (209) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 218 Filed: 8/14/2017, Entered: 8/14/2017 Motion for Acquittal
MOTION for Acquittal Defendants Motion for a Judgment of Acquittal by Joseph M Arpaio. (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit Exhibit A)(Wilenchik, John)
    Request RequestSpace LREF
    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 217 Filed: 8/14/2017, Entered: 8/14/2017 Motion for New Trial
    MOTION for New Trial Defendants Motion for New Trial and/or to Vacate the Judgment by Joseph M Arpaio. (Wilenchik, John)
      Request RequestSpace LREF
      Legal Document 216 Filed: 8/10/2017, Entered: 8/10/2017 Notice (Other)
      NOTICE Defendant's Waiver of Presentence Investigation Report by Joseph M Arpaio. (Goldman, Mark)
        LREF
        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 219 Filed: 8/7/2017, Entered: 8/16/2017 TranscriptCourt Filing
        NOTICE OF FILING OF OFFICIAL TRANSCRIPT of TELEPHONIC CONFERENCE proceedings as to Joseph M Arpaio held on 08/03/2017, before Judge Susan R. Bolton. (Court Reporter: Elizabeth A. Lemke). The ordering party will have electronic access to the transcript immediately. All others may view the transcript at the court public terminal or it may be purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber by filing a Transcript Order Form on the docket before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Redaction Request due 8/28/2017. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 9/7/2017. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 11/6/2017. (RAP)
          Request RequestSpace LREF
          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 215 Filed: 8/3/2017, Entered: 8/3/2017 Transcript RequestCourt Filing
          TRANSCRIPT REQUEST by Joseph M Arpaio for proceedings held on 08/03/2017, Judge Susan R Bolton hearing judge(s). (Goldman, Mark)
            Request RequestSpace LREF
            Legal Document 214 Filed: 8/3/2017, Entered: 8/3/2017 Order on Motion for ReconsiderationCourt Filing
            ORDER as to Joseph M Arpaio: IT IS ORDERED denying [198] Defendant's Motion for Reconsideration of Court's Order Dated July 5, 2017 [Doc. 193] [see attached Order for details]. Signed by Judge Susan R Bolton on 8/3/17.(MAW)
              LREF
              Legal Document 213 Filed: 8/3/2017, Entered: 8/3/2017 Telephone ConferenceCourt Filing
              MINUTE ENTRY for proceedings held before Judge Susan R Bolton: Telephonic Conference as to Joseph M Arpaio held on 8/3/2017. Discussion held. If Defendant wishes to waive the presentence investigation report, IT IS ORDERED that a waiver, signed by both counsel and Defendant, shall be filed no later than August 10, 2017. If no waiver is filed, the presentence investigation report process will proceed. The parties are advised of General Order 15-12, which states that no more than 10 character letters shall be submitted by defense counsel in a criminal case, IT IS ORDERED that if the Government was intending to offer letters for sentencing the Government is also limited to 10 letters. All letters shall be submitted to the Court [not filed electronically] by September 29, 2017. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that any motions for upward departure or downward departure and any sentencing memoranda shall be filed no later than September 29, 2017. IT IS ORDERED that not later than September 29, 2017, the following information shall be filed with the Court: the name(s) of the witness(es) either party intends to call at sentencing and the number of other individuals each party intends to have make a statement at sentencing. Each party is limited to 10 individuals who will address the Court either by a statement or through testimony at sentencing [see attached minute entry for details]. (Court Reporter Liz Lemke) Hearing held 9:20 AM to 9:44 AM.(MAW)
                LREF
                Blank 212 Filed: 8/1/2017, Entered: 8/1/2017 Set HearingsCourt Filing
                MINUTE ORDER as to Joseph M Arpaio: On July 31, 2017, an e-mail was sent to all the Assistant United States Attorneys and Defense attorneys who appeared in this case to inquire about counsels' availability for a telephonic conference. AUSA John Keller and Defense counsel Dennis Wilenchik have responded to the e-mail advising of their availability on Thursday, August 3, 2017, at 9:00 am. IT IS ORDERED setting Telephonic Conference on August 3, 2017, at 9:00 a.m. before Judge Susan R. Bolton. The Court will initiate the telephonic conference call. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (MAW)
                  LREF
                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 211 Filed: 8/1/2017, Entered: 8/1/2017 Order on Motion for Directed VerdictCourt Filing
                  ORDER as to Joseph M Arpaio (1): At the bench trial held in this matter the Court took Government's offer of Exhibit 38 and Defendant's offer of Exhibit 183 under advisement. IT IS ORDERED admitting Exhibit 183. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED sustaining Defense counsel's objection to the admission of Exhibit 38. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED denying Defendant's oral Rule 29 Motion for Judgment of Acquittal (Doc. [186]). Signed by Judge Susan R Bolton on 8/1/17.(MAW)
                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                    Legal Document 210 Filed: 7/31/2017, Entered: 7/31/2017 OrderCourt Filing
                    ORDER as to Joseph M Arpaio: IT IS ORDERED finding Defendant guilty of criminal contempt. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED setting Sentencing for October 5, 2017 at 10:00 a.m. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED directing the Probation Department to prepare a presentence investigation report [see attached Order for details]. Signed by Judge Susan R Bolton on 7/31/17.(MAW)
                      LREF
                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 209 Filed: 7/27/2017, Entered: 7/27/2017 Transcript RequestCourt Filing
                      TRANSCRIPT REQUEST by Richard K. Walker of Walker & Peskind, PLLC as to Joseph M Arpaio for proceedings held on 06/26/2017-06/29/2017, Judge Susan R Bolton hearing judge(s). (RAP)
                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 208 Filed: 7/25/2017, Entered: 7/25/2017 Order on Motion for Leave to FileCourt Filing
                        ORDER as to Joseph M Arpaio: IT IS ORDERED denying as moot Defendant's Motion for Leave to File Motion to Strike "United States' Trial Memorandum" (Doc. [165]). IT IS FURTHER ORDERED denying as moot Defendant's Motion to Strike "United States' Trial Memorandum" (Doc. [165-1]) [see attached Order for details]. Signed by Judge Susan R Bolton on 7/25/17.(MAW)
                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 207 Filed: 7/21/2017, Entered: 7/21/2017 Memorandum
                          MEMORANDUM by USA as to Joseph M Arpaio . (Cataldo, Simon)
                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 206 Filed: 7/21/2017, Entered: 7/21/2017 Memorandum
                            MEMORANDUM by Joseph M Arpaio re: [199] Order on Motion for Acquittal, Bench Trial - Completed . (Wilenchik, Dennis)
                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 205 Filed: 7/6/2017, Entered: 7/18/2017 TranscriptCourt Filing
                              NOTICE OF FILING OF OFFICIAL TRANSCRIPT of BENCH TRIAL - DAY #5 (Pages 959 through 1112, Inclusive.) proceedings as to Joseph M Arpaio held on 07/06/2017, before Judge Susan R. Bolton. (Court Reporter: Elizabeth A. Lemke). The ordering party will have electronic access to the transcript immediately. All others may view the transcript at the court public terminal or it may be purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber by filing a Transcript Order Form on the docket before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Redaction Request due 7/27/2017. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 8/7/2017. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 10/4/2017. (RAP)
                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 204 Filed: 7/6/2017, Entered: 7/7/2017 Minute Order
                                MINUTE ORDER RE EXHIBITS as to Joseph M Arpaio: IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that the exhibits marked but not admitted in the above-entitled case at the time of the trial/hearing are returned to respective counsel. Counsel/agents are directed to retain custody of the exhibits until the case has been completely terminated, including all appeals. (MAW)
                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 203 Filed: 7/6/2017, Entered: 7/7/2017 Exhibit
                                  EXHIBIT LIST by Joseph M Arpaio. (MAW)
                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 202 Filed: 7/6/2017, Entered: 7/7/2017 Exhibit
                                    EXHIBIT LIST by USA as to Joseph M Arpaio. (MAW)
                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 201 Filed: 7/6/2017, Entered: 7/7/2017 Witness List
                                      WITNESS LIST by Joseph M Arpaio. (MAW)
                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 200 Filed: 7/6/2017, Entered: 7/7/2017 Witness List
                                        WITNESS LIST by USA as to Joseph M Arpaio. (MAW)
                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 199 Filed: 7/6/2017, Entered: 7/6/2017 Order on Motion for AcquittalCourt Filing
                                          MINUTE ENTRY for proceedings held before Judge Susan R Bolton: Bench Trial [Day 5] as to Joseph M Arpaio completed on 7/6/2017.IT IS ORDERED taking this matter under advisement. At the request of counsel for the Government, counsel may file simultaneous briefs regarding legal authorities (not to exceed 7 pages) no later than 5:00 p.m., (Mountain Standard Time) on July 21, 2017. No responses or replies may be filed. For reasons as stated on the record, IT IS ORDERED denying Defendant's Motion for a Judgment of Acquittal re: Statute of Limitations, Section 402 (Doc. [188]) [see attached minute entry for details]. (Court Reporter Liz Lemke) Hearing held 9:01 AM to 2:09 PM.(MAW)
                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 198 Filed: 7/5/2017, Entered: 7/5/2017, Terminated: 8/3/2017 Motion for Reconsideration
                                            MOTION for Reconsideration re: [193] Order by Joseph M Arpaio. (Wilenchik, Dennis)
                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 197 Filed: 7/5/2017, Entered: 7/5/2017 Transcript RequestCourt Filing
                                              TRANSCRIPT REQUEST by USA as to Joseph M Arpaio for proceedings held on 6/26/2017 - 6/29/2017, Judge Susan R Bolton hearing judge(s). (Cataldo, Simon)
                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 196 Filed: 7/5/2017, Entered: 7/5/2017 Notice (Other)
                                                *AMENDED NOTICE Defendants Amended Noticeof Submission of Specific Objections and Counter Designations re Defendants Prior Statements by Joseph M Arpaio. (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit)(Wilenchik, Dennis) *Modified text on 7/6/2017 (KAS).
                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 195 Filed: 7/5/2017, Entered: 7/5/2017 Notice (Other)
                                                  NOTICE Defendants Notice of Submission of Specific Objections and Counter Designations re Defendants Prior Statements by Joseph M Arpaio. (Wilenchik, Dennis)
                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 194 Filed: 7/5/2017, Entered: 7/5/2017 Notice (Other)
                                                    *RESPONSE to Minute Entry [190] Defendants Notice Objections to Exhibits 37a-t by Joseph M Arpaio. (Wilenchik, Dennis) *Modified to correct event type on 7/6/2017 (KAS).
                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 193 Filed: 7/5/2017, Entered: 7/5/2017 OrderCourt Filing
                                                      ORDER as to Joseph M Arpaio: On June 29, 2017 (Doc. [190]) Defense counsel requested permission to file written objections to the Government's offer of Exhibits 37A through 37T.1 in lieu of making his objections orally. The request was granted, and Defense counsel was ordered to file the written objections prior to July 5, 2017. Defense counsel having filed no written objections, IT IS ORDERED admitting Exhibits 37A through 37T.1. Signed by Judge Susan R Bolton on 7/5/17.(MAW)
                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 192 Filed: 6/30/2017, Entered: 6/30/2017 TranscriptCourt Filing
                                                        NOTICE OF FILING OF OFFICIAL TRANSCRIPT of BENCH TRIAL - DAY 4 - P.M. SESSION (Pages 897 through 958, inclusive.) proceedings as to Joseph M Arpaio held on 06/29/2017, before Judge Susan R. Bolton. (Court Reporter: Linda Schroeder). The ordering party will have electronic access to the transcript immediately. All others may view the transcript at the court public terminal or it may be purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber by filing a Transcript Order Form on the docket before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Redaction Request due 7/21/2017. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 7/31/2017. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 9/28/2017. (RAP)
                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 191 Filed: 6/30/2017, Entered: 6/30/2017 TranscriptCourt Filing
                                                          NOTICE OF FILING OF OFFICIAL TRANSCRIPT of BENCH TRIAL - DAY #4 - A.M. SESSION (Pages 792 through 896, Inclusive.) proceedings as to Joseph M Arpaio held on 06/29/2017, before Judge Susan R. Bolton. (Court Reporter: Elizabeth A. Lemke). The ordering party will have electronic access to the transcript immediately. All others may view the transcript at the court public terminal or it may be purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber by filing a Transcript Order Form on the docket before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Redaction Request due 7/21/2017. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 7/31/2017. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 9/28/2017. (RAP)
                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 189 Filed: 6/30/2017, Entered: 6/30/2017 Order on Motion for Leave to FileCourt Filing
                                                            ORDER as to Joseph M Arpaio (1): IT IS ORDERED granting Defendant's Motion for Leave to File Motion for Change of Venue (Doc. [171]). IT IS FURTHER ORDERED denying Defendant's Motion for Change of Venue (Doc. [171]) [see attached Order for details]. Signed by Judge Susan R Bolton on 6/30/17.(MAW)
                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 190 Filed: 6/29/2017, Entered: 6/30/2017 Order on Motion for Leave to FileCourt Filing
                                                              MINUTE ENTRY for proceedings held before Judge Susan R Bolton: Bench Trial [Day 4] as to Joseph M Arpaio held on 6/29/2017. IT IS ORDERED granting Defendant's Motion for Leave to File Motion to Stay [166]. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED denying Defendant's Motion to Stay District Court Proceedings Pending Resolution of the Petition for Writ of Mandamus of Joseph M. Arpaio in the Supreme Court of the United States of America [166]. Trial continued to 7/6/2017 [see attached minute entry for details]. (Court Reporter Liz Lemke [a.m.] / Linda Schroeder [p.m.]) Hearing held 9:01 AM to 2:44 PM.(MAW)
                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                Blank 188 Filed: 6/29/2017, Entered: 6/29/2017, Terminated: 7/6/2017 Motion for Acquittal
                                                                MOTION for Acquittal re Statute of Limitations, Section 402 by Joseph M Arpaio. (Wilenchik, Dennis)
                                                                  LREF
                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 185 Filed: 6/29/2017, Entered: 6/29/2017 TranscriptCourt Filing
                                                                  NOTICE OF FILING OF OFFICIAL TRANSCRIPT of BENCH TRIAL - DAY 3 - P.M. SESSION (Pages 660 through 791, inclusive.) proceedings as to Joseph M Arpaio held on 06/28/2017, before Judge Susan R. Bolton. (Court Reporter: Linda Schroeder). The ordering party will have electronic access to the transcript immediately. All others may view the transcript at the court public terminal or it may be purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber by filing a Transcript Order Form on the docket before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Redaction Request due 7/20/2017. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 7/31/2017. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 9/27/2017. (RAP)
                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 184 Filed: 6/29/2017, Entered: 6/29/2017 TranscriptCourt Filing
                                                                    NOTICE OF FILING OF OFFICIAL TRANSCRIPT of BENCH TRIAL - DAY #3 - A.M. SESSION (Pages 535 through 659, Inclusive.) proceedings as to Joseph M Arpaio held on 06/28/2017, before Judge Susan R. Bolton. (Court Reporter: Elizabeth A. Lemke). The ordering party will have electronic access to the transcript immediately. All others may view the transcript at the court public terminal or it may be purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber by filing a Transcript Order Form on the docket before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Redaction Request due 7/20/2017. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 7/31/2017. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 9/27/2017. (RAP)
                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                      Blank 187 Filed: 6/28/2017, Entered: 6/29/2017 Order on Motion for Directed VerdictCourt Filing
                                                                      MINUTE ENTRY for proceedings held before Judge Susan R Bolton: Bench Trial [Day 3] as to Joseph M Arpaio held on 6/28/2017. IT IS ORDERED taking under advisement [186] Oral Motion for Directed Verdict as to Joseph M Arpaio (1). Evidence entered. Trial continued to 6/29/2017 [see attached minute entry for details]. (Court Reporter Liz Lemke [a.m.] / Linda Schroeder [p.m.]) Hearing held 9:01 AM to 4:15 PM.(MAW)
                                                                        LREF
                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 186 Filed: 6/28/2017, Entered: 6/29/2017 Motion for Directed Verdict
                                                                        ORAL MOTION for Directed Verdict by Joseph M Arpaio. (MAW)
                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 183 Filed: 6/28/2017, Entered: 6/28/2017 Notice (Other)
                                                                          NOTICE of Submission of Specific Objections and Counter-Designations re MacIntyre by Joseph M Arpaio. (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit)(Wilenchik, Dennis)
                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 182 Filed: 6/28/2017, Entered: 6/28/2017 Reply to Response
                                                                            REPLY TO RESPONSE to Motion by Joseph M Arpaio re: [165] MOTION for Leave to File Motion to Strike United States Trial Memorandum DEFENDANTS REPLY TO GOVERNMENTS RESPONSE TO DEFENDANTS MOTION TO STRIKE UNITED STATES TRIAL MEMORANDUM AND FOR CURATIVE MEASURES. (Mayr, Vincent)
                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 181 Filed: 6/28/2017, Entered: 6/28/2017 TranscriptCourt Filing
                                                                              NOTICE OF FILING OF OFFICIAL TRANSCRIPT of BENCH TRIAL - DAY 2 - P.M. SESSION (Pages 406 through 534, inclusive.) proceedings as to Joseph M Arpaio held on 06/27/2017, before Judge Susan R. Bolton. (Court Reporter: Linda Schroeder). The ordering party will have electronic access to the transcript immediately. All others may view the transcript at the court public terminal or it may be purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber by filing a Transcript Order Form on the docket before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Redaction Request due 7/19/2017. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 7/31/2017. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 9/26/2017. (RAP)
                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 180 Filed: 6/28/2017, Entered: 6/28/2017 TranscriptCourt Filing
                                                                                NOTICE OF FILING OF OFFICIAL TRANSCRIPT of BENCH TRIAL - DAY #2 - A.M. SESSION (Pages 265 through 405, Inclusive.) proceedings as to Joseph M Arpaio held on 06/27/2017, before Judge Susan R. Bolton. (Court Reporter: Elizabeth A. Lemke). The ordering party will have electronic access to the transcript immediately. All others may view the transcript at the court public terminal or it may be purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber by filing a Transcript Order Form on the docket before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Redaction Request due 7/19/2017. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 7/31/2017. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 9/26/2017. (RAP)
                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 179 Filed: 6/27/2017, Entered: 6/28/2017 Bench Trial - HeldCourt Filing
                                                                                  MINUTE ENTRY for proceedings held before Judge Susan R Bolton: Bench Trial [Day 2] as to Joseph M Arpaio held on 6/27/2017. Evidence entered. Trial continued to 6/28/2017 [see attached minute entry for details]. (Court Reporter Liz Lemke [a.m.] / Linda Schroeder [p.m.]) Hearing held 9:01 AM to 4:19 PM.(MAW) Modified on 6/28/2017 to reflect names of both court reporters (MAW).
                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 178 Filed: 6/27/2017, Entered: 6/27/2017 Order on Motion to QuashCourt Filing
                                                                                    ORDER as to Joseph M Arpaio (1): IT IS ORDERED granting Government's Motion to Quash Defendant's Trial Subpoena to U.S. Attorney General Jefferson Beauregard Sessions (Doc. [161]). IT IS FURTHER ORDERED quashing Defendant's Trial Subpoena to U.S. Attorney General Jefferson Beauregard Sessions [see attached Order for details]. Signed by Judge Susan R Bolton on 6/27/17.(MAW)
                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 176 Filed: 6/27/2017, Entered: 6/27/2017 TranscriptCourt Filing
                                                                                      NOTICE OF FILING OF OFFICIAL TRANSCRIPT of BENCH TRIAL - DAY 1 - P.M. SESSION (Pages 123 through 264, inclusive.) proceedings as to Joseph M Arpaio held on 06/26/2017, before Judge Susan R. Bolton. (Court Reporter: Linda Schroeder). The ordering party will have electronic access to the transcript immediately. All others may view the transcript at the court public terminal or it may be purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber by filing a Transcript Order Form on the docket before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Redaction Request due 7/18/2017. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 7/28/2017. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 9/25/2017. (RAP)
                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 175 Filed: 6/27/2017, Entered: 6/27/2017 TranscriptCourt Filing
                                                                                        NOTICE OF FILING OF OFFICIAL TRANSCRIPT of BENCH TRIAL - DAY #1 - A.M. SESSION (Pages 1 through 122, Inclusive.) proceedings as to Joseph M Arpaio held on 06/26/2017, before Judge Susan R. Bolton. (Court Reporter: Elizabeth A. Lemke). The ordering party will have electronic access to the transcript immediately. All others may view the transcript at the court public terminal or it may be purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber by filing a Transcript Order Form on the docket before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Redaction Request due 7/18/2017. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 7/28/2017. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 9/25/2017. (RAP)
                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                          Blank 177 Filed: 6/26/2017, Entered: 6/27/2017 Bench Trial - BegunCourt Filing
                                                                                          MINUTE ENTRY for proceedings held before Judge Susan R Bolton: Bench Trial [Day 1] begun on 6/26/2017 as to Joseph M Arpaio (1). Evidence entered. Trial continued to 6/27/2017 [see attached minute entry for details]. (Court Reporter Liz Lemke [a.m.]/ Linda Schroeder [p.m.]) Hearing held 9:02 AM to 4:26 PM. (MAW)
                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                            Blank 174 Filed: 6/26/2017, Entered: 6/26/2017 Additional Attachments to Main Document
                                                                                            Additional Attachments to Main Document re: [170] Response in Opposition by USA as to Joseph M Arpaio, Gerard Sheridan, Steven R Bailey, Michele M Iafrate. (Cataldo, Simon)
                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 173 Filed: 6/23/2017, Entered: 6/23/2017 Response in Opposition
                                                                                              RESPONSE in Opposition by USA as to Joseph M Arpaio re: [171] MOTION for Leave to File Motion for Change of Venue . (Keller, John)
                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 172 Filed: 6/22/2017, Entered: 6/22/2017 Reply to Response
                                                                                                REPLY TO RESPONSE to Motion by USA as to Joseph M Arpaio re: [161] MOTION to Quash Subpoena of U.S. Attorney General . (Cataldo, Simon)
                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 171 Filed: 6/22/2017, Entered: 6/22/2017, Terminated: 6/30/2017 Motion for Leave to File
                                                                                                  MOTION for Leave to File Motion for Change of Venue by Joseph M Arpaio. (Attachments: # (1) Text of Proposed Order Granting Defendant's Motion for Leave to File Motion for Change of Venue, # (2) Text of Proposed Order Granting Motion for Change of Venue)(Mayr, Vincent)
                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 170 Filed: 6/22/2017, Entered: 6/22/2017 Response in Opposition
                                                                                                  RESPONSE in Opposition by USA as to Joseph M Arpaio re: [166] MOTION for Leave to File Motion to Stay District Court Proceedings Pending Resolution of the Petition for Writ of Mandamus of Joseph M. Arpaio in the Supreme Court of the United States of America . (Cataldo, Simon)
                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 169 Filed: 6/22/2017, Entered: 6/22/2017 Transcript RequestCourt Filing
                                                                                                    TRANSCRIPT REQUEST by Joseph M Arpaio for proceedings held on June 26, 2017, Judge Susan R Bolton hearing judge(s). (Wilenchik, Dennis)
                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                      Blank 168 Filed: 6/21/2017, Entered: 6/21/2017 Response in Opposition
                                                                                                      RESPONSE in Opposition by USA as to Joseph M Arpaio re: [165] MOTION for Leave to File Motion to Strike United States Trial Memorandum . (Keller, John)
                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                        Blank 167 Filed: 6/21/2017, Entered: 6/21/2017 Response to Motion
                                                                                                        RESPONSE to Motion by Joseph M Arpaio re: [161] MOTION to Quash Subpoena of U.S. Attorney General Defendants Response to Government's Motion to Quash Defendant's Trial Subpoena to US Attonrney General Jefferson Beauregard Sessions. (Wilenchik, Dennis)
                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                          Blank 166 Filed: 6/20/2017, Entered: 6/20/2017, Terminated: 6/29/2017 Motion for Leave to File
                                                                                                          MOTION for Leave to File Motion to Stay District Court Proceedings Pending Resolution of the Petition for Writ of Mandamus of Joseph M. Arpaio in the Supreme Court of the United States of America by Joseph M Arpaio. (Attachments: # (1) Text of Proposed Order Order Granting Motion for Leave to File Motion to Stay District Court Proceedings, # (2) Text of Proposed Order Order Staying Proceedings Pending Resolution of the Petition for Writ of Mandamus of Joseph M. Arpaio in the Supreme Court of the U.S.A.)(Mayr, Vincent)
                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                          Blank 165 Filed: 6/20/2017, Entered: 6/20/2017, Terminated: 7/25/2017 Motion for Leave to File
                                                                                                          MOTION for Leave to File Motion to Strike United States Trial Memorandum by Joseph M Arpaio. (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit)(Wilenchik, Dennis)
                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 164 Filed: 6/20/2017, Entered: 6/20/2017 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                          ORDER as to Joseph M Arpaio: The Court is in receipt of the Government's Motion to Quash Defendant's Trial Subpoena to U.S. Attorney General Jefferson Beauregard Sessions (Doc. [161]). IT IS ORDERED directing Defense counsel to file a response no later than 5:00 p.m., June 21, 2017. The Government shall file its reply no later than Noon, June 23, 2017. Signed by Judge Susan R Bolton on 6/20/17.(MAW)
                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                            Blank 163 Filed: 6/20/2017, Entered: 6/20/2017 Notice of Attorney Appearance/Association - Defendant
                                                                                                            NOTICE OF ATTORNEY APPEARANCE: Vincent Rene Mayr appearing for Joseph M Arpaio . (Mayr, Vincent)
                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                              Blank 162 Filed: 6/19/2017, Entered: 6/19/2017 Trial Brief
                                                                                                              TRIAL BRIEF by USA as to Joseph M Arpaio. (Keller, John)
                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                Blank 161 Filed: 6/19/2017, Entered: 6/19/2017, Terminated: 6/27/2017 Motion to Quash
                                                                                                                MOTION to Quash Subpoena of U.S. Attorney General by USA as to Joseph M Arpaio. (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit A, # (2) Text of Proposed Order)(Keller, John)
                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                Blank 160 Filed: 6/16/2017, Entered: 6/16/2017 Order on Motion for LeaveCourt Filing
                                                                                                                ORDER granting [154] Government's Motion for Leave to Supplement Exhibit List as to Joseph M Arpaio (1). Signed by Judge Susan R Bolton on 6/16/17.(MAW)
                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                  Blank 159 Filed: 6/16/2017, Entered: 6/16/2017 Order on Motion to QuashCourt Filing
                                                                                                                  ORDER as to Joseph M Arpaio: IT IS ORDERED denying Special Appearance of Non-Party Timothy J. Casey and Motion to Quash Subpoena (Doc. [96]). IT IS FURTHER ORDERED denying Non-Party Timothy J. Casey's Renewed Motion to Quash Subpoena (Doc. [147]) [see attached Order for details]. Signed by Judge Susan R Bolton on 6/16/17.(MAW)
                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 158 Filed: 6/16/2017, Entered: 6/16/2017, Terminated: 6/19/2017 Stipulation
                                                                                                                    STIPULATION by USA as to Joseph M Arpaio. (Keller, John)
                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 157 Filed: 6/15/2017, Entered: 6/15/2017 Transcript RequestCourt Filing
                                                                                                                      AMENDED TRANSCRIPT REQUEST pursuant to [156] Notice of Deficiency by USA as to Joseph M Arpaio for proceedings held on 6-26-17 -- End of Trial, Judge Susan R Bolton hearing judge(s). (Keller, John)
                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 156 Filed: 6/15/2017, Entered: 6/15/2017 Notice of Deficiency re Transcript Request
                                                                                                                        NOTICE TO FILER OF DEFICIENCY re: AO435 [155] Transcript Request filed by USA. Item 18 - ORDER: (CATEGORY) No category box was checked. FOLLOW-UP ACTION REQUIRED: Please refile with the appropriate box checked under the ORIGINAL + 1 column. Deficiency must be corrected within one business day of this notice. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (RAP)
                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 155 Filed: 6/14/2017, Entered: 6/14/2017 Transcript RequestCourt Filing
                                                                                                                          TRANSCRIPT REQUEST by USA as to Joseph M Arpaio for proceedings held on 6-26-17 - End of Trial, Judge Susan R Bolton hearing judge(s). (Keller, John)
                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 154 Filed: 6/14/2017, Entered: 6/14/2017, Terminated: 7/7/2017 Motion for Leave
                                                                                                                            First MOTION for Leave to Supplement Exhibit List by USA as to Joseph M Arpaio, Gerard Sheridan, Steven R Bailey, Michele M Iafrate. (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit A, # (2) Exhibit B, # (3) Text of Proposed Order)(Cataldo, Simon)
                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 153 Filed: 6/13/2017, Entered: 6/13/2017 Lodged Proposed Document
                                                                                                                              *LODGED Proposed Trial Subpoena by Joseph M Arpaio. Document to be filed by Clerk if Motion or Stipulation for Leave to File or Amend is granted.. (Attachments: # (1) Supplement Trial Subpoena, # (2) Supplement Trial Subpoena, # (3) Supplement Trial Subpoena, # (4) Supplement Trial Subpoena, # (5) Supplement Trial Subpoena, # (6) Supplement Trial Subpoena, # (7) Supplement Trial Subpoena, # (8) Supplement Trial Subpoena, # (9) Supplement Trial Subpoena, # (10) Supplement Trial Subpoena, # (11) Supplement Trial Subpoena)(Wilenchik, Dennis) Modified on 6/16/2017 - CD notified attorney's office of procedure - not to issue (MAW).
                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 152 Filed: 6/13/2017, Entered: 6/13/2017 Order on Motion for Miscellaneous ReliefCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                ORDER as to Joseph M. Arpaio: IT IS ORDERED granting in part and denying in part Defendant Arpaio's Motion to Clarify Background and History of the "Civil Contempt" Admission (Doc. [102]). IT IS FURTHER ORDERED denying Motion Requesting a Voluntariness Hearing and Supplement in Support of Defendant Arpaio's Motion to Clarify Background and History of the "Civil Contempt" Admission (Doc. [105]) [see attached Order for details]. Signed by Judge Susan R Bolton on 6/13/17.(MAW)
                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                  Blank 151 Filed: 5/31/2017, Entered: 5/31/2017 Order on Motion for Miscellaneous ReliefCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                  ORDER denying [98] Defendant's Motion to Preclude Alleged "Victim" Testimony as to Joseph M Arpaio (1) [see attached Order for details]. Signed by Judge Susan R Bolton on 5/31/17.(MAW)
                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 150 Filed: 5/31/2017, Entered: 5/31/2017 USCA Order
                                                                                                                                    ORDER of USCA denying Petition for Rehearing as to Joseph M Arpaio re: 17-71094. (LSP)
                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 149 Filed: 5/31/2017, Entered: 5/31/2017 Order on Motion for ReconsiderationCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                      ORDER denying [133] Motion for Reconsideration of Order Denying "Motion to Dismiss, or in the Alternative for Jury Trial" as to Joseph M Arpaio (1). Signed by Judge Susan R Bolton on 5/31/17.(MAW)
                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 148 Filed: 5/31/2017, Entered: 5/31/2017 Order on Motion to ExcludeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                        ORDER denying [104] Motion to Prohibit the Introduction of Constitutionally Protected Campaign Statements as to Joseph M Arpaio (1) [see attached Order details]. Signed by Judge Susan R Bolton on 5/31/17.(MAW)
                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 147 Filed: 5/26/2017, Entered: 5/26/2017, Terminated: 6/16/2017 Motion to Quash
                                                                                                                                          MOTION to Quash by Timothy Casey as to Joseph M Arpaio. (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit, # (2) Text of Proposed Order)(Clark, Karen)
                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                          Blank 146 Filed: 5/19/2017, Entered: 5/19/2017 USCA Order
                                                                                                                                          ORDER of USCA denying the Writ of Mandamus as to Joseph M Arpaio re: 17-71094. (LSP)
                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                            Blank 145 Filed: 5/18/2017, Entered: 5/18/2017 Notice (Other)
                                                                                                                                            NOTICE Rule 12.3 Notice of Public Authority Defense by Joseph M Arpaio. (Wilenchik, Dennis)
                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 144 Filed: 5/2/2017, Entered: 5/2/2017 Notice (Other)
                                                                                                                                              USCA Case Number re Writ of Mandamus, Ninth Circuit Case number 17-71094. (LSP)
                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                Legal Document 142 Filed: 4/23/2017, Entered: 4/28/2017 TranscriptCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                NOTICE OF FILING OF OFFICIAL TRANSCRIPT of MOTION HEARING proceedings as to Joseph M Arpaio held on 04/12/2017, before Judge Susan R. Bolton. (Court Reporter: Elizabeth A. Lemke). The ordering party will have electronic access to the transcript immediately. All others may view the transcript at the court public terminal or it may be purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber by filing a Transcript Order Form on the docket before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Redaction Request due 5/15/2017. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 5/24/2017. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 7/24/2017. (RAP)
                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document 141 Filed: 4/23/2017, Entered: 4/28/2017 TranscriptCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                  NOTICE OF FILING OF OFFICIAL REDACTED TRANSCRIPT of MOTION HEARING proceedings as to Joseph M Arpaio held on 04/06/2017, before Judge Susan R. Bolton. (Court Reporter: Elizabeth A. Lemke). The ordering party will have electronic access to the transcript immediately. All others may view the transcript at the court public terminal or it may be purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber by filing a Transcript Order Form on the docket before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Redaction Request due 5/15/2017. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 5/24/2017. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 7/24/2017. (RAP)
                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 140 Filed: 4/19/2017, Entered: 4/19/2017 USCA Order
                                                                                                                                                    ORDER of USCA re 17-71094 as to Joseph M Arpaio - The petition for a writ of mandamus raises issues that warrant an answer; within 14 days after the date of this order, the real party in interest shall file an answer. The district court, within 14 days after the date of this order, may address the petition if it so desires. (LSP)
                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 139 Filed: 4/17/2017, Entered: 4/17/2017 Transcript RequestCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                      TRANSCRIPT REQUEST by Joseph M Arpaio, Gerard Sheridan, Steven R Bailey, Michele M Iafrate for proceedings held on 4-6-17, 4-12-17, Judge Susan R Bolton hearing judge(s). (Wilenchik, Dennis)
                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 138 Filed: 4/17/2017, Entered: 4/17/2017 Transcript RequestCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                        TRANSCRIPT REQUEST by USA as to Joseph M Arpaio, Gerard Sheridan, Steven R Bailey, Michele M Iafrate for proceedings held on 04.06.2017 and 04.12.2017, Judge Susan R Bolton hearing judge(s). (Cataldo, Simon)
                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                          Blank 137 Filed: 4/14/2017, Entered: 4/14/2017 Notice (Other)
                                                                                                                                                          NOTICE of Service re: Petition of Writ of Mandamus (filed at the Ninth Circuit) by Joseph M Arpaio. (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit Exhibit A)(Wilenchik, Dennis) Modified to add omitted text on 4/17/2017 (REW).
                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                          Blank 136 Filed: 4/12/2017, Entered: 4/13/2017 Order on Motion for Miscellaneous ReliefCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                          MINUTE ENTRY for proceedings held before Judge Susan R Bolton: Motion Hearing as to Joseph M Arpaio held on 4/12/2017. Defendant's Motion to Stay Proceedings (Doc. [106]) is argued to the Court. For reasons as stated on the record, IT IS ORDERED denying Defendant's Motion. Defendant's Fourth Motion to Continue Trial (Doc. [129]) is discussed. IT IS ORDERED granting Defendant's Motion to Continue. Counsel request additional time to consult their calendars regarding the proposed trial dates. The Court directs counsel to confer and advise the Court no later than 5:00 p.m., April 12, 2017, the trial date that is agreeable to both parties. Defense counsel agrees that in light of the grant of the trial continuance the Motion to Stay Proceedings to Allow For the Filing of a Writ of Mandamus Regarding Defendant's Motion to Dismiss, or in the Alternative, Motion for Trial by Jury (Doc. [134]) is moot. LATER: Counsel having consulted their calendars and advised the Court of the same, IT IS ORDERED continuing Bench Trial from April 25, 2017, to June 26, 2017, at 9:00 a.m. Trial will be held on June 26 through June 30, 2017, and July 5 through July 7, 2017. (Court Reporter Liz Lemke) Hearing held 10:36 AM to 11:32 AM.(MAW)
                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                            Blank 135 Filed: 4/12/2017, Entered: 4/12/2017 Witness List
                                                                                                                                                            *AMENDED WITNESS LIST by Joseph M Arpaio. (Goldman, Mark) *Modified to add "amended" on 4/13/2017 (KGM).
                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                              Blank 134 Filed: 4/11/2017, Entered: 4/11/2017, Terminated: 4/12/2017 Motion for Miscellaneous Relief
                                                                                                                                                              MOTION Staying Proceedings to Allow for the Filing of A Writ of Mandamus Regarding Defendants Motion to Dismiss, or in the Alternative, Motion for Trial by Jury re: [130] MOTION to Dismiss by Joseph M Arpaio. (Attachments: # (1) Text of Proposed Order Staying Proceedings)(Goldman, Mark)
                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                              Blank 133 Filed: 4/11/2017, Entered: 4/11/2017, Terminated: 5/31/2017 Motion for Reconsideration
                                                                                                                                                              * MOTION for Reconsideration re: [132] Order Denying Motion to Dismiss or in the Alternative for Jury Trial by Joseph M Arpaio. (Wilenchik, Dennis) *Modified to add document number on 4/12/2017 (KGM).
                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                Blank 132 Filed: 4/11/2017, Entered: 4/11/2017 Order on Motion to Dismiss All ChargesCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                ORDER as to Joseph M Arpaio: IT IS ORDERED denying Defendant's Motion to Dismiss or in the Alternative Motion for Trial by Jury (Doc. [130]) [see attached Order for details]. Signed by Judge Susan R Bolton on 4/11/17.(MAW)
                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                  Blank 131 Filed: 4/10/2017, Entered: 4/10/2017 Notice (Other)
                                                                                                                                                                  *WITHDRAWAL OF MOTION re: [97] MOTION to Preclude Testimony of Timothy Casey by Joseph M Arpaio . (Surdakowski, Jeffrey) *Modified to correct event type on 4/11/2017 (KGM).
                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                    Blank 130 Filed: 4/10/2017, Entered: 4/10/2017, Terminated: 4/11/2017 Motion to Dismiss
                                                                                                                                                                    * MOTION to Dismiss and/or MOTION for Trial by Jury by Joseph M Arpaio. (Wilenchik, Dennis). *Added MOTION on 4/11/2017 (KGM).
                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                      Blank 129 Filed: 4/10/2017, Entered: 4/10/2017, Terminated: 4/12/2017 Motion to Continue Trial
                                                                                                                                                                      Fourth MOTION to Continue Trial by Joseph M Arpaio. (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit Attachment, # (2) Text of Proposed Order Order)(Wilenchik, Dennis)
                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 128 Filed: 4/10/2017, Entered: 4/10/2017 Notice of Attorney Appearance/Association - Defendant
                                                                                                                                                                      NOTICE OF ATTORNEY APPEARANCE: Dennis Ira Wilenchik appearing for Joseph M Arpaio . (Wilenchik, Dennis)
                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 127 Filed: 4/7/2017, Entered: 4/7/2017 Reply to Response
                                                                                                                                                                        REPLY TO RESPONSE to Motion by Joseph M Arpaio re: [105] MOTION for Hearing re: Voluntariness Hearing and Supplement In Support Of Defendant Arpaios Motion To Clarify Background And History Of The Civil Contempt Admission . (Surdakowski, Jeffrey)
                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 126 Filed: 4/6/2017, Entered: 4/7/2017 Order on Motion to Continue TrialCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                          MINUTE ENTRY for proceedings held before Judge Susan R Bolton: Motion Hearing as to Joseph M Arpaio held on 4/6/2017. Discussion held. IT IS ORDERED granting Jones, Skelton & Hochuli's Application to Withdraw as Counsel for Defendant Joseph M. Arpaio (Doc. [115]). Upon oral request of Defense counsel Goldman, the reply deadline regarding Defendant's Motion to Preclude Testimony of Timothy Casey (Doc. [97]) is extended to April 10, 2017. IT IS ORDERED setting Hearing re: Defendant's Motion to Stay Proceedings (Doc. [106]) on April 12, 2017, at 10:30 a.m. At the request of Defense counsel, Defendant may supplement his witness and exhibit lists prior to April 12, 2017. LATER: IT IS ORDERED denying as moot Defendant's Emergency Motion to Continue Reply Deadlines for Certain Pretrial Motions (Doc. [122]) [see attached minute entry for details].(Court Reporter Liz Lemke) Hearing held 2:03 PM to 2:51 PM.(MAW)
                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 125 Filed: 4/5/2017, Entered: 4/5/2017 Reply to Response
                                                                                                                                                                            REPLY TO RESPONSE to Motion by Joseph M Arpaio re: [104] MOTION to Exclude - Defendant Arpaios Motion to Prohibit the Introduction of Constitutionally Protected Campaign Statements . (Goldman, Mark)
                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 124 Filed: 4/5/2017, Entered: 4/5/2017 Reply to Response
                                                                                                                                                                              REPLY TO RESPONSE to Motion by Joseph M Arpaio re: [106] MOTION TO STAY PROCEEDINGS. (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit Melendres v. Arpaio Opening Brief)(Surdakowski, Jeffrey)
                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                Blank 123 Filed: 4/5/2017, Entered: 4/5/2017 Reply to Response
                                                                                                                                                                                REPLY TO RESPONSE to Motion by Joseph M Arpaio re: [98] MOTION Preclude Alleged "Victim" Testimony . (McDonald, Andrew)
                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank 122 Filed: 4/5/2017, Entered: 4/5/2017, Terminated: 4/6/2017 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply
                                                                                                                                                                                  *Emergency MOTION for Extension of Time to File Replies for Certain Pretrial Motions by Joseph M Arpaio. (Attachments: # (1) Text of Proposed Order [Proposed] Order Granting Emergency Motion to Continue Reply Deadlines for Pretrial Motions)(McDonald, Andrew) *Modified to correct event type on 4/5/2017 (KGM).
                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank 121 Filed: 4/4/2017, Entered: 4/4/2017 Reply to Response
                                                                                                                                                                                  REPLY TO RESPONSE to Motion by Joseph M Arpaio re: [103] MOTION to Continue Trial Motion for Continuance or to Exclude Documents Disclosed by the Government after March 1, 2017 . (Surdakowski, Jeffrey)
                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank 120 Filed: 4/4/2017, Entered: 4/4/2017 Order on Motion to ExpediteCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                    ORDER granting [116] Motion for Accelerated Consideration of Jones, Skelton & Hochuli's Application to Withdraw as Counsel as to Joseph M Arpaio (1). IT IS FURTHER ORDERED setting Hearing re: Jones, Skelton & Hochuli's Application to Withdraw as Counsel for Defendant Joseph M. Arpaio (Doc. [115]) on April 6, 2017, at 2:00 p.m. (Arizona time). IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that Defense counsel McDonald and Goldman and Defendant Arpaio are to be personally present in the courtroom for said hearing [see attached Order for details]. Signed by Judge Susan R Bolton on 4/4/17.(MAW)
                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank 119 Filed: 4/3/2017, Entered: 4/3/2017 Exhibit
                                                                                                                                                                                      EXHIBIT LIST by Joseph M Arpaio. (McDonald, Andrew)
                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                        Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank 118 Filed: 4/3/2017, Entered: 4/3/2017 Witness List
                                                                                                                                                                                        WITNESS LIST by Joseph M Arpaio. (McDonald, Andrew)
                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                          Blank 117 Filed: 4/3/2017, Entered: 4/3/2017 Notice of Attorney Appearance/Association - Defendant
                                                                                                                                                                                          NOTICE OF ATTORNEY APPEARANCE: Jeffrey Sinclair Surdakowski appearing for Joseph M Arpaio . (Surdakowski, Jeffrey)
                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 116 Filed: 4/3/2017, Entered: 4/3/2017, Terminated: 4/4/2017 Motion to Expedite
                                                                                                                                                                                            MOTION to Expedite Consideration of Jones Skelton & Hochuli Application to Withdraw as Counsel for Defendant Joseph Arpaio by Joseph M Arpaio. (McDonald, Andrew)
                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 115 Filed: 4/3/2017, Entered: 4/3/2017, Terminated: 4/6/2017 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney
                                                                                                                                                                                              MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney as to attorney A. Melvin McDonald, Linda K. Tivorsake, Jones Skelton & Hochuli by Joseph M Arpaio. (Attachments: # (1) Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order Granting JSH Application to Withdraw)(McDonald, Andrew)
                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 114 Filed: 3/31/2017, Entered: 3/31/2017 Notice of Errata
                                                                                                                                                                                                NOTICE OF ERRATA re: [105] MOTION for Hearing re: Voluntariness Hearing and Supplement In Support Of Defendant Arpaios Motion To Clarify Background And History Of The Civil Contempt Admission by Joseph M Arpaio.. (Goldman, Mark)
                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 113 Filed: 3/31/2017, Entered: 3/31/2017 Response in Opposition
                                                                                                                                                                                                  RESPONSE in Opposition by USA as to Joseph M Arpaio re: [102] MOTION Clarify Background and History of the "Civil Contempt" Admission , [105] MOTION for Hearing re: Voluntariness Hearing and Supplement In Support Of Defendant Arpaios Motion To Clarify Background And History Of The Civil Contempt Admission . (Keller, John)
                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 112 Filed: 3/31/2017, Entered: 3/31/2017 Order on Motion to Continue TrialCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                    ORDER denying [86] Motion to Continue Trial filed as to Joseph M Arpaio (1) [see attached Order for details]. Signed by Judge Susan R Bolton on 3/31/17.(MAW)
                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 111 Filed: 3/30/2017, Entered: 3/30/2017 Response in Opposition
                                                                                                                                                                                                      RESPONSE in Opposition by USA as to Joseph M Arpaio re: [96] MOTION to Quash Subpoena, [97] MOTION Preclude Testimony of Timothy Casey . (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit A)(Keller, John)
                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank 110 Filed: 3/29/2017, Entered: 3/29/2017 Response in Opposition
                                                                                                                                                                                                      RESPONSE in Opposition by USA as to Joseph M Arpaio re: [106] MOTION . (Keller, John)
                                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank 109 Filed: 3/29/2017, Entered: 3/29/2017 Response in Opposition
                                                                                                                                                                                                        RESPONSE in Opposition by USA as to Joseph M Arpaio re: [98] MOTION Preclude Alleged "Victim" Testimony . (Keller, John)
                                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                          Blank 108 Filed: 3/29/2017, Entered: 3/29/2017 Response in Opposition
                                                                                                                                                                                                          RESPONSE in Opposition by USA as to Joseph M Arpaio re: [104] MOTION to Exclude - Defendant Arpaios Motion to Prohibit the Introduction of Constitutionally Protected Campaign Statements . (Salgado, Victor)
                                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                            Blank 107 Filed: 3/28/2017, Entered: 3/28/2017 Response in Opposition
                                                                                                                                                                                                            RESPONSE in Opposition by USA as to Joseph M Arpaio re: [103] MOTION to Continue Trial Motion for Continuance or to Exclude Documents Disclosed by the Government after March 1, 2017 . (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit A)(Keller, John)
                                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                            Blank 106 Filed: 3/24/2017, Entered: 3/24/2017, Terminated: 4/12/2017 Motion for Miscellaneous Relief
                                                                                                                                                                                                            * MOTION to Stay Proceedings by Joseph M Arpaio. (Attachments: # (1) Text of Proposed Order)(Goldman, Mark) *Modified to correct event type on 3/27/2017 (KGM).
                                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                            Blank 105 Filed: 3/24/2017, Entered: 3/24/2017, Terminated: 6/13/2017 Motion for Hearing
                                                                                                                                                                                                            MOTION for Hearing re: Voluntariness Hearing and Supplement In Support Of Defendant Arpaios Motion To Clarify Background And History Of The Civil Contempt Admission by Joseph M Arpaio. (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit 04-23-2015 Evidentiary Hearing Transcript, # (2) Exhibit 02-26-2015 Status Conference Hearing transcript, # (3) Text of Proposed Order)(Goldman, Mark)
                                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                            Blank 104 Filed: 3/24/2017, Entered: 3/24/2017, Terminated: 5/31/2017 Motion to Exclude
                                                                                                                                                                                                            MOTION to Exclude - Defendant Arpaios Motion to Prohibit the Introduction of Constitutionally Protected Campaign Statements by Joseph M Arpaio. (Attachments: # (1) Text of Proposed Order)(Goldman, Mark)
                                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                            Blank 103 Filed: 3/24/2017, Entered: 3/24/2017, Terminated: 4/6/2017 Motion to Continue Trial
                                                                                                                                                                                                            MOTION to Continue Trial Motion for Continuance or to Exclude Documents Disclosed by the Government after March 1, 2017 by Joseph M Arpaio. (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit January 25, 2017 Pretrial Conference Transcript, # (2) Exhibit March 21, 2017 Email, # (3) Exhibit March 22, 2017 Email, # (4) Text of Proposed Order)(Goldman, Mark)
                                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                            Blank 102 Filed: 3/24/2017, Entered: 3/24/2017, Terminated: 6/13/2017 Motion for Miscellaneous Relief
                                                                                                                                                                                                            MOTION Clarify Background and History of the "Civil Contempt" Admission by Joseph M Arpaio. (McDonald, Andrew)
                                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                              Blank 101 Filed: 3/24/2017, Entered: 3/24/2017 Supplement
                                                                                                                                                                                                              SUPPLEMENT In Support by Joseph M Arpaio to [86] MOTION to Continue Trial filed by Joseph M Arpaio. (MAP)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 100 Filed: 3/24/2017, Entered: 3/24/2017 Order on Motion to Seal DocumentCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                ORDER denying [89] Motion to Seal as to Joseph M Arpaio (1). The Court's review of Defendant Arpaio's Supplement in Support of Second Motion to Continue does not disclose any privileged information nor can the Court discern any legal basis justifying the sealing. FURTHER ORDERED that Defendant's Motion to Seal, Defendant's Supplement in Support of Second Motion to Continue and this Order shall be placed on the public docket. Signed by Judge Susan R Bolton on 3/24/17.(MAP)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 99 Filed: 3/24/2017, Entered: 3/24/2017 Additional Attachments to Main Document
                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Additional Attachments to Main Document re: [96] MOTION to Quash Subpoena by Timothy J Casey as to Joseph M Arpaio. (Clark, Karen)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 98 Filed: 3/24/2017, Entered: 3/24/2017, Terminated: 5/31/2017 Motion for Miscellaneous Relief
                                                                                                                                                                                                                    MOTION Preclude Alleged "Victim" Testimony by Joseph M Arpaio. (McDonald, Andrew)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 97 Filed: 3/24/2017, Entered: 3/24/2017, Terminated: 3/24/2017 Motion for Miscellaneous Relief
                                                                                                                                                                                                                      *WITHDRAWN pursuant to Doc. [131]-- MOTION Preclude Testimony of Timothy Casey by Joseph M Arpaio. (McDonald, Andrew) Modified on 4/11/2017 (KGM).
                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 96 Filed: 3/23/2017, Entered: 3/23/2017, Terminated: 6/16/2017 Motion to Quash
                                                                                                                                                                                                                        MOTION to Quash Subpoena by Timothy J Casey as to Joseph M Arpaio. (Attachments: # (1) Text of Proposed Order)(Clark, Karen)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 95 Filed: 3/23/2017, Entered: 3/23/2017 Notice of Attorney Appearance/Association - Defendant
                                                                                                                                                                                                                          NOTICE OF ATTORNEY APPEARANCE: Karen Ann Clark appearing for Timothy J Casey as to Joseph M Arpaio, Gerard Sheridan, Steven R Bailey, Michele M Iafrate. (Clark, Karen) Modified on 3/23/2017 (REW).
                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 94 Filed: 3/23/2017, Entered: 3/23/2017 Notice of Errata
                                                                                                                                                                                                                            NOTICE OF ERRATA re: [91] Notice (Other) Notice of Service of Subpoena to Maricopa County Sheriff's Office by Joseph M Arpaio.. (McDonald, Andrew)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 93 Filed: 3/23/2017, Entered: 3/23/2017 Notice of Errata
                                                                                                                                                                                                                              NOTICE OF ERRATA re: [92] Reply to Response by Joseph M Arpaio.. (Goldman, Mark)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 92 Filed: 3/23/2017, Entered: 3/23/2017 Reply to Response
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                REPLY TO RESPONSE to Motion by Joseph M Arpaio re: [86] MOTION to Continue Trial . (Goldman, Mark)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank 91 Filed: 3/22/2017, Entered: 3/22/2017 Notice (Other)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  NOTICE of Service of Subpoena to Maricopa County Sheriff's Office by Joseph M Arpaio. (McDonald, Andrew)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank 89 Filed: 3/21/2017, Entered: 3/21/2017, Terminated: 3/24/2017 Motion to Seal Document
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    *MOTION to Seal Document by Joseph M Arpaio. (Attachments: # (1) Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order)(McDonald, Andrew) *Modified on 3/24/2017 to Unseal Pursuant to Doc. [100] (MAP)*.
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 88 Filed: 3/20/2017, Entered: 3/20/2017 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    ORDER as to Joseph M Arpaio: The Court is in receipt of Defendant Joseph M. Arpaio's Motion to Continue Trial (Doc. [86]). The Government filed its response at Doc. 87. IT IS ORDERED directing Defense counsel to file a reply no later than Noon, March 23, 2017. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED denying Defendant's request to extend the pretrial motions deadline and disclosure of Defendant's witness and exhibit lists contained within the motion to continue trial. Signed by Judge Susan R Bolton on 3/20/17.(MAW)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 87 Filed: 3/20/2017, Entered: 3/20/2017 Response in Opposition
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      RESPONSE in Opposition by USA as to Joseph M Arpaio, Gerard Sheridan, Steven R Bailey, Michele M Iafrate re: [86] MOTION to Continue Trial . (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit Exhibit A, # (2) Exhibit Exhibit B)(Keller, John)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 86 Filed: 3/17/2017, Entered: 3/17/2017, Terminated: 3/31/2017 Motion to Continue Trial
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        MOTION to Continue Trial by Joseph M Arpaio. (Attachments: # (1) Text of Proposed Order)(Goldman, Mark)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 85 Filed: 3/17/2017, Entered: 3/17/2017 Notice of Attorney Appearance/Association - Defendant
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          NOTICE OF ATTORNEY APPEARANCE: Mark David Goldman appearing for Joseph M Arpaio . (Goldman, Mark)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 83 Filed: 3/1/2017, Entered: 3/1/2017 Order on Motion for Miscellaneous ReliefCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            ORDER as to Joseph M Arpaio (1): IT IS ORDERED granting the Government's Brief in Support of Request for Bench Trial (Doc. [61]). IT IS FURTHER ORDERED denying Defendant's Cross-Motion Requesting Jury Trial (Doc. [62]) [see attached Order for details]. Signed by Judge Susan R Bolton on 3/1/17.(MAW)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 82 Filed: 3/1/2017, Entered: 3/1/2017 Transcript RequestCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              AMENDED TRANSCRIPT REQUEST pursuant to [81] Notice of Deficiency by Joseph M Arpaio for proceedings held on 1-25-17, Judge Susan R Bolton hearing judge(s). (McDonald, Andrew)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 81 Filed: 3/1/2017, Entered: 3/1/2017 Notice of Deficiency re Transcript Request
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                NOTICE TO FILER OF DEFICIENCY re: AO435 [80] Transcript Request filed by Joseph M Arpaio. Item 18 - ORDER: (CATEGORY) A box under FIRST COPY was incorrectly checked. An original has not yet been ordered and prepared and e-mail address was not provided where e-mail copy should be sent. FOLLOW-UP ACTION REQUIRED: Please refile with the appropriate box checked under the ORIGINAL +1 column and provide an email address for delivery. Deficiency must be corrected within one business day of this notice. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (RAP)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 80 Filed: 3/1/2017, Entered: 3/1/2017 Transcript RequestCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  TRANSCRIPT REQUEST by Joseph M Arpaio, Gerard Sheridan, Steven R Bailey, Michele M Iafrate for proceedings held on 1-25-17, Judge Susan R Bolton hearing judge(s). (McDonald, Andrew)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 79 Filed: 2/3/2017, Entered: 2/3/2017 Order on Motion to Seal DocumentCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    ORDER denying Defendant's [77] Motion to Seal Amended Response as to Joseph M Arpaio (1). Signed by Judge Susan R Bolton on 02/03/2017. (ATD)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 75 Filed: 1/31/2017, Entered: 1/31/2017 Notice of Attorney Appearance/Substitution - USA
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      NOTICE OF ATTORNEY APPEARANCE: Simon Joseph Cataldo appearing for USA . (Cataldo, Simon)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 74 Filed: 1/27/2017, Entered: 1/30/2017 TranscriptCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        NOTICE OF FILING OF OFFICIAL REDACTED TRANSCRIPT of PRETRIAL CONFERENCE proceedings as to Joseph M Arpaio held on 01/25/2017, before Judge Susan R. Bolton. (Court Reporter: Elizabeth A. Lemke). The ordering party will have electronic access to the transcript immediately. All others may view the transcript at the court public terminal or it may be purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber by filing a Transcript Order Form on the docket before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Redaction Request due 2/17/2017. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 2/27/2017. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 4/27/2017. (RAP)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 70 Filed: 1/27/2017, Entered: 1/27/2017 Transcript RequestCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          TRANSCRIPT REQUEST by USA as to Joseph M Arpaio for proceedings held on 1-25-17, Judge Susan R Bolton hearing judge(s). (Keller, John)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 71 Filed: 1/25/2017, Entered: 1/27/2017 Pretrial ConferenceCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            MINUTE ENTRY for proceedings held before Judge Susan R Bolton: Pretrial Conference as to Joseph M Arpaio held on 1/25/2017. Argument held regarding Government's Request/Motion for Bench Trial (Doc. [61]) and Defendant's Cross Motion Requesting Jury Trial (Doc. [62]). The Court will issue its ruling in a separate Order. At the request of the parties, IT IS ORDERED continuing Trial from April 4, 2017, to April 25, 2017, at 9:00 a.m. Discussion held re: pretrial motions. The Court sets the motions deadline for March 24, 2017 [see attached Order for details]. (Court Reporter Liz Lemke) Hearing held 10:40 AM to 11:34 AM.(MAW)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 69 Filed: 1/25/2017, Entered: 1/25/2017 Reply to Response
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              *SUPPLEMENT to [66] REPLY TO RESPONSE to Motion by Joseph M Arpaio re: [62] MOTION Supplement to Government's Response re Arpaio Request for Jury Trial. (McDonald, Andrew) *Modified to correct event type on 1/25/2017 (KGM).
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 66 Filed: 1/9/2017, Entered: 1/9/2017 Reply to Response
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                REPLY TO RESPONSE to Motion by Joseph M Arpaio re: [62] MOTION Reply in Support of Arpaio's Request for Jury Trial. (McDonald, Andrew)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 65 Filed: 1/9/2017, Entered: 1/9/2017 Notice (Other)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  *NOTICE of Attorney Appearance/Association - Defendant by Joseph M Arpaio. (McDonald, Andrew) *Modified to correct event type on 1/10/2017 (KGM).
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 64 Filed: 1/6/2017, Entered: 1/6/2017 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    ORDER as to Joseph M Arpaio: IT IS ORDERED setting Pretrial Conference on January 25, 2017, at 10:30 a.m. Defendant Joseph M. Arpaio is directed to be present for the hearing. Signed by Judge Susan R Bolton on 1/6/17.(MAW)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 63 Filed: 1/3/2017, Entered: 1/3/2017 Reply to Response
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      REPLY TO RESPONSE to Motion by USA as to Joseph M Arpaio re: [62] MOTION . (Keller, John)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 62 Filed: 12/27/2016, Entered: 12/27/2016, Terminated: 3/1/2017 Motion for Miscellaneous Relief
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        *RESPONSE to Motion by Joseph M Arpaio re: [61] MOTION for Bench Trial and CROSS MOTION Requesting Jury Trial. (McDonald, Andrew) *Modified to add motion part on 12/28/2016 (KGM).
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 61 Filed: 12/15/2016, Entered: 12/15/2016, Terminated: 3/1/2017 Motion for Miscellaneous Relief
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          MOTION for Bench Trial by USA as to Joseph M Arpaio. (Attachments: # (1) Text of Proposed Order)(Keller, John)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 60 Filed: 12/13/2016, Entered: 12/13/2016 Order
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            ORDER: 18 U.S.C.
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 59 Filed: 12/6/2016, Entered: 12/6/2016 Order on Motion for Protective OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              ORDER granting [54] Motion for Protective Order as to Joseph M Arpaio (1) [see attached Order for details]. Signed by Judge Susan R Bolton on 12/6/16.(MAW)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Blank 58 Filed: 12/6/2016, Entered: 12/6/2016 Order on Motion to Continue TrialCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                ORDER denying as premature [57] Government's Motion to Continue Trial filed as to Joseph M Arpaio (1). The Court intends to schedule a Pretrial Conference in early 2017 to discuss the parties' readiness for trial and if an adjustment of the trial date is required a motion can be filed at that time. Signed by Judge Susan R Bolton on 12/6/16.(MAW)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 57 Filed: 12/5/2016, Entered: 12/5/2016, Terminated: 12/6/2016 Motion to Continue Trial
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  MOTION to Continue Trial (Unopposed) by USA as to Joseph M Arpaio. (Attachments: # (1) Text of Proposed Order)(Keller, John)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 56 Filed: 12/1/2016, Entered: 12/1/2016 Response to Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    RESPONSE to Motion by Joseph M Arpaio re: [54] MOTION for Protective Order Governing Discovery . (McDonald, Andrew)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document 55 Filed: 11/29/2016, Entered: 11/29/2016 Order on Motion to Continue TrialCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      ORDER granting in part and denying in part [50] Request for Continuance filed as to Joseph M Arpaio (1). IT IS FURTHER ORDERED continuing Trial from December 6, 2016, to April 4, 2017, at 9:00 a.m. [see attached Order for details]. Signed by Judge Susan R Bolton on 11/29/16.(MAW)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 54 Filed: 11/28/2016, Entered: 11/28/2016, Terminated: 12/6/2016 Motion for Protective Order
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        MOTION for Protective Order Governing Discovery by USA as to Joseph M Arpaio. (Attachments: # (1) Text of Proposed Order)(Keller, John)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 53 Filed: 11/22/2016, Entered: 11/22/2016 Order on Motion for Miscellaneous ReliefCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          ORDER denying [41] Ramon Gomez's Motion for Third Party Ex Parte as to Joseph M Arpaio (1), Gerard Sheridan (2), Steven R Bailey (3) and Michele M Iafrate (4) [see attached Order for details]. Signed by Judge Susan R Bolton on 11/22/16.(MAW)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 52 Filed: 11/17/2016, Entered: 11/17/2016 Reply to Response
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            REPLY TO RESPONSE to Motion by Joseph M Arpaio re: [50] MOTION to Continue Trial Defendant Arpaio's Waiver of Speedy Trial Rights and Request for Continuance . (McDonald, Andrew)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Blank 51 Filed: 11/9/2016, Entered: 11/9/2016 Response in Opposition
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              RESPONSE in Opposition by USA as to Joseph M Arpaio, Gerard Sheridan, Steven R Bailey, Michele M Iafrate re: [50] MOTION to Continue Trial Defendant Arpaio's Waiver of Speedy Trial Rights and Request for Continuance . (Attachments: # (1) Text of Proposed Order)(Keller, John)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 50 Filed: 11/9/2016, Entered: 11/9/2016, Terminated: 11/29/2016 Motion to Continue Trial
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              MOTION to Continue Trial Defendant Arpaio's Waiver of Speedy Trial Rights and Request for Continuance by Joseph M Arpaio. (Attachments: # (1) Text of Proposed Order)(McDonald, Andrew)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 49 Filed: 11/4/2016, Entered: 11/4/2016 Notice (Other)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              *RESPONSE to Defendants' Memoranda on Statute of Limitations re: [34] Memorandum, [35] Memorandum, [37] Memorandum and [38] Memorandum, by USA as to Joseph M Arpaio, Gerard Sheridan, Steven R Bailey, Michele M Iafrate . (Keller, John) *Modified to correct event on 11/4/2016 (ATD).
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 48 Filed: 11/2/2016, Entered: 11/2/2016 Order on Motion to ContinueCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                ORDER as to Joseph M Arpaio: IT IS ORDERED denying Defendant's Request/Motion to Continue Trial (Doc. [40]) with leave to re-file said Motion in compliance with LRCiv 7.3(a) and (b). Signed by Judge Susan R Bolton on 11/2/16.(MAW)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 47 Filed: 11/1/2016, Entered: 11/2/2016 Notice (Other)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  NOTICE of service by Ramon Gomez as to Joseph M Arpaio re: [41] MOTION for Third Party Ex Parte. (KGM)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 46 Filed: 11/1/2016, Entered: 11/2/2016 Notice (Other)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    NOTICE of service by Ramon Gomez as to Michele M Iafrate re: [41] MOTION for Third Party Ex Parte. (KGM)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 45 Filed: 11/1/2016, Entered: 11/2/2016 Notice (Other)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      NOTICE of Service by Ramon Gomez as to Gerard Sheridan, Steven R Bailey re: [41] MOTION for Third Party Ex Parte. (KGM)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 44 Filed: 11/1/2016, Entered: 11/1/2016 Additional Attachments to Main Document
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Additional Attachments to Main Document re: [40] MOTION to Continue Defendant Arpaio's Waiver of Speedy Trial Rights and Request for Continuance MOTION to Continue Trial (Proposed Order) by Joseph M Arpaio. (McDonald, Andrew)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 43 Filed: 11/1/2016, Entered: 11/1/2016 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          ORDER as to Joseph M. Arpaio: On October 28, 2016, Defense counsel for Joseph M. Arpaio filed a Waiver of Speedy Trial Rights and Request for Continuance (Doc. [40]). IT IS ORDERED that the request will be denied within 3 days of the date of this order if counsel does not comply with the ECF Administrative Policies and Procedures Manual, Section G, specifically, subparagraph 1b. Signed by Judge Susan R Bolton on 11/1/16.(MAW)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 42 Filed: 10/31/2016, Entered: 10/31/2016 Notice (Other)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            NOTICE re: Request by Non-Prisoner Pro Se Party for Electronic Noticing by Ramon Gomez. (KGM)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 41 Filed: 10/31/2016, Entered: 10/31/2016, Terminated: 11/22/2016 Motion for Miscellaneous Relief
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              EX PARTE MOTION for Third Party Ex Parte by Ramon Gomez as to Joseph M Arpaio, Gerard Sheridan, Steven R Bailey, Michele M Iafrate. (KGM)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 40 Filed: 10/28/2016, Entered: 10/28/2016, Terminated: 11/2/2016 Motion to Continue
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                MOTION to Continue Defendant Arpaio's Waiver of Speedy Trial Rights and Request for Continuance, MOTION to Continue Trial by Joseph M Arpaio. (McDonald, Andrew)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 39 Filed: 10/28/2016, Entered: 10/28/2016 Notice of Intent to File Waiver of Defendants Appearance At Arraignment
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  NOTICE OF INTENT TO FILE WAIVER of Defendant's Appearance At Arraignment by Joseph M Arpaio filed 10/28/2016. (McDonald, Andrew)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 38 Filed: 10/25/2016, Entered: 10/25/2016 Memorandum
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    MEMORANDUM by Michele M Iafrate Re Statute of Limitations Bar. (Danneman, Dale)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 37 Filed: 10/25/2016, Entered: 10/25/2016 Memorandum
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      MEMORANDUM by Joseph M Arpaio Defendant Sheriff Arpaio's Brief regarding the Statute of Limitations Applicable to 18 U.S.C. Section 402. (McDonald, Andrew)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 36 Filed: 10/25/2016, Entered: 10/25/2016 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE as to Joseph M. Arpaio: The Court issues a notice to show cause as to whether Joseph M. Arpaio should be held in criminal contempt for willful disobedience of Judge Snow's preliminary injunction of December 23, 2011. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that Trial for this matter is set for December 6, 2016 at 9:00 a.m. in the Sandra Day O'Connor U.S. Courthouse, 401 W. Washington Street, Courtroom 502, Phoenix, Arizona 85003 [see attached Order for details]. Signed by Judge Susan R Bolton on 10/25/16.(MAW)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 35 Filed: 10/24/2016, Entered: 10/24/2016 Memorandum
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          MEMORANDUM by Gerard Sheridan Regarding Expiration of Statute of Limitations Under 18 U.S.C. Sec. 3285. (Stein, Lee)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 34 Filed: 10/24/2016, Entered: 10/24/2016 Memorandum
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            MEMORANDUM by Steven R Bailey Regarding Expiration of Statute of Limitations Under 18 U.S.C. Sec. 3285. (Stein, Lee)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 33 Filed: 10/19/2016, Entered: 10/19/2016 Transcript RequestCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              TRANSCRIPT REQUEST by Daniel R. Ortega, Jr. of the Ortega Law Firm as to Joseph M Arpaio, Gerard Sheridan, Steven R Bailey, and Michele M Iafrate for Status Hearing proceedings held on 10/11/2016, Judge Susan R Bolton hearing judge(s). (RAP)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 32 Filed: 10/18/2016, Entered: 10/18/2016 Reply
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                REPLY re: [30] Reply Defendant Arpaio's Reply in support of his Objection to the United States' Lodged Order to Show Cause by Joseph M Arpaio. (McDonald, Andrew)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 31 Filed: 10/17/2016, Entered: 10/17/2016 Minute Order
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  MINUTE ORDER as to Joseph M Arpaio: At the Court's direction, Government's counsel filed its lodged proposed Order to Show Cause, Defendant Arpaio filed his Objection and the Government filed its Response. Defendant may file a reply no later than 5:00PM, 10/18/2016. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (MAW)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank 30 Filed: 10/17/2016, Entered: 10/17/2016 Reply
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    *RESPONSE to [29] OBJECTION to Proposed Order to Show Cause by USA as to Joseph M Arpaio, Gerard Sheridan, Steven R Bailey, Michele M Iafrate. (Keller, John) *Modified to correct event type on 10/18/2016 (EJA).
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank 29 Filed: 10/17/2016, Entered: 10/17/2016 Response
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      *OBJECTION to: [28] Notice (Other) Defendant Arpaio's Objection to the United State's Notice of Lodged Document by Joseph M Arpaio. (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit Exhibit A)(McDonald, Andrew) *Modified to correct event type on 10/18/2016 (EJA).
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank 28 Filed: 10/17/2016, Entered: 10/17/2016 Notice (Other)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      *NOTICE of Filing Proposed Order re: [24] Minute Entry by USA as to Joseph M Arpaio, Gerard Sheridan, Steven R Bailey, Michele M Iafrate. (Attachments: # (1) Proposed Order)(Keller, John) *Modified text and document number on 10/18/2016 (EJA).
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 26 Filed: 10/13/2016, Entered: 10/13/2016 Transcript RequestCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      TRANSCRIPT REQUEST by Joseph M Arpaio for proceedings held on October 11, 2016, Judge Susan R Bolton hearing judge(s). (Ackerman, Justin)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 25 Filed: 10/13/2016, Entered: 10/13/2016 Transcript RequestCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        TRANSCRIPT REQUEST by USA as to Joseph M Arpaio, Gerard Sheridan, Steven R Bailey, Michele M Iafrate for proceedings held on 10-11-16, Judge Susan R Bolton hearing judge(s). (Keller, John)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 27 Filed: 10/11/2016, Entered: 10/13/2016 TranscriptCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          NOTICE OF FILING OF OFFICIAL TRANSCRIPT of STATUS CONFERENCE proceedings as to Joseph M Arpaio, Gerard Sheridan, Steven R Bailey, and Michele M Iafrate held on 10/11/2016, before Judge Susan R. Bolton. (Court Reporter: Elizabeth A. Lemke). The ordering party will have electronic access to the transcript immediately. All others may view the transcript at the court public terminal or it may be purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber by filing a Transcript Order Form on the docket before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Redaction Request due 11/1/2016. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 11/14/2016. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 1/9/2017. (RAP)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 24 Filed: 10/11/2016, Entered: 10/12/2016 Status ConferenceCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            MINUTE ENTRY for proceedings held before Judge Susan R Bolton: Status Conference as to Joseph M Arpaio, Gerard Sheridan, Steven R Bailey and Michele M Iafrate held on 10/11/2016. IT IS ORDERED directing Defense counsel to advise the Court in writing no later than 2:00 p.m., October 11, 2016, whether their clients agree to a tolling of the statute of limitations under 18 U.S.C.
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 23 Filed: 10/11/2016, Entered: 10/11/2016 Notice (Other)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              NOTICE Re Tolling of the Statute of Limitations by Steven R Bailey. (Stein, Lee)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 22 Filed: 10/11/2016, Entered: 10/11/2016 Notice (Other)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                NOTICE Re Tolling of the Statute of Limitations by Gerard Sheridan. (Stein, Lee)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank 21 Filed: 10/11/2016, Entered: 10/11/2016 Notice (Other)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  NOTICE Defendant Arpaio's Notice Re: Tolling of Statute of Limitations Under 18 U.S.C. 402 by Joseph M Arpaio. (McDonald, Andrew)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 20 Filed: 10/11/2016, Entered: 10/11/2016, Terminated: 10/24/2016 Stipulation
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    STIPULATION Stipulation of Michele Iafrate by Michele M Iafrate. (Danneman, Dale)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 19 Filed: 10/11/2016, Entered: 10/11/2016 Transcript RequestCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      TRANSCRIPT REQUEST by Michele M Iafrate for proceedings held on 10/11/16, Judge Susan R Bolton hearing judge(s). (Danneman, Dale)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank 18 Filed: 10/5/2016, Entered: 10/5/2016 Notice (Other)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        NOTICE of Joint Representation by Steven R Bailey. (Stein, Lee)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Blank 17 Filed: 10/5/2016, Entered: 10/5/2016 Notice (Other)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          NOTICE of Joint Representation by Gerard Sheridan. (Stein, Lee)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Blank 16 Filed: 9/16/2016, Entered: 9/16/2016 Order on Motion for Leave to AppearCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            ORDER granting [14] and [15] Motions for Leave to Appear Telephonically as to Gerard Sheridan (2) and Steven R Bailey (3) and allowing counsel Barry Mitchell to participate telephonically for the Status Conference set for Tuesday, October 11, 2016, at 10:00 a.m. Counsel is directed to call the Court at 602-322-7570 at the time of the scheduled hearing. No cell phones or speaker phones are permitted. Signed by Judge Susan R Bolton on 9/16/16.(MAW)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Blank 15 Filed: 9/13/2016, Entered: 9/13/2016, Terminated: 9/16/2016 Motion to Appear
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              MOTION for Leave to Appear Telephonic at October 11, 2016 Status Conference as to attorney Barry Mitchell by Steven R Bailey. (Attachments: # (1) Text of Proposed Order)(Mitchell, Barry)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Blank 14 Filed: 9/13/2016, Entered: 9/13/2016, Terminated: 9/16/2016 Motion to Appear
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              MOTION for Leave to Appear Telephonic at October 11, 2016 Status Conference as to attorney Barry Mitchell by Gerard Sheridan. (Attachments: # (1) Text of Proposed Order)(Mitchell, Barry)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Blank 13 Filed: 9/9/2016, Entered: 9/9/2016 Order on Motion for Miscellaneous ReliefCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              ORDER granting [6] Motion for Status Conference as to Joseph M Arpaio (1), Gerard Sheridan (2), Steven R Bailey (3) and Michele M Iafrate (4). IT IS FURTHER ORDERED setting Status Conference on October 11, 2016, at 10:00 a.m. Signed by Judge Susan R Bolton on 9/9/16.(MAW)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 12 Filed: 9/8/2016, Entered: 9/8/2016 Notice of Attorney Appearance/Association - Defendant
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                NOTICE OF ATTORNEY APPEARANCE: Dale A Danneman appearing for Michele M Iafrate . (Danneman, Dale)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank 11 Filed: 9/7/2016, Entered: 9/7/2016 Notice (Other)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  NOTICE OF COMPLIANCE by USA as to Joseph M Arpaio, Gerard Sheridan, Steven R Bailey, Michele M Iafrate. (Salgado, Victor)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank 10 Filed: 9/7/2016, Entered: 9/7/2016 Notice of Attorney Appearance/Association - Defendant
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    NOTICE OF ATTORNEY APPEARANCE: Lee David Stein appearing for Gerard Sheridan, Steven R Bailey . (Stein, Lee)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank 9 Filed: 9/7/2016, Entered: 9/7/2016 Notice (Other)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      NOTICE of No Objection to Status Conference by Joseph M Arpaio re: [6] MOTION for Status Conference . (McDonald, Andrew)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank 8 Filed: 9/7/2016, Entered: 9/7/2016 Notice of Attorney Appearance/Association - Defendant
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        NOTICE OF ATTORNEY APPEARANCE: Andrew Melvin McDonald, Jr appearing for Joseph M Arpaio . (McDonald, Andrew)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Blank 7 Filed: 9/6/2016, Entered: 9/6/2016 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          ORDER as to Joseph M Arpaio, Gerard Sheridan, Steven R Bailey and Michele M Iafrate: On September 6, 2016, Government's counsel filed a Motion for Status Conference Doc. [6]. The certificate of service on Page 3 of the Government's motion states "....on this date, I electronically filed the foregoing filing with the Clerk of the Court using the CM/ECF system, which will send notification of such filing to the attorneys of record for the defendant." No counsel having yet appeared in this criminal case for Defendants, IT IS ORDERED directing Government's counsel to mail a copy of the motion to the attorney known to represent each of the Defendants and notify the Court in writing that Government's counsel has complied. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that the motion will be denied within 3 days of the date of this order if counsel does not comply with the ECF Administrative Policies and Procedures Manual, Section G, specifically, subparagraph 1b. Signed by Judge Susan R Bolton on 9/6/16.(MAW)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Blank 6 Filed: 9/6/2016, Entered: 9/6/2016, Terminated: 9/9/2016 Motion for Miscellaneous Relief
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            MOTION for Status Conference by USA as to Joseph M Arpaio, Gerard Sheridan, Steven R Bailey, Michele M Iafrate. (Keller, John)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Blank 5 Filed: 9/6/2016, Entered: 9/6/2016 Notice of Attorney Appearance/Substitution - USA
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              NOTICE OF ATTORNEY APPEARANCE: Victor R. Salgado appearing for USA . (Salgado, Victor)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4 Filed: 9/6/2016, Entered: 9/6/2016 Notice of Attorney Appearance/Substitution - USA
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                NOTICE OF ATTORNEY APPEARANCE: John D. Keller appearing for USA . (Keller, John)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank 3 Filed: 8/26/2016, Entered: 8/26/2016 Notice (Other)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  NOTICE OF RECUSAL with attached formal notice from EOUSA by USA as to Joseph M Arpaio, Gerard Sheridan, Steven R Bailey, Michele M Iafrate. (Strange, Elizabeth)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank 2 Filed: 8/19/2016, Entered: 8/19/2016 Order of RecusalCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    ORDER OF RECUSAL in case as to Joseph M Arpaio, Gerard Sheridan, Steven R Bailey, Michele M Iafrate: ORDERED this matter be reassigned, by lot, to another judge in the District of Arizona. FURTHER ORDERED that this matter has been reassigned by random lot to the Honorable Susan R. Bolton. All future pleadings and papers submitted for filing shall bear the following complete case number: CR-16-01012-PHX-SRB. Signed by Judge John J Tuchi on 8/19/16.(SJF)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1 Filed: 8/19/2016, Entered: 8/19/2016 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      ORDER re Criminal Contempt as to Joseph M Arpaio, Gerard Sheridan, Steven R Bailey, Michele M Iafrate - IT IS THEREFORE ORDERED that pursuant to Rule 42(a) (1) of the Federal Rules of Criminal Procedure, the Court refers Sheriff Joseph M. Arpaio, Chief Deputy Gerard Sheridan, Captain Steven R. Bailey, and Attorney Michelle M. Iafrate to another Judge of this Court to determine whether they should be held in criminal contempt for the matters detailed above. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED directing the Clerk of Court to refer the criminal contempt proceedings, by random lot, to another Judge in the District of Arizona. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED directing the Clerk of Court to promptly notify the United States Attorney for the District of Arizona regarding this Order. (See document for further details). Signed by Judge G Murray Snow on 8/19/16. (LAD)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF

                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Statistics

                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        This case has been viewed 1,334 times.

                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Space
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                         
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        PlainSite
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Sign Up
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Need Password Help?