McCrobie v. Palisades Acquisition XVI, LLC
Appeal Court of Appeals for the Second Circuit, Case No. 16-1264

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Last Updated January 19, 2017 at 6:53 AM ST (4.3 years ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

Nature of Suit 3480 - Consumer Credit
  Entries (33) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Blank 67 Filed: 8/9/2016, Entered: None
CORRECTED REPLY BRIEF, on behalf of Appellant Christopher McCrobie, FILED. Service date 08/09/2016 by CM/ECF. [1836015] [16-1264]--[Edited 08/15/2016 by AS] [Entered: 08/09/2016 09:59 AM]
    LREF
    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 66 Filed: 8/8/2016, Entered: None
    MOTION ORDER, granting motion to amend document [63] filed by Appellant Christopher McCrobie, FILED. [1834870][66] [16-1264]--[Edited 08/08/2016 by AS] [Entered: 08/08/2016 10:53 AM]
      Request RequestSpace LREF
      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 63 Filed: 8/5/2016, Entered: None
      MOTION, to amend document, on behalf of Appellant Christopher McCrobie, FILED. Service date 08/05/2016 by CM/ECF. [1834281] [16-1264] [Entered: 08/05/2016 03:38 PM]
        Request RequestSpace LREF
        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 60 Filed: 8/5/2016, Entered: None
        DEFECTIVE DOCUMENT, reply brief, [55], on behalf of Appellant Christopher McCrobie, FILED.[1833871] [16-1264] [Entered: 08/05/2016 11:22 AM]
          Request RequestSpace LREF
          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 58 Filed: 8/4/2016, Entered: None
          REPLY BRIEF, on behalf of Appellant Christopher McCrobie, FILED. Service date 08/02/2016 by CM/ECF. [1833272] [16-1264] [Entered: 08/04/2016 03:17 PM]
            Request RequestSpace LREF
            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 56 Filed: 8/2/2016, Entered: None
            ORAL ARGUMENT STATEMENT LR 34.1 (a), on behalf of filer Attorney Jonathan Robert Miller, Esq. for Appellant Christopher McCrobie, FILED. Service date 08/02/2016 by CM/ECF. [1831402] [16-1264] [Entered: 08/02/2016 07:16 PM]
              Request RequestSpace LREF
              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 53 Filed: 7/29/2016, Entered: None
              ORAL ARGUMENT STATEMENT LR 34.1 (a), on behalf of filer Attorney Robert L. Arleo, Esq. for Appellee Houslanger & Associates, PLLC and Todd E. Houslanger, FILED. Service date 07/29/2016 by CM/ECF. [1829114] [16-1264] [Entered: 07/29/2016 04:29 PM]
                Request RequestSpace LREF
                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 51 Filed: 7/26/2016, Entered: None
                ORAL ARGUMENT STATEMENT LR 34.1 (a), on behalf of filer Attorney Scott Evan Wortman, Esq. for Appellee Houslanger & Associates, PLLC, Todd E. Houslanger and Palisades Acquisition XVI, LLC, FILED. Service date 07/26/2016 by CM/ECF. [1825766] [16-1264] [Entered: 07/26/2016 04:53 PM]
                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 48 Filed: 7/21/2016, Entered: None
                  NOTICE OF APPEARANCE AS ADDITIONAL COUNSEL, on behalf of Appellee Palisades Acquisition XVI, LLC, FILED. Service date 07/21/2016 by CM/ECF. [1821636] [16-1264] [Entered: 07/21/2016 12:03 PM]
                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 47 Filed: 7/21/2016, Entered: None
                    DEFECTIVE DOCUMENT, notice of appearance as additional counsel, [46], on behalf of Appellee Palisades Acquisition XVI, LLC, FILED.[1821589] [16-1264] [Entered: 07/21/2016 11:49 AM]
                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 43 Filed: 7/19/2016, Entered: None
                      BRIEF, on behalf of Appellee Houslanger & Associates, PLLC and Todd E. Houslanger, FILED. Service date 07/19/2016 by CM/ECF. [1819474] [16-1264] [Entered: 07/19/2016 02:30 PM]
                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 42 Filed: 7/19/2016, Entered: None
                        BRIEF, on behalf of Appellee Palisades Acquisition XVI, LLC, FILED. Service date 07/19/2016 by CM/ECF. [1819393] [16-1264] [Entered: 07/19/2016 01:39 PM]
                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 40 Filed: 6/17/2016, Entered: None
                          ELECTRONIC INDEX, in lieu of record, FILED.[1800675] [16-1264] [Entered: 06/23/2016 02:08 PM]
                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 33 Filed: 6/16/2016, Entered: None
                            DEFECTIVE DOCUMENT, Brief & Special Appendix, [31], on behalf of Appellant Christopher McCrobie, FILED.[1795667] [16-1264] [Entered: 06/16/2016 03:52 PM]
                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                              Blank 32 Filed: 6/15/2016, Entered: None
                              BRIEF & SPECIAL APPENDIX, on behalf of Appellant Christopher McCrobie, FILED. Service date 06/14/2016 by CM/ECF. [1794036] [16-1264] [Entered: 06/15/2016 12:28 PM]
                                LREF
                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 29 Filed: 6/14/2016, Entered: None
                                APPENDIX, volume 3 of 3, (pp. 447-717), on behalf of Appellant Christopher McCrobie, FILED. Service date 06/14/2016 by CM/ECF.[1793255] [16-1264] [Entered: 06/14/2016 04:06 PM]
                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 28 Filed: 6/14/2016, Entered: None
                                  APPENDIX, volume 2 of 3, (pp. 225-446), on behalf of Appellant Christopher McCrobie, FILED. Service date 06/14/2016 by CM/ECF.[1793229] [16-1264] [Entered: 06/14/2016 04:04 PM]
                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 27 Filed: 6/14/2016, Entered: None
                                    APPENDIX, volume 1 of 3, (pp. 1-224), on behalf of Appellant Christopher McCrobie, FILED. Service date 06/14/2016 by CM/ECF.[1793221] [16-1264] [Entered: 06/14/2016 04:03 PM]
                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 26 Filed: 6/13/2016, Entered: None
                                      NOTICE OF APPEARANCE AS ADDITIONAL COUNSEL, on behalf of Appellee Palisades Acquisition XVI, LLC, FILED. Service date 06/13/2016 by CM/ECF. [1792325] [16-1264] [Entered: 06/13/2016 05:02 PM]
                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 24 Filed: 5/23/2016, Entered: None
                                        NOTICE OF APPEARANCE AS SUBSTITUTE COUNSEL, on behalf of Appellee Todd E. Houslanger, FILED. Service date 05/23/2016 by CM/ECF. [1777838] [16-1264] [Entered: 05/23/2016 02:26 PM]
                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 23 Filed: 5/23/2016, Entered: None
                                          NOTICE OF APPEARANCE AS SUBSTITUTE COUNSEL, on behalf of Appellee Houslanger & Associates, PLLC, FILED. Service date 05/23/2016 by CM/ECF. [1777837] [16-1264] [Entered: 05/23/2016 02:24 PM]
                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 22 Filed: 5/23/2016, Entered: None
                                            ACKNOWLEDGMENT AND NOTICE OF APPEARANCE, on behalf of Appellee Palisades Acquisition XVI, LLC, FILED. Service date 05/23/2016 by CM/ECF.[1777556] [16-1264] [Entered: 05/23/2016 11:13 AM]
                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 20 Filed: 5/10/2016, Entered: None
                                              LOCAL RULE 31.2 NOTICE, placing this appeal on the Court's Expedited Calendar, setting appellant' brief due date as 06/14/2016, appellee's brief due date as 07/19/2016,TRANSMITTED.[1768309] [16-1264] [Entered: 05/10/2016 10:22 AM]
                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 19 Filed: 5/10/2016, Entered: None
                                                NOTICE, to Appellee Todd E. Houslanger, Houslanger & Associates, PLLC and Palisades Acquisition XVI, LLC , for failure to file an appearance, SENT.[1768304] [16-1264] [Entered: 05/10/2016 10:19 AM]
                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 18 Filed: 5/10/2016, Entered: None
                                                  NEW CASE MANAGER, Amit Singh, ASSIGNED.[1768296] [16-1264] [Entered: 05/10/2016 10:16 AM]
                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 9 Filed: 5/6/2016, Entered: None
                                                    FORM C, on behalf of Appellant Christopher McCrobie, FILED. Service date 05/06/2016 by CM/ECF.[1766981] [16-1264] [Entered: 05/06/2016 04:42 PM]
                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 8 Filed: 5/6/2016, Entered: None
                                                      FORM D, on behalf of Appellant Christopher McCrobie, FILED. Service date 05/06/2016 by CM/ECF.[1766975] [16-1264] [Entered: 05/06/2016 04:37 PM]
                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7 Filed: 5/6/2016, Entered: None
                                                        LR 31.2 SCHEDULING NOTIFICATION, on behalf of Appellant Christopher McCrobie, informing Court of proposed due date 08/08/2016, RECEIVED. Service date 05/06/2016 by CM/ECF.[1766965] [16-1264] [Entered: 05/06/2016 04:34 PM]
                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 6 Filed: 5/6/2016, Entered: None
                                                          NOTICE OF APPEARANCE AS ADDITIONAL COUNSEL, on behalf of Appellant Christopher McCrobie, FILED. Service date 05/06/2016 by CM/ECF. [1766847] [16-1264] [Entered: 05/06/2016 03:45 PM]
                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5 Filed: 5/5/2016, Entered: None
                                                            ACKNOWLEDGMENT AND NOTICE OF APPEARANCE, on behalf of Appellant Christopher McCrobie, FILED. Service date 05/05/2016 by CM/ECF.[1766098] [16-1264] [Entered: 05/05/2016 10:59 PM]
                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 3 Filed: 4/22/2016, Entered: None
                                                              DISTRICT COURT JUDGMENT, dated 03/28/2016, RECEIVED.[1757297] [16-1264] [Entered: 04/25/2016 11:13 AM]
                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2 Filed: 4/22/2016, Entered: None
                                                                DISTRICT COURT DECISION, dated 03/24/2016, RECEIVED.[1757296] [16-1264] [Entered: 04/25/2016 11:11 AM]
                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1 Filed: 4/22/2016, Entered: None
                                                                  NOTICE OF CIVIL APPEAL, with district court docket, on behalf of Appellant Christopher McCrobie, FILED. [1757290] [16-1264] [Entered: 04/25/2016 11:08 AM]
                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF

                                                                    Statistics

                                                                    This case has been viewed 109 times.

                                                                    No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                                                    Space
                                                                    Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                    Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                     
                                                                    PlainSite
                                                                    Sign Up
                                                                    Need Password Help?