RICHARDSON et al v. TRICARE MANAGEMENT ACTIVITY et al
Federal Civil Lawsuit District Of Columbia District Court, Case No. 1:11-cv-01961
District Judge James E. Boasberg, presiding

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Last Updated August 22, 2016 at 2:33 PM DT (4.9 years ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo ALLIE J. RICHARDSON, III, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by REZVANI VOLIN & ROTBERT PC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Tracy Diana Rezvani +1 202 350 4270 +1 202 351 0544 trezvani@rvrlegal.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Sheller PC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
PRO HAC VICE, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Jamie L Sheller +1 215 790 7300 +1 215 546 0942 jlsheller@sheller.com
No Logo VON W. RICHARDSON, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by REZVANI VOLIN & ROTBERT PC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Tracy Diana Rezvani +1 202 350 4270 +1 202 351 0544 trezvani@rvrlegal.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Sheller PC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
PRO HAC VICE, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Jamie L Sheller +1 215 790 7300 +1 215 546 0942 jlsheller@sheller.com
v.
No Logo LEON PANETTA, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by United States Department of Justice

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Paul Gerald Freeborne +1 202 353 0543 +1 202 616 8460 paul.freeborne@usdoj.gov
TERMINATED: 03/26/2014, LEAD ATTORNEY Luke M. Jones +1 202 514 3770 luke.jones@usdoj.gov
No Logo Science Applications International Corporation, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Arnold & Porter, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Kenneth Lee Chernof +1 202 942 5940 +1 202 942 5999 kenneth.chernof@aporter.com
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Robert J. Katerberg +1 202 942 5000 robert.katerberg@aporter.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Reed Smith LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Lawrence S. Sher +1 202 414 9200 +1 202 414 3299 lsher@reedsmith.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Gunjan Rashmikant Talati +1 202 414 9210 +1 202 414 9299 gtalati@reedsmith.com
No Logo TRICARE MANAGEMENT ACTIVITY, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by United States Department of Justice

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Paul Gerald Freeborne +1 202 353 0543 +1 202 616 8460 paul.freeborne@usdoj.gov
TERMINATED: 03/26/2014, LEAD ATTORNEY Luke M. Jones +1 202 514 3770 luke.jones@usdoj.gov
United States Department of Defense United States Department of Defense, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by United States Department of Justice

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Paul Gerald Freeborne +1 202 353 0543 +1 202 616 8460 paul.freeborne@usdoj.gov
TERMINATED: 03/26/2014, LEAD ATTORNEY Luke M. Jones +1 202 514 3770 luke.jones@usdoj.gov
No Logo VIRGINIA E. GAFFNEY, Non-Party Petitioner
Citation Section 05 U.S.C. § 552
Nature of Suit 890 - Other Statutes: Other Statutory Actions
  Entries (41) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 41 Filed: 3/26/2014, Entered: None
NOTICE OF WITHDRAWAL OF APPEARANCE as to LEON PANETTA, TRICARE MANAGEMENT ACTIVITY, UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF DEFENSE. Attorney Luke M. Jones terminated. (Jones, Luke) (Entered: 03/26/2014)
    Request RequestSpace LREF
    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 40 Filed: 6/27/2012, Entered: None
    NOTICE of Appearance by Robert J. Katerberg on behalf of SCIENCE APPLICATIONS INTERNATIONAL CORPORATION (Katerberg, Robert) (Entered: 06/27/2012)
      Request RequestSpace LREF
      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 39 Filed: 6/27/2012, Entered: None
      NOTICE of Appearance by Kenneth Lee Chernof on behalf of SCIENCE APPLICATIONS INTERNATIONAL CORPORATION (Chernof, Kenneth) (Entered: 06/27/2012)
        Request RequestSpace LREF
        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 38 Filed: 6/27/2012, Entered: None Court Filing
        COPY OF TRANSFER ORDER dated 6/20/12 from the Judicial Panel on Multidistrict Litigation directing the transfer to the U.S. District Court for the District of Columbia with the consent of that court, assigned to the Honorable Judge Robert L. Wilkins for coordinated pretrial proceedings pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 1407.(MDL 2360) (ztnr, ) (Entered: 06/27/2012)
          Request RequestSpace LREF
          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 37 Filed: 6/26/2012, Entered: None
          MEMORANDUM re 36 MOTION to Lift Stay MOTION to Appoint Counsel and Interim Plaintiffs' Steering Committee filed by VON W. RICHARDSON by VON W. RICHARDSON. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order, # 2 Exhibit A - CMST Firm Resume, # 3 Exhibit B - FT Firm Resume, # 4 Exhibit C - MDPCE Firm Resume, # 5 Exhibit D - Cohen Malad Resume, # 6 Exhibit E - LP Firm Resume, # 7 Exhibit F - Sheller Bio, # 8 Exhibit G - HR Firm Resume, # 9 Exhibit H - Weiss Lurie Firm Resume, # 10 Exhibit I - Arellano Response, # 11 Exhibit J - MDL 2360 Transcript)(Rezvani, Tracy) (Entered: 06/26/2012)
            Request RequestSpace LREF
            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 36 Filed: 6/26/2012, Entered: None
            MOTION to Lift Stay , MOTION to Appoint Counsel and Interim Plaintiffs' Steering Committee by VON W. RICHARDSON (Rezvani, Tracy) (Entered: 06/26/2012)
              Request RequestSpace LREF
              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 35 Filed: 4/24/2012, Entered: None Court Filing
              ORDER granting (27) Motion to Stay in case 1:11-cv-01800-RLW; granting (31) Motion to Stay in case 1:11-cv-01961-RLW; granting (31) Motion to Stay in case 1:11-cv-02142-RLW; granting (26) Motion to Stay in case 1:11-cv-02283-RLW; granting (16) Motion to Stay in case 1:12-cv-00008-RLW. Signed by Judge Robert L. Wilkins on 4/24/2012. (tcb) (Entered: 04/24/2012)
                Request RequestSpace LREF
                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 34 Filed: 4/2/2012, Entered: None
                REPLY to opposition to motion re 31 MOTION to Stay Proceedings Pending a Decision by the Judicial Panel on Multidistrict Litigation and Incorporated Memorandum of Law filed by SCIENCE APPLICATIONS INTERNATIONAL CORPORATION. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit, # 2 Exhibit, # 3 Exhibit)(Talati, Gunjan) (Entered: 04/02/2012)
                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 33 Filed: 3/23/2012, Entered: None
                  Memorandum in opposition to re 31 MOTION to Stay Proceedings Pending a Decision by the Judicial Panel on Multidistrict Litigation and Incorporated Memorandum of Law filed by ALLIE J. RICHARDSON, III, VON W. RICHARDSON. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration Declaration Burton Finkelstein, # 2 Declaration Declaration of Tracy Rezvani, # 3 Declaration Declaration of Mark Smilow, # 4 Declaration Declaration of Jeffrey Carton, # 5 Declaration Declaration of James Kauffman, # 6 Declaration Declaration of Andrew Friedman, # 7 Declaration Declaration of Jamie Sheller, # 8 Text of Proposed Order, # 9 Certificate of Service)(Rezvani, Tracy) (Entered: 03/23/2012)
                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 32 Filed: 3/9/2012, Entered: None
                    NOTICE of Motion for Transfer, Schedule of Actions Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 1407 with the Judicial Panel on Multidistrict Litigation . (rdj) (Entered: 03/13/2012)
                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 31 Filed: 3/9/2012, Entered: None
                      MOTION to Stay Proceedings Pending a Decision by the Judicial Panel on Multidistrict Litigation and Incorporated Memorandum of Law by SCIENCE APPLICATIONS INTERNATIONAL CORPORATION (Talati, Gunjan) (Entered: 03/09/2012)
                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 30 Filed: 3/8/2012, Entered: None
                        NOTICE of Filing of Defendant's Motion for Transfer and Consolidation Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. sec. 1407 by SCIENCE APPLICATIONS INTERNATIONAL CORPORATION (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit, # 2 Memorandum in Support, # 3 Exhibit, # 4 Certificate of Service)(Talati, Gunjan) (Entered: 03/08/2012)
                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 29 Filed: 3/8/2012, Entered: None
                          Memorandum in opposition to re 26 MOTION to Consolidate Cases filed by LEON E. PANETTA, TRICARE MANAGEMENT ACTIVITY, UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF DEFENSE. (Jones, Luke) (Entered: 03/08/2012)
                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 28 Filed: 3/8/2012, Entered: None
                            NOTICE of Appearance by Paul Freeborne on behalf of LEON E. PANETTA, TRICARE MANAGEMENT ACTIVITY, UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF DEFENSE (Freeborne, Paul) (Entered: 03/08/2012)
                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 27 Filed: 2/15/2012, Entered: None
                              RESPONSE re 26 MOTION to Consolidate Cases filed by SCIENCE APPLICATIONS INTERNATIONAL CORPORATION. (dr) (Entered: 03/07/2012)
                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 26 Filed: 1/27/2012, Entered: None
                                MOTION to Consolidate Cases And Appoint Plaintiffs' Co-Lead Counsel by VIRGINIA E. GAFFNEY(jeb, ) (Entered: 03/01/2012)
                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 25 Filed: 2/27/2012, Entered: None Court Filing
                                  ORDER granting 23 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to Respond to Amended Complaint; and it is hereby ORDERED that the time within which the Federal Defendants must respond to Plaintiffs Complaint is extended until after resolution of the pending consolidation motion. Specifically, in the event the consolidation motion is denied, Federal Defendants will have 30 days from the denial of the motion to respond to the now operative Amended Complaint and, in the event the consolidation motion is granted and/or Plaintiff files or joins the filing of any new complaint, Federal Defendants will have 60 days from the date of service of the new complaint to respond. Signed by Judge Robert L. Wilkins on 2/27/2012. (tcb) (Entered: 02/27/2012)
                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 24 Filed: 2/27/2012, Entered: None Court Filing
                                    ORDER granting 22 Unopposed MOTION to Stay Motion for Class Certification; IT IS THEREFORE ORDERED, ADJUDGED AND DECREED that all briefing for class certification in this matter shall be stayed pending resolution of the motion to consolidate. Signed by Judge Robert L. Wilkins on 2/27/2012. (tcb) (Entered: 02/27/2012)
                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 23 Filed: 2/24/2012, Entered: None
                                      Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to Respond to Amended Complaint by LEON E. PANETTA, TRICARE MANAGEMENT ACTIVITY, UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF DEFENSE (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Jones, Luke) (Entered: 02/24/2012)
                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 22 Filed: 2/24/2012, Entered: None
                                        Unopposed MOTION to Stay Motion for Class Certification by ALLIE J. RICHARDSON, III, VON W. RICHARDSON (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Rezvani, Tracy) (Entered: 02/24/2012)
                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 21 Filed: 2/21/2012, Entered: None
                                          MOTION to Consolidate Cases Reply In Support of Consolidation by VON W. RICHARDSON (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A - Consolidated Amended Complaint)(Rezvani, Tracy) (Entered: 02/21/2012)
                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 20 Filed: 2/3/2012, Entered: None Court Filing
                                            ORDER granting 19 Unopposed MOTION to Stay re 16 MOTION to Dismiss; IT IS THEREFORE ORDERED, ADJUDGED AND DECREED that all SAIC motion to dismiss briefing in this matter shall be stayed, pending resolution of the motion to consolidate. If Plaintiffs motion to consolidate is granted, and Plaintiffs file one amended consolidated complaint, the parties will proceed as ordered by the Court. If Plaintiffs motion to consolidate is denied, Plaintiffs shall have 14 days from the entry of the executed order denying the motion to respond to SAICs motion to dismiss. Signed by Judge Robert L. Wilkins on 2/3/2012. (tcb) (Entered: 02/03/2012)
                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 19 Filed: 2/2/2012, Entered: None
                                              Unopposed MOTION to Stay re 16 MOTION to Dismiss by ALLIE J. RICHARDSON, III, VON W. RICHARDSON (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Rezvani, Tracy) (Entered: 02/02/2012)
                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 18 Filed: 1/19/2012, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                ORDER granting 17 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to 16 MOTION to Dismiss;IT IS THEREFORE ORDERED, ADJUDGED AND DECREED that Plaintiffs deadline to respond to Defendant Science Applications International Corporations Motion to Dismiss is hereby extended to and including February 7, 2012. Plaintiffs deadline to file their motion for class certification is hereby extended to and including February 27, 2012. Signed by Judge Robert L. Wilkins on 1/19/2012. (tcb) (Entered: 01/19/2012)
                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 17 Filed: 1/18/2012, Entered: None
                                                  Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to 16 MOTION to Dismiss by ALLIE J. RICHARDSON, III, VON W. RICHARDSON (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Rezvani, Tracy) (Entered: 01/18/2012)
                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 16 Filed: 1/9/2012, Entered: None
                                                    MOTION to Dismiss by SCIENCE APPLICATIONS INTERNATIONAL CORPORATION (Talati, Gunjan) (Entered: 01/09/2012)
                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 15 Filed: 12/21/2011, Entered: None
                                                      AMENDED COMPLAINT against LEON E. PANETTA, SCIENCE APPLICATIONS INTERNATIONAL CORPORATION, TRICARE MANAGEMENT ACTIVITY, UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF DEFENSE filed by VON W. RICHARDSON, ALLIE J. RICHARDSON, III.(rdj) (Entered: 12/21/2011)
                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 14 Filed: 12/21/2011, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                        ORDER granting 13 MOTION to Amend/Correct Class Complaint; FURTHER ORDERED that the proposed Amended Complaint filed at Attachment A is hereby entered into the record. Signed by Judge Robert L. Wilkins on 12/21/2011. (tcb) (Entered: 12/21/2011)
                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 13 Filed: 12/20/2011, Entered: None
                                                          MOTION to Amend/Correct Class Complaint by ALLIE J. RICHARDSON, III, VON W. RICHARDSON (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Amended Class Complaint, # 2 Text of Proposed Order)(Rezvani, Tracy) (Entered: 12/20/2011)
                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 12 Filed: 12/20/2011, Entered: None
                                                            Memorandum in opposition to re 9 MOTION to Dismiss filed by ALLIE J. RICHARDSON, III, VON W. RICHARDSON. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Rezvani, Tracy) (Entered: 12/20/2011)
                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 11 Filed: 12/19/2011, Entered: None
                                                              MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice :Attorney Name- Jamie L. Sheller, :Firm- Sheller, P.C., :Address- 1528 Walnut Street, 4th Floor, Philadelphia, PA 19102. Phone No. - 215-790-7300. Fax No. - 215- 546-0942 by ALLIE J. RICHARDSON, III, VON W. RICHARDSON (Attachments: # 1 Declaration)(Rezvani, Tracy) (Entered: 12/19/2011)
                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 10 Filed: 12/6/2011, Entered: None
                                                                LCvR 7.1 CERTIFICATE OF DISCLOSURE of Corporate Affiliations and Financial Interests by SCIENCE APPLICATIONS INTERNATIONAL CORPORATION (Talati, Gunjan) (Entered: 12/06/2011)
                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 9 Filed: 12/6/2011, Entered: None
                                                                  MOTION to Dismiss by SCIENCE APPLICATIONS INTERNATIONAL CORPORATION (Talati, Gunjan) (Entered: 12/06/2011)
                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 8 Filed: 12/6/2011, Entered: None
                                                                    NOTICE of Appearance by Lawrence S. Sher on behalf of SCIENCE APPLICATIONS INTERNATIONAL CORPORATION (Sher, Lawrence) (Entered: 12/06/2011)
                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7 Filed: 12/5/2011, Entered: None
                                                                      NOTICE of Appearance by Gunjan Rashmikant Talati on behalf of SCIENCE APPLICATIONS INTERNATIONAL CORPORATION (Talati, Gunjan) (Entered: 12/05/2011)
                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 6 Filed: 12/2/2011, Entered: None
                                                                        RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed. TRICARE MANAGEMENT ACTIVITY served on 12/1/2011 (Rezvani, Tracy) (Entered: 12/02/2011)
                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5 Filed: 11/30/2011, Entered: None
                                                                          RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed. SCIENCE APPLICATIONS INTERNATIONAL CORPORATION served on 11/15/2011 (Rezvani, Tracy) (Entered: 11/30/2011)
                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4 Filed: 11/29/2011, Entered: None
                                                                            RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed. LEON E. PANETTA served on 11/14/2011 (Rezvani, Tracy) (Entered: 11/29/2011)
                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 3 Filed: 11/29/2011, Entered: None
                                                                              RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed. UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF DEFENSE served on 11/14/2011 (Rezvani, Tracy) (Entered: 11/29/2011)
                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2 Filed: 11/7/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                NOTICE OF RELATED CASE by ALLIE J. RICHARDSON, III, VON W. RICHARDSON. Case related to Case No. 11-1800. (rdj) (Entered: 11/08/2011)
                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1 Filed: 11/7/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                  COMPLAINT against LEON E. PANETTA, SCIENCE APPLICATIONS INTERNATIONAL CORPORATION, TRICARE MANAGEMENT ACTIVITY, UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF DEFENSE ( Filing fee $ 350, receipt number 4616043562) filed by VON W. RICHARDSON, ALLIE J. RICHARDSON, III. (Attachments: # 1 Civil Cover Sheet)(rdj) (Entered: 11/08/2011)
                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF

                                                                                    Statistics

                                                                                    This case has been viewed 103 times.

                                                                                    No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                                                                    Space
                                                                                    Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                    Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                     
                                                                                    PlainSite
                                                                                    Sign Up
                                                                                    Need Password Help?