Freddy Torres v. Los Angeles Regional Food Bank et al
State Civil Lawsuit Superior Court of California, County of Los Angeles, Case No. BC596167

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Last Updated August 22, 2016 at 4:10 PM EDT (5.4 years ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo Does 1 Through 25, Defendant/Respondent
No Logo Dronkers Jeff, Defendant/Respondent
No Logo Flood Michael, Defendant/Respondent
No Logo Los Angeles Regional Foodbank, Defendant/Respondent
No Logo Torres, Freddy, Plaintiff/Petitioner

Represented by Law Offices Of Young W. Ryu A.p.l.c.

Type Other Employment Complaint (General Jurisdiction)
Status Dismissed - Other 10/07/2015
  Entries (3) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Blank 3 Filed: 10/16/2015, Entered: 10/16/2015
    Blank 2 Filed: 10/7/2015, Entered: 10/7/2015
      Blank 1 Filed: 9/30/2015, Entered: 9/30/2015

        Statistics

        This case has been viewed 247 times.

        No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
        Space
        Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
        Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
         
        PlainSite
        Sign Up
        Need Password Help?