Ken Yim et al v. London Trust Media Inc et al
State Civil Lawsuit Superior Court of California, County of Los Angeles, Case No. BC596372

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Last Updated August 22, 2016 at 4:19 PM DT (4.8 years ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo Choi Jane, Plaintiff/Petitioner
No Logo Pak, John, Plaintiff/Petitioner
Unknown Role, Korea Fund Inc
No Logo Yim Ken, Plaintiff/Petitioner
No Logo Yim, Michael, Plaintiff/Petitioner
No Logo Does 1 Through 20, Defendant/Respondent
No Logo London Trust Media, Inc., Defendant/Respondent
Officially listed as "London Trust Media Incorporated"
Type Other Employment Complaint (General Jurisdiction)
Status Pending
  Entries (17) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Blank 17 Filed: 3/14/2016, Entered: 3/14/2016
    Blank 16 Filed: 2/18/2016, Entered: 2/18/2016
      Blank 15 Filed: 1/27/2016, Entered: 1/27/2016
        Blank 14 Filed: 1/27/2016, Entered: 1/27/2016
          Blank 13 Filed: 1/26/2016, Entered: 1/26/2016
            Blank 12 Filed: 1/26/2016, Entered: 1/26/2016
              Blank 11 Filed: 1/19/2016, Entered: 1/19/2016
                Blank 10 Filed: 1/19/2016, Entered: 1/19/2016
                  Blank 9 Filed: 1/15/2016, Entered: 1/15/2016
                    Blank 8 Filed: 1/7/2016, Entered: 1/7/2016
                      Blank 7 Filed: 11/9/2015, Entered: 11/9/2015
                        Blank 6 Filed: 11/9/2015, Entered: 11/9/2015
                          Blank 5 Filed: 10/20/2015, Entered: 10/20/2015
                            Blank 4 Filed: 10/13/2015, Entered: 10/13/2015
                              Blank 3 Filed: 10/9/2015, Entered: 10/9/2015
                                Blank 2 Filed: 10/6/2015, Entered: 10/6/2015
                                  Blank 1 Filed: 10/2/2015, Entered: 10/2/2015

                                    Statistics

                                    This case has been viewed 482 times.

                                    No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                    Space
                                    Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                    Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                     
                                    PlainSite
                                    Sign Up
                                    Need Password Help?