Kitchens v. Clean Harbors Environmental Services, Inc et al
Federal Civil Lawsuit Texas Eastern District Court, Case No. 1:16-cv-00347

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Last Updated September 19, 2018 at 6:43 PM DT (2.8 years ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo Richard Kitchens, Jr, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by The Nielsen Law Firm, PC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Eric David Nielsen +1 713 524 4800 +1 888 587 9443 eric@midtownlaw.com
v.
No Logo Clean Harbors Environmental Services, Inc., Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Suite 3300

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Kent Morrison Adams +1 713 353 2000 +1 713 785 7780 kent.adams@wilsonelser.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Wilson Elser Moskowitz Edelman & Dicker LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Ross Holiday Jones +1 409 600 8100 +1 409 832 8151 ross.jones@wilsonelser.com
No Logo Jesse E. Wiley, Defendant
  Entries (31) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 34 Filed: 9/19/2018, Entered: None Order on Motion to Dismiss
    Request RequestSpace LREF
    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 33 Filed: 9/18/2018, Entered: None Dismiss
      Request RequestSpace LREF
      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 32 Filed: 5/22/2018, Entered: None Order Dismissing Case
        Request RequestSpace LREF
        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 31 Filed: 5/21/2018, Entered: None Report of Mediation
          Request RequestSpace LREF
          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 30 Filed: 5/4/2018, Entered: None Strike
            Request RequestSpace LREF
            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 29 Filed: 3/15/2018, Entered: None Notice of Discovery Disclosure
              Request RequestSpace LREF
              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 28 Filed: 11/16/2017, Entered: None Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief
                Request RequestSpace LREF
                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 27 Filed: 11/16/2017, Entered: None Order on Motion to Compel
                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 26 Filed: 11/16/2017, Entered: None Telephone Conference
                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 25 Filed: 11/15/2017, Entered: None Scheduling Order
                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 24 Filed: 11/1/2017, Entered: None Reply to Response to Motion
                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 23 Filed: 10/31/2017, Entered: None Reply to Response to Motion
                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 22 Filed: 10/27/2017, Entered: None Response to Motion
                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 21 Filed: 10/27/2017, Entered: None Response to Motion
                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 20 Filed: 10/13/2017, Entered: None Miscellaneous Relief
                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 19 Filed: 10/13/2017, Entered: None Compel
                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 18 Filed: 10/13/2017, Entered: None Extension of Time to Complete Discovery
                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 16 Filed: 7/14/2017, Entered: None Notice of Discovery Disclosure
                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 15 Filed: 6/9/2017, Entered: None Answer
                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 14 Filed: 3/29/2017, Entered: None Scheduling Order
                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 13 Filed: 3/28/2017, Entered: None Miscellaneous Relief
                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 12 Filed: 2/10/2017, Entered: None Scheduling Order
                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 11 Filed: 2/8/2017, Entered: None Extension of Time to Complete Discovery
                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 10 Filed: 10/7/2016, Entered: None Scheduling Order
                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 9 Filed: 10/7/2016, Entered: None Scheduling Conference
                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5 Filed: 8/26/2016, Entered: None Notice (Other)
                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4 Filed: 8/26/2016, Entered: None Answer
                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 3 Filed: 8/24/2016, Entered: None Order
                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 3 Filed: 8/23/2016, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                          ORDER to Conduct Rule 26(f) Conference with a proposed Scheduling Order. Signed by Judge Marcia A. Crone on 8/23/16. (mrp, ) (Entered: 08/24/2016)
                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2 Filed: 8/22/2016, Entered: None Complaint
                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1 Filed: 8/22/2016, Entered: None Notice of Removal
                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF

                                                                Statistics

                                                                This case has been viewed 29 times.

                                                                No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                                                Space
                                                                Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                 
                                                                PlainSite
                                                                Sign Up
                                                                Need Password Help?