Brand Sense Partners Llc v. Rawpothecary Goodz Llc
State Civil Lawsuit Superior Court of California, County of Los Angeles, Case No. BC604314

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Last Updated October 30, 2017 at 5:40 AM EDT (4.2 years ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts
No Logo Does 1 Through 50, Defendant
No Logo Brand Sense Partners, LLC, Plaintiff and Cross-Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Harrison Barnes A.p.l.c.
No Logo Rawpothecary Goodz Llc, Defendant and Cross-Complainant
Type Contractual Fraud (General Jurisdiction)
Status Other Judgment 10/19/2016
  Entries (14) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Blank 14 Filed: 10/26/2016, Entered: 10/26/2016 Notice of Entry of Judgment
    Request RequestSpace
    Blank 13 Filed: 10/19/2016, Entered: 10/19/2016 Declaration
    of Jores Kharatian, Esq. in support of plaintiff's application for entry of judgment
      Request RequestSpace
      Blank 12 Filed: 10/19/2016, Entered: 10/19/2016 judgmentCourt Filing
      -signed by Judge Mackey
        Request RequestSpace
        Blank 11 Filed: 10/11/2016, Entered: 10/11/2016 Declaration
        of Susan Clary, Esq. in support of plaintiff Brand Sense Partners, LLC's Ex Parte Application for Entry of Judgment pursuant to joint stipulation for entry of judgment
          Request RequestSpace
          Blank 10 Filed: 10/11/2016, Entered: 10/11/2016 Declaration
          of Monica Hallinan in support of plaintiff Brand Sense Partner, LLC's application for entry of judgment pursuant to stipulation against defendant
            Request RequestSpace
            Blank 9 Filed: 10/11/2016, Entered: 10/11/2016 Ex-Parte Application
            for entry of judgment pursuant to joint stipulation for entry of judgment; memo of points and authorities and declarations of Monica Hallinan, and Susan Clary, Esq. in support thereof
              Request RequestSpace
              Blank 8 Filed: 8/15/2016, Entered: 8/15/2016 Notice
              Notice of Conditional Settlement
                Request RequestSpace
                Blank 7 Filed: 3/30/2016, Entered: 3/30/2016 Statement-Case Management
                  Request RequestSpace
                  Blank 6 Filed: 3/29/2016, Entered: 3/29/2016 Answer To Cross-complaint
                  Plaintiff/Cross-Defendant Brand Sense Partners, LLC's Answer to Defendant's Cross-Complaint
                    Request RequestSpace
                    Blank 5 Filed: 2/29/2016, Entered: 2/29/2016 Cross Complaint
                      Request RequestSpace
                      Blank 4 Filed: 2/29/2016, Entered: 2/29/2016 Answer
                      Defendant Rawpothecary Goodz LLC's Answer to Complaint
                        Request RequestSpace
                        Blank 3 Filed: 1/15/2016, Entered: 1/15/2016 Notice-Case Management Conference
                          Request RequestSpace
                          Blank 2 Filed: 12/23/2015, Entered: 12/23/2015 Notice-Case Management Conference
                            Request RequestSpace
                            Blank 1 Filed: 12/15/2015, Entered: 12/15/2015 Complaint
                            for Plaintiff Brand Sense Partners, LLC
                              Request RequestSpace

                              Statistics

                              This case has been viewed 18 times.

                              No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                              Space
                              Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                              Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                               
                              PlainSite
                              Sign Up
                              Need Password Help?