Jennifer Munoz v. Angelica Maria Campos et al
State Civil Lawsuit Superior Court of California, County of Los Angeles, Case No. BC605238

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Last Updated October 30, 2017 at 6:20 AM DT (4 years ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo Campos Angelica Maria, Defendant/Respondent
No Logo Campos Angelica Maria (msj Granted), Defendant/Respondent

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space O'neill, Michael J
No Logo Does 1 Through 10, Defendant/Respondent

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space O'neill, Michael J
State Farm General Insurance Company State Farm General Insurance Company, Defendant/Respondent

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space O'neill, Michael J
No Logo Munoz Jennifer, Plaintiff/Petitioner

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Carter Law
Type Other Prof Malp-not Med or Legal (General Jurisdiction)
Status Dismissed - Other 01/17/2017
  Entries (29) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Blank 29 Filed: 1/17/2017, Entered: 1/17/2017 Request and Entry of Dismissal
ENTIRE ACTION WITH PREJUDICE
    Blank 28 Filed: 12/7/2016, Entered: 12/7/2016 Notice of Entry of Judgment
      Blank 27 Filed: 11/14/2016, Entered: 11/14/2016 Partial Judgment
      not entire case) (BY COURT UNDER C.C.P. SECTION 437c AGAINST PLTFF, JENNIFER MUNOZ AND FOR ANGELICA MARIA CAMPOS ONLY:
        Blank 26 Filed: 10/19/2016, Entered: 10/19/2016 Order
        ON RULING RE: DEFT., MARIA ANGELICA CAMPOS' MSJ OR, IN THE ALT., MSA;
          Blank 25 Filed: 10/14/2016, Entered: 10/14/2016 Opposition Document
            Blank 24 Filed: 10/5/2016, Entered: 10/5/2016 Declaration
            OF JENIFER MUNOZ IN SUPPORT OF OPPOSITION
              Blank 23 Filed: 10/5/2016, Entered: 10/5/2016 Opposition Document
              WITH SEPARATE STATEMENT
                Blank 22 Filed: 9/29/2016, Entered: 9/29/2016 Notice Of Ruling
                ON DEFT STATE FARM GENERAL INSUR. COMPANY'S MOTION FOR SUMMARY ADJ
                  Blank 21 Filed: 9/28/2016, Entered: 9/28/2016 Order
                  ON RULING RE: DEFT, STATE FARM GENERAL INSURANCE COMPANY'S MTN FOR SUMMARY ADJUDICATION;
                    Blank 20 Filed: 9/23/2016, Entered: 9/23/2016 Reply to Opposition
                      Blank 19 Filed: 9/14/2016, Entered: 9/14/2016 Opposition Document
                        Blank 18 Filed: 9/14/2016, Entered: 9/14/2016 Declaration
                        W/SEPARATE STATEMENT
                          Blank 17 Filed: 9/1/2016, Entered: 9/1/2016 Notice
                          OF ERRATA (2X
                            Blank 16 Filed: 8/5/2016, Entered: 8/5/2016 Request For Judicial Notice
                              Blank 15 Filed: 8/5/2016, Entered: 8/5/2016 SUMMARY JUDGMENT
                              WITH SUPPORTING DOCUMENTS; COMPENDIUM; SEPARATE STATEMENT
                                Blank 14 Filed: 7/18/2016, Entered: 7/18/2016 Demurrer
                                  Blank 13 Filed: 7/16/2016, Entered: 7/16/2016 Request For Judicial Notice
                                    Blank 12 Filed: 7/15/2016, Entered: 7/15/2016 notice of motion
                                    SUMMARY ADJUDICATION
                                      Blank 11 Filed: 7/15/2016, Entered: 7/15/2016 Miscellaneous-Other
                                      SEPARATE STATEMENT OF CASE COMPENDIUM OF DECLARATIONS
                                        Blank 10 Filed: 6/20/2016, Entered: 6/20/2016 Notice of change of address
                                          Blank 9 Filed: 5/3/2016, Entered: 5/3/2016 Amendment to Complaint
                                          TO CORRECT PATY NAME AND ORDER;
                                            Blank 8 Filed: 4/22/2016, Entered: 4/22/2016 Order: Case Management
                                              Blank 7 Filed: 4/20/2016, Entered: 4/20/2016 Receipt
                                              $150 jury fees
                                                Blank 6 Filed: 4/20/2016, Entered: 4/20/2016 Notice
                                                of posting jury fees
                                                  Blank 5 Filed: 4/1/2016, Entered: 4/1/2016 Proof-Service/Summons
                                                    Blank 4 Filed: 2/29/2016, Entered: 2/29/2016 Amendment to Complaint
                                                    INCORRECT NAME: STATE FARM FIRE AND CASUALTY CO. A DELAWARE CORP. CORRECT NAME: STATE FARM FIRE AND CASUALTY CO., AN ILLINOIS CORP.
                                                      Blank 3 Filed: 2/23/2016, Entered: 2/23/2016 Answer
                                                        Blank 2 Filed: 1/5/2016, Entered: 1/5/2016 Notice-Case Management Conference
                                                          Blank 1 Filed: 12/24/2015, Entered: 12/24/2015 Complaint

                                                            Statistics

                                                            This case has been viewed 2 times.

                                                            No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                                            Space
                                                            Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                            Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                             
                                                            PlainSite
                                                            Sign Up
                                                            Need Password Help?