Tatcha, LLC v. Landmark Technology LLC
Federal Civil Lawsuit California Northern District Court, Case No. 3:16-cv-04831

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Last Updated June 15, 2017 at 1:40 AM DT (4 years ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo Tatcha LLC, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Mitchell Company

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Marcel F. De Armas +1 415 944 9789 mdearmas@mcolawoffices.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Brian Edward Mitchell +1 415 766 3515 +1 415 402 0058 brian.mitchell@mcolawoffices.com
v.
No Logo Landmark Technology, LLC, Defendant
  Entries (63) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 55 Filed: 4/4/2017, Entered: None Order Dismissing Case
    Request RequestSpace LREF
    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 54 Filed: 4/3/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
    ADR Remark: Mediator is advised the case is settled and mediation is no longer needed. (cmf, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/3/2017) (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (Entered: 04/03/2017)
      Request RequestSpace LREF
      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 53 Filed: 3/20/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
      Pre MED phone conference scheduled on 3/23/2017 at 2:00 PM Pacific time. (cmf, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/20/2017) (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (Entered: 03/20/2017)
        Request RequestSpace LREF
        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 52 Filed: 3/18/2017, Entered: None Case Management Statement
          Request RequestSpace LREF
          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 52 Filed: 3/17/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
          SUPPLEMENTAL CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT REGARDING DAMAGES; filed by Landmark Technology LLC. (Lee, John) (Filed on 3/17/2017) Modified on 3/20/2017 (aaaS, COURT STAFF). (Entered: 03/17/2017)
            Request RequestSpace LREF
            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 51 Filed: 3/10/2017, Entered: None Order on Motion for Judgment on the Pleadings
              Request RequestSpace LREF
              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 50 Filed: 3/4/2017, Entered: None Order
                Request RequestSpace LREF
                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 50 Filed: 3/3/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                ORDER REGARDING LANDMARK'S AMENDED DAMAGES DISCLOSURE - Further amendments to the damages disclosure in the Case Management Statement as required by this Order shall be filed by Landmark on or before March 17, 2017. Signed by Judge William H. Orrick on 03/03/2017. (jmdS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/3/2017) (Entered: 03/03/2017)
                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 49 Filed: 2/21/2017, Entered: None Objection
                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 48 Filed: 2/15/2017, Entered: None Case Management Statement
                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 47 Filed: 2/14/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                      CLERK'S NOTICE re: Notice of Video Recording 44 . Please note that the 2/8/17 hearing, while approved for video recording, was not in fact recorded due to an error on the part of the Clerk's Office. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (kmsS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/14/2017) (Entered: 02/14/2017)
                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 46 Filed: 2/9/2017, Entered: None Motion Hearing
                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 46 Filed: 2/8/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                          Minute Entry for proceedings held before Hon. William H. Orrick: Case Management Conference and Motion Hearing re 33 MOTION for Judgment on the Pleadings held on 2/8/2017. Motion taken under submission; written order to follow. Tutorial Hearing set for 10/6/2017 09:00 AM in Courtroom 2, 17th Floor, San Francisco. Claims Construction Hearing set for 10/13/2017 09:00 AM.Total Time in Court 22 minutes. Court Reporter Name Lydia Zinn. Plaintiff Attorney Brian E. Mitchell. Defendant Attorney Jennifer Ishimoto. (jmdS, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 2/8/2017) (Entered: 02/08/2017)
                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 45 Filed: 1/31/2017, Entered: None Joint Case Management Statement
                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 44 Filed: 1/27/2017, Entered: None Clerk's Notice of Video Recording Request
                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 43 Filed: 1/18/2017, Entered: None Order on Motion to Relate Case
                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 42 Filed: 1/18/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                  CLERK'S NOTICE - Case Management Conference continued to 2/8/2017 02:00 PM in Courtroom 2, 17th Floor, San Francisco (to coincide with motion hearing). (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (jmdS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/18/2017) (Entered: 01/18/2017)
                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 41 Filed: 1/18/2017, Entered: None Reply to Opposition/Response
                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 41 Filed: 1/17/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                      REPLY (re 33 MOTION for Judgment on the Pleadings ) filed byTatcha, LLC. (De Armas, Marcel) (Filed on 1/17/2017) (Entered: 01/17/2017)
                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 40 Filed: 1/10/2017, Entered: None Opposition/Response to Motion
                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 39 Filed: 1/10/2017, Entered: None Relate Case
                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 38 Filed: 1/10/2017, Entered: None Order
                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 38 Filed: 12/29/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                              Order Extending Deadline to Hold ADR Session by Hon. William H. Orrick granting 34 Stipulation. (jmdS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/29/2016) (Entered: 12/29/2016) (Entered: 01/10/2017)
                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 37 Filed: 1/4/2017, Entered: None Order
                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 36 Filed: 1/3/2017, Entered: None Stipulation and Proposed Order
                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 35 Filed: 12/29/2016, Entered: None Order on Stipulation
                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 34 Filed: 12/29/2016, Entered: None Stipulation and Proposed Order
                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 33 Filed: 12/27/2016, Entered: None Judgment on the Pleadings
                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 32 Filed: 12/20/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                          Pre MED phone conference scheduled on 12/21/2016 at 3:00 PM. (cmf, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/20/2016) (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (Entered: 12/20/2016)
                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 31 Filed: 12/15/2016, Entered: None ADR Clerk's Notice Appointing Mediator
                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 30 Filed: 12/14/2016, Entered: None Certificate of Interested Entities
                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 29 Filed: 12/7/2016, Entered: None Answer to Counterclaim
                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 28 Filed: 12/2/2016, Entered: None Reply to Opposition/Response
                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 27 Filed: 11/30/2016, Entered: None Order on Stipulation selecting Mediation
                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 26 Filed: 11/24/2016, Entered: None Opposition/Response to Motion
                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 26 Filed: 11/23/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                        OPPOSITION/RESPONSE (re 14 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction and/or Transfer ) filed byTatcha, LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration E. Bevan, # 2 Declaration M. De Armas, # 3 Exhibit A)(De Armas, Marcel) (Filed on 11/23/2016) (Entered: 11/23/2016)
                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 25 Filed: 11/21/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                          CLERK'S NOTICE - Case Management Conference continued to 2/7/2017 02:00 PM in Courtroom 2, 17th Floor, San Francisco. Case Management Statement due by 1/31/2017. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (jmdS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/21/2016) (Entered: 11/21/2016)
                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 24 Filed: 11/18/2016, Entered: None Certificate of Interested Entities
                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 23 Filed: 11/17/2016, Entered: None Response to Order to Show Cause
                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 22 Filed: 11/17/2016, Entered: None ADR Certification (ADR L.R. 3-5 b) of discussion of ADR options
                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 21 Filed: 11/16/2016, Entered: None Stipulation and Proposed Order selecting Mediation
                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 20 Filed: 11/16/2016, Entered: None ADR Certification (ADR L.R. 3-5 b) of discussion of ADR options
                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 19 Filed: 11/16/2016, Entered: None ADR Clerk's Notice
                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 18 Filed: 11/16/2016, Entered: None Set Motion and Deadlines/Hearings
                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 17 Filed: 11/15/2016, Entered: None Counterclaim
                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 16 Filed: 11/14/2016, Entered: None Reply to Opposition/Response
                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 15 Filed: 11/1/2016, Entered: None Amended Complaint
                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 14 Filed: 10/21/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction and/or Transfer filed by Landmark Technology LLC. Motion Hearing set for 12/7/2016 02:00 PM in Courtroom 2, 17th Floor, San Francisco before Hon. William H. Orrick. Responses due by 11/4/2016. Replies due by 11/14/2016. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of Jennifer Ishimoto, # 2 Declaration of Lawrence Lockwood, # 3 Proposed Order)(Ishimoto, Jennifer) (Filed on 10/21/2016) (Entered: 10/21/2016)
                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 13 Filed: 10/21/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                  NOTICE of Appearance by Jennifer L. Ishimoto for Defendant Landmark Technology (Ishimoto, Jennifer) (Filed on 10/21/2016) (Entered: 10/21/2016)
                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 12 Filed: 8/30/2016, Entered: None Waiver of Service Executed
                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                      Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 11 Filed: 8/30/2016, Entered: None Request for Waiver of Service
                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 10 Filed: 8/24/2016, Entered: None Case Management Scheduling Order
                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 9 Filed: 8/24/2016, Entered: None Order Reassigning Case
                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 8 Filed: 8/23/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                            CLERK'S NOTICE OF IMPENDING REASSIGNMENT TO A U.S. DISTRICT COURT JUDGE: The Clerk of this Court will now randomly reassign this case to a District Judge because either (1) a party has not consented to the jurisdiction of a Magistrate Judge, or (2) time is of the essence in deciding a pending judicial action for which the necessary consents to Magistrate Judge jurisdiction have not been secured. You will be informed by separate notice of the district judge to whom this case is reassigned. ALL HEARING DATES PRESENTLY SCHEDULED BEFORE THE CURRENT MAGISTRATE JUDGE ARE VACATED AND SHOULD BE RE-NOTICED FOR HEARING BEFORE THE JUDGE TO WHOM THIS CASE IS REASSIGNED. This is a text only docket entry; there is no document associated with this notice. (ig, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/23/2016) (Entered: 08/23/2016)
                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7 Filed: 8/23/2016, Entered: None Consent/Declination to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge
                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 6 Filed: 8/23/2016, Entered: None Patent/Trademark Copy
                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5 Filed: 8/23/2016, Entered: None Summons Issued
                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4 Filed: 8/23/2016, Entered: None Initial Case Management Scheduling Order with ADR Deadlines
                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 3 Filed: 8/23/2016, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                      Case assigned to Magistrate Judge Donna M. Ryu. Counsel for plaintiff or the removing party is responsible for serving the Complaint or Notice of Removal, Summons and the assigned judge's standing orders and all other new case documents upon the opposing parties. For information, visit E-Filing A New Civil Case at http://cand.uscourts.gov/ecf/caseopening.Standing orders can be downloaded from the court's web page at www.cand.uscourts.gov/judges. Upon receipt, the summons will be issued and returned electronically. Counsel is required to send chambers a copy of the initiating documents pursuant to L.R. 5-1(e)(7). A scheduling order will be sent by Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) within two business days. Consent/Declination due by 9/6/2016. (cjlS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/23/2016) (Entered: 08/23/2016)
                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2 Filed: 8/23/2016, Entered: None Proposed Summons
                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                          Blank 2 Filed: 8/22/2016, Entered: None
                                                                                                                          Proposed Summons. (De Armas, Marcel) (Filed on 8/22/2016) (Entered: 08/22/2016)
                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1 Filed: 8/23/2016, Entered: None Complaint
                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1 Filed: 8/22/2016, Entered: None
                                                                                                                              COMPLAINT for Declaratory Judgment of Invalidity and Non-Infringement against Landmark Technology LLC ( Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0971-10709571.). Filed byTatcha, LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A (First Landmark Letter), # 2 Exhibit B (Second Landmark Letter), # 3 Civil Cover Sheet)(Mitchell, Brian) (Filed on 8/22/2016) (Entered: 08/22/2016)
                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF

                                                                                                                                Statistics

                                                                                                                                This case has been viewed 69 times.

                                                                                                                                No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                                                                                                                Space
                                                                                                                                Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                                                Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                                                 
                                                                                                                                PlainSite
                                                                                                                                Sign Up
                                                                                                                                Need Password Help?