Yan Fox Danna Snir v. Robert Zalkin et al
State Civil Lawsuit Superior Court of California, County of Los Angeles, Case No. BC606755

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Last Updated October 30, 2017 at 7:26 AM DT (3.7 years ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo Alwhorn Alicia, Defendant/Respondent

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Shulkin Robert J..
Coldwell Banker Corporation Coldwell Banker Corporation, Defendant/Respondent
Officially listed as "Coldwell Banker"

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Shulkin Robert J..
No Logo Does 1-25, Defendant/Respondent

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Shulkin Robert J..
No Logo Extraordinary Real Estate Inc, Defendant/Respondent

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Shulkin Robert J..
No Logo Roy Jocelyn, Defendant/Respondent

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Shulkin Robert J..
No Logo Zalkin Robert, Defendant/Respondent

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Shulkin Robert J..
No Logo Los Angeles Superior Court-civil Limited, Court-Other County/State
No Logo Snir Yan Fox Danna, Plaintiff/Petitioner

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Abb Wayne M..
Type Other Prof Malp-not Med or Legal (General Jurisdiction)
Status Reclassified-Limited-Los Angeles 04/25/2017
  Entries (29) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Blank 29 Filed: 9/6/2017, Entered: 9/6/2017 Notice of Outgoing Case Transfer
    Blank 28 Filed: 8/25/2017, Entered: 8/25/2017 Partial Dismissal
    with Prejudice) (COMPLAINT AS TO COLDWELL BANKER RESIDENTIAL BROKERAGE CO. AND JOCLYNN ROY
      Blank 27 Filed: 8/23/2017, Entered: 8/23/2017 Partial Dismissal
      with Prejudice) (with prejudice as to Extraordinary Real Estate Inc. and Alicia La Whorn
        Blank 26 Filed: 4/25/2017, Entered: 4/25/2017 Order
        GRANTING APPLICATION FOR DETERMINATION OF GOOD FAITH SETTLEMENT PURSUANT TO CCP SECTION CCP 877.6(A)(2) BY DEFENDANTS COLDWELL AND ROY
          Blank 25 Filed: 4/7/2017, Entered: 4/7/2017 Order
          RE: APPLICATION FOR DETERMINATION OF GOOD FAITH SETTLEMENT PURSUANT TO CCP 877.6(a)(2) BY DEFENDANTS, EXTRAORDINARY REAL ESTATE, INC. AND ALICIA LAWHON
            Blank 24 Filed: 3/24/2017, Entered: 3/24/2017 Notice of hearing
            Notice of Hearing of Good Faith settlement and application for determination of good faith settlement
              Blank 23 Filed: 3/24/2017, Entered: 3/24/2017 Application-Miscellaneous
              Application for Determination of Good Faith Settlement Pursuant to CCP 877
                Blank 22 Filed: 3/24/2017, Entered: 3/24/2017 Declaration
                of Robert J. Shulkin
                  Blank 21 Filed: 3/8/2017, Entered: 3/8/2017 Points and Authorities
                  IN SUPPORT OF APPLICATION FOR DETERMINATION OF GOOD FAITH SETTLEMENT
                    Blank 20 Filed: 3/8/2017, Entered: 3/8/2017 Notice
                    NOTICE OF SETTLEMENT AND APPL. FOR DETERMINATION OF GOOD SETTLE.
                      Blank 19 Filed: 3/8/2017, Entered: 3/8/2017 Declaration
                      OF JOSHUA W. MILLER, ESQ.
                        Blank 18 Filed: 3/8/2017, Entered: 3/8/2017 Application-Miscellaneous
                        FOR DETERMINATION OF GOOD FAITH SETTLEMENT PUS. TO CCP SECTION 877 A 2
                          Blank 17 Filed: 11/17/2016, Entered: 11/17/2016 Amended Answer
                            Blank 16 Filed: 9/28/2016, Entered: 9/28/2016 First Amended Complaint
                              Blank 15 Filed: 8/26/2016, Entered: 8/26/2016 Declaration
                              OF JOSHUA W. MILLER RE: MEET AND CONFER
                                Blank 14 Filed: 8/26/2016, Entered: 8/26/2016 Motion to strike
                                  Blank 13 Filed: 8/26/2016, Entered: 8/26/2016 Demurrer
                                    Blank 12 Filed: 7/29/2016, Entered: 7/29/2016 Notice
                                    AMENDED NOTICE OF SETTING OF STATUS CONFERENCE
                                      Blank 11 Filed: 7/18/2016, Entered: 7/18/2016 Notice
                                      Notice of setting of status conference
                                        Blank 10 Filed: 6/28/2016, Entered: 6/28/2016 Statement-Case Management
                                          Blank 9 Filed: 6/24/2016, Entered: 6/24/2016 Receipt
                                            Blank 8 Filed: 6/24/2016, Entered: 6/24/2016 Statement-Case Management
                                              Blank 7 Filed: 4/26/2016, Entered: 4/26/2016 Notice
                                              notice of taking demurrer off cal
                                                Blank 6 Filed: 3/25/2016, Entered: 3/25/2016 Motion to strike
                                                  Blank 5 Filed: 3/25/2016, Entered: 3/25/2016 Demurrer
                                                    Blank 4 Filed: 2/11/2016, Entered: 2/11/2016 Answer To Unverified Complaint
                                                      Blank 3 Filed: 2/3/2016, Entered: 2/3/2016 Notice-Case Management Conference
                                                        Blank 2 Filed: 1/11/2016, Entered: 1/11/2016 Complaint
                                                          Blank 1 Filed: 1/11/2016, Entered: 1/11/2016 Summons Filed

                                                            Statistics

                                                            This case has been viewed 37 times.

                                                            No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                                            Space
                                                            Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                            Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                             
                                                            PlainSite
                                                            Sign Up
                                                            Need Password Help?