Daniel Santiago v. Elaine Robinson et al
State Civil Lawsuit Superior Court of California, County of Los Angeles, Case No. BC608087

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Last Updated October 30, 2017 at 4:47 PM EDT (4.2 years ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts
No Logo Does 1-50, Defendant/Respondent
No Logo Robinson Elaine, Defendant/Respondent
No Logo Santiago, David, Defendant/Respondent
No Logo Santiago, Daniel, Plaintiff/Petitioner

Represented by Law Offices Of Kenneth L Snyder Apc

Type Motor Vehicle - PI/PD/WD (General Jurisdiction)
Status Dismissed - Other 07/19/2016
  Entries (5) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Blank 5 Filed: 7/19/2016, Entered: 7/19/2016 Request and Entry of Dismissal
WITH PREJUDICE; ENTIRE ACTION OF ALL PARTIES AND ALL CAUSES OF ACTION
    Request RequestSpace
    Blank 4 Filed: 2/3/2016, Entered: 2/3/2016 Summons Filed
      Request RequestSpace
      Blank 3 Filed: 1/27/2016, Entered: 1/27/2016 Order-Court Fee Waiver
        Request RequestSpace
        Blank 2 Filed: 1/25/2016, Entered: 1/25/2016 Complaint
          Request RequestSpace
          Blank 1 Filed: 1/25/2016, Entered: 1/25/2016 Request-Waive Court Fees
            Request RequestSpace

            Statistics

            This case has been viewed 3 times.

            No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
            Space
            Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
            Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
             
            PlainSite
            Sign Up
            Need Password Help?