Polly Powers Grossman et al v. Leif Rogers Md et al
State Civil Lawsuit Superior Court of California, County of Los Angeles, Case No. BC608547

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Last Updated October 30, 2017 at 5:07 PM DT (3.5 years ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo Grossman, Howard, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Girardi Keese +1 909 381 1551
Space Girardi Tom V.
No Logo Grossman Polly Powers, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Girardi Tom V.
v.
Allergan, Inc. Allergan, Inc., Defendant
No Logo Leif L. Rogers M.d. Professional Corp., Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Packer O'leary & Corson

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Roosevelt T. Kevin
No Logo Rogers M.d. Leif, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Packer O'leary & Corson

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Roosevelt T. Kevin
Allergan, Inc. Allergan, Inc., Defendant/Respondent

Toggle Switch Represented by Finlayson Toffer Roosevelt & Lilly LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Packer Roert B.

Toggle Switch Represented by Finlayson Toffer Roosevelt and Lilly LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Packer Roert B.

Toggle Switch Represented by Packer O'leary & Corson

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Roosevelt T. Kevin
No Logo Does 1-20, Defendant/Respondent

Toggle Switch Represented by Finlayson Toffer Roosevelt & Lilly LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Packer Roert B.

Toggle Switch Represented by Finlayson Toffer Roosevelt and Lilly LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Packer Roert B.
No Logo Rogers Leif L. M.d. Professional Corp., Defendant/Respondent

Toggle Switch Represented by Finlayson Toffer Roosevelt & Lilly LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Packer Roert B.

Toggle Switch Represented by Finlayson Toffer Roosevelt and Lilly LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Packer Roert B.
No Logo Rogers Leif. M.d., Defendant/Respondent

Toggle Switch Represented by Finlayson Toffer Roosevelt & Lilly LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Packer Roert B.

Toggle Switch Represented by Finlayson Toffer Roosevelt and Lilly LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Packer Roert B.
No Logo Grossman, Howard, Plaintiff/Petitioner
No Logo Grossman Polly Powers, Plaintiff/Petitioner

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Girardi Keese +1 909 381 1551
Space Girardi Tom V.
Type Med Malpractice (Drs & Surgeons) (General Jurisdiction)
Status Pending
  Entries (51) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Blank 51 Filed: 10/18/2017, Entered: 10/18/2017 Ex-Parte Application
FOR AN ORDER TO CONTINUE TRIAL & ALL TRIAL RELATED DATES SO THAT DR. ROGERS' MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT CAN BE HEARD
    Blank 50 Filed: 8/29/2017, Entered: 8/29/2017 Proof of Service
      Blank 49 Filed: 8/29/2017, Entered: 8/29/2017 Miscellaneous-Other
      APPENDIX OF NON-CALIFORNIA AUTHORITIES IN SUPPORT OF MOTION
        Blank 48 Filed: 8/29/2017, Entered: 8/29/2017 Miscellaneous-Other
        COMPENDIUM OF EVIDENCE IN SUPPORT OF ITS MOTION
          Blank 47 Filed: 8/29/2017, Entered: 8/29/2017 Declaration
          OF T. KEVIN ROOSEVELT
            Blank 46 Filed: 8/29/2017, Entered: 8/29/2017 notice of motion
            AND MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT
              Blank 45 Filed: 8/29/2017, Entered: 8/29/2017 Separate Statement of Und. Facts
                Blank 44 Filed: 4/13/2017, Entered: 4/13/2017 Declaration
                OF T. KEVIN ROOSEVELT IN SUPP OF EX PARTE APPLIC
                  Blank 43 Filed: 4/13/2017, Entered: 4/13/2017 Ex-Parte Application
                  TO CONTINUE TRIAL DATE
                    Blank 42 Filed: 12/19/2016, Entered: 12/19/2016 Partial Dismissal
                    w/o Prejudice) (as to Leif L. Rogers MD, Professional corporation only
                      Blank 41 Filed: 11/15/2016, Entered: 11/15/2016 Notice of trial
                      TRIAL 6-9-17 8:30 AM DEOT O
                        Blank 40 Filed: 11/3/2016, Entered: 11/3/2016 Answer To First Amended Complaint
                          Blank 39 Filed: 10/20/2016, Entered: 10/20/2016 reply
                          brief in support of demurrer to FAC
                            Blank 38 Filed: 10/14/2016, Entered: 10/14/2016 Opposition Document
                            OPP TO DEFT ALLERGAN INC DEM TO PLTFS FAC
                              Blank 37 Filed: 10/14/2016, Entered: 10/14/2016 Opposition
                              to demurrer to FAC
                                Blank 36 Filed: 9/22/2016, Entered: 9/22/2016 Notice
                                of rescheduled hearing on Deft Allergan Inc's demurrer to FAC
                                  Blank 35 Filed: 9/21/2016, Entered: 9/21/2016 Declaration
                                  Robert J McGuirl in support of demurrer to FAC
                                    Blank 34 Filed: 9/21/2016, Entered: 9/21/2016 Miscellaneous-Other
                                    appendix of non California authorities in support of demurrer to FAC
                                      Blank 33 Filed: 9/21/2016, Entered: 9/21/2016 Substitution of Attorney
                                        Blank 32 Filed: 9/21/2016, Entered: 9/21/2016 Demurrer
                                        to FAC Deft Allergan Inc.
                                          Blank 31 Filed: 8/26/2016, Entered: 8/26/2016 Statement-Case Management
                                            Blank 30 Filed: 8/23/2016, Entered: 8/23/2016 Answer To First Amended Complaint
                                            Answer of Leif Rogers, MD and Leif Rogers, MD, Professional Corporation to 1st Amended Complaint
                                              Blank 29 Filed: 8/4/2016, Entered: 8/4/2016 First Amended Complaint
                                                Blank 28 Filed: 7/21/2016, Entered: 7/21/2016 Notice
                                                of posting jury fees
                                                  Blank 27 Filed: 7/14/2016, Entered: 7/14/2016 Order
                                                  GRANTING DEFT ALLERGAN, INC.'S MOTION TO STRIKE PORTIONS OF PLAINTIFFS' COMPLAINT (SIGNED BY JUDGE H. CHESTER HORN, JR.
                                                    Blank 26 Filed: 7/12/2016, Entered: 7/12/2016 Receipt
                                                    jury fees
                                                      Blank 25 Filed: 7/12/2016, Entered: 7/12/2016 Notice
                                                      of posting jury fees
                                                        Blank 24 Filed: 7/8/2016, Entered: 7/8/2016 Statement-Case Management
                                                          Blank 23 Filed: 7/5/2016, Entered: 7/5/2016 Notice
                                                          of non opposition to demurrer
                                                            Blank 22 Filed: 7/5/2016, Entered: 7/5/2016 Notice Of Association Of Attorneys
                                                              Blank 21 Filed: 7/1/2016, Entered: 7/1/2016 Ex-Parte Application
                                                              FOR AN ORDER APPROVING PRO HAC VICE APPLICATION OF ROBERT McGUIRL, OR ALTERNATIVELY, FOR AN ORDER SHORTENING TIME
                                                                Blank 20 Filed: 7/1/2016, Entered: 7/1/2016 Receipt
                                                                jury fees
                                                                  Blank 19 Filed: 7/1/2016, Entered: 7/1/2016 Order
                                                                  GRANTING VERIFIED APPLICATION BY ROBERT McGUIRL FOR PERMISSION TO APPEAR AS COUNSEL PRO HAC VICE (SIGNED BY JUDGE H. CHESTER HORN, JR.
                                                                    Blank 18 Filed: 7/1/2016, Entered: 7/1/2016 Notice
                                                                    of posting jury fees
                                                                      Blank 17 Filed: 7/1/2016, Entered: 7/1/2016 Statement-Case Management
                                                                        Blank 16 Filed: 6/17/2016, Entered: 6/17/2016 Notice
                                                                        of rescheduled hearing
                                                                          Blank 15 Filed: 6/14/2016, Entered: 6/14/2016 Notice
                                                                          Notice of Transfer of Action
                                                                            Blank 14 Filed: 5/18/2016, Entered: 5/18/2016 Order
                                                                            TRANSFERRING COMPLICATED PERSONAL INJURY (PI) CASE TO INDEPENDENT CALENDAR (IC) COURT
                                                                              Blank 13 Filed: 5/18/2016, Entered: 5/18/2016 Stipulation and Order
                                                                              TO TRANSFER COMPLICATED PERSONAL INJURY CASE TO INDEPENDENT CALENDAR COURT AND ORDER
                                                                                Blank 12 Filed: 3/25/2016, Entered: 3/25/2016 Motion to strike
                                                                                  Blank 11 Filed: 3/25/2016, Entered: 3/25/2016 Demurrer
                                                                                    Blank 10 Filed: 3/25/2016, Entered: 3/25/2016 1N11's Ntc of Hrng on Demurrer
                                                                                    DEM TO PLTFS CPLT 160323115178 11/14/2016
                                                                                      Blank 9 Filed: 3/25/2016, Entered: 3/25/2016 Motion to strike
                                                                                      portions of complt
                                                                                        Blank 8 Filed: 3/10/2016, Entered: 3/10/2016 Demand For Jury Trial
                                                                                          Blank 7 Filed: 3/10/2016, Entered: 3/10/2016 Declaration
                                                                                          OF TRIAL ATTORNEY
                                                                                            Blank 6 Filed: 3/10/2016, Entered: 3/10/2016 Answer
                                                                                              Blank 5 Filed: 2/29/2016, Entered: 2/29/2016 Proof-Service/Summons
                                                                                                Blank 4 Filed: 2/25/2016, Entered: 2/25/2016 Proof-Service/Summons
                                                                                                  Blank 3 Filed: 2/17/2016, Entered: 2/17/2016 Proof-Service/Summons
                                                                                                    Blank 2 Filed: 2/4/2016, Entered: 2/4/2016 Complaint filed
                                                                                                      Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
                                                                                                      Blank 1 Filed: 2/4/2016, Entered: 2/4/2016 Complaint

                                                                                                        Statistics

                                                                                                        This case has been viewed 1,167 times.

                                                                                                        No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                                                                                        Space
                                                                                                        Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                        Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                         
                                                                                                        PlainSite
                                                                                                        Sign Up
                                                                                                        Need Password Help?