Damon Heller v. The Surgery Group Of Los Angeles Pc et al
State Civil Lawsuit Superior Court of California, County of Los Angeles, Case No. BC608780

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Last Updated October 30, 2017 at 5:17 PM DT (3.5 years ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo Cohen Jason S. M.d., Defendant/Respondent

Toggle Switch Represented by Reback Mcandrews Kjar Warford&stockalper

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Clark Maureen E.
No Logo Does 1 Through 100, Defendant/Respondent

Toggle Switch Represented by Reback Mcandrews Kjar Warford&stockalper

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Clark Maureen E.
No Logo Johnson & Johnson Health Care System Doe1, Defendant/Respondent

Toggle Switch Represented by Reback Mcandrews Kjar Warford&stockalper

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Clark Maureen E.
No Logo Linden Surgical Center Of Beverly Hills, Defendant/Respondent

Toggle Switch Represented by Reback Mcandrews Kjar Warford&stockalper

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Clark Maureen E.
No Logo Nasseri Josef M.d., Defendant/Respondent

Toggle Switch Represented by Reback Mcandrews Kjar Warford&stockalper

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Clark Maureen E.
No Logo Surgery Group Of Los Angeles Pc The, Defendant/Respondent

Toggle Switch Represented by Reback Mcandrews Kjar Warford&stockalper

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Clark Maureen E.
No Logo Heller Damon, Plaintiff/Petitioner

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Bunch Bruce M..

Represented by Law Offices Of Bruce M. Bunch

Type Med Malpractice (Drs & Surgeons) (General Jurisdiction)
Status Pending
  Entries (12) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Blank 12 Filed: 10/16/2017, Entered: 10/16/2017 Partial Dismissal
with Prejudice) (the third cause of action for breach of warranty as against Defendant Johnson & Johnson Health Care Systems, Inc. only
    Blank 11 Filed: 9/22/2017, Entered: 9/22/2017 Receipt
    RE: JURY FEES-$150.00
      Blank 10 Filed: 9/14/2017, Entered: 9/14/2017 Stip & Order-Continue Trial,FSC-PI
      FSC: 01-18-18 TRIAL: 01-30-18
        Blank 9 Filed: 9/7/2017, Entered: 9/7/2017 Proof of Service
        P/S JOHNSON & JOHNSON HEALTH CARE SYSTEMS, INC.
          Blank 8 Filed: 9/5/2017, Entered: 9/5/2017 Amendment to Complaint
            Blank 7 Filed: 7/12/2017, Entered: 7/12/2017 Answer to Complaint
              Blank 6 Filed: 7/6/2017, Entered: 7/6/2017 Stipulation and Order
              NOTICE OF ENTRY TO CONTINUE TRIAL, FSC AND RELATED MOTION/DISCOVERY DATES
                Blank 5 Filed: 6/26/2017, Entered: 6/26/2017 Stip & Order-Continue Trial,FSC-PI
                FSC: 11-17-17 TRIAL: 12-01-17
                  Blank 4 Filed: 6/22/2017, Entered: 6/22/2017 Answer to Complaint
                    Blank 3 Filed: 6/22/2017, Entered: 6/22/2017 Receipt
                      Blank 2 Filed: 6/22/2017, Entered: 6/22/2017 Declaration
                        Blank 1 Filed: 2/1/2016, Entered: 2/1/2016 Complaint

                          Statistics

                          This case has been viewed 1,293 times.

                          No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                          Space
                          Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                          Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                           
                          PlainSite
                          Sign Up
                          Need Password Help?