Luisa Hosseini v. International Coffee & Tea Llc
State Civil Lawsuit Superior Court of California, County of Los Angeles, Case No. BC612020

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Last Updated October 30, 2017 at 7:41 PM DT (3.5 years ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo Coffee Bean & Tea Leaf The, Defendant/Respondent's DBA
No Logo Does 1 Through 100, Defendant/Respondent

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Littler Mendelson A Professional Corp.
No Logo International Coffee & Tea, LLC, Defendant/Respondent

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Littler Mendelson A Professional Corp.
No Logo Hosseini Luisa, Plaintiff/Petitioner

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Aequitas Legal Group +1 213 223 7144
Type Other Employment Complaint (General Jurisdiction)
Status Pending
  Entries (17) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Blank 17 Filed: 3/24/2017, Entered: 3/24/2017 Notice
DEFT NT OF COURT MINUTE ORDER
    Blank 16 Filed: 2/17/2017, Entered: 2/17/2017 Statement-Case Management
    JOINT FURTHER STATUS CONF STATEMENT
      Blank 15 Filed: 2/16/2017, Entered: 2/16/2017 Stipulation and Order
      Stipulation and Protective Order (conformed copy returned to DEFT via SASE to County Legal Atty Service on 2/16/17
        Blank 14 Filed: 9/13/2016, Entered: 9/13/2016 Order: Case Management
          Blank 13 Filed: 9/7/2016, Entered: 9/7/2016 Report - Status
          JOINT FURTHER STATUS CONFERENCE STATEMENT
            Blank 12 Filed: 8/8/2016, Entered: 8/8/2016 Answer to Complaint
            DEFT'S ANS TO PLT'S FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT
              Blank 11 Filed: 7/8/2016, Entered: 7/8/2016 Order
              AUTHORIZING ELECTRONIC SERVICE (CASEANYWHERE
                Blank 10 Filed: 6/30/2016, Entered: 6/30/2016 Report - Status
                RE: JOINT
                  Blank 9 Filed: 5/24/2016, Entered: 5/24/2016 Notice-Related Cases
                  OF RELATED CASES BC557239
                    Blank 8 Filed: 5/4/2016, Entered: 5/4/2016 Proof of Service
                    OF ORDER DETERMINING CASE TO BE COMPLEX AND INITIAL STATUS CONFERENCE ORDER
                      Blank 7 Filed: 4/18/2016, Entered: 4/18/2016 Order
                      RE: INITIAL STATUS CONFERENCE
                        Blank 6 Filed: 4/4/2016, Entered: 4/4/2016 First Amended Complaint
                          Blank 5 Filed: 3/23/2016, Entered: 3/23/2016 Proof-Service/Summons
                            Blank 4 Filed: 3/8/2016, Entered: 3/8/2016 Summons issued
                              Blank 3 Filed: 3/8/2016, Entered: 3/8/2016 CCP 170.6 Application Filed
                                Blank 2 Filed: 3/8/2016, Entered: 3/8/2016 Summons Filed
                                  Blank 1 Filed: 2/26/2016, Entered: 2/26/2016 Complaint

                                    Statistics

                                    This case has been viewed 392 times.

                                    No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                    Space
                                    Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                    Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                     
                                    PlainSite
                                    Sign Up
                                    Need Password Help?