Anita Bralock v. American University Of Health Sciences Inc
State Civil Lawsuit Superior Court of California, County of Los Angeles, Case No. BC614955

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Last Updated October 30, 2017 at 9:49 PM DT (4 years ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo American University Of Health Sciences, Defendant/Respondent

Represented by Tyson & Mendes LLP

No Logo Does 1-50, Defendant/Respondent

Represented by Tyson & Mendes LLP

No Logo Johnson, Gregory, Defendant/Respondent

Represented by Tyson & Mendes LLP

No Logo Bralock Anita, Plaintiff/Petitioner

Represented by Law Office Of Twila S. White

Type Wrongful Termination (General Jurisdiction)
Status Pending
  Entries (50) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Blank 50 Filed: 10/16/2017, Entered: 10/16/2017 Opposition Document
    Blank 49 Filed: 10/16/2017, Entered: 10/16/2017 Ex-Parte Application
      Blank 48 Filed: 9/29/2017, Entered: 9/29/2017 Motion to compel
      FURTHER RESPONSES TO DEPOSITION QUESTIONS
        Blank 47 Filed: 8/9/2017, Entered: 8/9/2017 Objection Document
        TO NOTICE OF RULING RE EX PARTE HEARD 8-1-17
          Blank 46 Filed: 8/3/2017, Entered: 8/3/2017 Notice Of Ruling
            Blank 45 Filed: 8/1/2017, Entered: 8/1/2017 Request For Judicial Notice
              Blank 44 Filed: 8/1/2017, Entered: 8/1/2017 Ord-Appt Apprv Rptr as Rptr protem
                Blank 43 Filed: 8/1/2017, Entered: 8/1/2017 Ex-Parte Application
                  Blank 42 Filed: 8/1/2017, Entered: 8/1/2017 Opposition Document
                    Blank 41 Filed: 5/25/2017, Entered: 5/25/2017 motion to quash
                      Blank 40 Filed: 5/25/2017, Entered: 5/25/2017 Miscellaneous-Other
                      SEPARATE STATEMENT
                        Blank 39 Filed: 4/19/2017, Entered: 4/19/2017 Declaration
                          Blank 38 Filed: 4/19/2017, Entered: 4/19/2017 Ex-Parte Application
                            Blank 37 Filed: 1/5/2017, Entered: 1/5/2017 Amended Answer to Complaint
                            GREGORY JOHNSON'S VERIFIED AMENDED ANSWER TO PLAINTIFF, ANITA BRALOC K'S VERIFIED FIRST AMENDED COMPLAI NT
                              Blank 36 Filed: 1/4/2017, Entered: 1/4/2017 Answer To First Amended Complaint
                              GREGORY JOHNSON'S ANSWER TO PLAINT IFF, ANITA BRALOCK'S VERIFIED FIRS T AMENDED COMPLAINT
                                Blank 35 Filed: 1/4/2017, Entered: 1/4/2017 Request to Enter Default
                                REJECT FOR JOHNSON- ANSWER FILED ON 1-4-17.
                                  Blank 34 Filed: 12/29/2016, Entered: 12/29/2016 Answer
                                  Gregory Johnson
                                    Blank 33 Filed: 12/12/2016, Entered: 12/12/2016 Notice
                                    OF SUBMISSION ON TENTATIVE RULING ON DEMURRER TO FIRST AMENDED COMPL AINT
                                      Blank 32 Filed: 12/5/2016, Entered: 12/5/2016 Reply/Response
                                      TO PLAINTIFF'S OPPOSITION TO DEFEN DANT GREGORY JOHNSON'S DEMURRER TO PLAINTIFF'S FIRST AMENDED VERIFIE D COMPLAINT; MEMORANDUM OF POINTS AND AUTHORITIES IN SUPPORT THEREOF
                                        Blank 31 Filed: 11/29/2016, Entered: 11/29/2016 Opposition Document
                                        TO DEFENDANT GREGORY JOHNSON'S REQ UEST FOR JUDICIAL NOTICE IN SUPPOR T OF JOHNSON'S DEMURRER TO PLAINTI FF'S FIRST AMENDED VERFIED COMPLAI NT
                                          Blank 30 Filed: 11/29/2016, Entered: 11/29/2016 Opposition Document
                                          TO DEFENDANT'S DEMURRER TO PLAINTI FF'S FIRST AMENDED VERIFIED COMPLA INT; MEMORANDUM OF POINTS AND AUTH ORITIES IN SUPPORT THEREOF; DECLAR ATION OF TWILA S. WHITE; [PROPOSED ] ORDER
                                            Blank 29 Filed: 11/29/2016, Entered: 11/29/2016 Opposition Document
                                            TO DEFENDANT GREGORY JOHNSON'S REQ UEST FOR JUDICIAL NOTICE IN SUPPOR T OF JOHNSON'S DEMURRER TO PLAINTI FF'S FIRST MANEDED VERFIED COMPLAI NT
                                              Blank 28 Filed: 10/28/2016, Entered: 10/28/2016 Stipulation and Order
                                              To Consolidate Cases;
                                                Blank 27 Filed: 10/24/2016, Entered: 10/24/2016 Proof of Service
                                                  Blank 26 Filed: 10/24/2016, Entered: 10/24/2016 Declaration
                                                  OF SARAH E. CHRISTENSON IN SUPPORT OF DEFENDANT GREGORY JOHNSON'S DE MURRER TO PLAINTIFF'S FIRST AMENDE D VERIFIED COMPLAINT
                                                    Blank 25 Filed: 10/24/2016, Entered: 10/24/2016 Defendants Demurrer
                                                    TO PLAINTIFF'S FIRST AMENDED VERIF IED COMPLAINT; MEMORANDUM OF POINT S AND AUTHORITIES IN SUPPORT THERE OF
                                                      Blank 24 Filed: 10/24/2016, Entered: 10/24/2016 Request For Judicial Notice
                                                      IN SUPPORT OF DEMURRER TO PLAINTIF F'S FIRST AMENDED VERIFIED COMPLAI NT
                                                        Blank 23 Filed: 9/20/2016, Entered: 9/20/2016 First Amended Complaint
                                                          Blank 22 Filed: 8/18/2016, Entered: 8/18/2016 Opposition Document
                                                          TO MOTION TO STRIKE FILED BY DEFEN DANT GREGORY JOHNSON
                                                            Blank 21 Filed: 7/28/2016, Entered: 7/28/2016 Receipt
                                                            Civil Deposit
                                                              Blank 20 Filed: 7/28/2016, Entered: 7/28/2016 Notice
                                                              Of Posting Jury Fees
                                                                Blank 19 Filed: 7/8/2016, Entered: 7/8/2016 Joinder
                                                                IN DEFENDANT GREGORY JOHNSON'S MOT ION TO STRIKE PORTIONS OF PLAINTIF F'S VERIFIED COMPLAINT
                                                                  Blank 18 Filed: 7/8/2016, Entered: 7/8/2016 Defendants Demurrer
                                                                  TO PLAINTIFF'S VERIFIED COMPLAINT; MEMORANDUM OF POINTS AND AUTHORITI ES IN SUPPORT THEREOF
                                                                    Blank 17 Filed: 7/8/2016, Entered: 7/8/2016 Declaration
                                                                    OF SARAH E. CHRISTENSON IN SUPPORT OF DEMURRER TO COMPLAINT
                                                                      Blank 16 Filed: 7/8/2016, Entered: 7/8/2016 Answer
                                                                      AMERICAN UNIVERSITY OF HEALTH SCIE NCES, INC.
                                                                        Blank 15 Filed: 7/8/2016, Entered: 7/8/2016 Motion to strike
                                                                        MEMORANDUM OF POINTS AND AUTHORITI ES IN SUPPORT THEREOF
                                                                          Blank 14 Filed: 6/21/2016, Entered: 6/21/2016 Stipulation and Order
                                                                          To Continue CMC;
                                                                            Blank 13 Filed: 6/16/2016, Entered: 6/16/2016 Reply/Response
                                                                            OF DEFENDANT AMERICAN UNIVERSITY O F HEALTH SCIENCES, INC. TO PLAINTI FF'S OPPOSITION TO DEFENDANTS' MOT ION TO COMPEL ARBITRATION
                                                                              Blank 12 Filed: 6/16/2016, Entered: 6/16/2016 Substitution of Attorney
                                                                                Blank 11 Filed: 6/10/2016, Entered: 6/10/2016 Opposition Document
                                                                                TO DEFENDANT AMERICAN UNIVERSITY O F HEALTH SCIENCES, INC.'S MOTION T O COMPEL ARBITRATION AND TO STAY T HE ACTION PENDING ARBITRATION; MEM ORANDUM OF POINTS AND AUTHORITIES; DECLARATION OF ANITA BRALOCK
                                                                                  Blank 10 Filed: 6/7/2016, Entered: 6/7/2016 Statement-Case Management
                                                                                    Blank 9 Filed: 6/7/2016, Entered: 6/7/2016 Statement-Case Management
                                                                                      Blank 8 Filed: 6/2/2016, Entered: 6/2/2016 Notice of change of address
                                                                                        Blank 7 Filed: 5/9/2016, Entered: 5/9/2016 Proof of Service
                                                                                        NOTICE OF TAKING DEPOSITION, ETC.
                                                                                          Blank 6 Filed: 4/28/2016, Entered: 4/28/2016 Declaration
                                                                                          OF ALMA PINEDA IN SUPPORT OF DEFEN DANTS' PETITION TO COMPEL ARDITRAT ION
                                                                                            Blank 5 Filed: 4/28/2016, Entered: 4/28/2016 Declaration
                                                                                            OF SARAH E. CHRISTENSON IN SUPPORT OF PETITION TO COMPEL ARBITRATION
                                                                                              Blank 4 Filed: 4/28/2016, Entered: 4/28/2016 Motion to compel
                                                                                              ARBITRATION; MEMORANDUM OF POINTS AND AUTHORITIES IN SUPPORT THEREOF ; DECLARATION OF SARAH E. CHRISTEN SON; DECLARATION OF AMA PINEDA
                                                                                                Blank 3 Filed: 4/8/2016, Entered: 4/8/2016 Notice-Case Management Conference
                                                                                                  Blank 2 Filed: 4/8/2016, Entered: 4/8/2016 Proof of Service
                                                                                                  SUMMONS & COMPLAINT, ETC.
                                                                                                    Blank 1 Filed: 3/25/2016, Entered: 3/25/2016 Complaint

                                                                                                      Statistics

                                                                                                      This case has been viewed 897 times.

                                                                                                      No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                                                                                      Space
                                                                                                      Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                      Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                       
                                                                                                      PlainSite
                                                                                                      Sign Up
                                                                                                      Need Password Help?