Trisha K Paytas v. Damien D Wayans
State Civil Lawsuit Superior Court of California, County of Los Angeles, Case No. BC623197

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Last Updated November 1, 2017 at 6:26 AM DT (3.5 years ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo Does 1 Through 10, Defendant/Respondent

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Madison Mark E.
No Logo Wayans Damien D., Defendant/Respondent

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Madison Mark E.
No Logo Paytas Trisha K., Plaintiff/Petitioner

Represented by Wolf, Rifkin, Shapiro, Schulman & Rabkin, LLP

Type Breach Rental/Lease (not UD/Evict) (General Jurisdiction)
Status Pending
  Entries (16) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Blank 16 Filed: 8/21/2017, Entered: 8/21/2017 Notice of Entry of Judgment
    Blank 15 Filed: 8/16/2017, Entered: 8/16/2017 Notice Of Ruling
      Blank 14 Filed: 8/8/2017, Entered: 8/8/2017 Stipulation and Order
      STIPULATION REGARDING PARTIES' CONSENT TO WAIVE TRIAL AND PROCEED WITH BINDING ARBITRATION; ORDER
        Blank 13 Filed: 7/20/2017, Entered: 7/20/2017 ExParte Application & Order
          Blank 12 Filed: 7/13/2017, Entered: 7/13/2017 Declaration
          IN SUPPORT OF ATTORNEY'S MOTION TO BE RELIEVED AS COUNSEL
            Blank 11 Filed: 7/13/2017, Entered: 7/13/2017 Motion To Be Relieved As Counsel
            AS COUNSEL FROM DEF DAMIEN WAYANS
              Blank 10 Filed: 7/13/2017, Entered: 7/13/2017 Proof of Service
                Blank 9 Filed: 1/6/2017, Entered: 1/6/2017 Order
                CASE MANAGEMENT
                  Blank 8 Filed: 10/21/2016, Entered: 10/21/2016 Notice-Case Management Conference
                    Blank 7 Filed: 10/20/2016, Entered: 10/20/2016 Statement-Case Management
                      Blank 6 Filed: 10/17/2016, Entered: 10/17/2016 Statement-Case Management
                        Blank 5 Filed: 10/11/2016, Entered: 10/11/2016 Notice of Continuance
                          Blank 4 Filed: 7/25/2016, Entered: 7/25/2016 Answer
                            Blank 3 Filed: 7/14/2016, Entered: 7/14/2016 Proof of Service
                            SUMMONS AND COMPLAINT SUB-SERVED ON 7-8-16 AND BY MAIL ON 7-12-16
                              Blank 2 Filed: 6/16/2016, Entered: 6/16/2016 Notice-Case Management Conference
                                Blank 1 Filed: 6/9/2016, Entered: 6/9/2016 Complaint

                                  Statistics

                                  This case has been viewed 10,681 times.

                                  No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                  Space
                                  Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                  Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                   
                                  PlainSite
                                  Sign Up
                                  Need Password Help?