Jennifer Robi v. Merck & Co Inc et al
State Civil Lawsuit Superior Court of California, County of Los Angeles, Case No. BC628589

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Last Updated November 1, 2017 at 10:32 AM EDT (4.1 years ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

Space Space

No Logo Fuller M.d. Claire Valencia, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Venable LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Gray Davis S.
No Logo Fuller M.d. Valencia, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Venable LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Gray Davis S.
No Logo Garza M.d. Judith, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Venable LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Gray Davis S.
No Logo Kaiser Foundation Hospitals A Corp., Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Venable LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Gray Davis S.
No Logo Merck & Co. Inc. A New Jersey Corp., Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Venable LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Gray Davis S.
No Logo Scanlon M.d. Robin B., Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Venable LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Gray Davis S.
No Logo Southern California Permenante Mg, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Venable LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Gray Davis S.
No Logo Does 1-100, Defendant/Respondent

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Whitwell Ben D.
No Logo Dohme Corp., Defendant/Respondent

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Whitwell Ben D.
No Logo Fuller Claire Judith. M.d., Defendant/Respondent
No Logo Fuller Claire Valencia M.d., Defendant/Respondent

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Whitwell Ben D.
No Logo Garza Judith. M.d., Defendant/Respondent

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Whitwell Ben D.
Kaiser Foundation Hospitals Kaiser Foundation Hospitals, Defendant/Respondent

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Whitwell Ben D.

Toggle Switch Represented by Venable LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Gray Davis S.
Merck & Company, Inc. Merck & Company, Inc., Defendant/Respondent
Officially listed as "Merck & Co Inc"
Officer/Director, Rosetta Inpharmatics,inc.
Officer/Director, Sibia Neurosciences, Inc.
Officer/Director, SCHERING PLOUGH CORP

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Whitwell Ben D.

Toggle Switch Represented by Venable LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Gray Davis S.
Merck, Sharp & Dohme Corporation Merck, Sharp & Dohme Corporation, Defendant/Respondent
Officially listed as "Merck Sharp & Dohme Corp"

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Whitwell Ben D.

Toggle Switch Represented by Venable LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Gray Davis S.
No Logo Scanlon Robin B. M.d., Defendant/Respondent

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Whitwell Ben D.
No Logo Southern California Permanente Medical, Defendant/Respondent

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Whitwell Ben D.

Toggle Switch Represented by Venable LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Gray Davis S.
No Logo Robi Jennifer, Plaintiff/Petitioner

Represented by Ajalat & Ajalat Llp

Type Prdct Liablty (not asbes,tox,envir (General Jurisdiction)
Status Pending
  Entries (46) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Blank 46 Filed: 10/13/2017, Entered: 10/13/2017 Order
GRANTING UNOPPOSED APPLICATION FOR ADMISSION OF ATTORNEY PRO HAC VICE
    Blank 45 Filed: 9/28/2017, Entered: 9/28/2017 Notice of Continuance
    OF INITIAL MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE [CORRECTED]
      Blank 44 Filed: 8/30/2017, Entered: 8/30/2017 Notice
      OF CONTINUANCE OF INITIAL MANDATORY SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE
        Blank 43 Filed: 8/22/2017, Entered: 8/22/2017 Report - Status
        JOINT EXHIBIT A TO INITIAL CONFERENCE STATEMENT
          Blank 42 Filed: 8/21/2017, Entered: 8/21/2017 Report - Status
          JOINT
            Blank 41 Filed: 8/11/2017, Entered: 8/11/2017 Application-Pro Hac Vice
            Christina Lee Gaarder
              Blank 40 Filed: 8/11/2017, Entered: 8/11/2017 Declaration
              of Ben D. Whitwell iso app. for pro hac vice
                Blank 39 Filed: 8/11/2017, Entered: 8/11/2017 Notice
                of unopposed application and application for admission of attorney pro hac vice
                  Blank 38 Filed: 8/11/2017, Entered: 8/11/2017 Points and Authorities
                  memo, iso application for pro hac vice
                    Blank 37 Filed: 8/11/2017, Entered: 8/11/2017 Proof of Service
                    pro hac vice application
                      Blank 36 Filed: 6/22/2017, Entered: 6/22/2017 Notice
                      OF COURT ORDER REGARDING (1) INITIAL STATUS CONFERENCE SCHEDULING DATE & CONTINUING STAY OF LITIGATION AND (2) INITIAL STATUS CONFERENCE ORDER
                        Blank 35 Filed: 5/2/2017, Entered: 5/2/2017 Proof of Service
                        RE NOTICE OF RULING GRANTING COMPLEX DESIGNATION PURSUANT TO CALIFORNIA RULES OF COURT RULE 3.400
                          Blank 34 Filed: 4/14/2017, Entered: 4/14/2017 Order
                          GRANTING UNOPPOSED APPLICATION FOR ADMISSION OF ATTORNEY PRO HAC VICE (DAVID S. GRAY
                            Blank 33 Filed: 4/4/2017, Entered: 4/4/2017 Order
                            GRANTING UNOPPOSED APPLICATION FOR ADMISSION OF ATTORNEY PRO HAC VICE (DINO S. SANGIAMO
                              Blank 32 Filed: 4/4/2017, Entered: 4/4/2017 Order
                              GRANTING UNOPPOSED APPLICATION FOR ADMISSION OF ATTORNEY PRO HAC VICE (KALI ENYEART BOOK
                                Blank 31 Filed: 3/21/2017, Entered: 3/21/2017 Notice Of Ruling
                                  Blank 30 Filed: 3/7/2017, Entered: 3/7/2017 Statement-Case Management
                                    Blank 29 Filed: 3/3/2017, Entered: 3/3/2017 Statement-Case Management
                                      Blank 28 Filed: 3/3/2017, Entered: 3/3/2017 Notice
                                      OF POSTING JURY FEES
                                        Blank 27 Filed: 3/3/2017, Entered: 3/3/2017 Jury Fee Deposit by Defendant
                                          Blank 26 Filed: 3/2/2017, Entered: 3/2/2017 response
                                          TO UNOPPOSED APPLICATION
                                            Blank 25 Filed: 3/2/2017, Entered: 3/2/2017 Declaration
                                            OF SOL P. AJALAT
                                              Blank 24 Filed: 3/2/2017, Entered: 3/2/2017 Statement-Case Management
                                                Blank 23 Filed: 2/14/2017, Entered: 2/14/2017 Memorandum Of Points And Authorities;
                                                  Blank 22 Filed: 2/14/2017, Entered: 2/14/2017 Proof of Service
                                                    Blank 21 Filed: 2/14/2017, Entered: 2/14/2017 Declaration
                                                    OF BEN D. WHITWELL IN SUPPORT OF UNOPPOSED APPLICATION TO DESIGNATE CASE AS COMPLEX
                                                      Blank 20 Filed: 2/14/2017, Entered: 2/14/2017 Notice
                                                      OF UNOPPOSED APPLICATION AND APPLICATION TO DESIGNATE CASE AS COMPLEX
                                                        Blank 19 Filed: 2/14/2017, Entered: 2/14/2017 Notice
                                                        OF HEARING ON UNOPPOSED APPLICATION FOR ADMISSION OF ATTORNEY PRO HAC VICE
                                                          Blank 18 Filed: 2/7/2017, Entered: 2/7/2017 Notice Of Ruling
                                                            Blank 17 Filed: 1/26/2017, Entered: 1/26/2017 Affidavit of Prejudice--Peremptory
                                                              Blank 16 Filed: 1/11/2017, Entered: 1/11/2017 Order
                                                              TRANSFERRING COMPLICATED PERSONAL INJURY (PI) CASE TO INDEPENDENT CALENDAR (IC) COURT
                                                                Blank 15 Filed: 12/16/2016, Entered: 12/16/2016 Notice
                                                                NTC OF UNOPPOSED APP AND APP FOR ADM OF ATTY PRO HAC VICE
                                                                  Blank 14 Filed: 12/16/2016, Entered: 12/16/2016 Points and Authorities
                                                                  MEMO OF P&A IN SUPP OF UNOPPOSED APP AND APP FOR ADM OF ATTY PRO HAC VICE
                                                                    Blank 13 Filed: 12/16/2016, Entered: 12/16/2016 Declaration
                                                                    DECL OF BEN D WHITWELL IN SUPP OF UNOPPOSED APP; MEMO OF P&A; VERIFIED APP OF DINO S SANGIAMO
                                                                      Blank 12 Filed: 12/16/2016, Entered: 12/16/2016 Declaration
                                                                      DECL OF BEN D WHITWELL IN SUPP OF UNOPPOSED APP FOR ADM OF ATTY PRO HAC VICE
                                                                        Blank 11 Filed: 12/16/2016, Entered: 12/16/2016 Application-Miscellaneous
                                                                        VERIFIED APP OF DAVID S GRAY 161202178101 1/11/2017 01:30 pm
                                                                          Blank 10 Filed: 12/16/2016, Entered: 12/16/2016 Points and Authorities
                                                                          MEMO OF P&A IN SUPP OF UNOPP APP AND APP FOR ADM OF ATTY PRO HAC VICE
                                                                            Blank 9 Filed: 12/16/2016, Entered: 12/16/2016 Notice
                                                                            NTC OF UNOPP APP AND APP FOR ADM OF ATTY PRO HAC VICE
                                                                              Blank 8 Filed: 12/16/2016, Entered: 12/16/2016 Declaration
                                                                              DECL OF BEN D WHITWELL IN SUPP OF UNOPP APP FOR ADM OF ATTY PHV
                                                                                Blank 7 Filed: 12/16/2016, Entered: 12/16/2016 Application-Miscellaneous
                                                                                VERIFIED APPL OF KALI ENYEART BOOK 161202178106 1/11/2017 01:30 pm
                                                                                  Blank 6 Filed: 12/16/2016, Entered: 12/16/2016 Points and Authorities
                                                                                  MEMO OF P*A IN SUPP OF UNOPPOSED APP AND APP FOR ADM OF ATTY PHV
                                                                                    Blank 5 Filed: 12/16/2016, Entered: 12/16/2016 Application-Pro Hac Vice
                                                                                    DINO S SANGIAMO 161202178104 1/11/2017 01:30 pm
                                                                                      Blank 4 Filed: 12/16/2016, Entered: 12/16/2016 Proof of Service
                                                                                        Blank 3 Filed: 10/3/2016, Entered: 10/3/2016 Answer
                                                                                          Blank 2 Filed: 7/27/2016, Entered: 7/27/2016 Complaint
                                                                                            Blank 1 Filed: 6/14/2014, Entered: 6/14/2014 Complaint
                                                                                            INITIAL STATUS CONFERENCE ORDER

                                                                                              Statistics

                                                                                              This case has been viewed 2,281 times.

                                                                                              No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                                                                              Space
                                                                                              Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                              Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                               
                                                                                              PlainSite
                                                                                              Sign Up
                                                                                              Need Password Help?