Jill Buice v. Lisa Nicole Piasecki
State Civil Lawsuit Superior Court of California, County of Los Angeles, Case No. BC629378

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Last Updated November 1, 2017 at 11:08 AM DT (3.5 years ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo Buice Jill, Plaintiff/Petitioner

Represented by Nelson & Fraenkel Llp

No Logo Does 1 Through 10, Defendant/Respondent
No Logo Piasecki Lisa Nicole, Defendant/Respondent
No Logo Lane Tory, Defendant/Respondent's AKA
Type Intentional PI/PD/WD (eg. assault) (General Jurisdiction)
Status Pending
  Entries (21) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Blank 21 Filed: 6/21/2017, Entered: 6/21/2017 Order for Publication
FOR MS. LISA NICOLE PIASECKI,AKA TORY LANE NEWSPAPER THE METROPOLITAN NEWS- ENTERPRISE
    Blank 20 Filed: 6/16/2017, Entered: 6/16/2017 Appl & Ord to Publish Summons
    FOR LISA N PIASECKI AKA TORY LANE NEWSPAPER METROPOLITAN NEWS-ENTERP RISE RECEIPT #LAC155814019 $20.00 6-19-17
      Blank 19 Filed: 6/8/2017, Entered: 6/8/2017 Miscellaneous-Other
      NON SERVICE REPORT
        Blank 18 Filed: 12/29/2016, Entered: 12/29/2016 Proof of Service
        lisa nicole plasecki
          Blank 17 Filed: 11/2/2016, Entered: 11/2/2016 Order
          GRANTING VERIFIED APPLICATION OF RICHARD C. MITCHELL TO APPEAR PRO HAC VICE
            Blank 16 Filed: 11/2/2016, Entered: 11/2/2016 Order
            CONDITIONALLY GRANTING PLFF'S MOTIONS TO PERMIT PATRICK J. O'CONNOR AND RICHARD C. MITCHELL TO APPEAR AS COUNSEL PRO HAC VICE
              Blank 15 Filed: 11/2/2016, Entered: 11/2/2016 Order
              GRANTING VERIFIED APPLICATION OF PATRICK J. O'CONNOR TO APPEAR PRO HAC VICE
                Blank 14 Filed: 11/1/2016, Entered: 11/1/2016 Proof of Service
                CA PRO HAC VICE PROGRAM
                  Blank 13 Filed: 10/26/2016, Entered: 10/26/2016 Proof of Service
                  PRO HAC VICE PROGRAM - THE STATE BAR OF CA
                    Blank 12 Filed: 10/14/2016, Entered: 10/14/2016 Ex-Parte Application
                    RE:ORDER EXTENDING TIME TO SERVE
                      Blank 11 Filed: 10/12/2016, Entered: 10/12/2016 Proof of Service
                      BY MAIL LISA NICOLE PIASECKI
                        Blank 10 Filed: 10/12/2016, Entered: 10/12/2016 Declaration Of Diligence
                          Blank 9 Filed: 10/12/2016, Entered: 10/12/2016 Proof of Service
                          LISA NICOLE PIASECKI
                            Blank 8 Filed: 10/5/2016, Entered: 10/5/2016 Declaration Of Diligence
                              Blank 7 Filed: 9/29/2016, Entered: 9/29/2016 Declaration Of Diligence
                                Blank 6 Filed: 9/22/2016, Entered: 9/22/2016 Proof of Service
                                LISA NICOLE PIASECKI
                                  Blank 5 Filed: 9/7/2016, Entered: 9/7/2016 Notice of Application
                                  AND APPLICATION OF PATRICK J. O'CONNOR TO APPEAR PRO HAC VICE
                                    Blank 4 Filed: 9/7/2016, Entered: 9/7/2016 Notice of Application
                                    AND APPLICATION OF RICHARD C. MITCHELL TO APPEAR PRO HAC VICE
                                      Blank 3 Filed: 9/7/2016, Entered: 9/7/2016 Application-Pro Hac Vice
                                      OF PATRICK J. O'CONNOR
                                        Blank 2 Filed: 9/7/2016, Entered: 9/7/2016 Application-Pro Hac Vice
                                        OF RICHARD C. MITCHELL
                                          Blank 1 Filed: 8/3/2016, Entered: 8/3/2016 Complaint

                                            Statistics

                                            This case has been viewed 2,376 times.

                                            No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                            Space
                                            Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                            Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                             
                                            PlainSite
                                            Sign Up
                                            Need Password Help?